Sohila Zadran v. Jose Cruz et al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. BC442648

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Aguirre Nubia L. Mendez(doe1)(dsmdwith), Defendant/Respondent
CBS Corporation CBS Corporation, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Cruz Jose (dismissed With), Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Does 1 Through 100, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Radford Studio Center Inc., Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Simpson, Richard D., Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Feinberg Raymond, Mediator
No Logo Wilson Christine J. Esq., Mediator-Immediate Former
No Logo Zadran Sohila, Plaintiff/Petitioner
Type Motor Vehicle - PI/PD/WD (General Jurisdiction)
Status Dismissed - Other 05/14/2012
  Entries (26) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 26 Filed: 5/14/2012, Entered: 5/14/2012 Request and Entry of Dismissal
WITH PREJUDICE
    Blank 25 Filed: 5/3/2012, Entered: 5/3/2012 Partial Dismissal
    with Prejudice
      Blank 24 Filed: 4/16/2012, Entered: 4/16/2012 Notice Of Ruling
        Blank 23 Filed: 4/11/2012, Entered: 4/11/2012 Notice-Settlement
          Blank 22 Filed: 2/10/2012, Entered: 2/10/2012 Notice-Mediation Hrg Date
            Blank 21 Filed: 12/2/2011, Entered: 12/2/2011 miscellaneous other
            FIRST SANA FILED. MEDIATION DID NOT TAKE PLACE.
              Blank 20 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: 10/24/2011 Notice-Mediation Hrg Date
                Blank 19 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: 10/7/2011 Notice Of Ruling
                  Blank 18 Filed: 8/3/2011, Entered: 8/3/2011 Notice-Reassgnment-Mediator
                    Blank 17 Filed: 7/25/2011, Entered: 7/25/2011 Notice of Change of Address
                    EARLY, MASLACH & VAN DUECK 700 SO. FLOWER ST. STE. 2800 LOS ANGELES,CA. 90017 (213) 615-2500 (213) 615-2698
                      Blank 16 Filed: 4/5/2011, Entered: 4/5/2011 Notice-Change-Firm Name / Address
                        Blank 15 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: 2/7/2011 Notice-Assignment-Mediator
                          Blank 14 Filed: 1/26/2011, Entered: 1/26/2011 Notice
                          OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY
                            Blank 13 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: 1/18/2011 Statement-Case Management
                              Blank 12 Filed: 1/11/2011, Entered: 1/11/2011 Motion to Compel
                              3/TOTAL
                                Blank 11 Filed: 1/6/2011, Entered: 1/6/2011 Statement-Case Management
                                  Blank 10 Filed: 11/4/2010, Entered: 11/4/2010 Demand For Jury Trial
                                    Blank 9 Filed: 11/4/2010, Entered: 11/4/2010 Answer
                                      Blank 8 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: 10/5/2010 Statement-Case Management
                                        Blank 7 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: 9/21/2010 Proof of Service
                                        summons and complaint
                                          Blank 6 Filed: 8/27/2010, Entered: 8/27/2010 Proof-Service/Summons
                                            Blank 5 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: 8/20/2010 Proof of Service
                                            summons and complaint
                                              Blank 4 Filed: 8/6/2010, Entered: 8/6/2010 OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
                                                Blank 3 Filed: 8/6/2010, Entered: 8/6/2010 Notice-Case Management Conference
                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 8/5/2010, Entered: 8/5/2010 Amendment to Complaint
                                                  TO ADD DOE 1
                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 7/29/2010, Entered: 7/29/2010 Complaint

                                                      Statistics

                                                      This case has been viewed 701 times.

                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                      Space
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                       
                                                      PlainSite
                                                      Sign Up
                                                      Need Password Help?