Jefferson v. Turpin
Federal Civil Lawsuit Georgia Northern District Court, Case No. 1:96-cv-00989
District Judge Clarence Cooper, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 28, 2017 at 6:14 AM EST (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Lawrence Joseph Jefferson, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by GEORGIA DIAGNOSTIC & CLASSIFICATION PRISON

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lawrence Joseph Jefferson +1 770 504 2000

Toggle Switch Represented by Martin Brothers

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John R Martin +1 404 522 0400 +1 404 223 6467 jack@martinbroslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McIntyre & Associates - ATL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/22/1997 Michael Kennedy +1 404 879 1515 mkm@georgiapostconviction.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Defender Services

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Suzanne Hashimi +1 404 688 7530 +1 404 688 0768 Suzanne_Hashimi@FD.Org

Toggle Switch Represented by South Tower, Royal Bank Plaza

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Lyn Ertel +1 404 688 7530 jeff_ertel@fd.org
v.
No Logo Warden William Terry, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Department of Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sabrina G. Graham sgraham@law.ga.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of State Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/23/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY Susan Virginia Boleyn +1 404 656 3397 sboleyn@law.ga.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Beth Attaway Burton +1 404 656 3499 bburton@law.ga.gov
TERMINATED: 07/23/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paula K. Smith +1 404 656 3351 psmith@law.ga.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 700

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/27/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY Michael J. Bowers +1 404 261 6020 mbowers@balch.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 2254
Nature of Suit 535 - Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
  Entries (254) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: None
Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): June 24, 2015 through July 12, 2015, by Jeffrey Lyn Ertel. (Ertel, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/22/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 256 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: None
    REPLY BRIEF re 1 Motion for Writ filed by Lawrence Joseph Jefferson. (Ertel, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/04/2015)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 5/1/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER granting Petitioner's 254 Corrected Unopposed MOTION for Ten Day Extension of Time to File Reply Brief. Accordingly, Petitioner has through and including May 4, 2015 to file his reply brief. Signed by Judge Clarence Cooper on 5/1/2015. (dfb) (Entered: 05/01/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 5/1/2015, Entered: None
        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief Corrected Unopposed Motion for Ten Day Extension to File Reply Brief by Lawrence Joseph Jefferson. (Ertel, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/01/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER GRANTING Petitioner's 252 Motion for Ten Day Extension to File Reply Brief. Accordingly, Petitioner has through and including May 3, 2015, to file his reply brief. Signed by Judge Clarence Cooper on 4/27/2015. (tcc) (Entered: 04/27/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: None
            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief by Lawrence Joseph Jefferson. (Ertel, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/24/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER granting Respondent's 249 Motion for Leave to exceed the page limit and file his Brief at a length of 103 pages. Signed by Judge Clarence Cooper on 4/13/2015. (tcc) (Entered: 04/13/2015)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Blank 250 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: None
                RESPONSE re 246 Notice of Filing Post-Hearing Brief filed by William Terry. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A, # 2 Attachment B)(Graham, Sabrina) (Entered: 04/10/2015)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: None
                MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Respondent's Brief by William Terry. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Excess Pages)(Graham, Sabrina) (Entered: 04/10/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 4/8/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER granting 247 Motion for Extension of Time for one day to file final merits brief. Accordingly, Respondent has through and including April 10, 2015, to file the final merits brief in this action. Signed by Judge Clarence Cooper on 4/8/2015. (tcc) (Entered: 04/08/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: None
                    MOTION for Extension of Time File Final Merits Brief by William Terry. (Graham, Sabrina) (Entered: 04/07/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 3/9/2015, Entered: None
                      NOTICE Of Filing Post-Hearing Brief Regarding Ineffective Assistance of Counsel by Lawrence Joseph Jefferson re 239 Evidentiary Hearing, (Martin, John) (Entered: 03/09/2015)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 3/9/2015, Entered: None
                        (DOCUMENT FILING ERROR) NOTICE Of Filing Post-Hearing Brief Regarding Ineffective Assistance of Counsel by Lawrence Joseph Jefferson (Martin, John) Modified on 3/12/2015 (tcc). (Entered: 03/09/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 2/12/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER granting the 243 Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Post-Hearing Brief. Petitioner shall now have through and including March 9, 2015, to file the post-hearing brief. Signed by Judge Clarence Cooper on 2/12/15. (ddm) (Entered: 02/12/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 2/11/2015, Entered: None
                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time File Post-Hearing Brief by Lawrence Joseph Jefferson. (Martin, John) (Entered: 02/11/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 2/11/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                              EXHIBITS (Respondent's exhibits 1 - 8) received from Courtroom Deputy and placed in Exhibit room. Exhibits from Evidentiary Hearing held on December 19, 2014 before Judge Clarence Cooper. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3 pt. 1, # 4 Exhibit 3 pt. 2, # 5 Exhibit 3 pt. 3, # 6 Exhibit 3 pt. 4, # 7 Exhibit 3 pt. 5, # 8 Exhibit 3 pt. 6, # 9 Exhibit 3 pt. 7, # 10 Exhibit 3 pt. 8, # 11 Exhibit 3 pt. 9, # 12 Exhibit 3 pt. 10, # 13 Exhibit 3 pt. 11, # 14 Exhibit 3 pt. 12, # 15 Exhibit 3 pt. 13, # 16 Exhibit 3 pt. 14, # 17 Exhibit 3 pt. 15, # 18 Exhibit 3 pt. 16, # 19 Exhibit 3 pt. 17, # 20 Exhibit 3 pt. 18, # 21 Exhibit 3 pt. 19, # 22 Exhibit 3 pt. 20, # 23 Exhibit 3 pt. 21, # 24 Exhibit 3 pt. 22, # 25 Exhibit 3 pt. 23, # 26 Exhibit 3 pt. 24, # 27 Exhibit 3 pt. 25, # 28 Exhibit 3 pt. 26, # 29 Exhibit 3 pt. 27, # 30 Exhibit 3 pt. 28, # 31 Exhibit 3 pt. 29, # 32 Exhibit 4 pt. 1, # 33 Exhibit 4 pt. 2, # 34 Exhibit 4 pt. 3, # 35 Exhibit 4 pt. 4, # 36 Exhibit 4 pt. 5, # 37 Exhibit 4 pt. 6, # 38 Exhibit 4 pt. 7, # 39 Exhibit 4 pt. 8, # 40 Exhibit 4 pt. 9, # 41 Exhibit 4 pt. 10, # 42 Exhibit 4 pt. 11, # 43 Exhibit 4 pt. 12, # 44 Exhibit 4 pt. 13, # 45 Exhibit 4 pt. 14, # 46 Exhibit 4 pt. 15, # 47 Exhibit 4 pt. 16, # 48 Exhibit 4 pt. 17, # 49 Exhibit 4 pt. 18, # 50 Exhibit 4 pt. 19, # 51 Exhibit 4 pt. 20, # 52 Exhibit 4 pt. 21, # 53 Exhibit 4 pt. 22, # 54 Exhibit 4 pt. 23, # 55 Exhibit 4 pt. 24, # 56 Exhibit 4 pt. 25, # 57 Exhibit 4 pt. 26, # 58 Exhibit 4 pt. 27, # 59 Exhibit 4 pt. 28, # 60 Exhibit 4 pt. 29, # 61 Exhibit 4 pt. 30, # 62 Exhibit 4 pt. 31, # 63 Exhibit 4 pt. 32, # 64 Exhibit 4 pt. 33, # 65 Exhibit 4 pt. 34, # 66 Exhibit 5 pt. 1, # 67 Exhibit 5 pt. 2, # 68 Exhibit 5 pt. 3, # 69 Exhibit 5 pt. 4, # 70 Errata 5 pt. 5, # 71 Exhibit 5 pt. 6, # 72 Exhibit 5 pt. 7, # 73 Exhibit 5 pt. 8, # 74 Exhibit 5 pt. 9, # 75 Exhibit 6 pt. 1, # 76 Exhibit 6 pt. 2, # 77 Exhibit 6 pt. 3, # 78 Exhibit 6 pt. 4, # 79 Exhibit 6 pt. 5, # 80 Exhibit 6 pt. 6, # 81 Exhibit 6 pt. 7, # 82 Exhibit 6 pt. 8, # 83 Exhibit 6 pt. 9, # 84 Exhibit 6 pt. 10, # 85 Exhibit 6 pt. 11, # 86 Exhibit 6 pt. 12, # 87 Exhibit 6 pt. 13, # 88 Exhibit 6 pt. 14, # 89 Exhibit 6 pt. 15, # 90 Exhibit 6 pt. 16, # 91 Exhibit 6 pt. 17, # 92 Exhibit 6 pt. 18, # 93 Exhibit 6 pt. 19, # 94 Exhibit 6 pt. 20, # 95 Exhibit 6 pt. 21, # 96 Exhibit 6 pt. 22, # 97 Exhibit 6 pt. 23, # 98 Exhibit 6 pt. 24, # 99 Exhibit 6 pt. 25, # 100 Exhibit 6 pt. 26, # 101 Exhibit 6 pt. 27, # 102 Exhibit 6 pt. 28, # 103 Exhibit 6 pt. 29, # 104 Exhibit 6 pt. 30, # 105 Exhibit 6 pt. 31, # 106 Exhibit 6 pt. 32, # 107 Exhibit 6 pt. 33, # 108 Exhibit 6 pt. 34, # 109 Exhibit 6 pt. 35, # 110 Exhibit 6 pt. 36, # 111 Exhibit 6 pt. 37, # 112 Exhibit 6 pt. 38, # 113 Exhibit 6 pt. 39, # 114 Exhibit 6 pt. 40, # 115 Exhibit 6 pt. 41, # 116 Exhibit 6 pt. 42, # 117 Exhibit 6 pt. 43, # 118 Exhibit 6 pt. 44, # 119 Exhibit 6 pt. 45, # 120 Exhibit 6 pt. 46, # 121 Exhibit 6 pt. 47, # 122 Exhibit 6 pt. 48, # 123 Exhibit 6 pt. 49, # 124 Exhibit 6 pt. 50, # 125 Exhibit 6 pt. 51, # 126 Exhibit 6 pt. 52, # 127 Exhibit 6 pt. 53, # 128 Exhibit 6 pt. 54, # 129 Exhibit 6 pt. 55, # 130 Exhibit 6 pt. 56, # 131 Exhibit 6 pt. 57, # 132 Exhibit 6 pt. 58, # 133 Exhibit 6 pt. 59, # 134 Exhibit 6 pt. 60, # 135 Exhibit 6 pt. 61, # 136 Exhibit 6 pt. 62, # 137 Exhibit 6 pt. 63, # 138 Exhibit 6 pt. 64, # 139 Exhibit 6 pt. 65, # 140 Exhibit 6 pt. 66, # 141 Exhibit 6 pt. 67, # 142 Exhibit 6 pt. 68, # 143 Exhibit 6 pt. 69, # 144 Exhibit 6 pt. 70, # 145 Exhibit 7 pt. 1, # 146 Exhibit 7 pt. 2, # 147 Exhibit 7 pt. 3, # 148 Exhibit 7 pt. 4, # 149 Exhibit 7 pt. 5, # 150 Exhibit 7 pt. 6, # 151 Exhibit 7 pt. 7, # 152 Exhibit 7 pt. 8, # 153 Exhibit 7 pt. 9, # 154 Exhibit 7 pt. 10, # 155 Exhibit 7 pt. 11, # 156 Exhibit 7 pt. 12, # 157 Exhibit 7 pt. 13, # 158 Exhibit 7 pt. 14, # 159 Exhibit 7 pt. 15, # 160 Exhibit 8)(tcc) (Entered: 02/11/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 2/11/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                EXHIBITS (Petitioner's exhibits 1 - 19) received from Courtroom Deputy and placed in Exhibit room. Exhibits from Evidentiary Hearing held on December 19, 2014 before Judge Clarence Cooper. (Attachments: # 1 Petitioner's Exhibits 1 - 19 pt. 2, # 2 Petitioner's Exhibits 1 - 19 pt. 3, # 3 Petitioner's Exhibits 1 - 19 pt. 4, # 4 Petitioner's Exhibits 1 - 19 pt. 5, # 5 Petitioner's Exhibits 1 - 19 pt. 6, # 6 Petitioner's Exhibits 1 - 19 pt. 7, # 7 Petitioner's Exhibits 1 - 19 pt. 8, # 8 Petitioner's Exhibits 1 - 19 pt. 9)(tcc) (Entered: 02/11/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 12/19/2014, before Judge Clarence Cooper. Court Reporter/Transcriber Montrell Vann, Telephone number 404-215-1549. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/6/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/17/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/16/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Notice of Filing of Transcript) (mv) (Entered: 01/16/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Clarence Cooper: Evidentiary Hearing held on 12/19/2014. Evidentiary hearing continued from 11/12/2014. Court heard from expert witnesses. Witnesses Judge Stephen Schuscer, Dr. David Price, Dr. Steven Macciocchi, sworn and testified. Res exhibits admitted. (Court Reporter Monty Vann)(vs) (Entered: 01/05/2015)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 12/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      TRANSCRIPT of evidentiary hearing Proceedings held on November 12, 2014, before Judge Clarence Cooper. Court Reporter/Transcriber Elizabeth G. Cohn, Telephone number (404) 215-1573. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/2/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/12/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/11/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Filing Transcript) (egc) (Entered: 12/11/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: None
