Youssef Mahboubian-fard, Et. Al. Vs. Golden Eagle Ins. Co.
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. BC147541

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Golden Eagle Insurance Company, Defendant/Respondent

Represented by Brownwood Rice & Zurawski Law Offices

No Logo Mahboubian-fard Helen, Plaintiff/Petitioner

Represented by Ahdoot & Paulson Law Offices Of

No Logo Mahboubian-fard Sohayla, Plaintiff/Petitioner

Represented by Ahdoot & Paulson Law Offices Of

No Logo Mahboubian-fard Youssef, Plaintiff/Petitioner

Represented by Ahdoot & Paulson Law Offices Of

Type Commrcial Compl-Not Tort or Complx (General Jurisdiction)
Status Dismissed - Other 08/07/1996
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 6 Filed: 9/4/1996, Entered: 9/4/1996 Notice-Change-Firm Name / Address
    Blank 5 Filed: 9/4/1996, Entered: 9/4/1996 Declaration
    of service re notice of change of firm name
      Blank 4 Filed: 8/7/1996, Entered: 8/7/1996 Ord of Disml without prejudice
        Blank 3 Filed: 6/21/1996, Entered: 6/21/1996 Answer to Complaint
          Blank 2 Filed: 6/21/1996, Entered: 6/21/1996 Declaration
            Blank 1 Filed: 4/3/1996, Entered: 4/3/1996 Complaint

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 122 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?