Veronica Corrales et al v. Adolfo Schoneke et al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. BC402162

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Cna Surety (dismissed), Defendant
No Logo Angeles Enterpris (dismissed), Defendant/Respondent

Represented by Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

No Logo Countrywide Home Loans, Defendant/Respondent

Represented by Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

No Logo Does 1 Through 20, Defendant/Respondent

Represented by Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

No Logo Dreamworks Group (dismissed), Defendant/Respondent

Represented by Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

No Logo Golden Empire Mortgage Company, Defendant/Respondent

Represented by Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

No Logo Gonzalez, Arturo, Defendant/Respondent

Represented by Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

No Logo Gonzalez, Maria Ramirez, Defendant/Respondent

Represented by Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

No Logo Gonzalez, Mario, Defendant/Respondent

Represented by Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

No Logo International Fidelity Insurance Co., Defendant/Respondent
Officially listed as "International Fidelity Insurance Company"

Represented by Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

No Logo Long Beach Mortgage Company, Defendant/Respondent

Represented by Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

No Logo Merchant's Bonding Company, Defendant/Respondent

Represented by Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

No Logo Morfa Giselle, Defendant/Respondent

Represented by Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

No Logo Mrg Realty Escrow Division, Defendant/Respondent

Represented by Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

No Logo Ortiz Garciela, Defendant/Respondent

Represented by Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

No Logo Ramirez Ana, Defendant/Respondent

Represented by Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

No Logo Salmeron George, Defendant/Respondent

Represented by Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

No Logo Schoneke Adolfo, Defendant/Respondent

Represented by Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

No Logo Schoneke Blanca, Defendant/Respondent

Represented by Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

No Logo Surety Bonding Company Of America, Defendant/Respondent

Represented by Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

No Logo Barr Eleanor Oths, Mediator
No Logo Corrales Sofia, Plaintiff/Petitioner
No Logo Corrales Veronica, Plaintiff/Petitioner
Type Fraud (no contract) (General Jurisdiction)
Status Dismissed - Other 11/24/2009
  Entries (98) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 98 Filed: 3/26/2013, Entered: 3/26/2013 Abstract of Judgment
(5)abstracts a.s.
    Blank 97 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: 4/9/2010 Notice of Entry of Judgment
      Blank 96 Filed: 2/11/2010, Entered: 2/11/2010 Judgment*
      JUDGMENT FOR PLTF, AGAINST DEFT IN THE AMT OF $201,804.00
        Blank 95 Filed: 1/4/2010, Entered: 1/4/2010 ExParte Application & Order
        FOR AN ORDER TO ENTER JUDGMENT AND AWARD ATTY FEES;
          Blank 94 Filed: 11/24/2009, Entered: 11/24/2009 Request and Entry of Dismissal
          without prejudice, complaint, court to retain jurisdiction pursuant to CCP section 664.6 conformed copy in pick up box
            Blank 93 Filed: 11/19/2009, Entered: 11/19/2009 Partial Dismissal
            with Prejudice) (*ANGELES ENTERPRISE*
              Blank 92 Filed: 11/10/2009, Entered: 11/10/2009 Partial Dismissal
              with Prejudice) (*DREAMWORKS GROUP*
                Blank 91 Filed: 11/10/2009, Entered: 11/10/2009 Partial Dismissal
                with Prejudice) (*SURETY BONDING CO. OF AMERICA*
                  Blank 90 Filed: 11/10/2009, Entered: 11/10/2009 Partial Dismissal
                  with Prejudice) ( *DOE 1 CNA SURETY*
                    Blank 89 Filed: 10/30/2009, Entered: 10/30/2009 Statement-Agreement
                    Partial) (FIRST SANA FILED MEDIATION ENDED IN PARTIAL AGREEMENT
                      Blank 88 Filed: 10/26/2009, Entered: 10/26/2009 List of Exhibits
                        Blank 87 Filed: 10/26/2009, Entered: 10/26/2009 Statement of Case
                          Blank 86 Filed: 10/26/2009, Entered: 10/26/2009 List of Witnesses
                            Blank 85 Filed: 10/26/2009, Entered: 10/26/2009 miscellaneous other
                            proposed jury instructions
                              Blank 84 Filed: 10/16/2009, Entered: 10/16/2009 Partial Dismissal
                              w/o Prejudice) (AS TO DEFENDANT, INTERNATIONAL FIDELITY INSURANCE CO.
                                Blank 83 Filed: 10/13/2009, Entered: 10/13/2009 Partial Dismissal
                                with Prejudice) (MERCHANT'S BONDING COMPANY ONLY*
                                  Blank 82 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: 10/9/2009 Notice
                                  NOTICE OF DISMISSAL
                                    Blank 81 Filed: 10/2/2009, Entered: 10/2/2009 Stipulation and Order
                                    to substitute conformed copy mailed
                                      Blank 80 Filed: 9/23/2009, Entered: 9/23/2009 Partial Dismissal
                                      w/o Prejudice) (complaint/ other: as to de Merchant's Bonding Company only.
                                        Blank 79 Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: 9/14/2009 Notice-Assignment-Mediator
                                          Blank 78 Filed: 9/3/2009, Entered: 9/3/2009 Partial Dismissal(not entire case)
