Carl Jones v. Universal Network Television Llc et al

State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. BC441981
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Jones, Carl, Plaintiff/Petitioner

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Organ A. Lawrence
v.
No Logo Casey, Mike, Defendant/Respondent

Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

No Logo Does 1 Through 100, Defendant/Respondent

Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

No Logo Patton Tyler, Defendant/Respondent

Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

No Logo Universal Network Television, LLC, Defendant/Respondent

Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Attributes
Type Other Employment Complaint (General Jurisdiction)
Status Dismissed - Other 03/23/2012
Timeline
  Entries (254) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 254 Filed: 3/23/2012, Entered: 3/23/2012 Request and Entry of Dismissal
WITH PREJUDICE; ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION
Request RequestSpace
Blank 253 Filed: 3/12/2012, Entered: 3/12/2012 Declaration
AND ORDER RE: ADVANCE JURY FEES
Request RequestSpace
Blank 252 Filed: 3/9/2012, Entered: 3/9/2012 Exparte Application
PLAINTIFF CARL JONES' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO SEAL DECLARATION AND ORDER RE: ADVANCE JURY FEES
Request RequestSpace
Blank 251 Filed: 2/24/2012, Entered: 2/24/2012 Notice
of resoultion of action
Request RequestSpace
Blank 250 Filed: 2/22/2012, Entered: 2/22/2012 Proof of Service
Request RequestSpace
Blank 249 Filed: 2/22/2012, Entered: 2/22/2012 Motion to Compel
Request RequestSpace
Blank 248 Filed: 2/22/2012, Entered: 2/22/2012 Points and Authorities
Request RequestSpace
Blank 247 Filed: 2/22/2012, Entered: 2/22/2012 Opposition Document
Request RequestSpace
Blank 246 Filed: 2/22/2012, Entered: 2/22/2012 Declaration
OF LAWRENCE A. ORGAN
Request RequestSpace
Blank 245 Filed: 2/22/2012, Entered: 2/22/2012 Statement of Facts
Request RequestSpace
Blank 244 Filed: 2/22/2012, Entered: 2/22/2012 Declaration
OF BARBARA E. FIGARI
Request RequestSpace
Blank 243 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: 2/21/2012 Declaration
of Shannon Clawson in support of opposition to ex parte
Request RequestSpace
Blank 242 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: 2/21/2012 Exparte Application
for order shortening time
Request RequestSpace
Blank 241 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: 2/21/2012 Points and Authorities
in support of exparte
Request RequestSpace
Blank 240 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: 2/21/2012 Declaration
Request RequestSpace
Blank 239 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: 2/21/2012 Notice
certificate of service
Request RequestSpace
Blank 238 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: 2/21/2012 Opposition Document
to ex parte of plaintiff to shorten time
Request RequestSpace
Blank 237 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: 2/21/2012 Notice
of reverse offer of proof motion in limine
Request RequestSpace
Blank 236 Filed: 2/17/2012, Entered: 2/17/2012 Motion to Compel
Request RequestSpace
Blank 235 Filed: 2/17/2012, Entered: 2/17/2012 Declaration
OF MICHAEL W. SEITZ
Request RequestSpace
Blank 234 Filed: 2/17/2012, Entered: 2/17/2012 Brief
REGARDING "DENY ACCESS" DECISION
Request RequestSpace
Blank 233 Filed: 2/17/2012, Entered: 2/17/2012 Brief
Request RequestSpace
Blank 232 Filed: 2/17/2012, Entered: 2/17/2012 Brief
REGARDING VERDICT FORM
Request RequestSpace
Blank 231 Filed: 2/17/2012, Entered: 2/17/2012 Statement of Facts
Request RequestSpace
Blank 230 Filed: 2/17/2012, Entered: 2/17/2012 Points and Authorities
Request RequestSpace
Blank 229 Filed: 2/17/2012, Entered: 2/17/2012 Declaration
of barabra e. figari
Request RequestSpace
Blank 228 Filed: 2/17/2012, Entered: 2/17/2012 Proof of Service
Request RequestSpace
Blank 227 Filed: 2/17/2012, Entered: 2/17/2012 Notice
CERTIFIATE OF SERVICE
Request RequestSpace
Blank 226 Filed: 2/15/2012, Entered: 2/15/2012 miscellaneous other
CIVIL DEPOSIT 2/10/12 REPORTER'S FEES CCH503057050
Request RequestSpace
Blank 225 Filed: 2/15/2012, Entered: 2/15/2012 Notice
OF CHRONOLOGY OF CONDUCT REQUESTED BY THE COURT
Request RequestSpace
