Philip S Dudley v. Avalon Film Services Corp et al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles,
Case No. BC377858
|
|
|
|
Update Alerts Jump |
Summary Parties Attributes Timeline |
Summary |
No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.
|
|
Parties |
|
 |
Dudley Philips S., Plaintiff |
|
|
|
|
v. |
|
|
 |
Avalon, Defendant |
|
|
|
|
 |
Avalon Film Services Corp., Defendant |
|
|
|
|
 |
Axium Hollywood Services Inc., Defendant |
|
|
|
|
 |
Btl Production Services Inc., Defendant |
|
|
|
|
 |
Cast & Crew Production Payroll Inc., Defendant |
|
|
|
|
 |
CBS Broadcasting, Inc., Defendant |
|
|
|
|
 |
Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Defendant |
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
 |
Doe One Through Doe One Hundred, Defendant |
|
|
|
|
 |
Epsg Management Services, Defendant |
|
|
|
|
 |
Gramercy Productions Llc, Defendant |
|
|
|
|
 |
Granite Productions, Inc., Defendant |
|
|
|
|
 |
Metro-goldlynn-mayer Pictures Inc., Defendant |
|
|
|
|
 |
Mgm Television Entertainment Inc., Defendant |
|
|
|
|
 |
Nbc Studios Inc., Defendant |
|
|
|
|
 |
Paramount Network Tv, Defendant |
|
|
|
|
 |
Paramount Television, Defendant |
|
|
|
|
 |
Revolution Production Services Llc, Defendant |
|
|
|
|
 |
Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Defendant |
|
|
|
|
 |
Twentieth Century Fox Int'l Television, Defendant |
|
|
|
|
 |
Universal Network Television, LLC, Defendant |
|
|
|
|
 |
Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Warner Bros."
|
|
|
|
|
 |
WARNER BROS. PICTURES, Inc., Defendant |
|
|
|
|
 |
Warner Bros. Television, Defendant |
|
|
|
|
|
Attributes |
Type |
Other Employment Complaint (General Jurisdiction) |
Status |
Cons with Lead Case (see X-Ref) 10/09/2008 |
|
|
Timeline |
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
9 |
Filed: 6/18/2008, Entered: 6/18/2008 |
Report - Status |
|
status report re the status of the bankrupt deft's bankruptcy case
|
|
Request |
|
|
|
8 |
Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: 6/2/2008 |
Notice Of Ruling |
|
OF NON APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW; NOTICE OF FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE
|
|
Request |
|
|
|
7 |
Filed: 3/26/2008, Entered: 3/26/2008 |
Notice |
|
of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff Dudley to Give Notice [that the Case is Assigned to William F. Highberger, Department 307]
|
|
Request |
|
|
|
6 |
Filed: 3/13/2008, Entered: 3/13/2008 |
Notice of Reassignment and Order |
|
|
|
Request |
|
|
|
5 |
Filed: 1/17/2008, Entered: 1/17/2008 |
Notice of Bankruptcy Stay |
|
ntc of pendency of chapter 7 cases and automatic stay **filed by Bankruptcy Counsel
|
|
Request |
|
|
|
4 |
Filed: 11/15/2007, Entered: 11/15/2007 |
Ntc and Acknowledgement of Receipt |
|
|
|
Request |
|
|
|
3 |
Filed: 11/15/2007, Entered: 11/15/2007 |
Proof of Service |
|
of summons
|
|
Request |
|
|
|
2 |
Filed: 10/26/2007, Entered: 10/26/2007 |
Proof of Service |
|
|
|
Request |
|
|
|
1 |
Filed: 9/20/2007, Entered: 9/20/2007 |
Complaint |
|
|
|
Request |
|
 |
Date: 10/9/2008, Time: 09:00:00, Status: None |
|
|
|
 |
Date: 8/1/2008, Time: 09:00:00, Status: None |
|
|
|
 |
Date: 7/21/2008, Time: 10:00:00, Status: None |
|
|
|
 |
Date: 6/23/2008, Time: 09:00:00, Status: None |
|
|
|
 |
Date: 5/23/2008, Time: 09:00:00, Status: None |
|
|
|
 |
Date: 5/6/2008, Time: 09:00:00, Status: None |
|
|
|
 |
Date: 1/24/2008, Time: 09:00:00, Status: None |
|
|
|
 |
Date: 12/14/2007, Time: 10:00:00, Status: None |
|
|
|
|
|
Statistics
This case has been viewed 11 times.
|
|
|