Omen Fiction Inc v. Universal Television Networks et al

State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. BC293911
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Omen Fiction Inc., Plaintiff/Petitioner
v.
No Logo Universal Network Television, LLC, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Universal Television Networks, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Valentine Ian, Defendant/Respondent
Other Parties
No Logo Hirschberg Gert K., Mediator
Attributes
Type Other Compl-not Tort or Complex (General Jurisdiction)
Status Dismissed - Other 06/28/2004
Timeline
  Entries (84) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 84 Filed: 6/28/2004, Entered: 6/28/2004 Request and Entry of Dismissal
WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION
Request RequestSpace
Blank 83 Filed: 6/9/2004, Entered: 6/9/2004 miscellaneous other
plff's stmt re defts' motion to compel further responses to request for production of docs
Request RequestSpace
Blank 82 Filed: 6/4/2004, Entered: 6/4/2004 miscellaneous other
DEFTS' REPORT ON: 1)DEFTS'MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGS 2)DEFTS' MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQ FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCS
Request RequestSpace
Blank 81 Filed: 6/3/2004, Entered: 6/3/2004 Notice of Continuance
SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Request RequestSpace
Blank 80 Filed: 5/26/2004, Entered: 5/26/2004 Stipulation
SUBMITTED IN COMMECTION RE PLT. MOT TO COMPEL DEPOS.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 79 Filed: 5/21/2004, Entered: 5/21/2004 miscellaneous other
MEMO OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES RE DEFENDANT UNIVERSAL TELEVISION NETWORKS' MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Request RequestSpace
Blank 78 Filed: 5/21/2004, Entered: 5/21/2004 Statement-Non-Agreement
Request RequestSpace
Blank 77 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/17/2004 Stipulation
AND NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING
Request RequestSpace
Blank 76 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/17/2004 Notice Of Ruling
Request RequestSpace
Blank 75 Filed: 5/14/2004, Entered: 5/14/2004 Points and Authorities
Request RequestSpace
Blank 74 Filed: 5/11/2004, Entered: 5/11/2004 Notice of Continuance
OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO UNIVERSAL'S SPECIAL INTERROGS
Request RequestSpace
Blank 73 Filed: 5/10/2004, Entered: 5/10/2004 Notice of Continuance
OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO UNIVERSAL'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Request RequestSpace
Blank 72 Filed: 5/10/2004, Entered: 5/10/2004 Reply/Response
REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO FOURTH REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Request RequestSpace
Blank 71 Filed: 5/10/2004, Entered: 5/10/2004 Opposition Document
TO PLTS' MOTION FOR ORDER COMPEL DEFTS TO PRODUCE WITNESSES
Request RequestSpace
Blank 70 Filed: 5/5/2004, Entered: 5/5/2004 Notice of Motion
OF 5-26-04 MOT TO CONT TRIAL
Request RequestSpace
Blank 69 Filed: 5/3/2004, Entered: 5/3/2004 miscellaneous other
LODGING ON MEDIATION BRIEF FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Request RequestSpace
Blank 68 Filed: 5/3/2004, Entered: 5/3/2004 Notice Of Ruling
Request RequestSpace
Blank 67 Filed: 4/30/2004, Entered: 4/30/2004 Reply/Response
RESPONSE TO SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION NOS.5,6,7,8, AND 12 OF OMEN FICTION INC 4TH REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCS
Request RequestSpace
Blank 66 Filed: 4/30/2004, Entered: 4/30/2004 Reply/Response
