Steven P Dell v. Avalon Hollywood Services Inc
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles ,
Case No. BC313113
Update Alerts Jump
Summary Parties Attributes Timeline
Summary
No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.
Parties
Dell Steven P. , Plaintiff
Phillip S. Dudley [bc377858] , Plaintiff/Petitioner
Represented by Harris & Ruble
v.
Avalon Hollywood Services Inc. , Defendant
Btl Production Services Inc. [bc377858] , Defendant/Respondent
Represented by Jeffer, Mangels, Butler & Marmaro LLP
Cast & Crew Production Payroll Inc. , Defendant/Respondent
Represented by Jeffer, Mangels, Butler & Marmaro LLP
Cbs Productions [bc377858] , Defendant/Respondent
Represented by Jeffer, Mangels, Butler & Marmaro LLP
Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc. , Defendant/Respondent
Represented by Jeffer, Mangels, Butler & Marmaro LLP
Epsg Management Services [bc377858] , Defendant/Respondent
Represented by Jeffer, Mangels, Butler & Marmaro LLP
Gramercy Productions Llc [bc377858] , Defendant/Respondent
Represented by Jeffer, Mangels, Butler & Marmaro LLP
Granite Productions, Inc. , Defendant/Respondent
Represented by Jeffer, Mangels, Butler & Marmaro LLP
Metro-goldwyn-mayer Pictures, Inc. , Defendant/Respondent
Represented by Jeffer, Mangels, Butler & Marmaro LLP
Mgm Television Entertainment Inc. , Defendant/Respondent
Represented by Jeffer, Mangels, Butler & Marmaro LLP
Nbc Studios Inc. [bc377858] , Defendant/Respondent
Represented by Jeffer, Mangels, Butler & Marmaro LLP
Paramount Network Tv [bc377858] , Defendant/Respondent
Represented by Jeffer, Mangels, Butler & Marmaro LLP
Paramount Television [bc377858] , Defendant/Respondent
Represented by Jeffer, Mangels, Butler & Marmaro LLP
Revolution Production Services Llc , Defendant/Respondent
Represented by Jeffer, Mangels, Butler & Marmaro LLP
Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation , Defendant/Respondent
Represented by Jeffer, Mangels, Butler & Marmaro LLP
Twentieth Century Fox International Tel.. , Defendant/Respondent
Represented by Jeffer, Mangels, Butler & Marmaro LLP
Universal Network Television, LLC , Defendant/Respondent
Represented by Jeffer, Mangels, Butler & Marmaro LLP
Warner Bros. Pictures Inc. [bc377858] , Defendant/Respondent
Represented by Jeffer, Mangels, Butler & Marmaro LLP
Warner Bros. Television [bc377858] , Defendant/Respondent
Represented by Jeffer, Mangels, Butler & Marmaro LLP
Warner Bros. [bc377858] , Defendant/Respondent
Represented by Jeffer, Mangels, Butler & Marmaro LLP
Attributes
Type
Other Employment Complaint (General Jurisdiction)
Status
Dismissed - Other 07/02/2015
Timeline
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
36
Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: 6/29/2015
Report - Status
re bankruptcy of Axium Intl.Inc. and related entities
Request
35
Filed: 1/28/2015, Entered: 1/28/2015
Notice of Continuance
of case review
Request
34
Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: 11/21/2014
Report - Status
Request
33
Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: 4/10/2014
Report - Status
REGARDING BANKRUPTCY
Request
32
Filed: 8/1/2013, Entered: 8/1/2013
Report - Status
Request
31
Filed: 5/22/2012, Entered: 5/22/2012
Notice
of non-appearance case review re status of bankruptcy proceedings
Request
30
Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: 5/2/2012
Report - Status
re bankruptcy proceedins of Defts
Request
29
Filed: 1/3/2012, Entered: 1/3/2012
Report - Status
regarding bankruptcy proceedings of defendants
Request
28
Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: 9/28/2011
Notice
OF NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE STATUS OF BANKRUPTCY PROCEEDINGS
Request
27
Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: 9/15/2011
Report - Status
RE BANKRUPTCY PROCEEDINGS OF DEFENDANTS
Request
26
Filed: 3/9/2011, Entered: 3/9/2011
Report - Status
re bankruptcy proceedings of Defts
Request
25
Filed: 8/25/2010, Entered: 8/25/2010
Notice
of NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE STATUS OF BANKRUPTCY PROCEEDINGS
Request
24
Filed: 8/12/2010, Entered: 8/12/2010
Report - Status
status report re bankruptcy of Axium Intl.Inc. and related entities
Request
23
Filed: 2/10/2010, Entered: 2/10/2010
Notice
of non-appearance case review re status of bankruptcy proceedings
Request
22
Filed: 1/28/2010, Entered: 1/28/2010
Report - Status
re bankruptcy of Axium Int'l. Inc. and related entities
Request
21
Filed: 11/5/2009, Entered: 11/5/2009
Notice
of non-appearance case review re status of bankruptcy proceedings
Request
20
Filed: 10/26/2009, Entered: 10/26/2009
Report - Status
re bankruptcy of Axium Int'l. Inc. and related entities
Request
19
Filed: 3/25/2009, Entered: 3/25/2009
Notice
OF ORD. SETTING NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RES STATUS OF BANKRUPTCY OF AXIUM INTERNATIONAL, INC. AND RELATED ENTITIES
Request
18
Filed: 3/9/2009, Entered: 3/9/2009
Report - Status
re bankruptcy of Axium Intl.Inc. and related entities
Request
17
Filed: 10/31/2008, Entered: 10/31/2008
Request For Dismissal
*AS TO CASE NUMBER:BC347925 ONLY* all pltffs dismiss w/prej the entire action as to defts: Epoch Films, Inc.; 20th Century Fox Film Corp.; Harticon, Inc.; Hungry Man, Inc; Partizan Entertainment..
