Victoria Vogel et al v. C Casey Bennett et al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. BC352438

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

HDNet, LLC HDNet, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Akimbo Sytems Inc., Defendant/Respondent

Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Amazon.com, Inc. Amazon.com, Inc., Defendant/Respondent
Officer/Director, Drugstore.com, Inc.
Officer/Director, Audible, Inc.

Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

No Logo Axn Network Inc., Defendant/Respondent

Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

No Logo Bender Media Services Inc., Defendant/Respondent

Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

No Logo Bennett C. Casey, Defendant/Respondent

Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

No Logo Bennett Media Worldwide Llc, Defendant/Respondent

Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

No Logo Bennett Productions Inc., Defendant/Respondent

Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

No Logo Cinemanow, Inc., Defendant/Respondent

Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

No Logo Customflix Labs, Inc., Defendant/Respondent

Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

No Logo Goldpocket Wireless Inc., Defendant/Respondent

Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Google, Inc. Google, Inc., Defendant/Respondent

Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

No Logo Guba, Inc., Defendant/Respondent

Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

No Logo Hdnt Llc, Defendant/Respondent

Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

No Logo Ktla Inc., Defendant/Respondent

Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Microsoft Corporation Microsoft Corporation, Defendant/Respondent
Officer/Director, Greenfield Online Inc.
Officer/Director, Crisp Acquisition Corp
Officer/Director, Devry Inc.
Facebook, Inc. Officer/Director, Facebook, Inc.
Officer/Director, Visiocorp
Officer/Director, Immersion Corp
Officer/Director, Avanade Inc.

Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

T-Mobile USA, Inc. T-Mobile USA, Inc., Defendant/Respondent
Officially listed as "T-mobile Usa"

Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

No Logo Veoh Networks, Inc., Defendant/Respondent

Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

No Logo Bikini Destinations, Plaintiff/Petitioner's DBA
No Logo Delaware Akimbo Systems Inc., Defendant/Respondent's DBA
No Logo The Bikini Network.com, Plaintiff/Petitioner
No Logo Vogel Victoria, Plaintiff/Petitioner
Type Othr Breach Contr/Warr-not Fraud (General Jurisdiction)
Status Dismissed - Other 09/09/2011
  Entries (184) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 184 Filed: 5/22/2013, Entered: 5/22/2013 Remittitur
Remittitur issued on 5/16/13; *s/t D-82 on 5/29/13*
    Blank 183 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: 9/13/2011 Notice
      Blank 182 Filed: 8/11/2011, Entered: 8/11/2011 Satisfaction of Judgment
      ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF FULL
        Blank 181 Filed: 6/14/2011, Entered: 6/14/2011 Notice of Hearing.
          Blank 180 Filed: 6/9/2011, Entered: 6/9/2011 Notice-Settlement
            Blank 179 Filed: 2/16/2011, Entered: 2/16/2011 Judgment*
            DEFT. HDNET
              Blank 178 Filed: 1/13/2011, Entered: 1/13/2011 Notice Of Ruling
                Blank 177 Filed: 1/11/2011, Entered: 1/11/2011 miscellaneous other
                COURT'S TENTATIVE RULING
                  Blank 176 Filed: 1/11/2011, Entered: 1/11/2011 Order
                  GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES FILED BY: LEWIS, BRISBOIS, BISGAARD & SMITH
                    Blank 175 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: 1/7/2011 Exparte Application
                    JOINT TO CONTINUE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DATES
                      Blank 174 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: 1/7/2011 Order
                      GRANTING PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANTS' JOINT EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DATES
                        Blank 173 Filed: 1/4/2011, Entered: 1/4/2011 Reply/Response
                        SUPPLEMENTAL
                          Blank 172 Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: 12/17/2010 Opposition Document
                          SUPPLEMENTAL OPPOOSITION
                            Blank 171 Filed: 12/8/2010, Entered: 12/8/2010 Notice of Continuance
                              Blank 170 Filed: 11/23/2010, Entered: 11/23/2010 Reply/Response
                                Blank 169 Filed: 11/19/2010, Entered: 11/19/2010 Objection Document
                                  Blank 168 Filed: 11/19/2010, Entered: 11/19/2010 Opposition Document
                                    Blank 167 Filed: 11/2/2010, Entered: 11/2/2010 Declaration
                                    OF RAYAN D. HARVEY IN SUPPORT OF DENT. HDNet's MOTION FOR ATTY. FEES;
                                      Blank 166 Filed: 11/2/2010, Entered: 11/2/2010 Notice of Motion
                                      AND MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES PURSUANT TO CAL.CIV.CODE SEC. 3344 (a
                                        Blank 165 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: 10/8/2010 Notice
                                          Blank 164 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: 10/1/2010 Notice
                                          OF ENTRY OF ORDER
                                            Blank 163 Filed: 9/30/2010, Entered: 9/30/2010 Statement-Case Management
                                              Blank 162 Filed: 9/28/2010, Entered: 9/28/2010 Statement-Case Management
                                                Blank 161 Filed: 9/17/2010, Entered: 9/17/2010 Partial Dismissal
                                                w/o Prejudice) (AS TO COMLAINT FILED AGAINST DEFENDANT, HDNET, LLC. ONLY
                                                  Blank 160 Filed: 9/15/2010, Entered: 9/15/2010 Order
                                                  ON BENNETT DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SET TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE OR ALTERNATIVELY TO SET TRIAL
                                                    Blank 159 Filed: 9/13/2010, Entered: 9/13/2010 Notice
                                                    NON-OPPOSITION
                                                      Blank 158 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: 9/1/2010 Exparte Application
                                                      for order to set trial setting cnf, etc.
                                                        Blank 157 Filed: 7/1/2010, Entered: 7/1/2010 Proof of Service
                                                          Blank 156 Filed: 6/28/2010, Entered: 6/28/2010 Exhibit
                                                          IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                            Blank 155 Filed: 6/28/2010, Entered: 6/28/2010 Statement of Facts
                                                            UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS
                                                              Blank 154 Filed: 6/28/2010, Entered: 6/28/2010 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                Blank 153 Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: 4/20/2010 Abstract of Judgment
                                                                ISSUED-MAILED OUT-AB;
                                                                  Blank 152 Filed: 1/29/2010, Entered: 1/29/2010 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                  NTC OF CHANGE OF MAILING ADDRESS OF THE AVANZADO LAW FIRM
                                                                    Blank 151 Filed: 1/27/2010, Entered: 1/27/2010 Notice
                                                                    OF ENTRY OF COURT ORDER
                                                                      Blank 150 Filed: 1/21/2010, Entered: 1/21/2010 Order
                                                                      GRANTING PLAINTIFF AND APPELLANT VICTORIA VOGEL COSTS INCURRED ON APPEAL
                                                                        Blank 149 Filed: 12/24/2009, Entered: 12/24/2009 Notice Of Ruling
                                                                          Blank 148 Filed: 12/22/2009, Entered: 12/22/2009 Notice
                                                                          OF WITHDRAWL OF MOTION
                                                                            Blank 147 Filed: 12/15/2009, Entered: 12/15/2009 Reply/Response