TO SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION NOS. 50,51,51,53 AND 55 OF OMEN FICTION,INCS 4TH REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCS
Request RequestSpace
Blank 65 Filed: 4/30/2004, Entered: 4/30/2004 Opposition Document
TO MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO OMEN FICTION INC. 4TH SET OF REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCS
Request RequestSpace
Blank 64 Filed: 4/30/2004, Entered: 4/30/2004 Opposition Document
TO MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO OMEN FICTION FIRST SET OF REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCS
Request RequestSpace
Blank 63 Filed: 4/28/2004, Entered: 4/28/2004 Reply/Response
REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGS
Request RequestSpace
Blank 62 Filed: 4/28/2004, Entered: 4/28/2004 Reply/Response
REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO UNIVERSAL'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET NO. TWO
Request RequestSpace
Blank 61 Filed: 4/27/2004, Entered: 4/27/2004 Stipulation and Order
TO DISMISS PUNITIVE DAMAGES ALLEGATION ON BREACH OF CONFIDENCE CLAIM & TAKE HEARING ON MOTION TO STRIKE OFF CALENDAR
Request RequestSpace
Blank 60 Filed: 4/21/2004, Entered: 4/21/2004 Notice of Motion
0F 5-12-04 MOTION TO COMPEL
Request RequestSpace
Blank 59 Filed: 4/21/2004, Entered: 4/21/2004 Notice of Motion
OF 5-12-04 MOT TO COMPEL
Request RequestSpace
Blank 58 Filed: 4/21/2004, Entered: 4/21/2004 miscellaneous other
SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION NOS. 5,6,7,8 AND 12 OF OMEN FICTIONS' FIRST REQUEST FOR PORDUCTIONS OF DOCS
Request RequestSpace
Blank 57 Filed: 4/21/2004, Entered: 4/21/2004 miscellaneous other
SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSE TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION NOS.50,51, 52,53 AND 55 OF OMEN FICTION' FOURTH REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Request RequestSpace
Blank 56 Filed: 4/19/2004, Entered: 4/19/2004 miscellaneous other
SEPARATE STATEMENT IN OPPOSITION TO UNIVERSAL TELEVISION'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGS
Request RequestSpace
Blank 55 Filed: 4/19/2004, Entered: 4/19/2004 Opposition Document
TO DEFT UNIVERSAL TELEVISION'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO 2ND REQ FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCS
Request RequestSpace
Blank 54 Filed: 4/19/2004, Entered: 4/19/2004 Opposition Document
TO DEFT UNIVERSAL TELEVISION'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO FIRST SET OF SPECIAL INTERROGS AND REQ FOR SANCTIONS
Request RequestSpace
Blank 53 Filed: 4/19/2004, Entered: 4/19/2004 miscellaneous other
SEPARATE STATEMENT IN OPPOSITION OF DEFTS' MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTIO OF DOCS
Request RequestSpace
Blank 52 Filed: 4/19/2004, Entered: 4/19/2004 miscellaneous other
APPENDIX OF NON-CALIFORNIA AUTHORITY CITED IN PLTS' OPPOSITION TO DEFT UNIVERSAL TELEVISION'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO 2ND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCS
Request RequestSpace
Blank 51 Filed: 4/19/2004, Entered: 4/19/2004 miscellaneous other
ECXHIBIT 4 TO DECLARATION OF MELODIE K. LARSEN FILED IN SUPPORT OF PLTS' OPPOSITION TO DEFT UNIVERSAL TELEVISION'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO 2ND REQ FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCS
Request RequestSpace
Blank 50 Filed: 4/15/2004, Entered: 4/15/2004 Notice Of Ruling
Request RequestSpace
Blank 49 Filed: 4/13/2004, Entered: 4/13/2004 Exparte Application
ORDER TO CONT. THE MSJ & ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR A MO. COMPELL ING DEFTS.TO PRODUCE WITNESSES FOR DEPOS.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 48 Filed: 4/13/2004, Entered: 4/13/2004 Notice of Motion
