Keyvan Chapchian et al v. Donald J Trump et al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. BC439950

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Bahaneh Mehrdad Sami, Plaintiff
No Logo Bray Alice, Plaintiff
No Logo Bray Dale, Plaintiff
No Logo Chapchian Keyvan, Plaintiff
No Logo Ghaemi Maria, Plaintiff
No Logo Ghaemi Michael, Plaintiff
No Logo Jenkins Joseph J., Plaintiff
No Logo Mitchell, William L., Plaintiff
No Logo Phillips Breeon, Plaintiff
No Logo Phillips Duncan, Plaintiff
No Logo Sosa Steven L., Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Banco J.p. Morgan S.a. Institucion De, Defendant
No Logo Bandera Crane Llc, Defendant
No Logo Bandera Fisher Family Llc, Defendant
No Logo Bandera Fisher Llc, Defendant
No Logo Bandera Grosfeld Llc, Defendant
No Logo Bandera Richard Fisher Llc, Defendant
No Logo Bank Of Ny Mellon S.a. Institution De, Defendant
No Logo Bicknell Ryan, Defendant
No Logo Collinridge Tracy, Defendant
No Logo Crane Joshua, Defendant
No Logo Davis, Richard Dean, Defendant
No Logo Does 1 Through 500, Defendant
No Logo Dolker Jason, Defendant
No Logo Dupuis Peter, Defendant
No Logo Elrod Kevin, Defendant
No Logo Federman Casey, Defendant
No Logo Fg Wilshire Llc, Defendant
No Logo Fisher, Adam, Defendant
No Logo Fisher, Richard, Defendant
No Logo Frere Marie Laure, Defendant
No Logo Grosfeld Jason, Defendant
No Logo Hourston Renee, Defendant
No Logo Irongate Capital Partners Llc, Defendant
No Logo Irongate Development, Defendant
No Logo Irongate Punta Bandera Investors Usa Llc, Defendant
No Logo Irongate Wilshire Llc, Defendant
No Logo Jgrosfeld Llc, Defendant
No Logo Jk Grosfeld Llc, Defendant
No Logo Landholt Sid, Defendant
No Logo Leduc Jay, Defendant
No Logo Mann Robert Brendan, Defendant
No Logo Pb Impulsores S. De C.v., Defendant
No Logo Punta Bandera Investors Usa Ii Llc, Defendant
No Logo Punta Bandera Investors Usa Llc, Defendant
No Logo Remax International Inc., Defendant
No Logo Resort Dynamics Inc., Defendant
No Logo Rockey David, Defendant
No Logo S&p Destination Properties Inc., Defendant
No Logo S&p Destination Properties L.p., Defendant
No Logo S&p Destination Properties S.a. De D.v, Defendant
No Logo S&p Destination Properties U.s. Inc., Defendant
No Logo S&p Real Estate Partners, Defendant
No Logo Sanchez Mark, Defendant
No Logo Setter Jacquelyn, Defendant
No Logo Susel Matias Rodolfo, Defendant
No Logo The Bank Of Ny Mellon, Defendant
No Logo The Trump Corporation, Defendant
Trump Organization, Inc. Trump Organization, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "The Trump Organization Inc."
Trump Organization, LLC Trump Organization, LLC, Defendant
Officially listed as "The Trump Organization Llc"
Trump, Donald J. Trump, Donald J., Defendant
Officer/Director, Riviera Holdings Corp
No Logo Trump, Donald J. Jr., Defendant
Officially listed as "Trump Donald Jr."
No Logo Trump, Ivanka, Defendant
Trump Marks Baja LLC Trump Marks Baja LLC, Defendant
Trump Marks LLC Trump Marks LLC, Defendant
Type Fraud (no contract) (General Jurisdiction)
Status Cons with Lead Case (see X-Ref) 10/05/2010
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 10 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: 10/5/2010 Partial Dismissal(not entire case)
DEFENDANT PB IMPULSORES, S. DE C.V.,A MEXICAN LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY ONLY W/O PREJUDICE
    Blank 9 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: 10/5/2010 Notice
      Blank 8 Filed: 9/23/2010, Entered: 9/23/2010 Notice
      OF SUBMISSION OF PETITION FOR COORDINATION 3 OF 3
        Blank 7 Filed: 9/23/2010, Entered: 9/23/2010 Notice
        OF SUBMISSION OF PETITION FOR COORDINATION 1 OF 3
          Blank 6 Filed: 9/23/2010, Entered: 9/23/2010 Notice
          OF SUBMISSION OF PETITION FOR COORDINATION 2 OF 3
            Blank 5 Filed: 8/26/2010, Entered: 8/26/2010 Notice
              Blank 4 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: 7/30/2010 Notice-Related Cases
                Blank 3 Filed: 7/16/2010, Entered: 7/16/2010 Notice-Related Cases
                  Blank 2 Filed: 7/9/2010, Entered: 7/9/2010 Notice-Case Management Conference
                    Blank 1 Filed: 6/18/2010, Entered: 6/18/2010 Complaint

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 208 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?