Blank 224 Filed: 2/14/2012, Entered: 2/14/2012 Opposition Document
Request RequestSpace
Blank 223 Filed: 2/10/2012, Entered: 2/10/2012 List of Exhibits
Request RequestSpace
Blank 222 Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: 2/9/2012 Statement of Case
Request RequestSpace
Blank 221 Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: 2/9/2012 List of Witnesses
Request RequestSpace
Blank 220 Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: 2/9/2012 Proof of Service
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Request RequestSpace
Blank 219 Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: 2/9/2012 Statement of Case
DEFT'S (PROPOSED) SHORT STATEMENT OF THE CASE
Request RequestSpace
Blank 218 Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: 2/9/2012 Notice
proposed special verdict form
Request RequestSpace
Blank 217 Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: 2/9/2012 Request for Jury Instructions
Request RequestSpace
Blank 216 Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: 2/9/2012 List of Exhibits
Request RequestSpace
Blank 215 Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: 2/9/2012 List of Witnesses
Request RequestSpace
Blank 214 Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: 2/9/2012 Request for Jury Instructions
(PROPOSED) JURY INSTRUCTIONS
Request RequestSpace
Blank 213 Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: 2/9/2012 List of Exhibits
Request RequestSpace
Blank 212 Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: 2/9/2012 Statement of Case
Request RequestSpace
Blank 211 Filed: 2/3/2012, Entered: 2/3/2012 Notice
of withdrawal of ogletree, deakins nash, smoak & stewart, p.c., as counsel of record
Request RequestSpace
Blank 210 Filed: 1/31/2012, Entered: 1/31/2012 Reply/Response
Request RequestSpace
Blank 209 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: 1/30/2012 Proof-Service/Summons
Request RequestSpace
Blank 208 Filed: 1/25/2012, Entered: 1/25/2012 Opposition Document
to motion for reconsideration
Request RequestSpace
Blank 207 Filed: 1/24/2012, Entered: 1/24/2012 Reply/Response
Request RequestSpace
Blank 206 Filed: 1/24/2012, Entered: 1/24/2012 Notice
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Request RequestSpace
Blank 205 Filed: 1/24/2012, Entered: 1/24/2012 Reply/Response
IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT UNIVERSAL NETWORK TELEVISION, LLCS MOTION IN LIMINE #6 TO EXCLUDE STATEMENTS
Request RequestSpace
Blank 204 Filed: 1/24/2012, Entered: 1/24/2012 Reply/Response
IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE #2
Request RequestSpace
Blank 203 Filed: 1/24/2012, Entered: 1/24/2012 Reply/Response
IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT UNIVERSAL NETWORK TELEVISION LLC'S MOTION IN LIMINE #4 TO EXCLUDE THE TESTI- MONY OF PLFFS EXPERT DR. ANTHONY READING
Request RequestSpace
Blank 202 Filed: 1/24/2012, Entered: 1/24/2012 Brief - Reply
TO OPPOSITION TO MOTIONS IN LIMINE NO. 1 THRU 14
Request RequestSpace
Blank 201 Filed: 1/24/2012, Entered: 1/24/2012 Application-Miscellaneous
Request RequestSpace
Blank 200 Filed: 1/24/2012, Entered: 1/24/2012 Reply to Opposition
MOTION FOR ORDER
Request RequestSpace
Blank 199 Filed: 1/24/2012, Entered: 1/24/2012 Declaration
OF BARBARA E. FIGARI
Request RequestSpace
Blank 198 Filed: 1/23/2012, Entered: 1/23/2012 Reply/Response
BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE #1
Request RequestSpace
Blank 197 Filed: 1/23/2012, Entered: 1/23/2012 Reply/Response
BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIM- INE NO. 3 AND JOINDER IN UNIVERSAL NETWORK TELEVIIONS REPLY BRIEFS IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION IN LIMINE
Request RequestSpace
Blank 196 Filed: 1/23/2012, Entered: 1/23/2012 Reply/Response
BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE #3 TO EXCLUDE ALL EVIDENCE AGAINST MIKE CASEY ON THE THIRD CAUSE OF ACTION
Request RequestSpace
Blank 195 Filed: 1/23/2012, Entered: 1/23/2012 Reply/Response
BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE #5 AND JOINDER IN UNIVERSAL NETWORK TELEVISION'S MOTION IN LIMINE
Request RequestSpace
Blank 194 Filed: 1/23/2012, Entered: 1/23/2012 Reply/Response
BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMI NE NO. 2 TO EXCLUDE ALL EVIDENCE AGAINST MIKE CASEY ON THE SIXTH CAUSE OF ACTION