                                      Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): March 11 - 14, 2015 and March 25, 26, 27 and 30, 2015, by Jeffrey Lyn Ertel. (Ertel, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/10/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 12/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ORDER that the said Lawrence Joseph Jefferson (GCD ID 0000425035) be bused by the Department of Corrections to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Georgia, Atlanta Division, where said Petitioner will be turned over to the United States Marshall to appear at an Evidentiary Hearing set for 12/19/2014 at 09:30 AM in ATLA Courtroom 1706 before Judge Clarence Cooper, and be kept there until said hearing is completed, at which time he will be returned to Death Row at the Georgia Diagnostic and Classification Center in Jackson, Georgia; IT IS ALSO ORDERED that the State Department of Corrections order that the above be so done and that the Warden of the place of confinement turn the said Petitioner over to the United States Marshall at the United States District Court, 75 Spring Street, S.W., Atlanta, Georgia. Signed by Judge Clarence Cooper on 12/3/2014. (tcc) (Entered: 12/03/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 12/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          NOTICE of Hearing: Evidentiary Hearing set for 12/19/2014 at 09:30 AM in ATLA Courtroom 1706 before Judge Clarence Cooper. (vs) (Entered: 12/03/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Clarence Cooper: Evidentiary Hearing held on 11/12/2014. Petitioner's exhibits 1-19 admitted. Respondent called Mark Sella; sworn and testified. Petitioner called Dr. James Merikangas; sworn and testified. Dr. Gary Dudley sworn and testified. Exhibits retained by the Court to be forwarded to the Clerks Office. (Court Reporter Elizabeth Cohn)(tcc) (Entered: 11/13/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ORDER that the said Lawrence Joseph Jefferson (GCD ID 0000425035) be bused by the Department of Corrections to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Georgia, Atlanta Division, where said Petitioner will be turned over to the United States Marshall to appear at said Hearing at 9:30 a.m. and be kept there until said hearing is completed, at which time he will be returned to Death Row at the Georgia Diagnostic and Classification Center in Jackson, Georgia; IT IS ALSO ORDERED that the State Department of Corrections order that the above be so done and that the Warden of the place of confinement turn the said Petitioner over to the United States Marshall at the United States District Court, 75 Spring Street, S.W., Atlanta, Georgia. Signed by Judge Clarence Cooper on 10/9/2014. (tcc) (Entered: 10/09/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                NOTICE of Hearing: Evidentiary Hearing RESET for 11/12/2014 at 09:30 AM in ATLA Courtroom 1706 before Judge Clarence Cooper. (vs) (Entered: 10/01/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 9/26/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  AMENDED ORDER that the Evidentiary Hearing set for October 1, 2014 at 9:30 am is CANCELED and the Court Production Order [Doc. 227 ], is HEREBY VACATED. Upon resetting of the Evidentiary Hearing, the Court will issue a new Production Order for said Hearing. (Amended to correct the signature date and the date document filed). Signed by Judge Clarence Cooper on 9/26/2014. (tcc) (Entered: 09/26/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 9/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    ORDER that the Evidentiary Hearing set for October 1, 2014 at 9:30 am is CANCELED and the Court Production Order [ Doc. 227 ], is HEREBY VACATED. Upon resetting of the Evidentiary Hearing, the Court will issue a new Production Order for said Hearing. Signed by Judge Clarence Cooper on 9/25/2014. (tcc) (Entered: 09/26/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      (VACATED PER ORDER # 231 ) ORDER that the said Lawrence Joseph Jefferson (GCD ID 0000425035) be bused by the Department of Corrections to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Georgia, Atlanta Division, where said Petitioner will be turned over to the United States Marshall to appear at a Hearing on Issue Remanded by the United States Supreme Court and Eleventh Circuit Court of Appeals on October 1, 2014 at 9:30 a.m., in Courtroom 1706, U. S. District Court, 75 Spring Street, S.W. Atlanta, Georgia; and be kept there until said hearing is completed, at which time he will be returned to Death Row at the Georgia Diagnostic and Classification Center in Jackson, Georgia; IT IS ALSO ORDERED that the State Department of Corrections order that the above be so done and that the Warden of the place of confinement turn the said Petitioner over to the United States Marshall at the United States District Court, 75 Spring Street, S.W., Atlanta, Georgia. Signed by Judge Clarence Cooper on 9/19/2014. (tcc) (Entered: 09/19/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 8/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        NOTICE of Hearing: Evidentiary Hearing set for 10/1/2014 at 09:30 AM in ATLA Courtroom 1706 before Judge Clarence Cooper. (vs) (Entered: 08/11/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                          MOTION to Schedule an Evidentiary Hearing by William Terry. (Burton, Beth) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                            Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): July 21, 22, 23, 24, 25 and August 4, 5, 6, 7, 8, 11, 12, 13, 14, 15, 18, 19, 20, 2014, by John Richard Martin. (Martin, John) (Entered: 06/20/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              ORDER granting 219 Motion for Access to Petitioner for Neuropsychological Evaluation and Testing. Court ORDERS that the Warden of the Georgia Diagnostic and Classification Center, Bruce Chatman, allow Dr. Stephen Macciocchi, Ph.D., a neuropsychologist, and Rachelle Smith, a psychometrist, access to evaluate Petitioner on April 18, 2014, for such time as may be necessary, and to allow Dr. Macciocchi and Ms. Smith to bring all necessary test materials to conduct said evaluation of Petitioner. The Court FURTHER ORDERS that Dr. Macciocchi and Ms. Smith be permitted to conduct such evaluation and testing on Petitioner subject to the following conditions: (1) that said evaluation and testing be conducted during the Georgia Diagnostic and Classification Center's normal visitation hours; (2) that said evaluation and testing be done in compliance with all the rules and regulations of the Department of Corrections and the Georgia Diagnostic and Classification Center; and (3) that counsel for Petitioner may introduce Petitioner to Dr. Macciocchi, but counsel shall remain absent from the general vicinity of the testing area while Dr. Macciocchi's evaluation is taking place, including during all breaks taken during the testing. The Court FURTHER ORDERS that the scope of the examination(s) conducted by Dr. Macciocchi and Ms. Smith is permitted to be parallel to the scope of the examinations conducted by Petitioner's experts. However, Petitioner may move the Court to limit the evidence presented at the evidentiary hearing in this case. Signed by Judge Clarence Cooper on 4/16/2014. (bdb) (Entered: 04/16/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 4/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 219 MOTION for Access to Petitioner for Neuropsychological Evaluation and Testing filed by Lawrence Joseph Jefferson. (Martin, John) (Entered: 04/02/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 4/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re 219 MOTION for Access to Petitioner for Neuropsychological Evaluation and Testing filed by William Terry. (Burton, Beth) (Entered: 04/02/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                    RESPONSE re 219 MOTION for Access to Petitioner for Neuropsychological Evaluation and Testing filed by Lawrence Joseph Jefferson. (Martin, John) (Entered: 04/01/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                                      MOTION for Access to Petitioner for Neuropsychological Evaluation and Testing by William Terry. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Burton, Beth) (Entered: 03/31/2014)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER that a travel voucher be issued authorizing Petitioner's lead counsel, John R. Martin, to travel to Bethesda, Maryland to take the deposition of Dr. Merikangas scheduled by Respondent in this case on March 20-21, 2014. Signed by Judge Clarence Cooper on 3/17/2014. (tcc) (Entered: 03/17/2014)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 3/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                          MOTION for Funds to Travel to Bethesda, MD to Attend Deposition on March 20-21, 2014 by Lawrence Joseph Jefferson. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Martin, John) (Entered: 03/12/2014)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 3/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                            Withdrawal of Motion 215 MOTION Funds for Travel to Attend Deposition of Dr. Merikangas in Bethesda, MD filed by Lawrence Joseph Jefferson filed by Lawrence Joseph Jefferson. (Martin, John) (Entered: 03/12/2014)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 3/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                              MOTION Funds for Travel to Attend Deposition of Dr. Merikangas in Bethesda, MD by Lawrence Joseph Jefferson. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Martin, John) (Entered: 03/12/2014)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): May 1, 2, 5, 6, 7, 8, 9, 12, 13, 14, 15, 16, 19, 20, 21, 22 and 23, 2014, by John Richard Martin. (Martin, John) (Entered: 03/10/2014)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                  FILED IN ERROR REPLY to Response to Motion re 210 MOTION for Discovery on the Issue of Petitioner's Mental Health filed by William Terry. (Burton, Beth) Modified on 12/30/2013. The motion was granted at entry # 212 . (jtj) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 12/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    ORDER granting 209 Motion to Continuance of 1/8/2014 Evidentiary Hearing and granting 210 Motion for Requesting Discovery on Issue of Petitioner's Mental Health. Court continued to a later date to be determined. Signed by Judge Clarence Cooper on 12/27/2013. (See Order for details) (bdb) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 12/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 209 MOTION to Continue January 8, 2014 Evidentiary Hearing, 210 MOTION for Discovery on the Issue of Petitioner's Mental Health filed by Lawrence Joseph Jefferson. (Ertel, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/24/2013)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 12/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                        MOTION for Discovery on the Issue of Petitioner's Mental Health by William Terry. (Burton, Beth) (Entered: 12/18/2013)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 12/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                          MOTION to Continue January 8, 2014 Evidentiary Hearing by William Terry. (Burton, Beth) (Entered: 12/18/2013)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 12/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Clarence Cooper: Motion Hearing held on 12/11/2013 re 205 MOTION Requesting Ruling on Issue Remanded by the United States Supreme Court filed by William Terry. Court resolved the issue remanded by the Supreme Court of the United States and the Eleventh Circuit in favor of Petitioner Lawrence Jefferson. A written opinion will follow and an evidentiary hearing will be held. Evidentiary Hearing set for 1/8/2014 at 09:00 AM in ATLA Courtroom 1706 before Judge Clarence Cooper. (Court Reporter Amanda Lohnaas)(bdb) (Entered: 12/12/2013)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 10/31/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              COURT PRODUCTION ORDER - IT APPEARING TO THE COURT that the Petitioner is now serving a sentence and is housed on Death Row at the Georgia Diagnostic and Classification Center at Jackson, Georgia, and it appearing that the above-referenced case has been set for a Hearing on Issue Remanded by the United States Supreme Court and Eleventh Circuit Court of Appeals on December 11, 2013 at 10:00 a.m., in Courtroom 1706, U. S. District Court, 75 Spring Street, S.W., Atlanta, Georgia, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the said Lawrence Joseph Jefferson (GCD ID 0000425035) be bused by the Department of Corrections to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Georgia, Atlanta Division, where said Petitioner will be turned over to the United States Marshall to appear at said Hearing at 10:00 a.m. and be kept there until said hearing is completed, at which time he will be returned to Death Row at the Georgia Diagnostic and Classification Center in Jackson, Georgia; IT IS ALSO ORDERED that the State Department of Corrections order that the above be so done and that the Warden of the place of confinement turn the said Petitioner over to the United States Marshall at the United States District Court, 75 Spring Street, S.W., Atlanta, Georgia. Signed by Judge Clarence Cooper on 10/31/2013. (tcc) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 10/31/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                NOTICE of Hearing: on Issue Remanded by the United States Supreme Court and Eleventh Circuit Court of Appeals. Hearing set for 12/11/2013 at 10:00 AM in ATLA Courtroom 1706 before Judge Clarence Cooper. (vs) (Entered: 10/31/2013)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 7/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                  MOTION Requesting Ruling on Issue Remanded by the United States Supreme Court by William Terry. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A)(Graham, Sabrina) (Entered: 07/23/2013)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): May 18, 21, 22, 23, 24, 25, 28, 29, 30, 31, June 1, 4, 5, 6, 7 and 8, 2012, by John Richard Martin. (Martin, John) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 7/26/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER granting, nunc pro tunc, the 198 Consent Motion to Supplement Record and Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Clarence Cooper on 07/26/2011. (dfb) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 202 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                        RESPONSE re 201 Response (Non-Motion) to Respondents Brief Regarding Deference Owed the State Courts Finding filed by Lawrence Joseph Jefferson. (Martin, John) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 201 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                          RESPONSE re 200 Notice of Filing (Respondent's Brief Regarding the Deference Owed the State Courts' Findings) filed by William Terry. (Burton, Beth) (Entered: 07/08/2011)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                            NOTICE Of Filing Issue Remanded by Supreme Court by Lawrence Joseph Jefferson (Martin, John) (Entered: 06/24/2011)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 6/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                              NOTICE Of Filing Exhibits by Lawrence Joseph Jefferson re 198 Consent MOTION to Supplement (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Ertel, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/10/2011)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 6/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Consent MOTION to Supplement by Lawrence Joseph Jefferson. (Ertel, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/10/2011)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 5/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  CORRECTED Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): May 30, 2011 through June 3, 2011; August 9, 2011 through August 12, 2011; September 1, 2, 5, 6, 2011; September 9, 12, 13, 14, 15, 16, 19, 20, 21, 22, 23, 26, 27, 28, 29, 30, 2011, by John Richard Martin. (Martin, John) Modified on 5/20/2011 to add Corrected and to edit docket text to include all dates requested (mdy). (Entered: 05/19/2011)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 5/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): June 6, 7, 8, 9, 10, August 9, 10, 11, 12, September 1, 2, 5, 6, 2011, by John Richard Martin. (Martin, John) (Entered: 05/18/2011)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 4/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      COURT PRODUCTION ORDER that a Status Conference is set for 6/10/2011, at 09:30 AM, in ATLA Courtroom 1706, before Judge Clarence Cooper. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the said Lawrence Joseph Jefferson (GCD ID 0000425035) be bused by the Department of Corrections to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Georgia, Atlanta Division, where said Petitioner will be turned over to the United States Marshall to appear at said Status Conference at 9:30 a.m. and be kept there until said hearing is completed, at which time he will be returned to Death Row at the Georgia Diagnostic and Classification Center in Jackson, Georgia; IT IS ALSO ORDERED that the State Department of Corrections order that the above be so done and that the Warden of the place of confinement turn the said Petitioner over to the United States Marshall at the United States District Court, 75 Spring Street, S.W., Atlanta, Georgia. Signed by Judge Clarence Cooper on 4/14/2011. (mdy) Modified on 4/15/2011 to edit docket text (mdy). (Entered: 04/15/2011)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 4/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference RESET for 6/10/2011 at 09:30 AM in ATLA Courtroom 1706 before Judge Clarence Cooper. (vs) (Entered: 04/14/2011)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 4/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 4/21/2011 at 11:00 AM in ATLA Courtroom 1706 before Judge Clarence Cooper. (Amended to attach correct PDF)(vs) (Entered: 04/04/2011)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 1/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            DOCUMENT FILING ERROR - NOTICE ENTERED IN ERROR NOTICE TO COUNSEL OF RECORD, Jeffrey Ertel and Beth Burton, regarding RECLAMATION AND DISPOSITION OF UNCLAIMED EXHIBITS pursuant to Local Rule 79.1D(2). (tcc) Modified on 2/9/2011 (pdw). (Entered: 01/06/2011)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 11/16/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER granting the 189 Motion for Issuance of Subpoena and directing that the requested subpoena be issued for the presence of Christopher Desmond, without prepayment of fees, and that the same be served without cost to the Petitioner. Signed by Judge Clarence Cooper on 11/16/10. (aaq) (Entered: 11/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 11/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Ex Parte MOTION in forma pauperis for Issuance of Subpoena filed by Lawrence Joseph Jefferson. (aaq) (Entered: 11/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 11/10/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER extending time for Discovery. Discovery extended to 12/1/2010. Signed by Judge Clarence Cooper on 11/10/10. (aaq) (Entered: 11/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER with respect to proceedings on the remand of this case by the Eleventh Circuit Court of Appears to the District Court signed by Judge Clarence Cooper on 09/20/10. (aaq) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 9/10/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      AMENDED Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Clarence Cooper: Status Conference held on 9/10/2010. Counsel for Petitioner made oral argument for discovery. Court granted Motion for discovery. Court directed the parties to confer and prepare a scheduling Order and submit to the court. (Court Reporter Amanda Lohnaas)(vs) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 9/10/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Clarence Cooper: Evidentiary Hearing held on 9/10/2010. Counsel for Petitioner made oral argument for discovery. Court granted Motion for discovery. Court directed the parties to confer and prepare a scheduling Order and submit to the court. (Court Reporter Amanda Lohnaas)(aaq) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 7/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Certification of Consent to Substitution of Counsel. Sabrina G. Graham replacing attorney Michael J. Bowers. (Graham, Sabrina) (Entered: 07/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 7/26/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            AMENDED COURT PRODUCTION ORDER: A Status Conference is set for 9/10/2010 at 09:30 AM in ATLA Courtroom 1906 before Judge Clarence Cooper. Petitioner is now serving a sentence and is housed on Death Row at the Georgia Diagnostic and Classification Center at Jackson, Georgia. It is ordered that Lawrence Joseph Jefferson be bused by the Department of Corrections to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Georgia, Atlanta Division, where said Petitioner will be turned over to the United States Marshall to appear at said Status Conference at 9:30 a.m. and be kept there until said hearing is completed, at which time he will be returned to Death Row at the Georgia Diagnostic and Classification Center in Jackson, Georgia. IT IS ALSO ORDERED that the State Department of Corrections order that the above be so done and that the Warden of the place of confinement turn the said Petitioner over to the United States Marshall at the United States District Court, 75 Spring Street, S.W., Atlanta, Georgia. Signed by Judge Clarence Cooper on 7/26/10. (Georgia Dept. of Corrections served by CRD)(vs) (Entered: 07/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 7/26/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 9/10/2010 at 09:30 AM in ATLA Courtroom 1706 before Judge Clarence Cooper. (vs) (Entered: 07/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Certification of Consent to Substitution of Counsel. Beth Attaway Burton replacing attorney Susan Virginia Boleyn and Paula K. Smith. (Burton, Beth) (Entered: 07/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  COURT PRODUCTION ORDER: A Status Conference is set for 8/16/2010 at 09:30 AM in ATLA Courtroom 1906 before Judge Clarence Cooper. Petitioner is now serving a sentence and is housed on Death Row at the Georgia Diagnostic and Classification Center at Jackson, Georgia. It is ordered that Lawrence Joseph Jefferson be bused by the Department of Corrections to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Georgia, Atlanta