Md Beauty Inc v. Mehran David Kohanbash
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. BC329058

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Kohan David, Defendant/Respondent's AKA
No Logo Kohanbash David, Defendant/Respondent's AKA
No Logo Kohanbash Mehran, Defendant/Respondent's AKA
No Logo Kohanbash Mehran David, Defendant/Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Taillieu Olivier A.
No Logo Md Beauty, Inc., Plaintiff/Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by fitzgeraldknaier.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth M Fitzgerald +1 619 241 4810 +1 619 955 5318 kfitzgerald@fitzgeraldknaier.com
Type Breach Contrct/Warnty (Sellr Pltf) (General Jurisdiction)
Status Dismissed - Other 12/08/2005
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 20 Filed: 12/8/2005, Entered: 12/8/2005 Request For Dismissal
with prejudice, complaint (entire action
    Blank 19 Filed: 7/18/2005, Entered: 7/18/2005 Notice of Continuance
      Blank 18 Filed: 7/6/2005, Entered: 7/6/2005 Opposition Document
      Notice of Opposition to RTAO J Pharm, Inc. dba Jaye Pharmacy
        Blank 17 Filed: 6/27/2005, Entered: 6/27/2005 Stipulation and Order
        TO EXTEND HEARING TIME ON MD BEAUTY'S APPLICATION FOR A RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER AND WRIT OF ATTACHMENT
          Blank 16 Filed: 6/8/2005, Entered: 6/8/2005 Memorandum - Other
          of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff MD Beauty, Inc.'s Application for: (1)Right to Attach Order and (II)writ of Attachment Against J PHARM INC.
            Blank 15 Filed: 6/8/2005, Entered: 6/8/2005 Declaration
            of David Brenner in Support of Plaintiff MD Beauty, Inc.'s Application for: (1) Right to Attach Order and (II) writ of Attachment Against J PHARM INC.
              Blank 14 Filed: 6/8/2005, Entered: 6/8/2005 Appl/Ntc for Rt to Attach & Order
              notice;
                Blank 13 Filed: 6/8/2005, Entered: 6/8/2005 Appl/Ntc for Rt to Attach & Order
                J Pharm Inc. a Delaware corporation
                  Blank 12 Filed: 5/17/2005, Entered: 5/17/2005 Answer To First Amended Complaint
                    Blank 11 Filed: 5/17/2005, Entered: 5/17/2005 Demand For Jury Trial
                      Blank 10 Filed: 5/13/2005, Entered: 5/13/2005 Opposition Document
                      Notice of Opposition to RTAO Mehrah David Kohanbash
                        Blank 9 Filed: 5/4/2005, Entered: 5/4/2005 miscellaneous other
                        RETURN OF ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND PROOFS OF SERVICE THEREOF
                          Blank 8 Filed: 4/25/2005, Entered: 4/25/2005 Notice of Application
                          Hearing for Right to Attach Order
                            Blank 7 Filed: 4/25/2005, Entered: 4/25/2005 Declaration
                            David Brenner
                              Blank 6 Filed: 4/25/2005, Entered: 4/25/2005 Appl for Attach/Temp Protect Order
                              Mehran David Kohanbash
                                Blank 5 Filed: 4/18/2005, Entered: 4/18/2005 First Amended Complaint
                                  Blank 4 Filed: 4/4/2005, Entered: 4/4/2005 Statement-Case Management
                                    Blank 3 Filed: 3/29/2005, Entered: 3/29/2005 Proof of Service
                                      Blank 2 Filed: 2/25/2005, Entered: 2/25/2005 Notice-Case Management Conference
                                        Blank 1 Filed: 2/18/2005, Entered: 2/18/2005 Complaint

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 981 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?