Conway Ho v. Capcom Co Llc et al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. BC358289

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Capcom Co. Llc, Defendant/Respondent

Represented by Fenwick & West LLP

No Logo Capcom Entertainment, Inc., Defendant/Respondent

Represented by Fenwick & West LLP

No Logo Capcom U.s.a., Inc., Defendant/Respondent

Represented by Fenwick & West LLP

No Logo Hanaho Games Inc., Cross-Defendant
No Logo Ho Conway, Plaintiff/Petitioner

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Serota Todd B.
Type Othr Breach Contr/Warr-not Fraud (General Jurisdiction)
Status Other Judgment 01/10/2008
  Entries (140) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 140 Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: 2/13/2008 Request and Entry of Dismissal
    Request RequestSpace
    Blank 139 Filed: 12/17/2007, Entered: 12/17/2007 Points and Authorities
    IN OPP TO MTN
      Request RequestSpace
      Blank 138 Filed: 12/17/2007, Entered: 12/17/2007 Opposition Document
      TO DEMURRER
        Request RequestSpace
        Blank 137 Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: 12/13/2007 Ex-parte Request for Order
        EX PARTE APP TO CONTINUE HEARING ON DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE
          Request RequestSpace
          Blank 136 Filed: 12/6/2007, Entered: 12/6/2007 Notice of Motion
          FOR MORE SPECIFIC STMT PURSUANT TO CAL CODE CIV PRO 437 c(g
            Request RequestSpace
            Blank 135 Filed: 12/6/2007, Entered: 12/6/2007 Demurrer
            AND MOTION TO STRIKE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT;
              Request RequestSpace
              Blank 134 Filed: 12/6/2007, Entered: 12/6/2007 Proof of Service
                Request RequestSpace
                Blank 133 Filed: 12/6/2007, Entered: 12/6/2007 Request For Judicial Notice
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Blank 132 Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: 11/30/2007 Reply/Response
                  MEMO IN SUPPORT OF MTN TO SEVER AND BIFURCATE ISSUES FOR TRIAL
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Blank 131 Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: 11/30/2007 Proof of Service
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Blank 130 Filed: 11/29/2007, Entered: 11/29/2007 Reply/Response
                      reply memo in support of deft's motion in limine to exclude speculative damages evidence
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Blank 129 Filed: 11/29/2007, Entered: 11/29/2007 Proof of Service
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Blank 128 Filed: 11/27/2007, Entered: 11/27/2007 Points and Authorities
                          IN OPP TO MTN IN LIMINE
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Blank 127 Filed: 11/27/2007, Entered: 11/27/2007 Amended Complaint
                            THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT SEEKING DAMAGES
                              Request RequestSpace
                              Blank 126 Filed: 11/27/2007, Entered: 11/27/2007 Order
                                Request RequestSpace
                                Blank 125 Filed: 11/26/2007, Entered: 11/26/2007 Reply/Response
                                IN SUPPORT OF MTN IN LIMINE FOR PRECLUSION OF EVIDENCE
                                  Request RequestSpace
                                  Blank 124 Filed: 11/26/2007, Entered: 11/26/2007 Proof of Service
                                    Request RequestSpace
                                    Blank 123 Filed: 11/26/2007, Entered: 11/26/2007 Declaration
                                    OF MARY E. MILIONIS IN SUPPORT OF MTN IN LIMINE FOR PRECLUSION OF EVIDENCE
                                      Request RequestSpace
                                      Blank 122 Filed: 11/21/2007, Entered: 11/21/2007 Proof of Service
                                        Request RequestSpace
                                        Blank 121 Filed: 11/21/2007, Entered: 11/21/2007 Points and Authorities
                                        IN OPP TO MTN IN LIMINE RE DAMAGES
                                          Request RequestSpace
                                          Blank 120 Filed: 11/21/2007, Entered: 11/21/2007 Points and Authorities
                                          PLF CONWAY HO'S MEMO OF P&A'S
                                            Request RequestSpace
                                            Blank 119 Filed: 11/21/2007, Entered: 11/21/2007 Notice
                                            OF WITHDRAWAL OF NOTICE OF NON-OPP TO MTN IN LIMINE
                                              Request RequestSpace
                                              Blank 118 Filed: 11/21/2007, Entered: 11/21/2007 Opposition Document
                                              TO MTN TO SEVER AND BIFURCATE ISSUES FOR TRIAL
                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                Blank 117 Filed: 11/21/2007, Entered: 11/21/2007 Proof of Service
                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                  Blank 116 Filed: 11/21/2007, Entered: 11/21/2007 Declaration
                                                  AND EXHIBITS IN OPP TO MTN IN LIMINE RE DAMAGES
                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                    Blank 115 Filed: 11/20/2007, Entered: 11/20/2007 Proof of Service
                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                      Blank 114 Filed: 11/20/2007, Entered: 11/20/2007 Notice
                                                      OF NON-OPP TO MTN IN LIMINE FOR PRECLUSION OF EVIDENCE
                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                        Blank 113 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: 11/19/2007 Proof of Service
                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                          Blank 112 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: 11/19/2007 Reply/Response
                                                          IN SUPPORT OF MTN TO COMPEL
                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                            Blank 111 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: 11/19/2007 Declaration
                                                            OF ALBERT L. SIEBER IN SUPPORT OF REPLY TO OPP TO MTN TO COMPEL
                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                              Blank 110 Filed: 11/14/2007, Entered: 11/14/2007 Objection Document
                                                              TO EVIDENCE SUBMITTED IN OPP TO MSA
                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                Blank 109 Filed: 11/14/2007, Entered: 11/14/2007 Reply/Response
                                                                SEP STMT IN SUPPORT OF MSA
