Sherrie Hampton-Muhamed v. James B. Nutter & Company, et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit, Case No. 15-15594

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 15, 2017 at 6:08 AM DT (3.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 01109567261 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ORDER: Motion for extension to file request for rehearing filed by Appellant Sherrie Hampton-Muhamed is GRANTED by clerk. [8145850-2] Petition for Rehearing due on 06/20/2017.
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01109567253 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    MOTION for extension of time to file request for rehearing to 06/20/2017 filed by Appellant Sherrie Hampton-Muhamed. Motion is Unopposed [8145850-1]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01109529896 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Opinion issued by court as to Appellant Sherrie Hampton-Muhamed. Decision: Affirmed. Opinion type: Non-Published. Opinion method: Per Curiam. The opinion is also available through the Court's Opinions page at this link http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/opinions.
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01109072210 Filed: 7/18/2016, Entered: None
        Reply Brief filed by Appellant Sherrie Hampton-Muhamed. Service 07/11/2016 email - Attorney for Appellees: Gowen, Hill, Messersmith.
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01108993399 Filed: 6/9/2016, Entered: None
          Supplemental Appendix [1 VOLUMES] filed by Appellees Bruce Huey, James B. Nutter & Company, Andrea D. Pidala, Al Pitzner and Ronald R. Wolfe & Associates, P.L.. (ECF: Suzanne Hill)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01108993387 Filed: 6/9/2016, Entered: None
            Appellee's Brief filed by Appellees Bruce Huey, James B. Nutter & Company, Andrea D. Pidala, Al Pitzner and Ronald R. Wolfe & Associates, P.L.. (ECF: Suzanne Hill)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01108957808 Filed: 5/11/2016, Entered: None
              Appendix filed [6 VOLUMES - 2 sets] by Party Sherrie Hampton-Muhamed. Service date: 05/09/2016 US mail - Appellant Hampton-Muhamed; email - Attorney for Appellees: Gowen, Hill, Messersmith.--[Edited 05/20/2016 by MM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01108949278 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None
                AMENDED Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Candy L. Messersmith for Appellees Robert Schneider, James B. Nutter & Company, Bruce Huey, Al Pitzner, Ronald R. Wolfe & Associates, P.L., Andrea D. Pidala, James B. Nutter, Jr., Keith Ward, Amanda Croteau, Ivan Ivanov, Sabrina Moravecy, Francis Hannon, John Phillips, Luis Ugaz, Rhonda Lewis, Brian Hummel, Matthew Wolf, Matthew Marks, Julie Anthousis, Katherine Tilka, Victoria Jones and Ronald R. Wolfe. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). (ECF: Candy Messersmith)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01108948693 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None
                  APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Candy L. Messersmith for Appellees (ECF: Candy Messersmith)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01108924075 Filed: 4/29/2016, Entered: None
                    Public Communication: The "Appellant's Unopposed Motion to Amend Appeal Brief," construed as a motion for extension of time to file an amended appellant brief and extension of time to file the appellees' brief, is returned unfiled.
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank 01108914428 Filed: 4/22/2016, Entered: None
                      Appellant's brief filed by Sherrie Hampton-Muhamed. Service date: 04/18/2016 [15-15594] Attorney for Appellee: Gowen - US mail; Attorney for Appellee: Hill - email.
                        LREF
                        Blank 01108913290 Filed: 4/22/2016, Entered: None
                        Over the phone extension granted by clerk. Appendix due on 05/09/2016.
                          LREF
                          Blank 01108838513 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: None
                          Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Suzanne Barto Hill for Appellees James B. Nutter & Company, Bruce Huey, Al Pitzner, Ronald R. Wolfe & Associates, P.L. and Andrea D. Pidala. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). (ECF: Suzanne Hill)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01108836276 Filed: 3/4/2016, Entered: None
                            ORDER: The motion for extension of time to file the appellant's brief is GRANTED. The brief is due April 18, 2016, with the appellant's appendix due no later than seven days from the filing date of the appellant's brief. [7708567-2] (JEC)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01108823494 Filed: 2/25/2016, Entered: None
                              MOTION for extension of time to file appellant's brief filed by Appellant Sherrie Hampton-Muhamed. Motion is Unopposed. [7708567-1]
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01108823477 Filed: 2/25/2016, Entered: None
                                Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Sherrie Hampton-Muhamed.
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01108775646 Filed: 1/22/2016, Entered: None
                                  Briefing Notice issued to Appellant Sherrie Hampton-Muhamed. The appellants brief is due on or before 03/02/2016. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief.
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01108774160 Filed: 1/14/2016, Entered: None
                                    Appellate fee was paid on 01/14/2016 as to Appellant Sherrie Hampton-Muhamed.
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Blank 01108751331 Filed: 1/5/2016, Entered: None
                                      APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Suzanne Barto Hill for James B. Nutter & Company, Bruce Huey, Al Pitzner, Ronald R. Wolfe & Associates, P.L. and Andrea D. Pidala. (ECF: Suzanne Hill)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01108736099 Filed: 12/17/2015, Entered: None
                                        CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Sherrie Hampton-Muhamed on 12/16/2015. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. Awaiting Appellant's CIP Due on 01/11/2016 as to Appellant Sherrie Hampton-Muhamed
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 193 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?