Cit Technology Financing Services Inc v. Ultra Pro Corporati

State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. BC429209
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo CIT Technology Financing Services, Inc., Plaintiff/Petitioner
v.
No Logo Does 1 Through 10, Defendant/Respondent

Represented by Porter David S. Law Offices Of

No Logo Ultra Pro Corporation, Defendant/Respondent

Represented by Porter David S. Law Offices Of

Attributes
Type Other Promissory Note/Collections (General Jurisdiction)
Status Dismissed - Other 06/15/2010
Timeline
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 7 Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: 6/11/2010 Notice-Settlement
Request RequestSpace
Blank 6 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: 5/24/2010 Statement-Case Management
Request RequestSpace
Blank 5 Filed: 3/2/2010, Entered: 3/2/2010 Notice
OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Request RequestSpace
Blank 4 Filed: 2/25/2010, Entered: 2/25/2010 Notice-Case Management Conference
Request RequestSpace
Blank 3 Filed: 2/18/2010, Entered: 2/18/2010 Answer
Request RequestSpace
Blank 2 Filed: 1/26/2010, Entered: 1/26/2010 Proof-Service/Summons
Request RequestSpace
Blank 1 Filed: 1/5/2010, Entered: 1/5/2010 Complaint
Request RequestSpace

Statistics

This case has been viewed 11 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?