Division, where said Petitioner will be turned over to the United States Marshall to appear at said Status Conference at 9:30 a.m. and be kept there until said hearing is completed, at which time he will be returned to Death Row at the Georgia Diagnostic and Classification Center in Jackson, Georgia. IT IS ALSO ORDERED that the State Department of Corrections order that the above be so done and that the Warden of the place of confinement turn the said Petitioner over to the United States Marshall at the United States District Court, 75 Spring Street, S.W., Atlanta, Georgia. Signed by Judge Clarence Cooper on 7/23/10. (aaq) (Entered: 07/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 8/16/2010 at 09:30 AM in ATLA Courtroom 1706 before Judge Clarence Cooper. (vs) (Entered: 07/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER making the USCA mandate the judgment of this Court RE: 148 Notice of Cross Appeal and 145 Notice of Appeal Case Appealed to 11th Circuit Case Number 07-12502 & 07-12507. Signed by Judge Clarence Cooper on 7/23/10. (aaq) (Entered: 07/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        PROPOSED MANDATE ORDER RE: 176 USCA Judgment. (aaq) (Entered: 07/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 7/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Certified copy of JUDGMENT of USCA VACATING and REMANDING to the District Court for further action re: 145 Notice of Appeal and 148 Notice of Cross Appeal filed by William Terry Case Appealed to 11th Circuit Case Number 07-12502 & 07-12507 as the Supreme Court of The United States has VACATED the 172 JUDGMENT of USCA at Jefferson v. Upton, _ U.S._, 130 S.Ct. 2217 (2010). (Attachments: # 1 Supreme Court Decision, # 2 Correspondence)(aaq) (Entered: 07/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 175 Filed: 11/3/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            JUDGMENT: It is ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the petition for a writ of habeas corpus be, and the same hereby is denied and petitioners original sentence of death is REINSTATED. Signed by Judge Clarence Cooper on 11/3/2009. --Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist--(vs) Modified on 11/3/2009 (vs). (Entered: 11/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 11/3/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER making the USCA mandate the judgment of this Court re 148 Notice of Cross Appeal, 145 Notice of Appeal Case Appealed to Eleventh Circuit Case Number 07-12507; 07-12502. Signed by Judge Clarence Cooper on 11/3/2009. (vs) (Entered: 11/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 173 Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Appeal Record Returned: 148 Notice of Cross Appeal and 145 Notice of Appeal Case Appealed to USCA-11th Circuit Case Number 07-12507. (7 Vols of Pldgs w/1 filed under SEAL, 6 Transcripts, 1 Deposition, 7 Expandable Folders of Respondent's Exhibits 1-55 w/ Pldg# 13, 2 Expandable Folders of Defendant's and Plaintiff's Exhibits and 1 Box of Plaintiff's Exhibits) (pjm) (Entered: 09/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 172 Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  ---DOCUMENT VACATED PURSUANT TO THE SUPREME COURT DECISION AT Jefferson v. Upton, _ U.S._, 130 S.Ct. 2217 (2010) (See attachment at 176 Judgment of USCA) --- Certified copy of JUDGMENT of USCA AFFIRMING the district court's denial of Jefferson's juror misconduct claim, REVERSING the ruling of the district court's order granting Jefferson's petition as to his sentence of death and REMANDING with instructions that the District Court reinstate Jefferson's original sentence re: 145 Notice of Appeal filed by William Terry and 148 Notice of Cross Appeal filed by Lawrence Joseph Jefferson. Case Appealed to Eleventh Circuit. Case Number 07-12502. (vs) Modified on 9/14/2009 (vs). Modified on 9/15/2009 to revise text(pjm). Modified on 7/23/2010 to edit text. (aaq). (Entered: 09/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 3/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re: 148 Notice of Cross Appeal filed by Lawrence Joseph Jefferson and 145 Notice of Appeal filed by William Terry. Case Appealed to USCA-11th Circuit. Case Number 07-12502-PP. (pjm) (Entered: 03/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 12/4/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re: 148 Notice of Cross Appeal and 145 Notice of Appeal. Case Appealed to USCA-11th Circuit. Case Number 07-12502-PP. (7 Vols of Pldgs w/1 filed under SEAL, 6 Transcripts, 1 Deposition, 7 Expandable Folders of Respondent's Exhibits 1-55 w/ Pldg# 13, 2 Expandable Folders of Defendant's and Plaintiff's Exhibits and 1 Box of Plaintiff's Exhibits) (pjm) (Entered: 12/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 12/4/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        FORTHWITH LETTER from USCA re: 148 Notice of Cross Appeal filed by Lawrence Joseph Jefferson and 145 Notice of Appeal filed by William Terry. Case Appealed to USCA-11th Circuit. Case Number 07-12502-PP. Appeal Record due by 12/13/2007. (pjm) (Entered: 12/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 11/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          Appeal notice from USCA sent to John R. Martin (Counsel) informing him that he will be representing Mr. Jefferson on appeal re: 148 Notice of Cross Appeal. Case Appealed to USCA-11th Circuit. Case Number 07-12502-PP. (pjm) (Entered: 11/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 10/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            Certified copy of USCA ORDER GRANTING Appellee's/Cross-Appellant's unopposed motion for extension of time to file appellee's/cross-appellant's brief to and including October 31, 2007 re: 148 Notice of Cross Appeal filed by Lawrence Joseph Jefferson and 145 Notice of Appeal filed by William Terry. Case Appealed to USCA-11th Circuit. Case Number 07-12502-PP. (pjm) (Entered: 10/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              Certified copy of USCA ORDER GRANTING Appellee's/Cross-Appellant's unopposed motion for an enlargement of time in which to file the appellee's/cross-appellant's principle and response brief to and including October 17, 2007 re: 148 Notice of Cross Appeal filed by Lawrence Joseph Jefferson and 145 Notice of Appeal filed by William Terry. Case Appealed to USCA-11th Circuit. Case Number 07-12502-PP. (pjm) (Entered: 09/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 8/15/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                USCA Acknowledgment of Certificate of Readiness re: 145 Notice of Appeal filed by William Terry and 148 Notice of Cross Appeal filed by Lawrence Joseph Jefferson. Case Appealed to USCA-11th Circuit. Case Number 07-12502-PP. (pjm) (Entered: 08/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  Certified copy of CERTIFICATE OF READINESS transmitted to USCA re: 145 Notice of Appeal and 148 Notice of Cross Appeal. Case Appealed to USCA-11th Circuit. Case Number 07-12502-PP. (pjm) (Entered: 08/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 12/30/03 before Judge Clarence Cooper. Court Reporter: Sharon D. Upchurch. (vs) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/20/2015: # 1 Transcript) (tcc). (Entered: 08/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/6/02 before Judge Clarence Cooper. Court Reporter: Sharon D. Upchurch. (vs) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/20/2015: # 1 Transcript) (tcc). (Entered: 08/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 1/15/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 1/7/99 before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. Court Reporter: Andy Ashley. (pjm) Modified on 8/7/2007 (pjm). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/20/2015: # 1 Transcript) (tcc). (Entered: 08/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 6/29/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 6/22/98 before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. Court Reporter: Linda W. Baggett. (pjm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/20/2015: # 1 Transcript) (tcc). (Entered: 08/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 8/1/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM (No transcript is required for appeal purposes) re: 145 Notice of Appeal. USCA Appeal Number 07-12502-P.Certificate of Readiness due on 8/15/2007. (pjm) (Entered: 08/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 7/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              USCA Acknowledgment of 155 Order re: 145 Notice of Appeal filed by William Terry and 148 Notice of Cross Appeal filed by Lawrence Joseph Jefferson. Case Appealed to USCA-11th Circuit. Case Number 07-12502-P. (pjm) (Entered: 07/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 7/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                Certified copy of USCA ORDER GRANTING Appellant/Cross Appellee's motion for a stay of the briefing schedule pending ruling on petitioner/cross-appellant's application for a COA re: 148 Notice of Cross Appeal filed by Lawrence Joseph Jefferson and 145 Notice of Appeal filed by William Terry. Case Appealed to USCA-11th Circuit. Case Number 07-12502-P. (pjm) (Entered: 07/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 7/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order 155 forwarded to USCA re: 145 Notice of Appeal filed by William Terry and 148 Notice of Cross Appeal filed by Lawrence Joseph Jefferson. Case Appealed to USCA-11th Circuit. Case Number 07-12502-P. (pjm) (Entered: 07/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 7/12/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER GRANTING 154 Motion for Certificate of Appealability and DENYING Petitioner's Application as to all remaining claims and issues. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to transmit a copy of this Order to the USCA signed by Judge Clarence Cooper on 7/12/07. (pjm) (Entered: 07/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 6/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Certificate of Appealability by Lawrence Joseph Jefferson. (Martin, John) (Entered: 06/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 6/19/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 151 Motion for Extension of Time. Petitioner has through and including June 19, 2007, to file an Application for Certificate of Appealability. Signed by Judge Clarence Cooper on 6/19/07. (vs) (Entered: 06/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 6/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          USCA Acknowledgment of 148 Notice of Cross Appeal filed by Lawrence Joseph Jefferson. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit. USCA Case Number 07-12502-P. (kac) (Entered: 06/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            First MOTION for Extension of Time Application for Certificate of Appealability by Lawrence Joseph Jefferson. (Ertel, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 6/6/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Appeal notice from USCA sent to Michael K. McIntyre (Counsel) advising him that he will be representing Lawrence Joseph Jefferson re: 145 Notice of Appeal. Case Appealed to USCA-11th Circuit. Case Number 07-12502-P. (pjm) (Entered: 06/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Transmission of Certified Copy of Notice of Cross Appeal, Judgment, Order and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: 148 Notice of Cross Appeal. (pjm) (Entered: 06/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 6/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL by Lawrence Joseph Jefferson. