Parde Enterprise Limited Partnership v. American Western Hom
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. BC389922

Tags
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo American Western Home Insurance Company, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Does 1 To 50, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Parde Enterprise Limited Partnership, Plaintiff/Petitioner
No Logo Wrede Robert K. Esq., Evaluator
Type Ins Coverage (not Complex) (General Jurisdiction)
Status Dismissed - Other 03/20/2009
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 11 Filed: 3/20/2009, Entered: 3/20/2009 Request and Entry of Dismissal
with Prejudice- Entire action of all parties and all causes of action
    Request RequestSpace
    Blank 10 Filed: 12/5/2008, Entered: 12/5/2008 Report-ADR Outcome
    ADR OUTCOME REPORT FILED. NE ENDED IN FULL AGREEMENT.
      Request RequestSpace
      Blank 9 Filed: 10/2/2008, Entered: 10/2/2008 Notice-Assign-Evaluator
        Request RequestSpace
        Blank 8 Filed: 9/9/2008, Entered: 9/9/2008 Notice Of Ruling
          Request RequestSpace
          Blank 7 Filed: 9/4/2008, Entered: 9/4/2008 Order
          CASE MANAGEMENT
            Request RequestSpace
            Blank 6 Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: 8/20/2008 Statement-Case Management
              Request RequestSpace
              Blank 5 Filed: 8/19/2008, Entered: 8/19/2008 Statement-Case Management
                Request RequestSpace
                Blank 4 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: 6/30/2008 Answer
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Blank 3 Filed: 6/23/2008, Entered: 6/23/2008 Proof-Service/Summons
                  & Complaint
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Blank 2 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: 5/9/2008 Notice-Case Management Conference
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Blank 1 Filed: 4/30/2008, Entered: 4/30/2008 Complaint
                        Request RequestSpace

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 16 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?