Tritia Q Barrientos v. Wmc Mortgage Corporation et al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. BC404587

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo American Servicing Company Inc., Defendant/Respondent

Represented by Treder & Weiss Llp

No Logo Does 1 Through 100, Defendant/Respondent

Represented by Treder & Weiss Llp

No Logo NDEx West L.L.C., Defendant/Respondent

Represented by Treder & Weiss Llp

No Logo Priority Posting And Publication, Defendant/Respondent

Represented by Treder & Weiss Llp

No Logo Wmc Mortgage Corporation, Defendant/Respondent

Represented by Treder & Weiss Llp

No Logo Barrientos Tritia Q., Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per
Type Quiet Title (General Jurisdiction)
Status Dismissed - Other 02/02/2011
  Entries (57) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 57 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: 3/1/2011 Notice Of Ruling
    Blank 56 Filed: 2/3/2011, Entered: 2/3/2011 Notice of Entry of Judgment
      Blank 55 Filed: 2/2/2011, Entered: 2/2/2011 Order
      OF DISMISSAL (WITH PREJUDICE) AS TO WMC MORTGAGE, LLC
        Blank 54 Filed: 1/13/2011, Entered: 1/13/2011 Notice of Continuance
        of s/c
          Blank 53 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: 1/7/2011 Request For Judicial Notice
            Blank 52 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: 1/7/2011 Points and Authorities
            in support of dem
              Blank 51 Filed: 12/6/2010, Entered: 12/6/2010 Motion To Be Relieved As Counsel
              decla in support of motion
                Blank 50 Filed: 11/24/2010, Entered: 11/24/2010 Notice Of Ruling
                  Blank 49 Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: 11/12/2010 Declaration
                  of joel bander
                    Blank 48 Filed: 11/5/2010, Entered: 11/5/2010 Demurrer
                    to 1st amended complt
                      Blank 47 Filed: 10/14/2010, Entered: 10/14/2010 Notice of Change of Address
                        Blank 46 Filed: 9/14/2010, Entered: 9/14/2010 Notice of Status Conference filed
                          Blank 45 Filed: 3/25/2010, Entered: 3/25/2010 Notice of Reassignment and Order
                            Blank 44 Filed: 2/18/2010, Entered: 2/18/2010 Notice
                            of entry of order re dismissal of deft Amerca's Servicing Company
                              Blank 43 Filed: 2/2/2010, Entered: 2/2/2010 Order
                              OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENANT AMERICA'S SERVICING COMPANY
                                Blank 42 Filed: 1/26/2010, Entered: 1/26/2010 Report - Status
                                Re: Bankruptcy
                                  Blank 41 Filed: 12/2/2009, Entered: 12/2/2009 Notice
                                  HEARING OFF CALENDAR.
                                    Blank 40 Filed: 11/24/2009, Entered: 11/24/2009 Motion
                                    for Reconsideration of Order Denying Pltf Leave to File an Amended Complaint
                                      Blank 39 Filed: 11/20/2009, Entered: 11/20/2009 Notice-Stay
                                        Blank 38 Filed: 11/20/2009, Entered: 11/20/2009 Reply/Response
                                        to opposition to WMC Mortgage, LLC Demurrer to 1st Amended Complaint
                                          Blank 37 Filed: 11/12/2009, Entered: 11/12/2009 Notice Of Ruling
                                            Blank 36 Filed: 10/29/2009, Entered: 10/29/2009 Opposition Document
                                              Blank 35 Filed: 10/29/2009, Entered: 10/29/2009 Opposition Document
                                              to Deft America's Servicing Company's Demurrer
                                                Blank 34 Filed: 10/5/2009, Entered: 10/5/2009 Memorandum - Other
                                                of P's & A's
                                                  Blank 33 Filed: 10/5/2009, Entered: 10/5/2009 Demurrer
                                                  to First Amended Complaint
                                                    Blank 32 Filed: 10/5/2009, Entered: 10/5/2009 Notice of Lodging
                                                      Blank 31 Filed: 9/24/2009, Entered: 9/24/2009 Notice Of Ruling
                                                        Blank 30 Filed: 9/22/2009, Entered: 9/22/2009 Order: Case Management
                                                          Blank 29 Filed: 9/21/2009, Entered: 9/21/2009 Statement-Case Management
                                                            Blank 28 Filed: 9/18/2009, Entered: 9/18/2009 Statement-Case Management
                                                              Blank 27 Filed: 9/3/2009, Entered: 9/3/2009 Demurrer
                                                                Blank 26 Filed: 8/24/2009, Entered: 8/24/2009 notice of filing
                                                                Declaration of Non-Monetary Status
                                                                  Blank 25 Filed: 8/24/2009, Entered: 8/24/2009 Declaration
                                                                  of Non-Monetary Status
                                                                    Blank 24 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: 8/10/2009 Proof of Service
                                                                    First Amended Complaint
                                                                      Blank 23 Filed: 8/7/2009, Entered: 8/7/2009 Proof of Service
                                                                      RE PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
                                                                        Blank 22 Filed: 8/7/2009, Entered: 8/7/2009 Proof of Service
                                                                          Blank 21 Filed: 8/5/2009, Entered: 8/5/2009 First Amended Complaint
                                                                            Blank 20 Filed: 7/29/2009, Entered: 7/29/2009 Reply/Response
                                                                            in support of its Demurrer to pltf complaint & Mtn to Strike portions of pltf's complaint
                                                                              Blank 19 Filed: 7/28/2009, Entered: 7/28/2009 Proof-Service/Summons
                                                                              & Complaint
                                                                                Blank 18 Filed: 7/23/2009, Entered: 7/23/2009 Statement-Case Management
                                                                                  Blank 17 Filed: 7/23/2009, Entered: 7/23/2009 Opposition Document
                                                                                  to defts...Demurrer and Motion to Strike
                                                                                    Blank 16 Filed: 7/23/2009, Entered: 7/23/2009 Statement-Case Management
                                                                                      Blank 15 Filed: 7/14/2009, Entered: 7/14/2009 Notice-Case Management Conference
                                                                                        Blank 14 Filed: 6/23/2009, Entered: 6/23/2009 Notice of Continuance
                                                                                          Blank 13 Filed: 6/19/2009, Entered: 6/19/2009 Notice
                                                                                          OF REASSIGNMENT
                                                                                            Blank 12 Filed: 6/12/2009, Entered: 6/12/2009 Notice Of Ruling
                                                                                              Blank 11 Filed: 6/12/2009, Entered: 6/12/2009 Notice of Continuance
                                                                                                Blank 10 Filed: 5/28/2009, Entered: 5/28/2009 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 5/28/2009, Entered: 5/28/2009 Demurrer
                                                                                                    Blank 8 Filed: 4/24/2009, Entered: 4/24/2009 Notice of Continuance
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 7 Filed: 4/23/2009, Entered: 4/23/2009 Statement-Case Management
                                                                                                        Blank 6 Filed: 2/9/2009, Entered: 2/9/2009 Notice
                                                                                                        OF FILING
                                                                                                          Blank 5 Filed: 2/9/2009, Entered: 2/9/2009 Declaration
                                                                                                            Blank 4 Filed: 1/6/2009, Entered: 1/6/2009 Proof of Service
                                                                                                              Blank 3 Filed: 1/2/2009, Entered: 1/2/2009 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                Blank 2 Filed: 12/30/2008, Entered: 12/30/2008 Notice-Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 12/24/2008, Entered: 12/24/2008 Complaint

                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 8 times.

                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?