Request RequestSpace
Blank 193 Filed: 1/23/2012, Entered: 1/23/2012 Reply/Response
BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIM- INE NO. 2 TO EXCLUDE ALL EVIDENCE AGAINST TYLER PATTON ON THE SIXTH CAUSE OF ACTOIN
Request RequestSpace
Blank 192 Filed: 1/23/2012, Entered: 1/23/2012 Reply/Response
BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN EVIDENCE AGAINST TYLER PATTON ON THE SECOND CAUSE OF ACTION
Request RequestSpace
Blank 191 Filed: 1/19/2012, Entered: 1/19/2012 Notice
of errata
Request RequestSpace
Blank 190 Filed: 1/18/2012, Entered: 1/18/2012 Joinder
of opposition of defts patton and casey to motion in limine #9
Request RequestSpace
Blank 189 Filed: 1/18/2012, Entered: 1/18/2012 Opposition Document
Request RequestSpace
Blank 188 Filed: 1/18/2012, Entered: 1/18/2012 Opposition Document
to mil #1
Request RequestSpace
Blank 187 Filed: 1/18/2012, Entered: 1/18/2012 Points and Authorities
om opposition to plaintiffs motion in limine #13 - to preclude refer- ence to or introduction of video or photographss
Request RequestSpace
Blank 186 Filed: 1/18/2012, Entered: 1/18/2012 Opposition Document
to motions in limine #1-4
Request RequestSpace
Blank 185 Filed: 1/18/2012, Entered: 1/18/2012 Opposition Document
to mil #12 to exclude any testimon or evidence of bebefits
Request RequestSpace
Blank 184 Filed: 1/18/2012, Entered: 1/18/2012 Notice
of certificate of service
Request RequestSpace
Blank 183 Filed: 1/18/2012, Entered: 1/18/2012 Opposition Document
to motion in limine #3 to preclude testimony or references regarding plffs use of the racial
Request RequestSpace
Blank 182 Filed: 1/18/2012, Entered: 1/18/2012 Joinder
of dfts patton and casey of oppos- ition to motion in limine #4
Request RequestSpace
Blank 181 Filed: 1/18/2012, Entered: 1/18/2012 Joinder
of opposition of defts patton and casey to motion in limine #13
Request RequestSpace
Blank 180 Filed: 1/18/2012, Entered: 1/18/2012 Joinder
of opposition of patton & casey to motion in limine #6
Request RequestSpace
Blank 179 Filed: 1/18/2012, Entered: 1/18/2012 Joinder
of dfts patton and casey of oppos- ition to motion in limine #5
Request RequestSpace
Blank 178 Filed: 1/18/2012, Entered: 1/18/2012 Opposition Document
to mil #4
Request RequestSpace
Blank 177 Filed: 1/18/2012, Entered: 1/18/2012 Opposition Document
mil #9 to prevent defts presenting evidence relating to plffs family background
Request RequestSpace
Blank 176 Filed: 1/18/2012, Entered: 1/18/2012 Joinder
of opposition of defts patton and casey to motion in limine #12
Request RequestSpace
Blank 175 Filed: 1/18/2012, Entered: 1/18/2012 Declaration
of lawrence orgAN
Request RequestSpace
Blank 174 Filed: 1/18/2012, Entered: 1/18/2012 Opposition Document
to motion in limine nos. 1-3
Request RequestSpace
Blank 173 Filed: 1/18/2012, Entered: 1/18/2012 Points and Authorities
in opposition to motion in limine #7 to preclude use of documents not produced
Request RequestSpace
Blank 172 Filed: 1/18/2012, Entered: 1/18/2012 Opposition Document
#5 to prevents defts from present- ing evidence relating to dwayne white's murder charges
Request RequestSpace
Blank 171 Filed: 1/18/2012, Entered: 1/18/2012 Opposition Document
to mil #3 incident of miki casey harassing a 17 year old
Request RequestSpace
Blank 170 Filed: 1/18/2012, Entered: 1/18/2012 Opposition Document
to motion in limine #5
Request RequestSpace
Blank 169 Filed: 1/18/2012, Entered: 1/18/2012 Opposition Document
to motion in limine #1 to prevent defendants from presenting evidenc relating to plffs involvement
Request RequestSpace
Blank 168 Filed: 1/18/2012, Entered: 1/18/2012 Proof of Service
pf plaintiff's opposition, delcar= ation and exhibits to defts motion in limine
Request RequestSpace
Blank 167 Filed: 1/18/2012, Entered: 1/18/2012 Joinder
of opposition of dfts patton and casey to motion in limine #10
Request RequestSpace
Blank 166 Filed: 1/18/2012, Entered: 1/18/2012 Joinder
deft tyler patton and mike casey's opposition to motion in limine #2
Request RequestSpace
Blank 165 Filed: 1/18/2012, Entered: 1/18/2012 Joinder
of opposition of dfts patton and casey to motion in limine #7
Request RequestSpace
Blank 164 Filed: 1/18/2012, Entered: 1/18/2012 Joinder
