R J Ruggiero v. Donald J Trump et al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. BC443134

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Ruggiero R.j., Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Afisher Llc, Defendant
No Logo Bandera Crane Llc, Defendant
No Logo Bandera Fisher Family Llc, Defendant
No Logo Bandera Fisher Llc, Defendant
No Logo Bandera Grosfeld Llc, Defendant
No Logo Bandera Richard Fisher Llc, Defendant
No Logo Bicknell Ryan, Defendant
No Logo Collinridge Tracy, Defendant
No Logo Crane Joshua, Defendant
No Logo Davis, Richard Dean, Defendant
No Logo Does 1 Through 500, Defendant
No Logo Dolker Jason, Defendant
No Logo Dupuis Peter, Defendant
No Logo Elrod Kevin, Defendant
No Logo Federman Casey, Defendant
No Logo Fg Wilshire Llc, Defendant
No Logo Fisher, Adam, Defendant
No Logo Fisher, Richard, Defendant
No Logo Frere Marie Laure, Defendant
No Logo Grosfeld Jason, Defendant
No Logo Hourston Renee, Defendant
No Logo Irongate Azrep Bw Llc, Defendant
No Logo Irongate Capital Partners Llc, Defendant
No Logo Irongate Development, Defendant
No Logo Irongate Punta Bandera Investors Usa Llc, Defendant
No Logo Irongate Wilshire Llc, Defendant
No Logo Jgrosfeld Llc, Defendant
No Logo Jk Grosfeld Llc, Defendant
No Logo Landholt Sid, Defendant
No Logo Leduc Jay, Defendant
No Logo Mann Robert Brendan, Defendant
No Logo Pb Impulsores S. De C.v., Defendant
No Logo Punta Bandera Investors Usa Ii Llc, Defendant
No Logo Punta Bandera Investors Usa Llc, Defendant
No Logo Resort Dyanmics Inc., Defendant
No Logo Rockey David, Defendant
No Logo S&p Destination Properties Inc., Defendant
No Logo S&p Destination Properties L.p., Defendant
No Logo S&p Destination Properties U.s. Inc., Defendant
No Logo S&p Destintation Properties S.a. De D.v, Defendant
No Logo S&p Real Estate Partners, Defendant
No Logo Sanchez Mark, Defendant
No Logo Setter Jacquelyn, Defendant
No Logo Susel Matias Rudolfo, Defendant
No Logo The Trump Corporation, Defendant
Trump Organization, Inc. Trump Organization, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "The Trump Organization Inc."
Trump Organization, LLC Trump Organization, LLC, Defendant
Officially listed as "The Trump Organization Llc"
Trump, Donald J. Trump, Donald J., Defendant
Officer/Director, Riviera Holdings Corp
No Logo Trump, Donald J. Jr., Defendant
Officially listed as "Trump Donald Jr."
No Logo Trump, Ivanka, Defendant
Trump Marks Baja LLC Trump Marks Baja LLC, Defendant
Trump Marks LLC Trump Marks LLC, Defendant
Type Other Commercial/Business Tort (General Jurisdiction)
Status Cons with Lead Case (see X-Ref) 10/05/2010
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 10 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: 10/5/2010 Partial Dismissal(not entire case)
DEFENDANT PB IMPULSORES, S DE CV A MEXICAN LIABILITY COMPANY ONLY
    Blank 9 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: 10/5/2010 Notice
      Blank 8 Filed: 9/23/2010, Entered: 9/23/2010 Notice
      OF SUBMISSION OF PETITION FOR COORDINATION 2 OF 3
        Blank 7 Filed: 9/23/2010, Entered: 9/23/2010 Notice
        OF SUBMISSION OF PETITION FOR COORDINATION 3 OF 3
          Blank 6 Filed: 9/23/2010, Entered: 9/23/2010 Notice
          OF SUBMISSION OF PETITION FOR COORDINATION 1 OF 3
            Blank 5 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: 9/7/2010 Notice-Related Cases
            CASE #: BC409651, FILED ON 3/9/09 IN DEPT. 36
              Blank 4 Filed: 8/26/2010, Entered: 8/26/2010 Notice
              OF ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT OF CASE TO DEPT. 36
                Blank 3 Filed: 8/23/2010, Entered: 8/23/2010 Notice-Related Cases
                CASE #: BC409651, FILED ON 3/9/09 IN DEPT. 36
                  Blank 2 Filed: 8/11/2010, Entered: 8/11/2010 OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
                    Blank 1 Filed: 8/5/2010, Entered: 8/5/2010 Complaint

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 183 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?