                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                  Blank 108 Filed: 11/14/2007, Entered: 11/14/2007 Supplemental Declaration
                                                                  OF JENNIFER L. KELLY IN SUPPORT OF MSA
                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                    Blank 107 Filed: 11/14/2007, Entered: 11/14/2007 Reply/Response
                                                                    MEMO IN SUPPORT OF MSA
                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                      Blank 106 Filed: 11/14/2007, Entered: 11/14/2007 Opposition Document
                                                                      TO MTN TO COMPEL
                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                        Blank 105 Filed: 11/14/2007, Entered: 11/14/2007 Proof of Service
                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                          Blank 104 Filed: 11/14/2007, Entered: 11/14/2007 Declaration
                                                                          OF TODD B. SEROTA, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF OPP TO MTN TO COMPEL
                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                            Blank 103 Filed: 11/14/2007, Entered: 11/14/2007 Proof of Service
                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                              Blank 102 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007 Reply/Response
                                                                              BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MTN FOR LEAVE TO FILE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT;
                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                Blank 101 Filed: 11/9/2007, Entered: 11/9/2007 Motion
                                                                                to sever and bifurcate issues for trial;
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                  Blank 100 Filed: 11/9/2007, Entered: 11/9/2007 Proof of Service
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                    Blank 99 Filed: 11/9/2007, Entered: 11/9/2007 Motion in Limine
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                      Blank 98 Filed: 11/9/2007, Entered: 11/9/2007 Declaration
                                                                                      OF JENNIFER L. KELLY IN SUPPORT OF MTN TO SEVER AND MTN IN LIMINE
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                        Blank 97 Filed: 11/6/2007, Entered: 11/6/2007 Ex-parte Request for Order
                                                                                        EX PARTE APP FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                          Blank 96 Filed: 11/6/2007, Entered: 11/6/2007 Opposition Document
                                                                                          TO MTN FOR LEAVE
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                            Blank 95 Filed: 11/6/2007, Entered: 11/6/2007 Proof of Service
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                              Blank 94 Filed: 11/6/2007, Entered: 11/6/2007 Declaration
                                                                                              OF JENNIFER L. KELLY IN SUPPORT OF OPP TO MTN FOR LEAVE
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                Blank 93 Filed: 11/6/2007, Entered: 11/6/2007 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                  Blank 92 Filed: 11/6/2007, Entered: 11/6/2007 Points and Authorities
                                                                                                  IN SUPPORT OF MTN IN LIMINE
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                    Blank 91 Filed: 11/6/2007, Entered: 11/6/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                    OF RODGER R. COLE IN SUPPORT OF MTN IN LIMINE
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                      Blank 90 Filed: 10/31/2007, Entered: 10/31/2007 Proof of Service
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                        Blank 89 Filed: 10/31/2007, Entered: 10/31/2007 miscellaneous other
                                                                                                        SEP STMT RE MTN TO COMPEL
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                          Blank 88 Filed: 10/31/2007, Entered: 10/31/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                          OF MARY E. MILIONIS IN SUPPORT OF MTN TO COMPEL
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                            Blank 87 Filed: 10/31/2007, Entered: 10/31/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                            OF JENNIFER L. KELLY IN SUPPORT OF MTN TO COMPEL
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                              Blank 86 Filed: 10/31/2007, Entered: 10/31/2007 miscellaneous other
                                                                                                              PROOF OF HAND DELIVERY
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                Blank 85 Filed: 10/31/2007, Entered: 10/31/2007 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                  Blank 84 Filed: 10/26/2007, Entered: 10/26/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                  AND EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF MEMO OF P&A'S IN OPP TO MSJ
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                    Blank 83 Filed: 10/26/2007, Entered: 10/26/2007 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                      Blank 82 Filed: 10/26/2007, Entered: 10/26/2007 Notice of Motion
                                                                                                                      TO FILE UNDER SEAL DOCS IN OPP TO MSJ
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                        Blank 81 Filed: 10/26/2007, Entered: 10/26/2007 Points and Authorities
                                                                                                                        IN OPP TO MSJ
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                          Blank 80 Filed: 10/26/2007, Entered: 10/26/2007 Reply/Response
                                                                                                                          TO SEP STMT RE MSJ
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                            Blank 79 Filed: 10/24/2007, Entered: 10/24/2007 Order
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                              Blank 78 Filed: 10/23/2007, Entered: 10/23/2007 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                Blank 77 Filed: 10/23/2007, Entered: 10/23/2007 Motion for Leave