of opposition of defts patton and casey to motion in limine #14
Request RequestSpace
Blank 163 Filed: 1/18/2012, Entered: 1/18/2012 Joinder
in opposition of defts patton and casey to plffs motion for an order to permit filing of amended compl
Request RequestSpace
Blank 162 Filed: 1/18/2012, Entered: 1/18/2012 Joinder
of opposition of defts patton and casey to motion in limine #11
Request RequestSpace
Blank 161 Filed: 1/18/2012, Entered: 1/18/2012 Joinder
of tyler patton and mike casey's to motion in limine #1
Request RequestSpace
Blank 160 Filed: 1/18/2012, Entered: 1/18/2012 Joinder
of opposistion of patton and casey to motion in limine #8
Request RequestSpace
Blank 159 Filed: 1/18/2012, Entered: 1/18/2012 Joinder
of dfts patton and casey of oppos- ition to motion in limine #3
Request RequestSpace
Blank 158 Filed: 1/18/2012, Entered: 1/18/2012 Opposition Document
to mil #10 to prevent defts from presenting information relating to the character of lawanda thomas
Request RequestSpace
Blank 157 Filed: 1/18/2012, Entered: 1/18/2012 Opposition Document
to mil #11 to prevent defts from presenting info srelated to the families of lawanda thomas and veronica perrez
Request RequestSpace
Blank 156 Filed: 1/18/2012, Entered: 1/18/2012 Opposition Document
mil #2 to prevent defts from presenting evidence relating to plffs involvement
Request RequestSpace
Blank 155 Filed: 1/18/2012, Entered: 1/18/2012 Opposition Document
mil #8 to exclude testimony or reference to any evidence
Request RequestSpace
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 154 Filed: 1/18/2012, Entered: 1/18/2012 Opposition Document
mil #14 - to preclude effect of un timely and improper deposition
Request RequestSpace
Blank 153 Filed: 1/18/2012, Entered: 1/18/2012 Opposition Document
to motion in limine #2 to exclude evidence unrelated to alleged sexual advances
Request RequestSpace
Blank 152 Filed: 1/18/2012, Entered: 1/18/2012 Opposition Document
to motion in limine #6 - exlcude evidence re the size and wealth of the law firms representing it
Request RequestSpace
Blank 151 Filed: 1/18/2012, Entered: 1/18/2012 Motion in Limine
mil #6 to prevent defts from pre- senting evidence that plff was a pimp
Request RequestSpace
Blank 150 Filed: 1/18/2012, Entered: 1/18/2012 Opposition Document
mit #4 to preclude testimony or references by witnesses,,,,,
Request RequestSpace
Blank 149 Filed: 1/17/2012, Entered: 1/17/2012 Exparte Application
PLFF'S TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Request RequestSpace
Blank 148 Filed: 1/17/2012, Entered: 1/17/2012 Notice of Motion
FOR RELIEF
Request RequestSpace
Blank 147 Filed: 1/17/2012, Entered: 1/17/2012 Notice
OF CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Request RequestSpace
Blank 146 Filed: 1/17/2012, Entered: 1/17/2012 Memorandum - Other
OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES
Request RequestSpace
Blank 145 Filed: 1/17/2012, Entered: 1/17/2012 miscellaneous other
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Request RequestSpace
Blank 144 Filed: 1/13/2012, Entered: 1/13/2012 Notice of Motion
FOR RELIEF FROM 1/3/12 ORDER
Request RequestSpace
Blank 143 Filed: 1/13/2012, Entered: 1/13/2012 Notice
OF CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Request RequestSpace
Blank 142 Filed: 1/10/2012, Entered: 1/10/2012 Notice of Continuance
Request RequestSpace
Blank 141 Filed: 1/6/2012, Entered: 1/6/2012 Notice of Continuance
Request RequestSpace
Blank 140 Filed: 1/5/2012, Entered: 1/5/2012 Notice of Continuance
Request RequestSpace
Blank 139 Filed: 1/3/2012, Entered: 1/3/2012 Declaration
OF WILLIAM BLOCH
Request RequestSpace
Blank 138 Filed: 1/3/2012, Entered: 1/3/2012 Notice of Motion
FOR AN ORDER PERMITTING FILING OF ATTACHED AMENDED COMP
Request RequestSpace
Blank 137 Filed: 1/3/2012, Entered: 1/3/2012 Declaration
OF LARRY ORGAN
Request RequestSpace
Blank 136 Filed: 12/30/2011, Entered: 12/30/2011 Notice
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Request RequestSpace
Blank 135 Filed: 12/30/2011, Entered: 12/30/2011 Exparte Application
Request RequestSpace
Blank 134 Filed: 12/30/2011, Entered: 12/30/2011 Declaration
OF HENRY SHIELDS, JR. IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT TYLER PATTON AND MIKE CASEY'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE
