Dukes Incorporated et al v. Timothy Weaver et al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. BC344648

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Aviation Manufacturing & Design, Plaintiff/Petitioner
No Logo Ccc & B Llc, Plaintiff/Petitioner
No Logo Dukes, Inc., Plaintiff/Petitioner
Officially listed as "Dukes Incorporated"
No Logo Dukes Research And Manufacturing Inc., Plaintiff/Petitioner
No Logo Von Lanken Craig, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Von Lanken Lacey, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Weaver Mary Jane, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Weaver, Timothy, Defendant/Respondent
Type Fraud (no contract) (General Jurisdiction)
Status Dismissed - Other 07/26/2007
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 13 Filed: 7/26/2007, Entered: 7/26/2007 Request and Entry of Dismissal
Without prejudice as to entire action of all parties and all causes of action. Court shall re- tain jurisdiction to enforce settlement only
    Blank 12 Filed: 4/30/2007, Entered: 4/30/2007 Stipulation and Order
    to continue order to Show Cause Re Dismissal
      Blank 11 Filed: 11/8/2006, Entered: 11/8/2006 Notice
      OF OSC RE: DISMISSAL
        Blank 10 Filed: 10/19/2006, Entered: 10/19/2006 Notice
        OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT
          Blank 9 Filed: 6/19/2006, Entered: 6/19/2006 Notice
          OF ADR COMPLETION REVIEW STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL SETTING
            Blank 8 Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: 6/16/2006 miscellaneous other
            JOINT ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION STATEMENT
              Blank 7 Filed: 4/21/2006, Entered: 4/21/2006 Answer
              BY DEFTS: TIMOTHY WEAVER, MARY JANE WEAVER, LACEY VON LANKEN AND CRAIG VON LANKEN.
                Blank 6 Filed: 4/3/2006, Entered: 4/3/2006 Statement-Case Management
                FILED BY: Jeffrey S. Wruble
                  Blank 5 Filed: 3/30/2006, Entered: 3/30/2006 Statement-Case Management
                    Blank 4 Filed: 1/30/2006, Entered: 1/30/2006 Declaration Of Diligence
                    SUMMONS & COMPLAINT
                      Blank 3 Filed: 1/30/2006, Entered: 1/30/2006 Proof of Service
                      SUMMONS & COMPLAINT
                        Blank 2 Filed: 12/19/2005, Entered: 12/19/2005 Notice-Case Management Conference
                          Blank 1 Filed: 12/15/2005, Entered: 12/15/2005 Complaint

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 58 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?