                                          without prejudice, complaint, as to deft, washington mutual bank fsb, only
                                            Blank 77 Filed: 8/24/2009, Entered: 8/24/2009 Proof-Service/Summons
                                            1ST AM. SUM.
                                              Blank 76 Filed: 8/24/2009, Entered: 8/24/2009 Proof-Service/Summons
                                                Blank 75 Filed: 8/21/2009, Entered: 8/21/2009 Stipulation and Order
                                                to extend the mediation completion date and to continue the post mediation status conference and trial date conformed copy mailed
                                                  Blank 74 Filed: 8/17/2009, Entered: 8/17/2009 Proof-Service/Summons
                                                  ARTURO GONZALEZ
                                                    Blank 73 Filed: 8/17/2009, Entered: 8/17/2009 Proof-Service/Summons
                                                    GISELLE MORFA
                                                      Blank 72 Filed: 8/17/2009, Entered: 8/17/2009 Default Entered
                                                      DEFAULT ENTER ON THE FIRST AMNEDED COMPLAINT AS MARIO GONZALEZ
                                                        Blank 71 Filed: 8/17/2009, Entered: 8/17/2009 Default Entered
                                                        DEFAULT ENTER ON THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINTAS GRACIELA ORTIZ
                                                          Blank 70 Filed: 8/17/2009, Entered: 8/17/2009 Proof-Service/Summons
                                                          MARIO GONZALEZ
                                                            Blank 69 Filed: 8/17/2009, Entered: 8/17/2009 Proof-Service/Summons
                                                            ANA RAMIREZ
                                                              Blank 68 Filed: 8/17/2009, Entered: 8/17/2009 Default Entered
                                                              DEFAULT ENTER ON THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AS GISELLE MORFA
                                                                Blank 67 Filed: 8/17/2009, Entered: 8/17/2009 Proof-Service/Summons
                                                                  Blank 66 Filed: 8/17/2009, Entered: 8/17/2009 Default Entered
                                                                  DEFAULT ENTER ON THE FIRST AMNEDED COMPLAINT AS ARTURO GONZALEZ
                                                                    Blank 65 Filed: 8/17/2009, Entered: 8/17/2009 Default Entered
                                                                    DEFAULT ENTER ON THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AS ANA RAMIREZ
                                                                      Blank 64 Filed: 7/30/2009, Entered: 7/30/2009 Default Entered
                                                                      DEFAULT ENTERED ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR ADOLFO SCHONEKE
                                                                        Blank 63 Filed: 7/30/2009, Entered: 7/30/2009 Request to Enter Default
                                                                        REJECT FOR ANA RAMIREZ-#15.30 NO SERVICE OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
                                                                          Blank 62 Filed: 7/30/2009, Entered: 7/30/2009 Request to Enter Default
                                                                          REJECT FOR BLANCA SCHONEKE-#26. 30. NEED DUE DILLIGENCE
                                                                            Blank 61 Filed: 7/30/2009, Entered: 7/30/2009 Request to Enter Default
                                                                            REJECT FOR MORFA-#15.30 NO SERVICE OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
                                                                              Blank 60 Filed: 7/30/2009, Entered: 7/30/2009 Request to Enter Default
                                                                              REJECT FOR MARIO GONZALEZ-#15.30 NO SERVICE OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
                                                                                Blank 59 Filed: 7/30/2009, Entered: 7/30/2009 Request to Enter Default
                                                                                REJECT FOR GRACIELA ORTIZ- NEED DATE OF MAILING ON ITEM 6B.
                                                                                  Blank 58 Filed: 7/30/2009, Entered: 7/30/2009 Request to Enter Default
                                                                                  REJECT FOR GONZALEZ-#15.30 NO SERVICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMP
                                                                                    Blank 57 Filed: 7/21/2009, Entered: 7/21/2009 Request to Enter Default
                                                                                    IS REJECTED AS MARIA #3.14.
                                                                                      Blank 56 Filed: 7/21/2009, Entered: 7/21/2009 Request to Enter Default
                                                                                      IS REJECTED AS MORFA #3.14.
                                                                                        Blank 55 Filed: 7/21/2009, Entered: 7/21/2009 Request to Enter Default
                                                                                        IS REJECTED AS MRG #3.14.
