Advance Magazine Publishers Inc v. Ivari International Inc
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. BC322296

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Advance Magazine Pulishers Inc, Plaintiff/Petitioner
No Logo Ivari International, Inc., Defendant/Respondent

Represented by Ackerman Lee B. Law Offices Of

Type Other Enforcement of Judgment Case (General Jurisdiction)
Status Dismissed - Other 11/01/2005
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 14 Filed: 9/22/2005, Entered: 9/22/2005 Notice-Settlement
    Blank 13 Filed: 9/16/2005, Entered: 9/16/2005 Exparte Application
    TO CONTINUE TRIAL; DECLARATION OF MOHAMMED IVARI AND LEE B. ACKERMAN; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT
      Blank 12 Filed: 9/13/2005, Entered: 9/13/2005 Brief
      TRIAL
        Blank 11 Filed: 9/13/2005, Entered: 9/13/2005 miscellaneous other
        FSC STATEMENT
          Blank 10 Filed: 8/24/2005, Entered: 8/24/2005 Notice
          of Unavailability 8/26/05 thru 8/30/05
            Blank 9 Filed: 1/27/2005, Entered: 1/27/2005 Statement-Case Management
              Blank 8 Filed: 1/18/2005, Entered: 1/18/2005 Statement-Case Management
                Blank 7 Filed: 1/5/2005, Entered: 1/5/2005 Answer
                  Blank 6 Filed: 12/16/2004, Entered: 12/16/2004 Proof of Service
                    Blank 5 Filed: 12/6/2004, Entered: 12/6/2004 Ord to Show Cause
                    Ntc to Appear
                      Blank 4 Filed: 12/6/2004, Entered: 12/6/2004 Notice-Case Management Conference
                        Blank 3 Filed: 10/19/2004, Entered: 10/19/2004 Notice-Related Cases
                          Blank 2 Filed: 10/7/2004, Entered: 10/7/2004 Notice-Case Management Conference
                            Blank 1 Filed: 9/30/2004, Entered: 9/30/2004 Complaint

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 34 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?