OF 5-19-04 MOT TO COMPEL
Request RequestSpace
Blank 47 Filed: 4/13/2004, Entered: 4/13/2004 Opposition Document
TO PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION
Request RequestSpace
Blank 46 Filed: 4/12/2004, Entered: 4/12/2004 Notice of Motion
OF 5-3-04 MOT TO COMPEL
Request RequestSpace
Blank 45 Filed: 4/12/2004, Entered: 4/12/2004 miscellaneous other
SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF DEFTS' MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTIO OF DOCS, SET NO. TWO
Request RequestSpace
Blank 44 Filed: 4/2/2004, Entered: 4/2/2004 Notice of Motion
OF 5-3-04 MOT COMPEL
Request RequestSpace
Blank 43 Filed: 4/2/2004, Entered: 4/2/2004 miscellaneous other
SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF UNIVERSAL'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGS
Request RequestSpace
Blank 42 Filed: 3/15/2004, Entered: 3/15/2004 Notice of Motion
OF 4-28-04 MOTION TO STRIKE
Request RequestSpace
Blank 41 Filed: 3/15/2004, Entered: 3/15/2004 miscellaneous other
COMPENDIUM OF NON CALIFORNIA AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE
Request RequestSpace
Blank 40 Filed: 3/15/2004, Entered: 3/15/2004 Answer To First Amended Complaint
OF UNIVERSAL TELEVISION NETWORKS AND IAN VALENTINE
Request RequestSpace
Blank 39 Filed: 3/5/2004, Entered: 3/5/2004 Stipulation and Order
CONTINUING MSJ from 4/6/04 to 5/27/04
Request RequestSpace
Blank 38 Filed: 2/13/2004, Entered: 2/13/2004 Reply/Response
REPLY MEMO IN SUPPORT OF MOTIONS TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGS PROPOUNDED UPON DEFTS UNIVERSAL TELEVISION NETWORKS AND IAN VALENTINE
Request RequestSpace
Blank 37 Filed: 2/13/2004, Entered: 2/13/2004 Proof of Service
by mail/pos re 1st amended comp
Request RequestSpace
Blank 36 Filed: 2/13/2004, Entered: 2/13/2004 Proof of Service
by mail/1st amended comp
Request RequestSpace
Blank 35 Filed: 2/11/2004, Entered: 2/11/2004 Notice of Motion
0F 4-6-04 MOTION SJ
Request RequestSpace
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 34 Filed: 2/11/2004, Entered: 2/11/2004 miscellaneous other
SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JGMT OR ALTERNATIVELY SUMMARY ADJUCIATION
Request RequestSpace
Blank 33 Filed: 2/11/2004, Entered: 2/11/2004 miscellaneous other
COMPENDIUM OF FEDERAL AUTHORITY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JGMT OR ALTERNATIVELY SUMMARY ADJUDICATION
Request RequestSpace
Blank 32 Filed: 2/11/2004, Entered: 2/11/2004 Supplemental Declaration
OF DAVID HOWE,LARRY LANDSMAN,DON SCHMITT,THOMAS CAREY,THOMAS VITALE KIM VOLONAKIS,IAN VALENTINE,RON ZISKIN, DAVID COLLINS AND ARTHUR MARGOLIN IN SUPPORT OF DEFTS MOT FOR SJ OR ALTER S ADJUDICATION
Request RequestSpace
Blank 31 Filed: 2/11/2004, Entered: 2/11/2004 Supplemental Declaration
OF GAIL MIGDAL TITLE IN SUPPORT OF DEFTS MOTION FOR SJ OR ALTERNATIVE SUMMARY ADJUDICATION
Request RequestSpace
Blank 30 Filed: 2/6/2004, Entered: 2/6/2004 Response
JOINT RESPONSE OF UNIVERSAL TV NETWORK & IAN VALENTINE TO PLTF'S SEP. STMT IN SUPP OF MTN/COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROG
Request RequestSpace
Blank 29 Filed: 2/6/2004, Entered: 2/6/2004 Opposition Document
joint oppo of defts to plff's motion to compel further responses to form interrogatories
Request RequestSpace
Blank 28 Filed: 2/6/2004, Entered: 2/6/2004 First Amended Complaint
Request RequestSpace
Blank 27 Filed: 2/6/2004, Entered: 2/6/2004 Declaration
DECL OF MARILYN M. GATES IN SUPP OF DEFTS UNIVERSAL TV NETWORK & IAN VALENTINE'S OPP TO PLTF'S MTN/COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGS & REQ FOR SANCTIONS
Request RequestSpace