                                                                              Blank 146 Filed: 12/8/2009, Entered: 12/8/2009 Opposition Document
                                                                                Blank 145 Filed: 11/6/2009, Entered: 11/6/2009 Motion
                                                                                TO DETERMINE PREVAILING PARTY ON APPEAL
                                                                                  Blank 144 Filed: 11/6/2009, Entered: 11/6/2009 Request For Judicial Notice
                                                                                    Blank 143 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: 10/9/2009 Memo of Costs on Appeal
                                                                                    $2,682.09 COSTS ENTERED 11/2/09 MEMO TO SCAN UNIT 11/2/09 NO COURT FILE
                                                                                      Blank 142 Filed: 10/8/2009, Entered: 10/8/2009 Remittitur
                                                                                      REVERSED REMITTITUR ISSUED ON 10-1-09 S/T D-85 10-13-09
                                                                                        Blank 141 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: 10/24/2008 Order To Appear For Examination
                                                                                        As to 3rd Party Tracey Scott
                                                                                          Blank 140 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: 10/24/2008 Writ Issued
                                                                                          Los Angeles County.
                                                                                            Blank 139 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: 10/24/2008 Association Of Attorney
                                                                                              Blank 138 Filed: 10/8/2008, Entered: 10/8/2008 Order
                                                                                              FOR DELIVERY PROPERTY AFTER EXAMINATION
                                                                                                Blank 137 Filed: 9/30/2008, Entered: 9/30/2008 Opposition Document
                                                                                                  Blank 136 Filed: 9/19/2008, Entered: 9/19/2008 Proof of Service
                                                                                                  RE: VICTORIA VOGEL
                                                                                                    Blank 135 Filed: 8/29/2008, Entered: 8/29/2008 Order To Appear For Examination
                                                                                                      Blank 134 Filed: 6/16/2008, Entered: 6/16/2008 Ntc to Prty re fee Clk's Transcpt
                                                                                                        Blank 133 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: 5/29/2008 Ntc to Reptr/Mon to Prep Transcrpt
                                                                                                          Blank 132 Filed: 5/21/2008, Entered: 5/21/2008 Notice
                                                                                                          OF ENTRY OF AMENDED AND MODIFIED JUDGMENT
                                                                                                            Blank 131 Filed: 5/14/2008, Entered: 5/14/2008 Judgment*
                                                                                                            AMENDED AND MOODIFIED JUDGMENT UPON ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS
                                                                                                              Blank 130 Filed: 5/13/2008, Entered: 5/13/2008 Notice of Lodging
                                                                                                                Blank 129 Filed: 5/7/2008, Entered: 5/7/2008 Notice Of Ruling
                                                                                                                  Blank 128 Filed: 5/6/2008, Entered: 5/6/2008 Stipulation
                                                                                                                  TO CONTINUTE HEARING DATE FOR DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS
                                                                                                                    Blank 127 Filed: 4/30/2008, Entered: 4/30/2008 Reply/Response
                                                                                                                      Blank 126 Filed: 4/24/2008, Entered: 4/24/2008 Opposition Document
                                                                                                                        Blank 125 Filed: 4/24/2008, Entered: 4/24/2008 Objection Document
                                                                                                                          Blank 124 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: 4/23/2008 Notice of Designation of Record
                                                                                                                            Blank 123 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: 4/23/2008 Designation of Record on Appeal
                                                                                                                              Blank 122 Filed: 4/18/2008, Entered: 4/18/2008 Designation of Record on Appeal
                                                                                                                                Blank 121 Filed: 4/11/2008, Entered: 4/11/2008 Declaration
                                                                                                                                  Blank 120 Filed: 4/11/2008, Entered: 4/11/2008 Motion
                                                                                                                                  FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES
                                                                                                                                    Blank 119 Filed: 4/9/2008, Entered: 4/9/2008 Ntc to Atty re Notice of Appeal
                                                                                                                                      Blank 118 Filed: 4/8/2008, Entered: 4/8/2008 Notice of Appeal