Request RequestSpace
Blank 133 Filed: 12/29/2011, Entered: 12/29/2011 Exparte Application
Request RequestSpace
Blank 132 Filed: 12/27/2011, Entered: 12/27/2011 Declaration
of counsel barbara e. figari
Request RequestSpace
Blank 131 Filed: 12/27/2011, Entered: 12/27/2011 Proof of Service
Request RequestSpace
Blank 130 Filed: 12/27/2011, Entered: 12/27/2011 Notice
of posting of jury fees
Request RequestSpace
Blank 129 Filed: 12/27/2011, Entered: 12/27/2011 Proof of Service
Request RequestSpace
Blank 128 Filed: 12/27/2011, Entered: 12/27/2011 Notice
OF PLAINTIFFS CORRECTED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTIONS IN LIMINE NO. 1-14
Request RequestSpace
Blank 127 Filed: 12/27/2011, Entered: 12/27/2011 Points and Authorities
Request RequestSpace
Blank 126 Filed: 12/27/2011, Entered: 12/27/2011 Motion in Limine
plaintiffs notice of motion and motion in limines nos. 1-14
Request RequestSpace
Blank 125 Filed: 12/27/2011, Entered: 12/27/2011 Application-Miscellaneous
Request RequestSpace
Blank 124 Filed: 12/27/2011, Entered: 12/27/2011 Motion in Limine
#6 to exclude statements and evid- ence relating to the size and/or w wealth
Request RequestSpace
Blank 123 Filed: 12/27/2011, Entered: 12/27/2011 Motion in Limine
#4 to exclude testimony of plff expert dr. anthony reading
Request RequestSpace
Blank 122 Filed: 12/27/2011, Entered: 12/27/2011 Motion in Limine
#3 to exclude all evidence against mike casey on the third cause of action
Request RequestSpace
Blank 121 Filed: 12/27/2011, Entered: 12/27/2011 Motion in Limine
#2 to exclude all evidence against tyler patton on the sixth cause of action
Request RequestSpace
Blank 120 Filed: 12/27/2011, Entered: 12/27/2011 Motion in Limine
#2 to exclude all evidence against mike casey on the sixth cause of action
Request RequestSpace
Blank 119 Filed: 12/27/2011, Entered: 12/27/2011 Motion in Limine
#2 to exclude all evidence unrela- ted to alleged sexual advances
Request RequestSpace
Blank 118 Filed: 12/27/2011, Entered: 12/27/2011 Motion in Limine
#1 o exclude all evidence against tyler patton on the second cause of action
Request RequestSpace
Blank 117 Filed: 12/27/2011, Entered: 12/27/2011 Motion in Limine
#5 to exclude evidence protected by a privilege
Request RequestSpace
Blank 116 Filed: 12/27/2011, Entered: 12/27/2011 Declaration
of kristopher davis
Request RequestSpace
Blank 115 Filed: 12/27/2011, Entered: 12/27/2011 Joinder
of mike casey's in motion in limine #4
Request RequestSpace
Sealed Legal Document 114 Filed: 12/27/2011, Entered: 12/27/2011 Motion in Limine
#3 filed under seal
Blank 113 Filed: 12/27/2011, Entered: 12/27/2011 Motion in Limine
#3 and joinder in universal net- work television's motion in limine
Request RequestSpace
Blank 112 Filed: 12/27/2011, Entered: 12/27/2011 Motion in Limine
#1 to exclude evidence relating to claims and issues that have been disposed of by the court or that\ were not pled
Request RequestSpace
Blank 111 Filed: 12/27/2011, Entered: 12/27/2011 Motion in Limine
#1 to exclude all evidence against mike casey on the second cause of action
Request RequestSpace
Blank 110 Filed: 12/27/2011, Entered: 12/27/2011 Declaration
of kristopher s. davis
Request RequestSpace
Blank 109 Filed: 12/16/2011, Entered: 12/16/2011 Stipulation
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING PROTECTED MATERIAL
Request RequestSpace
Blank 108 Filed: 12/15/2011, Entered: 12/15/2011 Notice
certificate of service
Request RequestSpace
Blank 107 Filed: 12/15/2011, Entered: 12/15/2011 Reply/Response
Request RequestSpace
Blank 106 Filed: 12/14/2011, Entered: 12/14/2011 Declaration
OF KELLIE EMMONS
Request RequestSpace
Blank 105 Filed: 12/14/2011, Entered: 12/14/2011 Declaration
OF LYNN HANG
Request RequestSpace
Blank 104 Filed: 12/14/2011, Entered: 12/14/2011 Reply/Response
Request RequestSpace
Blank 103 Filed: 12/12/2011, Entered: 12/12/2011 Proof of Service
AMENDED
Request RequestSpace
Blank 102 Filed: 12/9/2011, Entered: 12/9/2011 Brief
supplemental
Request RequestSpace
Blank 101 Filed: 12/7/2011, Entered: 12/7/2011 Statement of Facts
Request RequestSpace
Blank 100 Filed: 12/7/2011, Entered: 12/7/2011 Proof of Service
Request RequestSpace
Blank 99 Filed: 12/7/2011, Entered: 12/7/2011 Motion to Compel
Request RequestSpace