Blank 26 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004 Reply/Response
REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING DEFENDANTS TO PRODUCE JOHN GUITON FOR DEPOSITION
Request RequestSpace
Blank 25 Filed: 1/23/2004, Entered: 1/23/2004 Opposition Document
TO PLT'S MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION OF IN-HOUSE COUNSEL JOHN GUITON; DECLARATION OF JOHN GUITON,IAN VALENTINE,THOMAS VITALE DON SCHMITT AND RON ZISKIN
Request RequestSpace
Blank 24 Filed: 1/23/2004, Entered: 1/23/2004 Reply/Response
MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; DECLARATION OF MELODIE K. LARSEN.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 23 Filed: 1/21/2004, Entered: 1/21/2004 Proof of Service
Request RequestSpace
Blank 22 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: 1/20/2004 Motion to Compel
Motion to Compel the Deposition of John Guiton
Request RequestSpace
Blank 21 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: 1/20/2004 Exparte Application
Request RequestSpace
Blank 20 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: 1/20/2004 Stipulation and Order
Stipulation and Order for Order Shortening Time
Request RequestSpace
Blank 19 Filed: 1/16/2004, Entered: 1/16/2004 miscellaneous other
COMPENDIUM OF NON-CALIFORNIA AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF OPPO OF DEFTS UNIVERSAL AND VALENITNE TO PLTS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Request RequestSpace
Blank 18 Filed: 1/16/2004, Entered: 1/16/2004 Opposition Document
TO DEFTS UNIVERSAL AND VALENTINE TO PLTS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Request RequestSpace
Blank 17 Filed: 1/14/2004, Entered: 1/14/2004 Notice of Motion
OF 2-18-04
Request RequestSpace
Blank 16 Filed: 1/14/2004, Entered: 1/14/2004 miscellaneous other
SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL AS TO DEFT IAN VALENTINE
Request RequestSpace
Blank 15 Filed: 1/14/2004, Entered: 1/14/2004 miscellaneous other
SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL AS TO DEFT UNIVERSAL TELEVISION NETWORKS
Request RequestSpace
Blank 14 Filed: 12/5/2003, Entered: 12/5/2003 Notice of Motion
OF 1-29-04
Request RequestSpace
Blank 13 Filed: 10/16/2003, Entered: 10/16/2003 Stipulation and Order
Stip & ord re confidentiality
Request RequestSpace
Blank 12 Filed: 10/2/2003, Entered: 10/2/2003 Partial Dismissal
with Prejudice) (as to all causes of action alleged The Estate of Diana, Princess of Wales. ("The Estate"). the Hon. Frances Ruth Shand Kydd the Rt. Hon. Richard John Carew Chanres, Bishop of London, and Lady Sarah
Request RequestSpace
Blank 11 Filed: 9/18/2003, Entered: 9/18/2003 Order: Case Management
Request RequestSpace
Blank 10 Filed: 9/12/2003, Entered: 9/12/2003 Proof of Service
For Status Conference
Request RequestSpace
Blank 9 Filed: 9/11/2003, Entered: 9/11/2003 Status Conference Questionnaire
Request RequestSpace
Blank 8 Filed: 9/11/2003, Entered: 9/11/2003 Status Conference Questionnaire
Request RequestSpace
Blank 7 Filed: 7/23/2003, Entered: 7/23/2003 Notice of Status Conference filed
Request RequestSpace
Blank 6 Filed: 7/3/2003, Entered: 7/3/2003 Answer
Request RequestSpace
Blank 5 Filed: 6/17/2003, Entered: 6/17/2003 Notice
OF CASE REASSIGNMENT
Request RequestSpace
Blank 4 Filed: 6/9/2003, Entered: 6/9/2003 Notice of Reassignment and Order
Request RequestSpace
Blank 3 Filed: 6/6/2003, Entered: 6/6/2003 Summons Filed
Request RequestSpace
Blank 2 Filed: 5/12/2003, Entered: 5/12/2003 Amendment to Complaint
Doe 1 to be Universal Network Television LLC
Request RequestSpace
Blank 1 Filed: 4/14/2003, Entered: 4/14/2003 Complaint
Request RequestSpace

Statistics

This case has been viewed 1 time.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?