                                                                                                                                TO FILE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT;
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                  Blank 76 Filed: 10/23/2007, Entered: 10/23/2007 miscellaneous other
                                                                                                                                  CHANGES TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT IN SUPPORT OF MTN FOR LEAVE TO FILE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                    Blank 75 Filed: 10/23/2007, Entered: 10/23/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                    OF TODD B. SEROTA, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF MTN FOR LEAVE
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                      Blank 74 Filed: 10/19/2007, Entered: 10/19/2007 Reply/Response
                                                                                                                                      MEMO IN SUPPORT OF MSA
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                        Blank 73 Filed: 10/19/2007, Entered: 10/19/2007 Objection Document
                                                                                                                                        TO EVIDENCE SUBMITTED IN OPP TO MSA
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                          Blank 72 Filed: 10/19/2007, Entered: 10/19/2007 Supplemental Declaration
                                                                                                                                          OF JENNIFER L. KELLY IN SUPPORT OF MSA
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                            Blank 71 Filed: 10/19/2007, Entered: 10/19/2007 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                              Blank 70 Filed: 10/19/2007, Entered: 10/19/2007 Notice
                                                                                                                                              OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF CONWAY HO
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                Blank 69 Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: 10/10/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                OF CONWAY HO IN SUPPORT OF OPP TO MSJ
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 68 Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: 10/10/2007 Opposition Document
                                                                                                                                                  TO MSA
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 67 Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: 10/10/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                    OF WILLIAM GARDNER IN SUPPORT OF OPP TO MSJ
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 66 Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: 10/10/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                      OF DAVID FOLEY IN SUPPORT OF OPP TO MSJ
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 65 Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: 10/10/2007 miscellaneous other
                                                                                                                                                        OPPOSING SEP STMT RE MSA
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 64 Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: 10/10/2007 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 63 Filed: 9/13/2007, Entered: 9/13/2007 Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 62 Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: 8/24/2007 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 61 Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: 8/24/2007 Notice of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                TO FILE UNDER SEAL
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 60 Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: 8/24/2007 miscellaneous other
                                                                                                                                                                  SEP STMT RE MSA
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 59 Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: 8/24/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                    OF MARY E. MILIONIS IN SUPPORT OF MSA
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 58 Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: 8/24/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                      OF MARK BEAUMONT IN SUPPORT OF MSA
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 57 Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: 8/24/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                        OF JENNIFER L. KELLY ISO DEFENDANTS MSA
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 56 Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: 8/24/2007 Points and Authorities
                                                                                                                                                                          IN SUPPORT OF MTN TO FILE UNDER SEAL
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 55 Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: 8/24/2007 Points and Authorities
                                                                                                                                                                            IN SUPPORT OF MSA
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 54 Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: 8/24/2007 Mtn for Summary Adjud of Issues
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 53 Filed: 8/8/2007, Entered: 8/8/2007 Answer To Second Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 52 Filed: 8/8/2007, Entered: 8/8/2007 Mtn for Summary Adjud of Issues
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 51 Filed: 8/8/2007, Entered: 8/8/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                    OF TAKI ENOMOTO IN SUPPORT OF MSA
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 50 Filed: 8/8/2007, Entered: 8/8/2007 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 49 Filed: 8/8/2007, Entered: 8/8/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                        OF ROSS Q. SMITH IN SUPPORT OF MSA
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 48 Filed: 8/8/2007, Entered: 8/8/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                          OF JENNIFER L. KELLY IN SUPPORT OF MSA
