Tina Kyprios et al v. Dukes Inc et al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. BC379450

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Does 1 Through 100, Defendant/Respondent

Represented by Kern and Wooley, LLP

No Logo Dukes Aerospace Llc, Defendant/Respondent

Represented by Kern and Wooley, LLP

No Logo Dukes, Inc., Defendant/Respondent

Represented by Kern and Wooley, LLP

No Logo Pma Sales, Defendant/Respondent

Represented by Kern and Wooley, LLP

No Logo Kyprios Markella, Minor Plaintiff
No Logo Kyprios Samantha, Minor Plaintiff
No Logo Kyprios Tina, Guardian
No Logo Kyprios Tina, Plaintiff/Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Wolk Arthur A.
Type Other PI/PD/WD (General Jurisdiction)
Status Dismissed - Other 10/28/2008
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 15 Filed: 11/7/2008, Entered: 11/7/2008 Notice
OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL
    Blank 14 Filed: 10/28/2008, Entered: 10/28/2008 Request and Entry of Dismissal
    ***COMPLAINT W/O PREJUDICE***
      Blank 13 Filed: 10/27/2008, Entered: 10/27/2008 Stipulation
      OF DISMISSAL
        Blank 12 Filed: 6/4/2008, Entered: 6/4/2008 Notice
        OF ENTRY OF ORDER ADVANCING AND CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE
          Blank 11 Filed: 2/29/2008, Entered: 2/29/2008 Stipulation and Order
          re stay of case
            Blank 10 Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: 2/15/2008 miscellaneous other
            appl. and order for appointment of guardian ad litem - Samantha Kyprios
              Blank 9 Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: 2/15/2008 miscellaneous other
              applic and order for appointment of guardian ad litem - Markella Kyprios
                Blank 8 Filed: 1/28/2008, Entered: 1/28/2008 Proof-Service/Summons
                  Blank 7 Filed: 12/17/2007, Entered: 12/17/2007 Summons Filed
                  ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
                    Blank 6 Filed: 12/5/2007, Entered: 12/5/2007 Ord Apptng Guardian Ad Litem
                    FOR SAMANTHA KYPRIOS SIGNED BY COMMR BARRY D KOHN NO SUMMONS ISSUED
                      Blank 5 Filed: 12/5/2007, Entered: 12/5/2007 Ord Apptng Guardian Ad Litem
                      MARKELLA KYPRIOS SIGNED BY COMMR BARRY D KOHN NO SUMMONS
                        Blank 4 Filed: 11/1/2007, Entered: 11/1/2007 miscellaneous other
                        AMENDED CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET ADDENDUM AND STATEMENT OF LOCATION
                          Blank 3 Filed: 10/24/2007, Entered: 10/24/2007 Notice-Case Management Conference
                            Blank 2 Filed: 10/22/2007, Entered: 10/22/2007 First Amended Complaint
                            FOR WRONGFUL DEATH; DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY
                              Blank 1 Filed: 10/19/2007, Entered: 10/19/2007 Complaint

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 8 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?