                                                                                                                                        Blank 117 Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: 2/13/2008 Notice of Entry of Judgment
                                                                                                                                          Blank 116 Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: 1/30/2008 Judgment*
                                                                                                                                            Blank 115 Filed: 1/25/2008, Entered: 1/25/2008 Notice Of Ruling
                                                                                                                                            ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECON- SIDERATION & OTHER MATTERS AT THE HEARING THEREON
                                                                                                                                              Blank 114 Filed: 1/25/2008, Entered: 1/25/2008 Statement Of Decision
                                                                                                                                              RULING ON MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION HEARD 1/25/08
                                                                                                                                                Blank 113 Filed: 1/17/2008, Entered: 1/17/2008 Reply/Response
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 112 Filed: 1/11/2008, Entered: 1/11/2008 Opposition Document
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 111 Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: 1/4/2008 Notice
                                                                                                                                                    of court's order granting pltf ex parte application
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 110 Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: 1/4/2008 Request For Judicial Notice
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 109 Filed: 1/3/2008, Entered: 1/3/2008 Exparte Application
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 108 Filed: 1/3/2008, Entered: 1/3/2008 Opposition Document
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 107 Filed: 12/31/2007, Entered: 12/31/2007 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 106 Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: 12/19/2007 Notice of Lodging
                                                                                                                                                              OF PROPOSED JUDGMENT
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 105 Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: 12/13/2007 miscellaneous other
                                                                                                                                                                COMPENDIUM OF NON CALIFORNIA AUTHORITIES
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 104 Filed: 12/12/2007, Entered: 12/12/2007 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 103 Filed: 12/3/2007, Entered: 12/3/2007 Order
                                                                                                                                                                    tentative ruling adopted as final ruling of court
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 102 Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: 11/28/2007 Objection Document
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 101 Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: 11/28/2007 Reply/Response
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 100 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: 11/19/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                          OF VICTORIA VOGEL
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 99 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: 11/19/2007 miscellaneous other
                                                                                                                                                                            SEPARATE STATEMENT
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 98 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: 11/19/2007 Request For Judicial Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 97 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: 11/19/2007 Opposition Document
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 96 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: 11/19/2007 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 95 Filed: 10/19/2007, Entered: 10/19/2007 Exparte Application
                                                                                                                                                                                    to excuse certain unnecessary defts from obligation to appear at scheduled msc
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 94 Filed: 10/17/2007, Entered: 10/17/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                      OF PAUL A KROEGER
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 93 Filed: 10/17/2007, Entered: 10/17/2007 Application-Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                        TO FILE CERTAIN DOCS UNDER SEAL
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 92 Filed: 10/17/2007, Entered: 10/17/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                          OF SYD BIRENBAUM
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 91 Filed: 10/17/2007, Entered: 10/17/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                            OF PETER SZATMARI
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 90 Filed: 10/17/2007, Entered: 10/17/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                              OF C. CASEY BENNETT
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 89 Filed: 10/17/2007, Entered: 10/17/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                OF ROBERT THOELE
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 88 Filed: 10/17/2007, Entered: 10/17/2007 Statement of Facts
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 87 Filed: 10/17/2007, Entered: 10/17/2007 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 86 Filed: 10/17/2007, Entered: 10/17/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                      OF GRACELYN BROWN
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 85 Filed: 10/3/2007, Entered: 10/3/2007 Notice Of Ruling
