Gary Dowling v. Alex Capalac et al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. BC316600

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Andrews Janel, Mediator-Immediate Former
No Logo Capalac Alex, Defendant/Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sayre, Mark D
No Logo Western Express, Defendant/Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sayre, Mark D
No Logo Collinson Shankura, Mediator
No Logo Dowling Gary, Plaintiff/Petitioner
Type Motor Vehicle - PI/PD/WD (General Jurisdiction)
Status Dismissed - Other 07/25/2005
  Entries (27) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 27 Filed: 7/22/2005, Entered: 7/22/2005 Partial Dismissal
with Prejudice) (W/PREJUDICE AS TO COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION
    Blank 26 Filed: 7/7/2005, Entered: 7/7/2005 Notice
    OF OSC RE DISMISSAL
      Blank 25 Filed: 6/9/2005, Entered: 6/9/2005 Notice
      OF SETTLEMENT;
        Blank 24 Filed: 5/26/2005, Entered: 5/26/2005 miscellaneous other
        RULING RE: MOTIONS TO COMPEL
          Blank 23 Filed: 4/26/2005, Entered: 4/26/2005 Notice of Continuance
          OF MOTION TO COMPEL;
            Blank 22 Filed: 4/21/2005, Entered: 4/21/2005 Answer
              Blank 21 Filed: 4/19/2005, Entered: 4/19/2005 Stipulation
              TO CONTINUE MOTION TO COMPEL
                Blank 20 Filed: 3/16/2005, Entered: 3/16/2005 Notice
                DEPOSITION;
                  Blank 19 Filed: 3/9/2005, Entered: 3/9/2005 Proof of Service
                  OF CONFORMED COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION;
                    Blank 18 Filed: 3/7/2005, Entered: 3/7/2005 Notice Of Ruling
                    ON MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL;
                      Blank 17 Filed: 3/3/2005, Entered: 3/3/2005 miscellaneous other
                      CIVIL DEPOSIT
                        Blank 16 Filed: 3/3/2005, Entered: 3/3/2005 Declaration
                        OF MONICA T. CRABLE RE EX PARTE NOTICE
                          Blank 15 Filed: 3/3/2005, Entered: 3/3/2005 Declaration
                          OF BOBBIE R. BAILEY IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR HEARING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE
                            Blank 14 Filed: 3/3/2005, Entered: 3/3/2005 Stipulation
                              Blank 13 Filed: 3/3/2005, Entered: 3/3/2005 Exparte Application
                              FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR HEARING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE
                                Blank 12 Filed: 3/1/2005, Entered: 3/1/2005 Complaint
                                IN INTERVENTION;
                                  Blank 11 Filed: 2/24/2005, Entered: 2/24/2005 Substitution of Attorney
                                    Blank 10 Filed: 1/7/2005, Entered: 1/7/2005 Notice-Reassgnment-Mediator
                                      Blank 9 Filed: 10/27/2004, Entered: 10/27/2004 Notice-Assignment-Mediator
                                        Blank 8 Filed: 9/16/2004, Entered: 9/16/2004 Statement-Case Management
                                          Blank 7 Filed: 9/3/2004, Entered: 9/3/2004 Demand For Jury Trial
                                            Blank 6 Filed: 9/3/2004, Entered: 9/3/2004 Answer
                                              Blank 5 Filed: 9/2/2004, Entered: 9/2/2004 Statement-Case Management
                                                Blank 4 Filed: 8/31/2004, Entered: 8/31/2004 Notice
                                                OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE;
                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 6/15/2004, Entered: 6/15/2004 Notice
                                                  OF LIEN PURSUANT TO LABOR CODE3850 -3865
                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 6/10/2004, Entered: 6/10/2004 Notice-Case Management Conference
                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 6/4/2004, Entered: 6/4/2004 Complaint

                                                        Statistics

                                                        This case has been viewed 0 times.

                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                        Space
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                         
                                                        PlainSite
                                                        Sign Up
                                                        Need Password Help?