Brian Rodier v. Ralph Thomas et al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. BC424086

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Coldwell Banker Corporation Coldwell Banker Corporation, Defendant/Respondent
Officially listed as "Coldwell Banker"
No Logo De Salvo, Ron, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Does 1 Through 100, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Thomas Carolee, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Thomas, Ralph, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Rodier Brian In Pro Per, Plaintiff & Plaintiff in Pro Per
Type Contractual Fraud (General Jurisdiction)
Status Dismissed - Other 10/18/2012
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 19 Filed: 10/18/2012, Entered: 10/18/2012 Request and Entry of Dismissal
DISMISSAL FILED ON 10/18/12 WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE ENTIRE ACTION
    Blank 18 Filed: 9/28/2012, Entered: 9/28/2012 Notice Of Ruling
    RE OSC STATUS OF ARBITRATION COMPLETION
      Blank 17 Filed: 3/2/2012, Entered: 3/2/2012 Notice of Continuance
        Blank 16 Filed: 3/2/2012, Entered: 3/2/2012 Substitution of Attorney
          Blank 15 Filed: 12/23/2011, Entered: 12/23/2011 Substitution of Attorney
            Blank 14 Filed: 12/6/2011, Entered: 12/6/2011 Notice of Continuance
              Blank 13 Filed: 6/8/2011, Entered: 6/8/2011 Declaration
              OF TIMOTHY A. LORANGER RE OSC RE DISMISSAL AND STATUTE OF ARBITRA- TION; AND ORDER
                Blank 12 Filed: 2/1/2011, Entered: 2/1/2011 Notice
                of osc
                  Blank 11 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: 1/7/2011 Stipulation and Order
                  STIPULATION RE: PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; ORDER THEREON
                    Blank 10 Filed: 1/3/2011, Entered: 1/3/2011 Declaration
                    OF TIMOTHY A. LORANGER
                      Blank 9 Filed: 12/29/2010, Entered: 12/29/2010 OSC-RE Other
                      Miscellaneous
                        Blank 8 Filed: 4/29/2010, Entered: 4/29/2010 Notice
                        OF CHANGE JOF FIRM NAME
                          Blank 7 Filed: 4/23/2010, Entered: 4/23/2010 Petition
                          TO COMPEL ARBITRATION
                            Blank 6 Filed: 4/1/2010, Entered: 4/1/2010 Request and Entry of Dismissal
                            WITHOUT PREJUDICE; COMPLAINT; DISMISSAL AS TO DEFT RON DE SALVO AND COLDWELL BANKER ONLY
                              Blank 5 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: 3/26/2010 Proof-Service/Summons
                                Blank 4 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: 3/26/2010 Ntc and Acknowledgement of Receipt
                                  Blank 3 Filed: 1/28/2010, Entered: 1/28/2010 OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
                                    Blank 2 Filed: 10/20/2009, Entered: 10/20/2009 Notice
                                    OF ERRATA
                                      Blank 1 Filed: 10/16/2009, Entered: 10/16/2009 Complaint

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 205 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?