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 1223659.Transcript Order Form due on 6/21/2007 (Ertel, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 6/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    USCA Acknowledgment of 145 Notice of Appeal filed by William Terry. Case Appealed to USCA-11th Circuit. Case Number 07-12502-P. (pjm) (Entered: 06/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 5/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Transmission of Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal, Judgment, Order and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: 145 Notice of Appeal. (pjm) (Entered: 05/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 145 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 144 Judgment and 143 Order by William Terry. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 1210721. Transcript Order Form due on 6/12/2007 (Boleyn, Susan) Modified on 5/30/2007 to add docket entry relationship(pjm). (Entered: 05/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 5/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CLERK'S JUDGMENT granting in part and denying in part Petitioner's petition for writ of habease corpus. (vs)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist-- (Entered: 05/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 143 Filed: 5/10/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part Petitioner's Corrected Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. The Court Grants Petitioner's claim that trial cnsl was ineffective during the penalty phase of trial and Denies all other claims in the Petition. Petition's sentence is Vacated. The Court Orders res Terry To conduct a new sentening hrg for Petitioner to commence within six months from the date of this Order, or if an appeal is taken from this Order, witin six months of the date this Order becomes final. Signed by Judge Clarence Cooper on 5/10/07. (vs) (Entered: 05/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 2/22/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Clarence Cooper : Final Hearing held on 2/22/2005 re 1 Motion for Writ filed by Lawrence Joseph Jefferson,. Respondents exh list w/exhibits admitted. Plaintiff has 10 days to respond to defendants supplemental memo. Both parties have 10 days to complete the record. Ruling will be issued later. (Court Reporter Amanda Lohnaas.)(cdg) (Entered: 02/24/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 2/22/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM by Warden Tony Turpin (cdg) (Entered: 02/24/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 1/26/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED COURT PRODUCTION ORDER Final Hearing on petition for hc set for 2/22/2005 01:30 PM in Courtroom 1705 before Judge Clarence Cooper. It is hereby ordered that said Lawrence Joseph Jefferson be bused by the Dept of Corrections to the USDC, Atlanta Division, where said petitioner will be turned over to the USM to appear at said hearing at 9:30am. Signed by Judge Clarence Cooper on 1/26/05. (jdb) (Entered: 01/27/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 1/11/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER that the Petitioner Lawrence Joseph Jefferson be bused by the Department of Corrections to the USDC for the Northern Dist. of Georgia, Atlanta Division, where said Petitioner will be turned over to the USM to appear at the Final Hrg on the Petition of Writ of Habeas Corpus on 2/14/05 at 9:30 am and kept there until said hrg is completed, at which time he will be returned to Death Row at the Georgia Diagnostic and Classisfication Center in Jackson, Georgia; It is also ordered that the State Dept. of Corrections Order that the above be so done and that the Warden of the place of confinement turn said Petitioner over to the USM at the USDC, 75 Spring Street, S.W., Atlanta Georgia. Signed by Judge Clarence Cooper on 1/11/05. (vs) (Entered: 01/13/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 1/11/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Hearing: Final Evidentiary Hearing on petition for writ of habeas corpus set for 2/14/2005 09:30 AM before Judge Clarence Cooper. (pds) (Entered: 01/11/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 10/12/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting (nunc pro tunc) petitioner's 130 Motion to expedite the obtaining of DNA samples from Edward Taulbee's sisters for the purpose of DNA comparison . Signed by Judge Clarence Cooper on 10/12/04. (vs) (Entered: 10/14/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 7/13/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE Of Filing concerning consent to DNA testing by Lawrence Joseph Jefferson (vs) (Entered: 07/23/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 7/13/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE Of Filing concerning consent to DNA testing by Lawrence Joseph Jefferson (vs) (Entered: 07/23/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 6/16/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion HEARING held before Judge Clarence Cooper [130-1] motion to expedite the obtaining of DNA samples from Edward Taulbee's sisters for the purpose of DNA comparison. Court will allow DNA samples. (vs) (Entered: 06/17/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 6/4/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Clarence Cooper that petitioner Lawrence Joseph Jefferson be bused by the Dept of Corrections to the USDC for the Northern Dist of Ga, Atlanta Div., where said petitioner will be turned over to the USM to appear at the hrg on petitioner's motion to expedite obtaining DNA samples, and be kept there until said hrg is completed. It is ordered that the The State Dept of Corrections order that the above be done and that the Warden of the place of confinemetn turn the said petitioner over to the USM at the USDC, Atlanta, GA. (cc) (vs) (Entered: 06/07/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 5/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY by petitioner to response to [130-1] motion to expedite the obtaining of DNA samples from Edward Taulbee's sisters for the purpose of DNA comparison (vs) (Entered: 05/20/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Response by respondent in opposition to [130-1] motion to expedite the obtaining of DNA samples from Edward Taulbee's sisters for the purpose of DNA comparison (vs) (Entered: 05/19/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 5/13/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by petitioner to expedite the obtaining of DNA samples from Edward Taulbee's sisters for the purpose of DNA comparison with brief in support. (vs) (Entered: 05/14/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 4/21/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS CONFERENCE HELD before Judge Clarence Cooper. Court will allow three strands of hair to be performed for DNA. Pla to prepare order. (vs) (Entered: 04/27/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Clarence Cooper that J.W. Turner or whoever is the present custodian of these hairs for the Cobb County Police Department produce the hairs to cnsl for petitioner, John R. Martin, for the purpose of his sending the hairs to a qualifed indepenent laboratory for DNA analysis and testing. (cc) (vs) (Entered: 04/27/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 4/19/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COURT PRODUCTION ORDER by Judge Clarence Cooper that pla Lawrence Joseph Jefferson be bused by the Dept of Corrections to the USDC for the Norther Dist of GA. Petitioner will be turned over to the USM to appear at the Status Conf on 4/21/04 at 10:30 a.m. It is also ordered that the State Dept of Corrections order that the above be done and that the Warden of the place of confinement turn the Petitioner over to the USM at the USDC, Atlanta, GA. (cc by chambers) (vs) (Entered: 04/21/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 4/14/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS CONFERENCE HELD before Judge Clarence Cooper and continued to 4/21/04 at 10:30 a.m. (vs) (Entered: 04/15/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 3/24/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Clarence Cooper, petitioner Lawrence Joseph Jefferson be bused by the Dept of Corrections to the USDC for the Northern Dist of GA, Atlanta Division, where said petitioner will be turned over to the USM to appear at the Status conf at 4:00 and be kept there until said hrg is completed, at which time he will be returned to Death Row at the Georgia Diagnostic Classification Center in Jackson, Ga. It is also ordered that the State Dept of Corrections order that the above be so done and that the Warden of the place of confinement turn the said petitioner over to the USM at the USDC, Atlanta, GA. status conference set for 4:00 4/14/04 (cc) (vs) (Entered: 03/29/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 3/11/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Clarence Cooper that the Petitioner shall be allowed to have tested by the indepedent laboratory Orchid Cellmark of Germantown, Maryland, certian swabs of blood stains (cc) (vs) (Entered: 03/16/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 2/24/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Correspondence by petitioner Lawrence Joseph Jefferson . (vs) (Entered: 02/27/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 12/30/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Status Conf HEARING HELD on 12/30/03 before Judge Clarence Cooper, status conference set for 10:00 3/19/04 (vs) (Entered: 01/29/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 12/16/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Clarence Cooper (cc) that Joseph Jefferson be bused by the Dept of Corrections to the USDC for the Northern Dist of GA, Atlanta Division, where said petitioner will be turned over to the USM to appear for status hrg on 12/30/03 at 9:30 a.m. It is also ordered that the State Dept of Corrections order that the above be so done and that the Warden of the place of confinement turn the said petitioner over to the USM at the USDC, 75 Spring Street, S.W., Atlanta GA. (vs) (Entered: 12/17/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 10/24/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Clarence Cooper re DNA testing. It is intention of this court that this matter be made a priority by all relevant parties so that the DNA testing can be completed by the 12/30/03 deadline. See order for details. (cc) (vs) Modified on 10/27/2003 (Entered: 10/27/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 10/22/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS CONFERENCE HELD before Judge Clarence Cooper: Cnsl for pla informed court that the final DNA testing has not been completed. Court advised attys to make this case a top priority and the evidentiary hrg is now reset for 12/30/03 at 10:30 a.m. P-16 thru 2 admitted. Exhibits retained by the court. (vs) Modified on 10/27/2003 (Entered: 10/23/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 10/21/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Clarence Cooper to produce petitioner Larence Joseph Jefferson to the USDC for the Northern Dist of GA, Atlanta Division, where said petitioner will be turned over to the USM to appear for motion hrg on 10/22/03 at 9:30 a.m. It is also ordered that the State Dept of Corrections order that the above be so done and that the Warden of the place of confinement turn said petitioner over to the USM at the United States Dist Court, 75 Spring Street, S.W., Atlanta, GA.