Sakorn Buckhout, et al v. Lockheed Martin Corp., et al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. BC149893

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Alison Engines, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Lockheed Martin Corp A Maryland Corp, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Rolls-Royce, Inc., Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Boyd Sarah, Plaintiff/Petitioner
No Logo Boyd Susan, Plaintiff/Petitioner
No Logo Boyd Zachary, Plaintiff/Petitioner
No Logo Buckhout Christine, Plaintiff/Petitioner
No Logo Buckhout Sakorn, Plaintiff/Petitioner
No Logo Kemp James Allen, Plaintiff/Petitioner
No Logo Kemp Jeffrey Michael, Plaintiff/Petitioner
No Logo Kemp Ruth, Plaintiff/Petitioner
No Logo Vail Mary, Plaintiff/Petitioner
Type PI Other -DO NOT USE (General Jurisdiction)
Status Removal to Federal Court 06/28/1996
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 8 Filed: 7/30/1997, Entered: 7/30/1997 Ord to Show Cause
Ntc to Appear
    Blank 7 Filed: 7/8/1996, Entered: 7/8/1996 Proof of Service
    re summons on first amended complaint; first amended complaint notice of removal/first amended complaint
      Blank 6 Filed: 6/28/1996, Entered: 6/28/1996 Ntc of Removal to Federal Court
      1st amended complt.
        Blank 5 Filed: 6/13/1996, Entered: 6/13/1996 Summons Issued
          Blank 4 Filed: 6/13/1996, Entered: 6/13/1996 Petition for Appointment
          of guardian ad litem, and ord.
            Blank 3 Filed: 6/13/1996, Entered: 6/13/1996 Petition for Appointment
            of guardian ad litem and ord.
              Blank 2 Filed: 6/13/1996, Entered: 6/13/1996 Amended Complaint
                Blank 1 Filed: 5/13/1996, Entered: 5/13/1996 Complaint

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 155 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?