Emma Breslin et al v. Donald J Trump et al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. BC437908

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Breslin Emma, Plaintiff
No Logo Chen Rosa, Plaintiff
No Logo Chen, Thomas, Plaintiff
No Logo Cho Julia, Plaintiff
No Logo Cho Ken, Plaintiff
No Logo D'amico Douglas, Plaintiff
No Logo Glassman Richard, Plaintiff
No Logo Langford Louis L., Plaintiff
No Logo Malooly Robert, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Afisher Llc, Defendant
No Logo Banco J.p. Morgan S.a., Defendant
No Logo Bander Fisher Llc, Defendant
No Logo Bandera Crane Llc, Defendant
No Logo Bandera Fisher Family Llc, Defendant
No Logo Bandera Grosfeld Llc, Defendant
No Logo Bandera Richard Fisher Llc, Defendant
No Logo Bank Of Ny Mellon S.a. Institution De, Defendant
No Logo Bicknell Ryan, Defendant
No Logo Collinridge Tracy, Defendant
No Logo Crane Joshua, Defendant
No Logo Davis, Richard Dean, Defendant
No Logo Does 1 Through 500, Defendant
No Logo Dolker Jason, Defendant
No Logo Dupuis Peter, Defendant
No Logo Elrod Kevin, Defendant
No Logo Federman Casey, Defendant
No Logo Fg Wilshire Llc, Defendant
No Logo Fisher, Adam, Defendant
No Logo Fisher, Richard, Defendant
No Logo Frere Marie Laure, Defendant
No Logo Grosfeld Jason, Defendant
No Logo Hourston Renee, Defendant
No Logo Institucion De Banca Multiple, Defendant
No Logo Irongate Capital Partners Llc, Defendant
No Logo Irongate Development, Defendant
No Logo Irongate Punta Bandera Investors Usa Llc, Defendant
No Logo Irongate Wilshire Llc, Defendant
No Logo J.p. Morgan Grupo Frananciero Division, Defendant
No Logo Jgrosfeld Llc, Defendant
No Logo Jk Grosfeld Llc, Defendant
No Logo Landholt Sid, Defendant
No Logo Leduc Jay, Defendant
No Logo Mann Robert Brendan, Defendant
No Logo Pb Impulsores S. De C.v., Defendant
No Logo Punta Bandera Investors Usa Ii Llc, Defendant
No Logo Punta Bandera Investors Usa Llc, Defendant
No Logo Remax International Inc., Defendant
No Logo Resort Dynamics Inc., Defendant
No Logo Rockey David, Defendant
No Logo S&p Destination Properties Inc., Defendant
No Logo S&p Destination Properties S.a. De D.v, Defendant
No Logo S&p Destination Properties U.s. Inc., Defendant
No Logo S&p Destinational Properties L.p., Defendant
No Logo S&p Real Estate Partners, Defendant
No Logo Sanchez Mark, Defendant
No Logo Setter Jacquelyn, Defendant
No Logo Susel Matias Rodolfo, Defendant
No Logo The Bank Of Ny Mellon, Defendant
No Logo The Trump Corporation, Defendant
Trump Organization, Inc. Trump Organization, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "The Trump Organization Inc."
Trump Organization, LLC Trump Organization, LLC, Defendant
Officially listed as "The Trump Organization Llc"
Trump, Donald J. Trump, Donald J., Defendant
Officer/Director, Riviera Holdings Corp
No Logo Trump, Donald J. Jr., Defendant
No Logo Trump, Ivanka, Defendant
Trump Marks Baja LLC Trump Marks Baja LLC, Defendant
Trump Marks LLC Trump Marks LLC, Defendant
Type Fraud (no contract) (General Jurisdiction)
Status Dismissed - Other 12/11/2013
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 4 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: 7/30/2010 Notice-Related Cases
    Blank 3 Filed: 6/23/2010, Entered: 6/23/2010 Notice-Related Cases
      Blank 2 Filed: 6/8/2010, Entered: 6/8/2010 Notice-Case Management Conference
        Blank 1 Filed: 5/17/2010, Entered: 5/17/2010 Complaint

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 102 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?