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 84 Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: 9/25/2007 Reply/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                          TO OPPOSITION
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 83 Filed: 9/19/2007, Entered: 9/19/2007 Opposition Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 82 Filed: 9/5/2007, Entered: 9/5/2007 Notice of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                              FOR COURT TO ORDER MATTER TO NON-BINDING ARBITRATION
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 81 Filed: 7/25/2007, Entered: 7/25/2007 miscellaneous other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                joint post-mediation status con- ference report;
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 80 Filed: 7/23/2007, Entered: 7/23/2007 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OF DEFENDANTS C. CASEY BENNETT, BENNETT PRODUCTIONS, INC., BENNETT MEDIA WORLDWIDE, GUBA, INC., HDNET LLC, KTLA, INC. AND VEOH NETWORKS INC. TO FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT OF VICTORIA VOGEL
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 79 Filed: 7/11/2007, Entered: 7/11/2007 Partial Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    with Prejudice) (COMPLAINT AS TO GOLDPOCKET WIRELESS INC ONLY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 78 Filed: 7/11/2007, Entered: 7/11/2007 Partial Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      with Prejudice) (COMPLAINT AGAINST DEFENDANT T-MOBILE USA INC ONLY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 77 Filed: 7/11/2007, Entered: 7/11/2007 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        tentative ruling adopted as final ruling of the Court
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 76 Filed: 7/11/2007, Entered: 7/11/2007 Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          and joint mo for providing for payment of costs and fees, etc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 75 Filed: 7/3/2007, Entered: 7/3/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            OF MELVIN AVANZADO
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 74 Filed: 7/3/2007, Entered: 7/3/2007 Reply/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 73 Filed: 6/27/2007, Entered: 6/27/2007 Opposition Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TO DEMURRER
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 72 Filed: 6/27/2007, Entered: 6/27/2007 Opposition Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TO REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 71 Filed: 6/27/2007, Entered: 6/27/2007 miscellaneous other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPENDIUM OF NON CALIFORNIA AUTHORITIES
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 70 Filed: 6/18/2007, Entered: 6/18/2007 Request For Judicial Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 69 Filed: 6/18/2007, Entered: 6/18/2007 Demurrer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 68 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: 5/29/2007 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          FOURTH
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 67 Filed: 5/16/2007, Entered: 5/16/2007 Statement-Case Management
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 66 Filed: 5/15/2007, Entered: 5/15/2007 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RE COURTS ORDER
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 65 Filed: 5/15/2007, Entered: 5/15/2007 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TENTATIVE RULING ADOPTED AS FINAL RULING OF COURT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 64 Filed: 5/8/2007, Entered: 5/8/2007 Reply/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 63 Filed: 5/8/2007, Entered: 5/8/2007 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    OF FURTHER CMC
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 62 Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: 5/7/2007 Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RE EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFTS TO RESPOND TO 3RD AMD COMP
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 61 Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: 5/7/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OF ALAN W. FORSLEY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 60 Filed: 5/4/2007, Entered: 5/4/2007 Demurrer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 59 Filed: 5/3/2007, Entered: 5/3/2007 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            OF FURTHER CMC
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 58 Filed: 5/3/2007, Entered: 5/3/2007 Exparte Application
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TO VACATE TRIAL AND CASE RELATED DATES
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 57 Filed: 5/3/2007, Entered: 5/3/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OF PAUL A. KROEGER
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 56 Filed: 5/2/2007, Entered: 5/2/2007 Opposition Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TO DEMURRER TO PLTF THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 55 Filed: 5/2/2007, Entered: 5/2/2007 Opposition Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TO DEMURRER TO THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 54 Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: 4/27/2007 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 53 Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: 4/27/2007 Objection Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TO EXISTING DEADLINES AND DATES IN THIS ACTION
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 52 Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: 4/27/2007 miscellaneous other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPENDIX OF NON-CALIFORNIA AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 51 Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: 4/27/2007 Request For Judicial Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 50 Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: 4/27/2007 Demurrer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AND NOTICE OF TO THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 49 Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: 4/27/2007 Answer To Third Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 48 Filed: 4/25/2007, Entered: 4/25/2007 Proof-Service/Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SECOND AMENDED
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 47 Filed: 4/12/2007, Entered: 4/12/2007 miscellaneous other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPENDIUM OF NON-CALIFORNIA AUTHORITIES