                                                                                          Blank 54 Filed: 7/21/2009, Entered: 7/21/2009 Request to Enter Default
                                                                                          IS REJECTED AS SCHONEKE #3.26.29.
                                                                                            Blank 53 Filed: 7/21/2009, Entered: 7/21/2009 Request to Enter Default
                                                                                            IS REJECTED AS ADOLFO #3.
                                                                                              Blank 52 Filed: 7/21/2009, Entered: 7/21/2009 Request to Enter Default
                                                                                              IS REJECTED AS MARIO #3
                                                                                                Blank 51 Filed: 7/21/2009, Entered: 7/21/2009 Request to Enter Default
                                                                                                IS REJECTED AS GONZALEZ #3.
                                                                                                  Blank 50 Filed: 7/21/2009, Entered: 7/21/2009 Request to Enter Default
                                                                                                  IS REJECTED AS ANA RAMIREZ #3.
                                                                                                    Blank 49 Filed: 7/21/2009, Entered: 7/21/2009 Request to Enter Default
                                                                                                    IS REJECTED AS ORTIZ #3.
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 48 Filed: 5/19/2009, Entered: 5/19/2009 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                      doe 1
                                                                                                        Blank 47 Filed: 4/30/2009, Entered: 4/30/2009 Notice
                                                                                                        of temporary unavailability of counsel;
                                                                                                          Blank 46 Filed: 4/24/2009, Entered: 4/24/2009 Proof of Service
                                                                                                          FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
                                                                                                            Blank 45 Filed: 4/23/2009, Entered: 4/23/2009 Notice
                                                                                                            OF APPEARANCE
                                                                                                              Blank 44 Filed: 4/22/2009, Entered: 4/22/2009 Answer To First Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                Blank 43 Filed: 4/20/2009, Entered: 4/20/2009 Partial Dismissal
                                                                                                                w/o Prejudice) (other: as to def Golden Empire Morgage Company only.
                                                                                                                  Blank 42 Filed: 4/15/2009, Entered: 4/15/2009 Partial Dismissal
                                                                                                                  w/o Prejudice) (/COMPLAINT/ OTHER: AS TO DEFE COUNRTYWIDE HOME LOANS ONLY
                                                                                                                    Blank 41 Filed: 4/13/2009, Entered: 4/13/2009 Reply/Response
                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF NON-OPP TO MTN TO STRIKE
                                                                                                                      Blank 40 Filed: 4/7/2009, Entered: 4/7/2009 Partial Dismissal
                                                                                                                      w/o Prejudice) (Complaint; As to defendant Countrywide Home Loans only;
                                                                                                                        Blank 39 Filed: 4/7/2009, Entered: 4/7/2009 Opposition Document
                                                                                                                        to defendant Golden Empire Mortgage, Inc.'s demurrer to plaintiffs' complaint;
                                                                                                                          Blank 38 Filed: 4/1/2009, Entered: 4/1/2009 Reply/Response
                                                                                                                          IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PLFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT BY DEFT COUNTYWIDE HOME LOANS, INC.
                                                                                                                            Blank 37 Filed: 3/24/2009, Entered: 3/24/2009 Opposition Document
                                                                                                                              Blank 36 Filed: 3/19/2009, Entered: 3/19/2009 Notice Of Ruling
                                                                                                                                Blank 35 Filed: 3/18/2009, Entered: 3/18/2009 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