(cc) (order executed 10/21/03, copies faxed to BOP by chambers) (vs) (Entered: 10/23/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 8/29/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Clarence Cooper GRANTING [116-1] joint motion for continuance of 9/15/03 evidentiary hearing. Evidentiary hearing reset for 10/22/03 at 9:30 a.m. (cc) (dfb) (Entered: 09/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 8/28/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION for continuance of evidentiary hrg to date to be determined later by the court. (vs) (Entered: 08/29/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 8/26/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Clarence Cooper GRANTING [114-1] joint motion for continuance of evidentiary hrg, evidentiary hearing set for 9:30 9/15/03 (cc by CRD) (vs) Modified on 08/27/2003 (Entered: 08/27/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 8/19/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION for continuance of evidentiary hrg (to CC) (vs) (Entered: 08/20/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 113 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Reply by petitioner Lawrence Joseph Jefferson to [110-1] Final Evidentiary Brief. (vs) (Entered: 08/19/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 8/7/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Clarence Cooper GRANTING [111-1] joint motion to extend time thru 08/15/03 within which petitioner may file a reply brief. (cc) (slc) (Entered: 08/08/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 8/4/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            UNOPPOSED MOTION to extend time thru 08/15/03 within which petitioner may file a reply brief . (to CC) (slc) (Entered: 08/07/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 7/28/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Evidentiary brief by respondent per [103-1] order. (slc) (Entered: 07/31/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 7/15/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ENDORSED ORDER by Judge Clarence Cooper GRANTING [107-1] joint motion to extend time thru 07/24/03 within which respondent may file brief on behalf of respondent. [109-1] order to be submitted on 7/25/03 if respondent fails to file brief . (cc) (slc) (Entered: 07/17/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 7/3/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by petitioner to amend [99-1] order regarding DNA testing with brief in support. (slc) Modified on 08/12/2003 (Entered: 07/07/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 7/2/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CONSENT MOTION to extend time thru 07/24/03 within which respondent may file brief on behalf of respondent . (to CC) (slc) (Entered: 07/07/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 6/23/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CONSENT MOTION to extend time for 7 days within which respondent may file appellee's brief . (to CC) (slc) (Entered: 06/25/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 5/23/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Final evidentiary brief and proposed findings of facts and conclusions of law by petitioner per [101-1] order. (slc) Modified on 05/28/2003 (Entered: 05/28/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 5/14/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          UNCONTESTED MOTION to modify the briefing schedule . (to CC) (slc) (Entered: 05/21/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 4/28/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Clarence Cooper GRANTING [102-1] joint motion to modify briefing schedule of 04/17/03. Petitioner has until 05/16/03 to submit Final Evidentiary Brief and Proposed Findings; Respondent has until 06/16/03 to submit his response; Petitioner has until 07/07/03 to submit his reply; and lastly, parties shall appear before Judge Cooper for a FINAL evidentiary hearing, set for 9:30 a.m. on 8/25/03 . (cc) (slc) (Entered: 04/28/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 4/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              UNOPPOSED MOTION to modify briefing schedule of 04/17/03 . (to CC) (slc) (Entered: 04/25/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 4/17/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Clarence Cooper GRANTING [100-1] joint motion to extend time of briefing schedule per [99-1] order. The parties shall submit FINAL EVIDENTIARY BRIEFS and PROPOSED FINDINGS according to the following schedule: Petitioner shall have thru 04/28/03 to submit his Final Evidentiary Brief and Proposed Findings; Respondent shall have thru 06/02/03 to submit its response to Petitioner's Final Evidentiary Brief and Proposed Findings; Petitioner shall have thru 07/07/03 to submit his reply; and lastly, an evidentiary hearing is set for 9:30 a.m. on 8/25/03 . (cc) (slc) (Entered: 04/18/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 4/16/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  UNOPPOSED MOTION to extend time of briefing schedule per [99-1] order . (to CC) (slc) (Entered: 04/17/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 4/4/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Clarence Cooper, GRANTING Petitioner's motion for DNA testing, as requested during 03/10/03 status conference. This order shall allow testing of the items as listed in this order. Petitioner is also GRANTED the right to have an independent expert(s) present during any testing and evaluation carried out by the GBI Crime Lab pursuant to this order, and to have the right to voice objections to the testing and to request additional measures to be taken should the petitioner's expert deems necessary. (***Please see order for detailed list of Items to be Tested, Testing to be Done, Location of Items and Transportation for Testing, Independent Experts, Limitations and Presumptions, Reporting of the Results, and Relevance and Admissibility of the results***). (cc) (slc) (Entered: 04/08/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 3/21/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Reply brief to repondent's [97-1] response in opposition to petitoner's motion for DNA testing. (motion filed with chambers, not in Clerk's office, therefore, not on docket) (slc) (Entered: 03/24/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 3/20/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Response by respondent in opposition to petitioner's 03/12/03 proposed consent order requestng DNA testing. (to CC) (slc) (Entered: 03/21/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 2/26/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Reply by petitioner in response to [94-1] expert report of Dr. Joel Katz pursuant to [95-1] order. (slc) (Entered: 02/27/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 1/31/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Clarence Cooper, that the petitioner Lawrence Jefferson is permitted until 02/15/03, to complete his investigation and evaluation of most recent submission of respondent Fred Head, Warden, regarding the prosecutorial decisions of Cobb County D.A. Thomas Charron. Petitioner shall have until 02/28/03 to submit his reply to the signed final report of Dr. Katz filed by respondent on 11/14/02. The period for submission of evidence shall expire 03/7/03. After close of evidentiary period, parties shall appear for a status conference and submit FINAL EVIDENTIARY BRIEFS and PROPOSED FINDINGS according to the following schedule: Parties shall appear for a status conference set for 9:30 a.m. on 3/10/03 . Petitioner shall have until 04/18/03 to submit his Final Evidentiary Brief and Proposed Findings; Respondent shall have until 05/23/03 to submit its response to Petitioner's Final Evidentiary Brief and Proposed Findings; Petitioner shall have until 06/27/03 to submit his reply; and lastly, the parties shall appear before Judge Clarence Cooper for a Final Evidentiary Hearing set for 9:30 a.m. on 8/25/03 . (cc) (slc) (Entered: 01/31/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 11/14/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Respondent's AMENDED Notice of filing exh as substitute for respondent's exh no.2 which was a draft of rpt of respondent's expert Joseph Katz. (slc) (tcc). (Entered: 11/15/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 11/13/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of filing exh in rebuttal of pet's claim by respondent. (slc) (tcc). (Entered: 11/15/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 11/6/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS CONFERENCE HELD before Judge Clarence Cooper. Dft to submit statistical info by 11/08/02. Pet has 60 days to respond. Also, parties to submit briefs on DNA. (slc) (tcc). (Entered: 11/07/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 9/20/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Clarence Cooper GRANTING [90-1] motion to hold record open for 60 days, until 11/08/02 to allow for the submission of additional evidence on behalf of respondent. NO FURTHER CONTINUANCES TO BE GRANTED. Lastly, parties shall appear for status conference, set for 4:00 p.m. on 10/10/02 (cc) (slc) (tcc). (Entered: 09/25/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 9/11/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by respondent to hold record open for 60 days, until 11/08/02 to allow for the submission of additional evidence on behalf of respondent with brief in support. (slc) (tcc). (Entered: 09/16/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 9/3/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Affidavit by petitioner in support of motion to proceed ifp. (slc) (tcc). (Entered: 09/06/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 5/30/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT filed for date of 04/29/02 at 11:00 a.m. before Judge Clarence Cooper. Court Reporter: Donna Keeble. (slc) (Entered: 06/03/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 5/7/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            EVIDENTIARY HEARING HELD before Judge Clarence Cooper. Evid by pet, P-6-9,10,11,12,13,14,15 (admitted) P-16 not allowed; and P-5 (admitted); Dft Exhs 1,2,3,4,5 Admitted, Dft exh 6 & 7 tendered. Mary Shellmann, Jeffrey Ertel, and Jeff Martin, sworn. After hearing from cnsl, court will allow record to remain opn for 60 dys from today to all pet to locate Mr. Mitchell, then evid will be closed. Parties to subm prop sched order and subm briefs and prop findings 30 days after evid closed. (slc) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/15/2007 (vs). Modified on 3/15/2007 to correct text to show actual exhibits received(vs). (Entered: 05/09/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 3/22/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Clarence Cooper GRANTING [85-1] motion to extend time of evidentiary hearing, evidentiary hearing set for 4/29/02 at 9:30am . (cc) (lme) (tcc). (Entered: 03/25/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 3/6/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by pet to extend time of evidentiary hearing . (slc) (tcc). (Entered: 03/07/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 12/18/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Evidientiary hearing scheduled before Judge Clarence Cooper. Evidentiary hearing set for 3/11/02 at 9:30 a.m. (slc) (tcc). (Entered: 12/27/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Clarence Cooper GRANTING [82-1] motion to apply for ifp for order requiring subpoena to be issued (cc) (***Filed Under Seal***) (lme) Modified on 12/06/2001 (Entered: 12/03/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by petitioner to apply for ifp for order requiring subpoena to be issued for serivce . (***Filed Under Seal***) (lme) (Entered: 12/03/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Clarence Cooper, for writ of habeas corpus ad testificandum to produce Lawrence J. Jefferson for a hearing on 1/14/02 (cc & U.S. Marshal and Warden) (lme) Modified on 12/06/2001 (tcc). (Entered: 