Blank 98 Filed: 12/6/2011, Entered: 12/6/2011 Opposition Document
Request RequestSpace
Blank 97 Filed: 12/6/2011, Entered: 12/6/2011 Declaration
OF MARCELLUS A. MCRAE
Request RequestSpace
Blank 96 Filed: 12/2/2011, Entered: 12/2/2011 Notice
OF PLFFS ADDITIONAL EVIDENCE MATERIAL TO PLFFS OPPOSITION
Request RequestSpace
Blank 95 Filed: 12/2/2011, Entered: 12/2/2011 Declaration
OF BARBARA E. FIGARI
Request RequestSpace
Blank 94 Filed: 12/1/2011, Entered: 12/1/2011 Notice
of association of counsel
Request RequestSpace
Blank 93 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: 11/29/2011 Response
TO PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT'S REPLY SEPARATE STATEMENT
Request RequestSpace
Blank 92 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: 11/29/2011 Opposition Document
TO PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING ON FUENTES V. AUTOZONE RE: DEFENDANT'S MOTOIN FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION
Request RequestSpace
Blank 91 Filed: 11/23/2011, Entered: 11/23/2011 Brief
SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF
Request RequestSpace
Blank 90 Filed: 11/23/2011, Entered: 11/23/2011 Notice Of Ruling
Request RequestSpace
Blank 89 Filed: 11/23/2011, Entered: 11/23/2011 Objection Document
TO DEFENDNAT'S REPLY SEPARATE STATEMENT
Request RequestSpace
Blank 88 Filed: 11/21/2011, Entered: 11/21/2011 Proof of Service
Request RequestSpace
Blank 87 Filed: 11/21/2011, Entered: 11/21/2011 Reply/Response
AND OBJECTIONS
Request RequestSpace
Blank 86 Filed: 11/21/2011, Entered: 11/21/2011 Reply/Response
Request RequestSpace
Blank 85 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: 11/14/2011 Reply/Response
Request RequestSpace
Blank 84 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: 11/14/2011 Proof of Service
Request RequestSpace
Blank 83 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: 11/14/2011 Declaration
of dean zingus
Request RequestSpace
Blank 82 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: 11/14/2011 Points and Authorities
Request RequestSpace
Blank 81 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: 11/14/2011 Declaration
of counsel barbara e. figari
Request RequestSpace
Blank 80 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: 11/14/2011 Objection Document
Request RequestSpace
Blank 79 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: 11/14/2011 Declaration
of counsel barbara e. figari (volume 2 of 4
Request RequestSpace
Blank 78 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: 11/14/2011 Declaration
of counsel barbara e. figari (vo. 4 of 4
Request RequestSpace
Blank 77 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: 11/14/2011 Declaration
of counsel barbara e. figari (volume 3 of 4
Request RequestSpace
Blank 76 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: 11/14/2011 Notice
of appendix of evidence
Request RequestSpace
Blank 75 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: 11/14/2011 Declaration
of william w. bloch
Request RequestSpace
Blank 74 Filed: 11/9/2011, Entered: 11/9/2011 Notice of Continuance
Request RequestSpace
Blank 73 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: 11/8/2011 Notice Of Ruling
Request RequestSpace
Blank 72 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: 11/8/2011 Exparte Application
Request RequestSpace
Blank 71 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: 11/7/2011 Notice of Continuance
Request RequestSpace
Blank 70 Filed: 11/1/2011, Entered: 11/1/2011 Notice of Continuance
Request RequestSpace
Blank 69 Filed: 10/27/2011, Entered: 10/27/2011 Notice of Continuance
Request RequestSpace
Blank 68 Filed: 10/26/2011, Entered: 10/26/2011 Exparte Application
Request RequestSpace
Blank 67 Filed: 10/13/2011, Entered: 10/13/2011 Brief - Reply
IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL
Request RequestSpace
Blank 66 Filed: 10/12/2011, Entered: 10/12/2011 Reply to Opposition
Request RequestSpace
Blank 65 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: 10/7/2011 Proof of Service
BY MAIL OF MINUTE ORDER RE: MOTION TO DISQUALIFY
Request RequestSpace
Blank 64 Filed: 9/27/2011, Entered: 9/27/2011 Notice of Motion
Request RequestSpace
Blank 63 Filed: 9/27/2011, Entered: 9/27/2011 Notice of Motion
FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Request RequestSpace
Blank 62 Filed: 9/22/2011, Entered: 9/22/2011 Answer
VERIFIED ANSWER TO STATEMENT OF DISQUALIFICATION WITH MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES
Request RequestSpace
Blank 61 Filed: 9/20/2011, Entered: 9/20/2011 miscellaneous other
VERIFIED STATEMENT TO DISQUALIFY THE HONORABLE RICHARD L. FRUIN
Request RequestSpace
Blank 60 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: 9/15/2011 Exparte Application
PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER REMOVING ALL PARTIES FROM THE CRASH SETTLEMENT PROGRAM; DECLARATION OF WILLIAM W. BLOCH IN SUPPORT THEREOF
Request RequestSpace
Blank 59 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: 9/15/2011 Stipulation and Order
APPOINTING DISCOVERY REFEREE AND SETTING HEARING AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION
Request RequestSpace
Blank 58 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: 9/15/2011 Notice Of Ruling
Request RequestSpace
Blank 57 Filed: 9/14/2011, Entered: 9/14/2011 Notice
OF CONSENT AND CERTIFICATION (CRC 3.904(a)(1
Request RequestSpace
Blank 56 Filed: 8/26/2011, Entered: 8/26/2011 Exparte Application
Request RequestSpace
Blank 55 Filed: 8/26/2011, Entered: 8/26/2011 Declaration
Request RequestSpace
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 54 Filed: 8/26/2011, Entered: 8/26/2011 Declaration
Request RequestSpace
Blank 53 Filed: 8/26/2011, Entered: 8/26/2011 Exparte Application
Request RequestSpace
Blank 52 Filed: 8/26/2011, Entered: 8/26/2011 Proof of Service
Request RequestSpace
Blank 51 Filed: 8/17/2011, Entered: 8/17/2011 Notice
OF COURT'S ORDER RE RELATED CASES
Request RequestSpace
Blank 50 Filed: 8/16/2011, Entered: 8/16/2011 Notice
OF ASSIGNED DATE AND TIME FOR EM- PLOYMENT CASES CRASH SETTLEMENT PROGRAM
Request RequestSpace
Blank 49 Filed: 8/4/2011, Entered: 8/4/2011 Notice
OF ASSIGNMENT TO CRASH PROGRAM
Request RequestSpace
Blank 48 Filed: 7/25/2011, Entered: 7/25/2011 Notice-Related Cases
Request RequestSpace
Blank 47 Filed: 7/22/2011, Entered: 7/22/2011 Opposition Document
TO PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICA- TION TO SHORTEN TIME FOR A MOTION COMPELLING TYLER PATTON TO ANSWER QUESTIONS AND FOR MONETARY SANC- TIONS
Request RequestSpace
Blank 46 Filed: 7/22/2011, Entered: 7/22/2011 Declaration
SUPPLEMENTARY DECLARATION OF WILLIAM W. BLOCH IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO HEAR PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO DEPOSITION...
Request RequestSpace
Blank 45 Filed: 7/22/2011, Entered: 7/22/2011 Exparte Application
Request RequestSpace
Blank 44 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: 7/19/2011 Declaration
OF MARRIAN S. CHANG IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT UNIVERSAL NETWORK TELE- VISION, LLC'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND IN OPPOS- ITION TO PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION
Request RequestSpace
Blank 43 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: 7/19/2011 Declaration
OF HENRY SHIELDS, JR. IN OPPOSI- TION TO PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION
Request RequestSpace
Blank 42 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: 7/19/2011 Exparte Application
DEFENDANT UNIVERSAL NETWORK TELE- VISION, LLC'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND OPPOSI- TION TO PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION
Request RequestSpace
Blank 41 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: 7/19/2011 Declaration
OF TYLER PATTON IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION
Request RequestSpace
Blank 40 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: 7/19/2011 Declaration
OF HENRY SHIELDS, JR IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT UNIVERSAL NETWORK TELE- VISION, LLC'S EX PARTE APPLICATION
Request RequestSpace
Blank 39 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: 7/19/2011 Declaration
OF MIKE CASEY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT UNIVERSAL NETWORK TELE- VISION, LLC'S EX PARTE APPLICA- TION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION
Request RequestSpace
Blank 38 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: 7/19/2011 Opposition Document