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 47 Filed: 8/8/2007, Entered: 8/8/2007 Points and Authorities
                                                                                                                                                                                            IN SUPPORT OF MSA
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 46 Filed: 8/8/2007, Entered: 8/8/2007 miscellaneous other
                                                                                                                                                                                              SEP STMT RE MSA
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 45 Filed: 4/30/2007, Entered: 4/30/2007 Answer To Second Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 44 Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: 4/27/2007 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                  OF INTENT TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE AT CMC
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 43 Filed: 3/29/2007, Entered: 3/29/2007 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 42 Filed: 3/27/2007, Entered: 3/27/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECL OF ALBERT SIEBER
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 41 Filed: 3/27/2007, Entered: 3/27/2007 Ex-parte Request for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                        EX PARTE APP
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 40 Filed: 3/27/2007, Entered: 3/27/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECL OF TODD B. SEROTA
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 39 Filed: 3/27/2007, Entered: 3/27/2007 Opposition Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                            DEFT OPP TO EX PARTE
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 38 Filed: 3/26/2007, Entered: 3/26/2007 Answer To Cross-complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 37 Filed: 3/22/2007, Entered: 3/22/2007 Reply/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                TO OPP TO DEMURRER
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 36 Filed: 3/22/2007, Entered: 3/22/2007 Summons Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 35 Filed: 3/21/2007, Entered: 3/21/2007 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    OF INTENT TO APPEAR BY PHONE
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 34 Filed: 3/15/2007, Entered: 3/15/2007 Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIP AND ORDER ON MOTION TO STRIKE
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 33 Filed: 3/14/2007, Entered: 3/14/2007 Opposition Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TO DEMURRER
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 32 Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: 3/2/2007 Statement-Case Management
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 31 Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: 3/2/2007 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 30 Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: 3/2/2007 Statement-Case Management
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 29 Filed: 2/27/2007, Entered: 2/27/2007 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OF INTENT TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE AT CMC
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 28 Filed: 2/20/2007, Entered: 2/20/2007 Answer To Second Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 27 Filed: 2/20/2007, Entered: 2/20/2007 Points and Authorities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 26 Filed: 2/20/2007, Entered: 2/20/2007 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PRAYER FOR ATTNY FEES
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 25 Filed: 2/20/2007, Entered: 2/20/2007 Points and Authorities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        IN SUPPORT OF MTN TO STRIKE
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 24 Filed: 2/20/2007, Entered: 2/20/2007 Cross Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 23 Filed: 2/20/2007, Entered: 2/20/2007 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 22 Filed: 2/20/2007, Entered: 2/20/2007 Demurrer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT;
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 21 Filed: 2/20/2007, Entered: 2/20/2007 Demurrer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 20 Filed: 2/1/2007, Entered: 2/1/2007 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OF RESCHEDULING OF CMC
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 19 Filed: 1/18/2007, Entered: 1/18/2007 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 18 Filed: 1/18/2007, Entered: 1/18/2007 Second Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 17 Filed: 1/11/2007, Entered: 1/11/2007 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        proof of serivce
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 16 Filed: 1/11/2007, Entered: 1/11/2007 Ex-parte Request for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APP FOR ORDER APPOINTING INT'L PROCESS SERVER
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 15 Filed: 1/11/2007, Entered: 1/11/2007 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER APPOINTING INTERNATIONAL PROCESS SERVER
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 14 Filed: 12/27/2006, Entered: 12/27/2006 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 13 Filed: 12/27/2006, Entered: 12/27/2006 Statement-Case Management
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 12 Filed: 12/27/2006, Entered: 12/27/2006 Statement-Case Management
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 11 Filed: 12/19/2006, Entered: 12/19/2006 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 10 Filed: 12/12/2006, Entered: 12/12/2006 Reply/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 9 Filed: 12/6/2006, Entered: 12/6/2006 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 8 Filed: 12/6/2006, Entered: 12/6/2006 Opposition Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TO DEMURRER
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 7 Filed: 11/17/2006, Entered: 11/17/2006 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 6 Filed: 11/16/2006, Entered: 11/16/2006 Demurrer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT;
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 5 Filed: 11/16/2006, Entered: 11/16/2006 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OF DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 4 Filed: 10/16/2006, Entered: 10/16/2006 Summons Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 10/16/2006, Entered: 10/16/2006 First Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 2 Filed: 9/25/2006, Entered: 9/25/2006 Notice-Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 9/11/2006, Entered: 9/11/2006 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 3 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?