Request
16
Filed: 7/29/2008, Entered: 7/29/2008
Notice
OF COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Request
15
Filed: 6/24/2008, Entered: 6/24/2008
Notice Of Ruling
AT JUNE 23, 2008 STATUS CONFERENCE
Request
14
Filed: 6/18/2008, Entered: 6/18/2008
Report - Status
status report re the status of the bankrupt deft's bankruptcy case
Request
13
Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: 6/2/2008
Notice Of Ruling
OF NON APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW; NOTICE OF FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE
Request
12
Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: 3/21/2008
Notice
of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff Dell to Give Notice [that the Case is Assigned to William F. Highberger Department 307]
Request
11
Filed: 3/13/2008, Entered: 3/13/2008
Notice of Reassignment and Order
Request
10
Filed: 1/23/2008, Entered: 1/23/2008
Notice of Bankruptcy Stay
ntc of pendency of chapter 7 cases and automatic stay
Request
9
Filed: 3/6/2006, Entered: 3/6/2006
Ntc of Unpaid Filing Fees
complex fees
Request
8
Filed: 2/24/2006, Entered: 2/24/2006
Second Amended Complaint
Request
7
Filed: 2/22/2006, Entered: 2/22/2006
Stipulation and Order
STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR FILING AMENDED COMPLAINT
Request
6
Filed: 9/1/2004, Entered: 9/1/2004
Order
INITIAL STATUS CONF. ORD.
Request
5
Filed: 8/17/2004, Entered: 8/17/2004
Notice of Reassignment and Order
Request
4
Filed: 6/24/2004, Entered: 6/24/2004
Notice of Transfer
Request
3
Filed: 6/14/2004, Entered: 6/14/2004
miscellaneous other
PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 170.6(2
Request
2
Filed: 5/5/2004, Entered: 5/5/2004
Notice
status hearing
Request
1
Filed: 4/5/2004, Entered: 4/5/2004
Complaint
Request
Date: 7/2/2015, Time: 09:00:00, Status: None
Date: 11/26/2014, Time: 09:00:00, Status: None
Date: 4/1/2014, Time: 09:00:00, Status: None
Date: 8/1/2013, Time: 09:00:00, Status: None
Date: 1/8/2013, Time: 09:00:00, Status: None
Date: 5/10/2012, Time: 09:00:00, Status: None
Date: 9/20/2011, Time: 09:00:00, Status: None
Date: 3/18/2011, Time: 09:00:00, Status: None
Date: 8/20/2010, Time: 09:00:00, Status: None
Date: 2/3/2010, Time: 09:00:00, Status: None
Date: 10/27/2009, Time: 09:00:00, Status: None
Date: 3/13/2009, Time: 08:30:00, Status: None
Date: 10/9/2008, Time: 09:00:00, Status: None
Date: 7/21/2008, Time: 10:00:00, Status: None
Date: 6/23/2008, Time: 09:00:00, Status: None
Date: 5/23/2008, Time: 09:00:00, Status: None
Date: 5/6/2008, Time: 09:00:00, Status: None
Date: 1/28/2008, Time: 11:00:00, Status: None
Date: 12/15/2006, Time: 10:00:00, Status: None
Date: 3/22/2006, Time: 09:00:00, Status: None
Date: 2/17/2006, Time: 10:00:00, Status: None
Date: 2/17/2006, Time: 09:30:00, Status: None
Date: 2/17/2006, Time: 09:00:00, Status: None
Date: 9/8/2004, Time: 10:00:00, Status: None
Date: 6/24/2004, Time: 10:45:00, Status: None
Date: 6/15/2004, Time: 03:15:00, Status: None
Date: 4/26/2004, Time: 09:30:00, Status: None
Statistics
This case has been viewed 69 times.