Irina Cuevas v. Wmc Mortgage Corporation et al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. BC425123

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Aurora Loan Services LLC, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Does 1-100, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Wmc Mortgage Corporation, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Cuevas Irina, Plaintiff/Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Setlich John R.
Type Quiet Title (General Jurisdiction)
Status Dismissed - Other 03/15/2010
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 11 Filed: 2/26/2010, Entered: 2/26/2010 Statement-Case Management
    Blank 10 Filed: 2/11/2010, Entered: 2/11/2010 Notice of Continuance
    of case mgmt conf
      Blank 9 Filed: 2/11/2010, Entered: 2/11/2010 Demurrer
      to complt
        Blank 8 Filed: 1/15/2010, Entered: 1/15/2010 Proof-Service/Summons
          Blank 7 Filed: 11/24/2009, Entered: 11/24/2009 Declaration
          of john r. setlich
            Blank 6 Filed: 11/24/2009, Entered: 11/24/2009 Declaration
            regarding ex parte notice
              Blank 5 Filed: 11/24/2009, Entered: 11/24/2009 Exparte Application
              for a tro and osc
                Blank 4 Filed: 11/24/2009, Entered: 11/24/2009 Declaration
                of irina cuevas
                  Blank 3 Filed: 11/17/2009, Entered: 11/17/2009 Notice-Case Management Conference
                    Blank 2 Filed: 11/17/2009, Entered: 11/17/2009 OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
                      Blank 1 Filed: 11/3/2009, Entered: 11/3/2009 Complaint

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 7 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?