Nasser Ghobadpour v. Coldwell Banker et al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. BC450622

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Coldwell Banker Corporation Coldwell Banker Corporation, Defendant/Respondent
Officially listed as "Coldwell Banker"
No Logo Coldwell Banker Residential Brokerage Co., Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Deutsche Bank Berkshire Mortgage Inc., Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Deutsche Bank Insurance Agency Inc., Defendant/Respondent
Deutsche Bank National Trust Company Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Defendant/Respondent
Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc. Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Does 1 Through 50, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Ghobadpour Nasser, Plaintiff/Petitioner
No Logo Maccarley Lisa Esq., Associated Counsel
Type Other Compl-not Tort or Complex (General Jurisdiction)
Status Dismissed - Other 12/13/2012
  Entries (75) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 75 Filed: 12/13/2012, Entered: 12/13/2012 Request and Entry of Dismissal
COMPLAINT W/PREJUDICE
    Blank 74 Filed: 10/23/2012, Entered: 10/23/2012 Notice-Settlement
      Blank 73 Filed: 10/5/2012, Entered: 10/5/2012 Notice
      of posting of jury fees
        Blank 72 Filed: 10/2/2012, Entered: 10/2/2012 Answer
          Blank 71 Filed: 10/2/2012, Entered: 10/2/2012 Exparte Application
          and stipulation for continuance of summary judgment or in the alter- native summary adjudication hearing and trial date; certificat re notice; declaration of Alan K. Abrams; memo P&As in support
            Blank 70 Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: 9/27/2012 Memorandum - Other
            of points and author;
              Blank 69 Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: 9/27/2012 Reply/Response
              RESPONSE TO PLTFFS EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE SUBMITTED
                Blank 68 Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: 9/27/2012 Objection Document
                TO EVIDENCE SUBMITTED
                  Blank 67 Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: 9/27/2012 Declaration
                  OF LISA MACCARLEY
                    Blank 66 Filed: 9/18/2012, Entered: 9/18/2012 Declaration
                    OF NASSER GHOBADPOUR IN OPPOSITION TO MSJ/MSA
                      Blank 65 Filed: 9/18/2012, Entered: 9/18/2012 Declaration
                      OF ALAN K. ABRAMS IN SUPPORT OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING AND OPPOSITION TO MSJ/MSA
                        Blank 64 Filed: 9/18/2012, Entered: 9/18/2012 Objection Document
                        EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS
                          Blank 63 Filed: 9/18/2012, Entered: 9/18/2012 miscellaneous other
                          SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN OPPOSITION TO DEFTS MOTION
                            Blank 62 Filed: 9/18/2012, Entered: 9/18/2012 miscellaneous other
                            APPENDIX OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF PLTFFS OPPOSITION TO MSJ/MSA
                              Blank 61 Filed: 9/18/2012, Entered: 9/18/2012 Opposition Document
                              TO DEFTS MSJ/MSA; MEMORANDUM O P & A'S; DECL. OF NASSER GHOBADPOUR IN OPPOSITION TO MSJ/MSA
                                Blank 60 Filed: 8/24/2012, Entered: 8/24/2012 Answer
                                  Blank 59 Filed: 8/24/2012, Entered: 8/24/2012 Affidavit of Prejudice--Peremptory
                                  RE MALCOLM H. MACKEY BY DEFENDANT-VITACCO (DOE 4
                                    Blank 58 Filed: 8/23/2012, Entered: 8/23/2012 Notice-Change-Firm Name / Address
                                      Blank 57 Filed: 8/21/2012, Entered: 8/21/2012 Proof-Service/Summons
                                      AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT/SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT Party served: STEPHANIE VITACCO
                                        Blank 56 Filed: 7/25/2012, Entered: 7/25/2012 Amendment to Complaint
                                        FILED DOE 4 - STEPHANIE VITACCO
                                          Blank 55 Filed: 7/19/2012, Entered: 7/19/2012 miscellaneous other
                                          SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS
                                            Blank 54 Filed: 7/19/2012, Entered: 7/19/2012 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                              Blank 53 Filed: 7/19/2012, Entered: 7/19/2012 Memorandum - Other
                                              IN SUPPORT OF MSJ
                                                Blank 52 Filed: 7/19/2012, Entered: 7/19/2012 miscellaneous other
                                                EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MSJ
                                                  Blank 51 Filed: 7/12/2012, Entered: 7/12/2012 Reply/Response
                                                    Blank 50 Filed: 7/6/2012, Entered: 7/6/2012 Opposition Document
                                                    TO MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
                                                      Blank 49 Filed: 7/6/2012, Entered: 7/6/2012 Opposition Document
                                                      TO MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLTFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
                                                        Blank 48 Filed: 7/6/2012, Entered: 7/6/2012 Memorandum - Other
                                                        OF P & A'S IN OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
                                                          Blank 47 Filed: 6/28/2012, Entered: 6/28/2012 Notice of Continuance
                                                            Blank 46 Filed: 6/28/2012, Entered: 6/28/2012 Notice of Continuance
                                                              Blank 45 Filed: 6/26/2012, Entered: 6/26/2012 Notice of Continuance
                                                                Blank 44 Filed: 6/22/2012, Entered: 6/22/2012 Reply/Response
                                                                MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHOR; IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE-REQUEST FOR POSTPONEMENT
                                                                  Blank 43 Filed: 6/21/2012, Entered: 6/21/2012 Notice of Continuance
                                                                    Blank 42 Filed: 6/21/2012, Entered: 6/21/2012 Proof of Service
                                                                      Blank 41 Filed: 6/15/2012, Entered: 6/15/2012 Exparte Application
                                                                      FOR ORDER SPECIALLY SETTING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO CONTINUE TRIAL & FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE
                                                                        Blank 40 Filed: 6/15/2012, Entered: 6/15/2012 Order
                                                                        GRANTING EXPARTE APPLICATION TO SPECIALLY SET MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                          Blank 39 Filed: 6/15/2012, Entered: 6/15/2012 Proof of Service
                                                                            Blank 38 Filed: 6/11/2012, Entered: 6/11/2012 Answer To Second Amended Complaint
                                                                              Blank 37 Filed: 6/11/2012, Entered: 6/11/2012 Motion to Strike
                                                                                Blank 36 Filed: 5/31/2012, Entered: 5/31/2012 Motion to Strike
