Tommie Cyne Brown v. Irma Castaneda et al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. BC423900

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Brown Tommie Cyne, Plaintiff/Petitioner
No Logo Castaneda Irma, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Does 1 To 50, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Iniguiz Mike, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Ortiz Albert G., Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Wmc Mortgage Corporation, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Paul Steven W. Esq., Mediator
Type Other Real Property Rights Case (General Jurisdiction)
Status Dismissed - Other 11/18/2010
  Entries (31) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 31 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: 8/2/2010 Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S
    Blank 30 Filed: 7/29/2010, Entered: 7/29/2010 Judgment*
    OF DISMISAL OF DEFENDANT IRMA CASTANEDA
      Blank 29 Filed: 7/22/2010, Entered: 7/22/2010 Judgment*
      OF DISMISSAL AS TO WMC MORTGAGE CORPORATION
        Blank 28 Filed: 6/29/2010, Entered: 6/29/2010 miscellaneous other
        1ST SANA FILED, MEDIATION DID NOT TAKE PLACE.A PARTY WHO WAS ORDERED TO APPEAR AT THE MEDIATION DID NOT APPEAR.
          Blank 27 Filed: 6/25/2010, Entered: 6/25/2010 Notice Of Ruling
            Blank 26 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: 6/1/2010 Notice
            AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING
              Blank 25 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: 6/1/2010 Opposition Points & Authorities
              IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER
                Blank 24 Filed: 5/27/2010, Entered: 5/27/2010 Opposition Document
                TO DEMURRER OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
                  Blank 23 Filed: 5/27/2010, Entered: 5/27/2010 Notice of Continuance
                  DEMURRER
                    Blank 22 Filed: 5/27/2010, Entered: 5/27/2010 Opposition Document
                    TO DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
                      Blank 21 Filed: 5/4/2010, Entered: 5/4/2010 Demurrer
                      TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
                        Blank 20 Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: 4/19/2010 Notice-Mediation Hrg Date
                          Blank 19 Filed: 4/12/2010, Entered: 4/12/2010 Demurrer
                            Blank 18 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 3/30/2010 First Amended Complaint
                              Blank 17 Filed: 3/18/2010, Entered: 3/18/2010 Notice-Assignment-Mediator
                                Blank 16 Filed: 3/10/2010, Entered: 3/10/2010 Statement-Case Management
                                  Blank 15 Filed: 2/22/2010, Entered: 2/22/2010 Stipulation and Order
                                  SETTIG ASIDE DEFAULT OF DEFENDANT IRMA CASTANEDA
                                    Blank 14 Filed: 2/18/2010, Entered: 2/18/2010 Demurrer
                                    TO COMPLAINT
                                      Blank 13 Filed: 2/9/2010, Entered: 2/9/2010 Statement-Case Management
                                        Blank 12 Filed: 1/8/2010, Entered: 1/8/2010 Notice-Case Management Conference
                                          Blank 11 Filed: 1/7/2010, Entered: 1/7/2010 Default Entered
                                          IRMA CASTANEDA *****DEFAULT VACATED 2/22/10*** PURSUANT TO STIPULATION
                                            Blank 10 Filed: 1/7/2010, Entered: 1/7/2010 Default Entered
                                            ALBERT G. ORTIZ
                                              Blank 9 Filed: 1/7/2010, Entered: 1/7/2010 Default Entered
                                              MIKE INIGUIZ
                                                Blank 8 Filed: 1/6/2010, Entered: 1/6/2010 Response
                                                TO OSC HEARING
                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 12/15/2009, Entered: 12/15/2009 Demurrer
                                                  TO COMPLAINT
                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 11/24/2009, Entered: 11/24/2009 Proof-Service/Summons
                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: 11/23/2009 Proof-Service/Summons
                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 11/13/2009, Entered: 11/13/2009 OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 11/13/2009, Entered: 11/13/2009 Notice-Case Management Conference
                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 11/3/2009, Entered: 11/3/2009 Proof-Service/Summons
                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 10/15/2009, Entered: 10/15/2009 Complaint

                                                                Statistics

                                                                This case has been viewed 8 times.

                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                Space
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                 
                                                                PlainSite
                                                                Sign Up
                                                                Need Password Help?