Jason Lablue v. Chet Huffman et al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. BC412980

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Aerofab Corporation, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Aviation Manufacturing And Design Corpor-, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Chet Huffman Motorsports Inc., Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Does 1-50, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Dukes, Inc., Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Gst Industries Inc., Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Huffman Chet, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Vision Aerospace International Inc., Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Lablue Jason, Plaintiff/Petitioner

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Schaedel John P.
Type Wrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction)
Status Dismissed - Other 06/09/2010
  Entries (43) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 43 Filed: 6/9/2010, Entered: 6/9/2010 Request For Dismissal
COMPLAINT; COURT TO RETAIN JURISDICTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT, CCP 664.6;
    Request RequestSpace
    Blank 42 Filed: 6/9/2010, Entered: 6/9/2010 Notice
    AMENDED NTC OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE; REQUEST FOR RESERVATION OF JURISDICTION PER CCP 664.6 AND PER CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER ENTERED SEPT. 30, 2009;
      Request RequestSpace
      Blank 41 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: 6/1/2010 Notice-Settlement
        Request RequestSpace
        Blank 40 Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: 5/5/2010 Motion to Compel
          Request RequestSpace
          Blank 39 Filed: 4/13/2010, Entered: 4/13/2010 First Amended Complaint
            Request RequestSpace
            Blank 38 Filed: 4/13/2010, Entered: 4/13/2010 Stipulation
            regarding first amended complaint
              Request RequestSpace
              Blank 37 Filed: 2/4/2010, Entered: 2/4/2010 Stipulation and Order
              to postponement of deposition of chet huffman
                Request RequestSpace
                Blank 36 Filed: 12/21/2009, Entered: 12/21/2009 Notice Of Ruling
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Blank 35 Filed: 12/18/2009, Entered: 12/18/2009 Notice
                  NOTICE THAT HEARING IS OFF CALENDAR;
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Blank 34 Filed: 12/17/2009, Entered: 12/17/2009 Substitution of Attorney
                    7 SUBSTITUTIONS FILED THIS DATE;
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Blank 33 Filed: 12/14/2009, Entered: 12/14/2009 Notice Of Ruling
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Blank 32 Filed: 12/14/2009, Entered: 12/14/2009 Proof of Service
                        BY FIRST CLASS MAIL;
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Blank 31 Filed: 12/14/2009, Entered: 12/14/2009 Proof of Service
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Blank 30 Filed: 12/14/2009, Entered: 12/14/2009 Proof of Service
                            BY FIRST CLASS MAIL
                              Request RequestSpace
                              Blank 29 Filed: 12/11/2009, Entered: 12/11/2009 Motion
                              TO BE RELIVED;
                                Request RequestSpace
                                Blank 28 Filed: 12/11/2009, Entered: 12/11/2009 Declaration
                                IN SUPPORT OF ATTY'S MTN TO BE RELIVED AS COUNSEL;
                                  Request RequestSpace
                                  Blank 27 Filed: 12/11/2009, Entered: 12/11/2009 Order
                                  shortening time for hearing on motion to be relieved
                                    Request RequestSpace
                                    Blank 26 Filed: 12/11/2009, Entered: 12/11/2009 Declaration
                                    of S. Roger Rombro
                                      Request RequestSpace
                                      Blank 25 Filed: 12/11/2009, Entered: 12/11/2009 Exparte Application
                                      for order shortening time
                                        Request RequestSpace
                                        Blank 24 Filed: 12/11/2009, Entered: 12/11/2009 Points and Authorities
                                          Request RequestSpace
                                          Blank 23 Filed: 11/13/2009, Entered: 11/13/2009 Notice
                                          of no opposition to motion to compel discovery responses and for sanctions in the amount of $14,540
                                            Request RequestSpace
                                            Blank 22 Filed: 10/14/2009, Entered: 10/14/2009 Proof of Service
                                            BY MAIL ON ORDER;
                                              Request RequestSpace
                                              Blank 21 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: 10/9/2009 Declaration
                                              OF JOHN P. SCHAEDEL IN SUPPORT OF MTN TO COMPEL;
                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                Blank 20 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: 10/9/2009 miscellaneous other
                                                SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTIONS TO COMPEL;
                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                  Blank 19 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: 10/9/2009 Notice of Continuance
                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                    Blank 18 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: 10/9/2009 Motion to Compel
                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                      Blank 17 Filed: 10/8/2009, Entered: 10/8/2009 Substitution of Attorney
                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                        Blank 16 Filed: 10/7/2009, Entered: 10/7/2009 Notice of Continuance
                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                          Blank 15 Filed: 9/30/2009, Entered: 9/30/2009 Order
                                                          ON STIPULATION REGARDING CONFIDENTIALITY OF NON-DISCLOSURE OF FINANCIAL, PRIVATE AND/OR PROPRIETARY INFORMATION PRODUCED IN DISCOVERY
                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                            Blank 14 Filed: 9/30/2009, Entered: 9/30/2009 Notice Of Ruling
                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                              Blank 13 Filed: 9/21/2009, Entered: 9/21/2009 Notice Of Ruling
                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                Blank 12 Filed: 8/26/2009, Entered: 8/26/2009 Statement-Case Management
                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                  Blank 11 Filed: 8/20/2009, Entered: 8/20/2009 Statement-Case Management
                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 7/27/2009, Entered: 7/27/2009 Notice
                                                                    OF UNAVAILABILITY;
                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                      Blank 9 Filed: 7/27/2009, Entered: 7/27/2009 Answer
                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                        Blank 8 Filed: 7/23/2009, Entered: 7/23/2009 Notice-Case Management Conference
                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 7/13/2009, Entered: 7/13/2009 Ntc and Acknowledgement of Receipt
                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 7/13/2009, Entered: 7/13/2009 Ntc and Acknowledgement of Receipt
                                                                            SUMMONS/COMPLAINT;
                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 7/13/2009, Entered: 7/13/2009 Ntc and Acknowledgement of Receipt
                                                                              SUMMONS/COMPLAINT;
                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 7/13/2009, Entered: 7/13/2009 Ntc and Acknowledgement of Receipt
                                                                                SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT;
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 7/9/2009, Entered: 7/9/2009 OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 5/20/2009, Entered: 5/20/2009 Summons Filed
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 5/4/2009, Entered: 5/4/2009 Complaint
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace

                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                        This case has been viewed 445 times.

                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                        Space
                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                         
                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                        Need Password Help?