TO PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICA- TION
Request RequestSpace
Blank 37 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: 7/19/2011 Declaration
OF MIKE CASEY IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION
Request RequestSpace
Blank 36 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: 7/19/2011 Proof of Service
Request RequestSpace
Blank 35 Filed: 6/13/2011, Entered: 6/13/2011 Statement of Facts
Request RequestSpace
Blank 34 Filed: 6/13/2011, Entered: 6/13/2011 Points and Authorities
Request RequestSpace
Blank 33 Filed: 6/13/2011, Entered: 6/13/2011 Notice of Lodging
Request RequestSpace
Blank 32 Filed: 6/13/2011, Entered: 6/13/2011 Motion for Summary Judgment
Request RequestSpace
Blank 31 Filed: 6/10/2011, Entered: 6/10/2011 Joinder
Request RequestSpace
Blank 30 Filed: 6/8/2011, Entered: 6/8/2011 Exparte Application
Request RequestSpace
Blank 29 Filed: 6/8/2011, Entered: 6/8/2011 Exparte Application
OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS TYLER PATTON'S AND MIKE CASEY'S EX PARTE APPLICATION; PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SETTING THE DEPOSITION OF VICTORIA BLAKE RUTHERFORD ON JUNE 10, 11, OR 13
Request RequestSpace
Blank 28 Filed: 6/3/2011, Entered: 6/3/2011 Exparte Application
Request RequestSpace
Blank 27 Filed: 6/2/2011, Entered: 6/2/2011 Exparte Application
Request RequestSpace
Blank 26 Filed: 4/28/2011, Entered: 4/28/2011 Order
GRANTING DEFENDANT UNIVERSAL NETWORK TELEVISION, LLC'S MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS
Request RequestSpace
Blank 25 Filed: 4/20/2011, Entered: 4/20/2011 Notice of Lodging
Request RequestSpace
Blank 24 Filed: 4/20/2011, Entered: 4/20/2011 Supplemental Declaration
OF WILLIAM W. BLOCH
Request RequestSpace
Blank 23 Filed: 4/19/2011, Entered: 4/19/2011 Reply/Response
Request RequestSpace
Blank 22 Filed: 4/13/2011, Entered: 4/13/2011 Opposition Document
Request RequestSpace
Blank 21 Filed: 4/8/2011, Entered: 4/8/2011 Reply/Response
Request RequestSpace
Blank 20 Filed: 4/6/2011, Entered: 4/6/2011 Joinder
in motion for protective order
Request RequestSpace
Blank 19 Filed: 4/4/2011, Entered: 4/4/2011 Notice of Motion
motion for protective order and re quest for monetary sanctions
Request RequestSpace
Blank 18 Filed: 4/1/2011, Entered: 4/1/2011 Opposition Document
Request RequestSpace
Blank 17 Filed: 3/3/2011, Entered: 3/3/2011 Statement of Facts
Request RequestSpace
Blank 16 Filed: 3/3/2011, Entered: 3/3/2011 Motion to Compel
Request RequestSpace
Blank 15 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: 1/24/2011 Proof of Service
OPPOSITION MOTION IN LIMINE
Request RequestSpace
Blank 14 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: 1/21/2011 Notice of Continuance
amended
Request RequestSpace
Blank 13 Filed: 1/4/2011, Entered: 1/4/2011 Notice of Change of Address
Request RequestSpace
Blank 12 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: 12/23/2010 Statement-Case Management
Request RequestSpace
Blank 11 Filed: 12/21/2010, Entered: 12/21/2010 Statement-Case Management
Request RequestSpace
Blank 10 Filed: 12/21/2010, Entered: 12/21/2010 Statement-Case Management
Request RequestSpace
Blank 9 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: 9/20/2010 Notice
of case management conference
Request RequestSpace
Blank 8 Filed: 9/13/2010, Entered: 9/13/2010 Answer To Unverified Complaint
Request RequestSpace
Blank 7 Filed: 9/8/2010, Entered: 9/8/2010 Notice-Case Management Conference
Request RequestSpace
Blank 6 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: 9/1/2010 Answer To Unverified Complaint
Request RequestSpace
Blank 5 Filed: 8/18/2010, Entered: 8/18/2010 Notice
OF CASE REASSIGNMENT
Request RequestSpace
Blank 4 Filed: 8/4/2010, Entered: 8/4/2010 Proof-Service/Summons
Request RequestSpace
Blank 3 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: 7/23/2010 Notice-Case Management Conference
Request RequestSpace
Blank 2 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: 7/23/2010 Affidavit of Prejudice--Peremptory
170.6 (ARAGON) BY PLAINTIFF
Request RequestSpace
Blank 1 Filed: 7/20/2010, Entered: 7/20/2010 Complaint
Request RequestSpace

Statistics

This case has been viewed 68 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?