Alba R Melgar v. Td Services Company et al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. BC439731

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Does 1 Through 100, Defendant/Respondent

Represented by Houser & Allison

No Logo Lsi Title Company, Defendant/Respondent

Represented by Houser & Allison

No Logo Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Defendant/Respondent

Represented by Houser & Allison

No Logo Td Services Company, Defendant/Respondent

Represented by Houser & Allison

U.S. Bank, NA U.S. Bank, NA, Defendant/Respondent
Officially listed as "Us Bank National Association"

Represented by Houser & Allison

No Logo Westwood Associates, Defendant/Respondent

Represented by Houser & Allison

No Logo Wmc Mortgage Corporation, Defendant/Respondent

Represented by Houser & Allison

No Logo Melgar Alba R., Plaintiff/Petitioner
Type Mortgage Foreclosure (General Jurisdiction)
Status Dismissed - Other 10/12/2010
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 9 Filed: 10/14/2010, Entered: 10/14/2010 Notice of Change of Address
    Blank 8 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: 10/12/2010 Request and Entry of Dismissal
    WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION
      Blank 7 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: 10/12/2010 Request For Dismissal
      WITHOUT PREJUDICE-ENTIRE ACTION.
        Blank 6 Filed: 9/28/2010, Entered: 9/28/2010 Proof of Service
          Blank 5 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: 9/24/2010 Supporting Docs/ P's & A's
          OF DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT
            Blank 4 Filed: 8/19/2010, Entered: 8/19/2010 Notice of Motion
            11-8-10 DEM TO 1ST AMEND COMPLAINT
              Blank 3 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: 7/30/2010 Proof of Service
              FILED MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC.
                Blank 2 Filed: 7/29/2010, Entered: 7/29/2010 Demurrer
                  Blank 1 Filed: 6/15/2010, Entered: 6/15/2010 Complaint

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 9 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?