12/03/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 11/21/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          HEARING set by Judge Clarence Cooper, evidentiary hearing set for 9:30 on 1/14/02 . (slc) (tcc). (Entered: 11/26/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 3/26/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT filed RE: hearing proceedings for dates of 2/21/01 Court Reporter: Therese J. Vesel - (bek) (Entered: 03/27/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 3/19/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Clarence Cooper authorizing payment of fees and expenses for the taking of the depo of Richard Berry in Atlanta, GA. The date, place and time of the depo is to be agreed by the parties. (cc) (so) (tcc). (Entered: 03/21/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 3/2/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Clarence Cooper GRANTING [75-1] motion for travel voucher authorizing petitioner's lead counsel to travel to Houston Texas to take the depo of Richard Berry on 3/26/01. (cc) (bek) Modified on 03/02/2001 (tcc). (Entered: 03/02/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 3/2/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Clarence Cooper, that the deposition of Richard Berry shall be taken at the FPD in Houston, TX 3/26/01 at 1:30 p.m. (cc) (bek) (tcc). (Entered: 03/02/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 3/2/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by John R. Martin counsel for petitioner for travel voucher (bek) (tcc). (Entered: 03/02/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 2/21/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EVIDENTIARY HEARING HELD before Judge Clarence Cooper. Witnesses sworn. Exhibits admitted. Hearing not completed counsel need to take depositions and subpoena other witnesses. Another hearing will be set later. (bek) (tcc). (Entered: 02/23/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 2/13/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Clarence Cooper GRANTING [72-1] motion for certificate by the court for payment of fees of witnesses. (cc) (bek) Modified on 04/22/2002 (tcc). (Entered: 02/14/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 2/13/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION by petitioner for certificate by the court for payment of fees of witnesses . (bek) Modified on 04/22/2002 (tcc). (Entered: 02/14/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 2/9/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Clarence Cooper GRANTING [70-1] motion for certificate by the court for payment of fees of witnesses. Fees to be paid by USM. (cc and USM) (bek) Modified on 04/22/2002 (tcc). (Entered: 02/13/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 2/9/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION by petitioner for certificate by the court for payment of fees of witnesses . (bek) Modified on 04/22/2002 (tcc). (Entered: 02/13/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 1/17/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Clarence Cooper, for writ of habeas corpus ad testificandum testify on 2/20/01 at 9:30 a.m. and from day to day thereafter until discharged by the court (cc) (bek) Modified on 04/22/2002 (tcc). (Entered: 01/19/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 1/9/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Clarence Cooper GRANTING [66-1] motion for continuance of January 9, 01 evidentiary hearing. Evidentiary hearing is rescheduled for for 9:30 2/20/01. The court will not entertain any further motions for continuance. (cc) (bek) (tcc). (Entered: 01/10/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 12/21/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Clarence Cooper GRANTING [66-1] motion for continuance of January 8, 2001 evidentiary hearing. The parties will be notified at a later date as to when the hearing will be rescheduled. (cc and to pla) (bek) Modified on 12/22/2000 (tcc). (Entered: 12/22/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 12/19/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by respondent for continuance of January 9, 01 evidentiary hearing (bek) (tcc). (Entered: 12/21/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 12/14/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Clarence Cooper, for writ of habeas corpus ad testificandum , to commence his evidentiary hearing set for 1/8/01 at 9:30 a.m. (cc) (bek) (tcc). (Entered: 12/18/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 11/29/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Mag Judge Janet F. King GRANTING [63-1] motion for order requiring subpoenas to be issued for service (cc) ***FILED UNDER SEAL*** (bek) (Entered: 11/29/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 11/29/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by petitioner for order requiring subpoenas to be issued for service with brief in support. ***FILED UNDER SEAL*** (bek) (Entered: 11/29/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 11/22/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              JOINT PRE-HEARING REPORT pursuant to [61-1] order re: evidentiary hearing (bek) (tcc). (Entered: 11/23/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/22/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Clarence Cooper DENYING [59-1] motion for reconsideration of [58-1] order by Tony Turpin. Parties are DIRECTED to submit a joint pre-hearing report w/in 14 days of the date of this order [61-1] order to be submitted on 11/15/99 (cc) (bek) (tcc). (Entered: 10/25/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 9/28/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Response by petitioner to [59-1] motion for reconsideration of [58-1] order (llg) (tcc). (Entered: 09/30/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 9/14/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by respondent for reconsideration of [58-1] order with brief in support. (shb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/20/2015: # 1 Brief) (tcc). (Entered: 09/15/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/31/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Clarence Cooper GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART [48-1] motion for evidentiary hearing regarding specific issues raised in petition by Lawrence Joseph Jefferson. The Court will grant an evidential hrg only w/respect to the following claims in Petitioner's habeas corpus petiton: (1) Racial Bias Claim; (2) Juror Misconduct; (3) The Brady Violation; (4) Actual Innocence Evidence. The parties are DIRECTED to submit a joint pre-hrg. report w/in (14) days of the date of this Order. [58-1] order to be submitted on 9/20/99 (cc) (shb) (tcc). (Entered: 09/01/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/7/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CONFERENCE HELD before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Court advised counsel of relationship with former District Attorney and asked counsel to advise of any recusal request as soon as possibl3 (bsm) (tcc). (Entered: 01/28/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/26/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Thomas W. Thrash recusing in action, case reassigned to Judge Julie E. Carnes (cc) (bsm) (tcc). (Entered: 01/27/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 12/22/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice by CRD of status conference set for 9:30 on 1/7/99 on issue of possible RECUSAL only (served by CRD) (bsm) (tcc). (Entered: 12/22/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 12/18/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Submission of affidavits of Megan C. De Vorsey and John Hanusz for Court's consideration in determining whether to hold an evidentiary hearing by petitioner. (bsm) (tcc). (Entered: 12/21/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 11/19/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice by CRD, motion hearing set for [48-1] motion for evidentiary hearing regarding specific issues raised in petition at 2:00 on 12/21/98 (served by CRD) (bsm) (tcc). (Entered: 11/20/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 11/18/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of filing deposition by respondent. (bsm) (tcc). (Entered: 11/18/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 11/16/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY by petitioner to response to [48-1] motion for evidentiary hearing regarding specific issues raised in petition (bsm) (tcc). (Entered: 11/17/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 11/13/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Affidavits in support of petr's motion for evidentiary hearing (bsm) (tcc). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/19/2015: # 1 Affidavit Dale A. Baich, # 2 Affidavit Theodore Bernsteing, PH.D., # 3 Affidavit Charles Boger, # 4 Affidavit Deborah W. Denno, # 5 Affidavit Richard C. Dieter, # 6 Affidavit Orrin Devinsky, M.D., # 7 Affidavit Paula B. Hutchinson, # 8 Affidavit George H. Kendall, # 9 Affidavit Robert H. Kirschner, M.D., # 10 Affidavit Dr. Harold Hillman) (tcc). (Entered: 11/16/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 11/4/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Response by petitioner in opposition to [48-1] motion for evidentiary hearing regarding specific issues raised in petition (bsm) (tcc). (Entered: 11/05/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/15/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by petitioner for evidentiary hearing regarding specific issues raised in petition with brief in support. (bsm) (tcc). (Entered: 10/19/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/27/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Thomas W. Thrash GRANTING [37-1] motion to supplement record as developed in state courts (cc) (bsm) (tcc). (Entered: 08/28/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/26/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Thomas W. Thrash GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART [24-1 & 32-1] motions to seek discovery, petr may depose former District Attorney Thomas Charron re McCleskey claim and all other discovery requests are DENIED, GRANTING [40-1] motion for leave to file corrected amended petition; pursuant to Court's previous scheduling order, petr's motion for an evidentiary hearing shall be filed by 10/15/98 (cc) (bsm) (tcc). (Entered: 08/27/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/20/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY by petitioner to response to [40-1] motion for leave to file corrected amended complaint (bsm) (tcc). (Entered: 07/21/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/14/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Response by respondent in opposition to [40-1] motion for leave to file corrected amended complaint (fmr emp) (tcc). (Entered: 07/14/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/8/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Thomas W. Thrash GRANTING [42-1] motion to extend time thru 7/10/98 for respondent to file brief on discovery motions (cc) (fmr emp) (tcc). (Entered: 07/09/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/7/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by respondent to extend time to file brief on discovery motions (fmr emp) (tcc). (Entered: 07/08/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/6/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Brief by petr in support of [24-1] motion to seek discovery (fmr emp) (tcc). (Entered: 07/07/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/25/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by petr for leave to file corrected amended complaint with brief in