                                                                                                                                  Blank 34 Filed: 3/18/2009, Entered: 3/18/2009 Demurrer
                                                                                                                                  M O PS ANS AS.
                                                                                                                                    Blank 33 Filed: 3/18/2009, Entered: 3/18/2009 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                      Blank 32 Filed: 3/11/2009, Entered: 3/11/2009 Notice of Continuance
                                                                                                                                        Blank 31 Filed: 3/9/2009, Entered: 3/9/2009 Substitution of Attorney
                                                                                                                                          Blank 30 Filed: 3/9/2009, Entered: 3/9/2009 Demurrer
                                                                                                                                          TO PLNTFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
                                                                                                                                            Blank 29 Filed: 3/6/2009, Entered: 3/6/2009 Proof-Service/Summons
                                                                                                                                            AND COMPLAINT
                                                                                                                                              Blank 28 Filed: 3/5/2009, Entered: 3/5/2009 Proof-Service/Summons
                                                                                                                                              AND COMPLAINT
                                                                                                                                                Blank 27 Filed: 3/5/2009, Entered: 3/5/2009 Statement-Case Management
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 26 Filed: 3/3/2009, Entered: 3/3/2009 Statement-Case Management
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 25 Filed: 3/2/2009, Entered: 3/2/2009 Statement-Case Management
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 24 Filed: 2/27/2009, Entered: 2/27/2009 General Denial
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 23 Filed: 2/23/2009, Entered: 2/23/2009 Statement-Case Management
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 22 Filed: 2/19/2009, Entered: 2/19/2009 Notice
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 21 Filed: 2/13/2009, Entered: 2/13/2009 Objection Document
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 20 Filed: 2/13/2009, Entered: 2/13/2009 Notice-Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 19 Filed: 2/11/2009, Entered: 2/11/2009 Summons Filed
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 18 Filed: 2/11/2009, Entered: 2/11/2009 First Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 17 Filed: 2/9/2009, Entered: 2/9/2009 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                    OF NON-OPPO TO DEMURRER
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 16 Filed: 2/5/2009, Entered: 2/5/2009 Notice-Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 15 Filed: 2/4/2009, Entered: 2/4/2009 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 14 Filed: 1/27/2009, Entered: 1/27/2009 Memorandum - Other
                                                                                                                                                                          MEMO OF POINTS & AUTH.IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 13 Filed: 1/27/2009, Entered: 1/27/2009 Demurrer
                                                                                                                                                                            TO PLFF'S COMPLAINT
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 12 Filed: 1/27/2009, Entered: 1/27/2009 Motion
                                                                                                                                                                              TO STRIKE PLFFS' COMPLAINT;
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 11 Filed: 1/22/2009, Entered: 1/22/2009 Demurrer
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 10 Filed: 1/15/2009, Entered: 1/15/2009 General Denial
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 9 Filed: 1/9/2009, Entered: 1/9/2009 Proof-Service/Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 8 Filed: 1/8/2009, Entered: 1/8/2009 General Denial
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 7 Filed: 1/2/2009, Entered: 1/2/2009 Demand For Jury Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 6 Filed: 1/2/2009, Entered: 1/2/2009 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 5 Filed: 12/30/2008, Entered: 12/30/2008 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 4 Filed: 12/16/2008, Entered: 12/16/2008 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                              of summons & complt, etc. to golden empire mortgage co.
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 12/11/2008, Entered: 12/11/2008 Proof-Service/Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                two filed separately this date.
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 12/10/2008, Entered: 12/10/2008 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: 11/17/2008 Complaint

                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 1,268 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?