David Koch v. Ubiquity Systems et al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. BC347386

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Brown, Beverly, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Ubiquity Systems, Defendant/Respondent
Koch, David Koch, David, Plaintiff/Petitioner
No Logo Mishkind Ira L., Mediator
Type Quiet Title (General Jurisdiction)
Status Dismissed - Other 11/21/2006
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 20 Filed: 11/21/2006, Entered: 11/21/2006 Request and Entry of Dismissal
WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION
    Blank 19 Filed: 10/24/2006, Entered: 10/24/2006 Notice
    OF DISCHARGE OF OSC RE SANCTIONS
      Blank 18 Filed: 10/19/2006, Entered: 10/19/2006 Notice-Settlement
        Blank 17 Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: 8/31/2006 miscellaneous other
        joint post-mediation report
          Blank 16 Filed: 8/16/2006, Entered: 8/16/2006 Statement-Non-Agreement
          FIRST SANA FILED THIS DATE
            Blank 15 Filed: 6/15/2006, Entered: 6/15/2006 Notice-Mediation Hrg Date
              Blank 14 Filed: 6/9/2006, Entered: 6/9/2006 Notice
              of entry of case management order
                Blank 13 Filed: 6/1/2006, Entered: 6/1/2006 Notice-Assignment-Mediator
                  Blank 12 Filed: 5/25/2006, Entered: 5/25/2006 Order
                  TRIAL PREPARATION
                    Blank 11 Filed: 5/25/2006, Entered: 5/25/2006 Order: Case Management
                      Blank 10 Filed: 5/8/2006, Entered: 5/8/2006 Statement-Case Management
                        Blank 9 Filed: 5/8/2006, Entered: 5/8/2006 Answer To Cross-complaint
                          Blank 8 Filed: 3/28/2006, Entered: 3/28/2006 Cross Complaint
                          VERIFIED CROSS-COMPLAINT
                            Blank 7 Filed: 3/28/2006, Entered: 3/28/2006 Answer
                            VERIFIED ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
                              Blank 6 Filed: 3/9/2006, Entered: 3/9/2006 Proof of Service
                              re: defendant Beverly Brown, an individual
                                Blank 5 Filed: 3/9/2006, Entered: 3/9/2006 Declaration Of Diligence
                                  Blank 4 Filed: 3/9/2006, Entered: 3/9/2006 Proof of Service
                                  re: defendant Ubiquity Systems, a California Corporation
                                    Blank 3 Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: 2/28/2006 Notice-Case Management Conference
                                      Blank 2 Filed: 2/15/2006, Entered: 2/15/2006 Notice-Case Management Conference
                                        Blank 1 Filed: 2/14/2006, Entered: 2/14/2006 Complaint

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 29 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?