support. (fmr emp) (tcc). (Entered: 06/26/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/22/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Affidavit of Mary Jane Haden by pla. (fmr emp) (tcc). (Entered: 06/24/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/22/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTIONS HEARING HELD before Judge Thomas W. Thrash: Dft's motion to supplement record & pla's affidavit of Mary Jane Haden, filed; [24-1] motion to seek discovery by Lawrence Joseph taken under ADVISEMENT, [32-1] motion amending [24-1] motion to seek discovery by Lawrence Joseph; counsel have (2) weeks to file any additional briefs as necessary Jefferson under ADVISEMENT (fmr emp) (tcc). (Entered: 06/24/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/22/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by respondent to supplement record as developed in state courts with brief in support. (fmr emp) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/19/2015: # 1 Brief) (tcc). (Entered: 06/24/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/3/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice by Ct Dep setting discovery hearing on 11:30 6/22/98 . fax by Ct Dep. (fmr emp) (tcc). (Entered: 06/04/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/1/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice by Ct Dep setting discovery hearing on 10:30 6/22/98 . cc by Ct Dep. (fmr emp) (tcc). (Entered: 06/02/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/18/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Response by respondent in opposition to [32-1] amended motion to [24-1] motion to seek discovery (fmr emp) (tcc). (Entered: 05/20/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/13/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Ct Dep of discovery conference set for 9:30 6/25/98 . cc by Ct Dep. (fmr emp) (tcc). (Entered: 05/13/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/30/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Amended MOTION by petitioner amending [24-1] motion to seek discovery (fmr emp) (tcc). (Entered: 05/01/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/22/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Thomas W. Thrash GRANTING [30-1] motion for leave to amend scheduling order, petr to have until 4/30/98 to file amended discovery motion, resp to have until 5/15/98 to respond and petr to have until 5/22/98 to reply; hearing on discovery matters to be scheduled on 6/1/98; if court permits discovery, petr to have until 10/15/98 to file motion for evidentiary hearing, resp to have until 11/1/98 to respond, petr to have until 11/15/98 to reply (cc) (bsm) (tcc). (Entered: 04/22/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/27/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by petr for leave to amend scheduling order (fmr emp) (tcc). (Entered: 03/30/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/23/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Thomas W. Thrash GRANTING [28-1] motion for appointment of second counsel under the CJA & Anti-Drug Abuse Action of 1988; John R. Martin is appointed as additional counsel & the first interim voucher shall be submitted no later than 4/5/98 & every month thereafter (cc) (fmr emp) (tcc). (Entered: 03/25/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/20/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by petr for appointment of second counsel under the CJA & Anti-Drug Abuse Action of 1988 (fmr emp) (tcc). (Entered: 03/20/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/25/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice setting hearing on Petitioner's Motion to Seek Discovery for 9:30 3/24/98. cc by Ct Dep. (fmr emp) (tcc). (Entered: 02/27/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/20/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Supplemental Answer-Response by respondent to [23-1] amended habeas corpus petition (fmr emp) (tcc). (Entered: 02/23/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/20/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Response by respondent in opposition to [24-1] motion to seek discovery (fmr emp) (tcc). (Entered: 02/23/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/30/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by petitioner to seek discovery . (rh) (tcc). (Entered: 02/02/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/30/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS by Lawrence Jefferson. (rh) (tcc). (Entered: 02/02/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/16/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Thomas W. Thrash GRANTING [21-1] motion to extend time to file amended petition and discovery motion through 1/30/98 (cc) (rh) (tcc). (Entered: 01/20/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/16/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by petitioner to extend time to file amended petition and discovery motion through 1/30/98 . (rh) (tcc). (Entered: 01/20/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/15/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Thomas W. Thrash DENYING [19-1] motion for reconsideration of [18-1] order by Lawrence Joseph Jefferson (cc) (rh) (tcc). (Entered: 01/16/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/7/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    EX PARTE MOTION by petitioner for reconsideration of [18-1] order . (rh) (tcc). (Entered: 01/08/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/22/1997, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Thomas W. Thrash GRANTING [17-1] motion to extend time to file amended petition for writ of habeas corpus and discovery requests. Pla must file on or before 1/14/98 and resp. shall have 20 days to respond; VACATING [12-1] order appointing Atty McIntyre as additional counsel for pet. (cc) (fmm) (tcc). (Entered: 12/22/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/15/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by petitioner to extend time to file amended petition for writ of habeas corpus and discovery requests with brief in support. (rh) (tcc). (Entered: 12/17/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/23/1997, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Thomas W. Thrash denying as moot the [8-1] motion to hold proceedings in abeyance (cc) (rh) (tcc). (Entered: 09/23/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/19/1997, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS CONFERENCE continued from 9/18/97 before Judge Thomas W. Thrash as to filing of certain pleadings and scheduling of discovery. Order filed. (rh) (tcc). (Entered: 09/23/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/19/1997, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Thomas W. Thrash allowing petitioner to file an amended petition and a motion for discovery by 12/15/97; respondent shall file response by 1/15/98; petitioner shall file a reply by 1/30/98. If the Court grants any portion or all of petitioner's motion for discovery, then petitioner shall file a motion for evidentiary hearing by 6/30/98; respondent's response due 7/15/98 [14-1] order to be submitted on 12/16/97 (cc) (rh) (tcc). (Entered: 09/22/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/18/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                First and Second Notices of filing respondent exhibits 1-55 by respondent. (fmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/19/2015: # 1 Second Notice of Filing) (tcc). (Entered: 09/21/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/29/1997, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Clarence Cooper GRANTING [11-1] motion for appointment of additional counsel, determination of rate of compensation & authorization of interim payments, with supporting authority. (cc) (cbm) Modified on 06/09/1997 (tcc). (Entered: 04/30/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/29/1997, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Clarence Cooper GRANTING [7-1] motion for appointment of counsel, & that the Federal Defender Program, Inc., be appointed. (cc) (cbm) Modified on 06/09/1997 (tcc). (Entered: 04/30/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/25/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EXPARTE MOTION by petitioner for appointment of additional counsel, determination of rate of compensation & authorization of interim payments, with supporting authority with brief in support. (cbm) Modified on 06/09/1997 (tcc). (Entered: 04/30/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/15/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Response by respondent to [9-1] motion to hold proceedings in abeyance pending the resolution of whether the amendments to 2254 enacted in the anti-terrorism & effective death penalty act will apply to petr's case by Lawrence Joseph Jefferson. (cbm) Modified on 06/09/1997 (tcc). (Entered: 04/21/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/31/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by petitioner to hold proceedings in abeyance pending the resolution of whether the amendments to 2254 enacted in the anti-terrorism & effective death penalty act will apply to petr's case by Lawrence Joseph Jefferson with brief in support. (cbm) Modified on 06/09/1997 (tcc). (Entered: 04/03/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/21/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by petitioner for appointment of counsel with brief in support. (cbm) (tcc). (Entered: 03/27/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/10/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER by respondent to complaint. Discovery ends 8/7/97 (jaw) (tcc). (Entered: 03/11/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/24/1997, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER DIRECTING clerk to correct docket to reflect the state Atty General as atty for respondent & make sure all orders are sent to state Atty General & ORDERS state Atty Gen to respond no later than 10 days from date of htis order; petr has 20 days thereafter to file traverse or amend petition; if petr files no traverse or amended petition, he shall have 30 days from date of respondent's answer to file brief, and respondent is allowed 30 days thereafter to file brief in response by Judge Clarence Cooper (cc to petr, cc of all orders & petition to Bowers, certified mail, rrr) (fmr emp) (tcc). (Entered: 02/25/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/29/1996, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Clarence Cooper GRANTING [3-1] motion to extend time to w/in (10) days of the date of this order for respondent to file responsive pleading to order directing respondent to show cause why writ should issue. [2-1], all other briefs shall be filed as specified in court's order dated May 16, 96. (cc) (cbm) (tcc). (Entered: 12/02/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/1/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by respondent Tony Turpin to extend time for respondent to file responsive pleading to order directing respondent to show cause why writ should not issue. [2-1] (cbm) (tcc). (Entered: 11/06/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/16/1996, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER directing respondent Tony Turpin to show cause why writ should not issue. Brief w/in (20) days 6/17/96 for Tony Turpin & pet has (20) days thereafer by Judge Clarence Cooper.o/cmp to res & o to petr (cbm) (tcc). (Entered: 05/20/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/23/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PETITION by petr for writ of habeas corpus . Fee paid r/231709 (dt) (tcc). (Entered: 04/29/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 63 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?