Dennis McGeough, et al v. Wells Fargo Bank NA, et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, Case No. 16-35014

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 1, 2017 at 11:20 AM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (2) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/7/2016, Entered: None
Filed referral notice (Deputy Clerk:CKP): Referring to the district court for determination whether in forma pauperis status should continue for this appeal. [9818604] (CKP) [Entered: 01/07/2016 10:24 AM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/6/2016, Entered: None
    DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF APLTS IN PRO PER AND COUNSEL FOR APLES. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Dennis P. McGeough and Katherine J. McGeough opening brief due 04/14/2016. Appellees Bank of America, Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, Nationstar Mortgage LLC and Wells Fargo Bank NA answering brief due 05/16/2016. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [9818087] (KM) [Entered: 01/06/2016 04:29 PM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF

      Statistics

      This case has been viewed 72 times.

      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
      Space
      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
       
      PlainSite
      Sign Up
      Need Password Help?