Gus Arvanitis et al v. Donald J Trump et al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. BC441346

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Arvantitis Gus, Plaintiff
No Logo Funk, Barbara, Plaintiff
No Logo Jung, Eun-hee, Plaintiff
No Logo Jung, Paul, Plaintiff
No Logo Nestor Rive, Plaintiff
No Logo Pei Yang Shin, Plaintiff
No Logo Sarmiento Amabel, Plaintiff
No Logo Saucedo Nicolas, Plaintiff
No Logo Sun San San, Plaintiff
No Logo Tonna Mary, Plaintiff
No Logo Tonna Roger, Plaintiff
No Logo Wevert Michelline, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Banco J.p. Morgan S.a. Institucion De, Defendant
No Logo Bandera Crane Llc, Defendant
No Logo Bandera Fisher Family Llc, Defendant
No Logo Bandera Grosfeld Llc, Defendant
No Logo Bandera Richard Fisher Llc, Defendant
No Logo Bicknell Ryan, Defendant
No Logo Collinridge Tracy, Defendant
No Logo Crane Joshua, Defendant
No Logo Davis, Richard Dean, Defendant
No Logo Does 1 Through 500, Defendant
No Logo Dolker Jason, Defendant
No Logo Federman Casey, Defendant
No Logo Fisher, Adam, Defendant
No Logo Fisher, Richard, Defendant
No Logo Frere Marie Laure, Defendant
No Logo Grosfeld Jason, Defendant
No Logo Hourston Renee, Defendant
No Logo Irongate Capital Partners Llc, Defendant
No Logo Irongate Development, Defendant
No Logo Irongate Punta Bandera Investors Usa Llc, Defendant
No Logo Irongate Wilshire Llc, Defendant
No Logo Landamerica Title Company, Defendant
No Logo Mann Robert Brendan, Defendant
No Logo Punta Bandera Investors Usa Ii Llc, Defendant
No Logo Punta Bandera Investors Usa Llc, Defendant
No Logo Resort Dynamics Inc., Defendant
No Logo S&p Destination Properties Inc., Defendant
No Logo S&p Destination Properties Lp, Defendant
No Logo S&p Destination Properties S.a. De D.v., Defendant
No Logo S&p Destination Properties U.s. Inc., Defendant
No Logo Sanchez Mark, Defendant
No Logo Southland Title Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Southland Title Of San Diego, Defendant
No Logo Susel Matias Rodolfo, Defendant
Trump, Donald J. Trump, Donald J., Defendant
Officer/Director, Riviera Holdings Corp
No Logo Trump, Donald J. Jr., Defendant
Officially listed as "Trump Donald Jr."
No Logo Trump, Ivanka, Defendant
Trump Marks LLC Trump Marks LLC, Defendant
Type Fraud (no contract) (General Jurisdiction)
Status Cons with Lead Case (see X-Ref) 10/05/2010
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 15 Filed: 12/30/2010, Entered: 12/30/2010 First Amended Complaint
    Blank 14 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: 10/5/2010 Notice
      Blank 13 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: 10/1/2010 Notice
      OF NON OPPOSITION
        Blank 12 Filed: 9/23/2010, Entered: 9/23/2010 Notice
        OF SUBMISSION OF PETITION FOR COORDINATION 1 OF 3
          Blank 11 Filed: 9/23/2010, Entered: 9/23/2010 Notice
          OF SUBMISSION OF PETITION FOR COORDINATION 3 OF 3
            Blank 10 Filed: 9/23/2010, Entered: 9/23/2010 Notice
            OF SUBMISSION OF PETITION FOR COORDINATION 2 OF 3
              Blank 9 Filed: 9/8/2010, Entered: 9/8/2010 Supplemental Proof Of Service
                Blank 8 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: 9/7/2010 Notice-Related Cases
                  Blank 7 Filed: 8/26/2010, Entered: 8/26/2010 Notice of Reassignment and Order
                    Blank 6 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: 7/30/2010 Notice-Related Cases
                      Blank 5 Filed: 7/29/2010, Entered: 7/29/2010 Notice-Case Management Conference
                        Blank 4 Filed: 7/29/2010, Entered: 7/29/2010 OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
                          Blank 3 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: 7/23/2010 Notice-Related Cases
                            Blank 2 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: 7/23/2010 Summons Filed
                              Blank 1 Filed: 7/9/2010, Entered: 7/9/2010 Complaint

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 103 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?