Jennifer Millard v. Lanterman Regional Center

State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. BC287072
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Millard Jennifer, Plaintiff/Petitioner

Represented by Ebner, Stephen A (law Offices Of)

No Logo Parker, Jennifer, Plaintiff/Petitioner

Represented by Ebner, Stephen A (law Offices Of)

v.
No Logo Buck, John, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Frank D. Lanterman Regional Center, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo L.a. County Developmental Services, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Lanterman Regional Center, Defendant/Respondent
Attributes
Type Other Employment Complaint (General Jurisdiction)
Status Dismissed - Other 05/14/2003
Timeline
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 15 Filed: 5/14/2003, Entered: 5/14/2003 Request and Entry of Dismissal
entire action w/prejudice
Request RequestSpace
Blank 14 Filed: 4/9/2003, Entered: 4/9/2003 Partial Dismissal(not entire case)
WITHOUT PREJUDICE, COMPLAINT AS TO DEFT JOHN BUCK, ONLY.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 13 Filed: 3/27/2003, Entered: 3/27/2003 Answer
Request RequestSpace
Blank 12 Filed: 3/10/2003, Entered: 3/10/2003 Statement-Case Management
Request RequestSpace
Blank 11 Filed: 2/28/2003, Entered: 2/28/2003 Reply/Response
REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES
Request RequestSpace
Blank 10 Filed: 2/27/2003, Entered: 2/27/2003 Stipulation
RE TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT
Request RequestSpace
Blank 9 Filed: 2/26/2003, Entered: 2/26/2003 Statement-Case Management
Request RequestSpace
Blank 8 Filed: 2/25/2003, Entered: 2/25/2003 Opposition Document
PLFFS' MEMO OF P&A'S IN OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER OF DEFENDANT
Request RequestSpace
Blank 7 Filed: 2/19/2003, Entered: 2/19/2003 Statement-Case Management
Request RequestSpace
Blank 6 Filed: 2/13/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003 Notice
of case managment conference
Request RequestSpace
Blank 5 Filed: 1/24/2003, Entered: 1/24/2003 Notice of Hearing.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 4 Filed: 1/9/2003, Entered: 1/9/2003 Notice-Case Management Conference
Request RequestSpace
Blank 3 Filed: 1/9/2003, Entered: 1/9/2003 Notice of Hearing.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 2 Filed: 1/9/2003, Entered: 1/9/2003 Ord to Show Cause
Ntc to Appear
Request RequestSpace
Blank 1 Filed: 12/16/2002, Entered: 12/16/2002 Complaint
Request RequestSpace

Statistics

This case has been viewed 44 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?