                                                                                  Blank 35 Filed: 5/31/2012, Entered: 5/31/2012 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                    Blank 34 Filed: 5/31/2012, Entered: 5/31/2012 Demurrer
                                                                                      Blank 33 Filed: 5/24/2012, Entered: 5/24/2012 Notice
                                                                                      amended notice of trial setting, and other trial related dates
                                                                                        Blank 32 Filed: 5/11/2012, Entered: 5/11/2012 Second Amended Complaint
                                                                                          Blank 31 Filed: 3/29/2012, Entered: 3/29/2012 reply to motion
                                                                                          REPLY MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES BY DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT;
                                                                                            Blank 30 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: 3/26/2012 Memorandum - Other
                                                                                            OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT;
                                                                                              Blank 29 Filed: 1/26/2012, Entered: 1/26/2012 Notice of Trial Setting Conference
                                                                                                Blank 28 Filed: 1/12/2012, Entered: 1/12/2012 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                PORTIONS OF PLTFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHOR.
                                                                                                  Blank 27 Filed: 1/12/2012, Entered: 1/12/2012 Request For Judicial Notice
                                                                                                  IN SUPPORT OF IT'S DEMURRER TO PLTFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
                                                                                                    Blank 26 Filed: 1/12/2012, Entered: 1/12/2012 Demurrer
                                                                                                    NTC OF HEARING OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHOR.
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 25 Filed: 11/23/2011, Entered: 11/23/2011 Request For Judicial Notice
                                                                                                        Blank 24 Filed: 11/23/2011, Entered: 11/23/2011 Demurrer
                                                                                                        DEFT DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY'S DEMURRER TO PLTF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMO OF PA
                                                                                                          Blank 23 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: 10/7/2011 First Amended Complaint
                                                                                                            Blank 22 Filed: 9/27/2011, Entered: 9/27/2011 Notice of Continuance
                                                                                                              Blank 21 Filed: 8/11/2011, Entered: 8/11/2011 Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                              STIPULATION RE DEUTSCHE BANK ENTITIES
                                                                                                                Blank 20 Filed: 8/3/2011, Entered: 8/3/2011 Notice Of Ruling
                                                                                                                  Blank 19 Filed: 7/21/2011, Entered: 7/21/2011 Notice, Association of Counsel
                                                                                                                    Blank 18 Filed: 7/11/2011, Entered: 7/11/2011 Answer
                                                                                                                      Blank 17 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: 7/8/2011 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                                        Blank 16 Filed: 6/29/2011, Entered: 6/29/2011 Statement-Case Management
                                                                                                                          Blank 15 Filed: 6/20/2011, Entered: 6/20/2011 Statement-Case Management
                                                                                                                            Blank 14 Filed: 6/3/2011, Entered: 6/3/2011 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                            DOE 1 - COLDWELL BANKER RESIDENTIAL BROKERAGE CO
                                                                                                                              Blank 13 Filed: 5/19/2011, Entered: 5/19/2011 Proof-Service/Summons
                                                                                                                                Blank 12 Filed: 5/2/2011, Entered: 5/2/2011 Request For Judicial Notice
                                                                                                                                  Blank 11 Filed: 5/2/2011, Entered: 5/2/2011 Demurrer
                                                                                                                                  TO PLTFF NASSER GHOBADPOUR'S COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHOR.
                                                                                                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 5/2/2011, Entered: 5/2/2011 Statement-Case Management
                                                                                                                                      Blank 9 Filed: 4/29/2011, Entered: 4/29/2011 Request to Enter Default
                                                                                                                                      IS REJECTED AS COLDWELL #9.13. EXECUTION DATE ON DECLARATION OF MAILING CCP 587 MUST BE THE LATEST DATE ON THE FORM 14.
                                                                                                                                        Blank 8 Filed: 3/3/2011, Entered: 3/3/2011 Statement-Case Management
                                                                                                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: 2/22/2011 Proof-Service/Summons
                                                                                                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: 2/14/2011 Summons Filed
                                                                                                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: 2/4/2011 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                              DOE 3 - DEUTSCHE BANK SECURITIES INC.
                                                                                                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: 2/4/2011 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                DOE 1 - DEUTSCHE BANK BERKSHIRE MORTGAGE INC.
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: 2/4/2011 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                  DOE 2 - DEUTSCHE BANK INSURANCE AGENCY, INC.
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 12/8/2010, Entered: 12/8/2010 Notice-Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: 12/3/2010 Complaint

                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 11 times.

                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?