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 46 Filed: 4/12/2007, Entered: 4/12/2007 Request For Judicial Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 45 Filed: 4/12/2007, Entered: 4/12/2007 Answer To Third Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 44 Filed: 4/12/2007, Entered: 4/12/2007 Demurrer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TO THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 43 Filed: 4/9/2007, Entered: 4/9/2007 Partial Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            w/o Prejudice) (ONLY AS TO DEFENDANT GOOGLE, INC.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 42 Filed: 3/27/2007, Entered: 3/27/2007 Proof-Service/Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SECOND AMENDED
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 41 Filed: 3/14/2007, Entered: 3/14/2007 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OF AVAILABILITY OF DISCOVERY AND 2) TRIAL RELATED DATES AND DEADLINES
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 40 Filed: 3/8/2007, Entered: 3/8/2007 Third Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 39 Filed: 3/8/2007, Entered: 3/8/2007 Summons Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 38 Filed: 3/6/2007, Entered: 3/6/2007 Notice Of Ruling
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 37 Filed: 3/5/2007, Entered: 3/5/2007 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TENTATIVE RULING ADOPTED AS FINAL RULING OF COURT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 36 Filed: 2/26/2007, Entered: 2/26/2007 Reply/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 35 Filed: 2/26/2007, Entered: 2/26/2007 Objection Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            EVIDENTIARY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 34 Filed: 2/23/2007, Entered: 2/23/2007 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 33 Filed: 2/20/2007, Entered: 2/20/2007 Opposition Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TO MOTION TO VACATE
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 32 Filed: 2/20/2007, Entered: 2/20/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OF MELVIN N.A. AVANZADO
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 31 Filed: 2/20/2007, Entered: 2/20/2007 Opposition Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TO MOTION TO STRIKE
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 30 Filed: 2/16/2007, Entered: 2/16/2007 Reply/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 29 Filed: 2/8/2007, Entered: 2/8/2007 Notice of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TO VACATE PORTION OF CMC ORDER
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 28 Filed: 2/6/2007, Entered: 2/6/2007 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DOE AMENDMENTS
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 27 Filed: 2/6/2007, Entered: 2/6/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            OF MELVIN N.A. AVANZADO
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 26 Filed: 1/29/2007, Entered: 1/29/2007 Ntc and Acknowledgement of Receipt
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 25 Filed: 1/25/2007, Entered: 1/25/2007 Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                stipulated protective order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 24 Filed: 1/18/2007, Entered: 1/18/2007 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 23 Filed: 1/9/2007, Entered: 1/9/2007 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Stipulated Protective Order-- ---DENIED---
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 22 Filed: 12/22/2006, Entered: 12/22/2006 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 21 Filed: 12/13/2006, Entered: 12/13/2006 Answer To Second Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 20 Filed: 11/8/2006, Entered: 11/8/2006 Summons Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 19 Filed: 11/8/2006, Entered: 11/8/2006 Second Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            FOR (1) COMMON LAW MISAPPROPIATION OF NAME AND LIKENESS; (2) VIOLATIO N OF CIVIL CODE SECTION 3344; AND (3) UNFAIR COMPETITION
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 18 Filed: 10/19/2006, Entered: 10/19/2006 Reply/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 17 Filed: 10/16/2006, Entered: 10/16/2006 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ON OPPOSING COUNSEL BY OVERNIGHT MAIL OF THE OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 16 Filed: 10/13/2006, Entered: 10/13/2006 Opposition Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TO DEMURRER TO PLANTIFF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 15 Filed: 9/20/2006, Entered: 9/20/2006 Notice of trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RELATED DATES
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 14 Filed: 9/20/2006, Entered: 9/20/2006 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 13 Filed: 9/20/2006, Entered: 9/20/2006 Notice of trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 12 Filed: 9/18/2006, Entered: 9/18/2006 Request For Judicial Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 11 Filed: 9/18/2006, Entered: 9/18/2006 Demurrer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 10 Filed: 8/25/2006, Entered: 8/25/2006 Statement-Case Management
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 9 Filed: 8/14/2006, Entered: 8/14/2006 Statement-Case Management
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                FILED
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 8/14/2006, Entered: 8/14/2006 First Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 8/9/2006, Entered: 8/9/2006 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    OF NON-OPPOSITION AND FURTHER REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT; DECLARATION;
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 7/20/2006, Entered: 7/20/2006 Demurrer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 5 Filed: 7/20/2006, Entered: 7/20/2006 Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DEFENDANTS' REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 6/5/2006, Entered: 6/5/2006 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          of notice of case management conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 5/24/2006, Entered: 5/24/2006 Notice-Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 5/19/2006, Entered: 5/19/2006 Summons Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 5/15/2006, Entered: 5/15/2006 Complaint

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space Space

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 82 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?