Tanya Benson v. Guardmark Inc
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. BC290971

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Benson Tanya, Plaintiff/Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ring David M.
No Logo Guardsmark, Inc., Defendant/Respondent
Type Other Employment Complaint (General Jurisdiction)
Status Dismissed - Other 07/16/2003
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 6 Filed: 4/23/2003, Entered: 4/23/2003 Proof of Service
OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL IN LIGHT OF REMOVAL TO REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT;
    Blank 5 Filed: 4/17/2003, Entered: 4/17/2003 Ord to Show Cause
    Ntc to Appear
      Blank 4 Filed: 4/2/2003, Entered: 4/2/2003 Ntc of Removal to Federal Court
      Ntc to Adverse Party
        Blank 3 Filed: 4/1/2003, Entered: 4/1/2003 Answer
          Blank 2 Filed: 3/7/2003, Entered: 3/7/2003 Proof of Service
            Blank 1 Filed: 2/25/2003, Entered: 2/25/2003 Complaint

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 2 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?