Jay Shin et al v. Donald J Trump et al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. BC452657

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Hebert Elizabeth, Plaintiff
No Logo Hebert Kenneth, Plaintiff
No Logo Hicken Claude R., Plaintiff
No Logo Hicken June M., Plaintiff
No Logo Hong Bonita, Plaintiff
No Logo Hong Cornelio, Plaintiff
No Logo Mcdermott Vincent, Plaintiff
No Logo Pallay Gerald, Plaintiff
No Logo Shah Bharati, Plaintiff
No Logo Shah, Kirti, Plaintiff
No Logo Shin, Jay, Plaintiff
No Logo Venuti Jaye, Plaintiff
No Logo Yokoyama Michael, Plaintiff
No Logo Zhou, Mei, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Afisher Llc, Defendant
No Logo Bandera Crane Llc, Defendant
No Logo Bandera Fisher Family Llc, Defendant
No Logo Bandera Fisher Llc, Defendant
No Logo Bandera Grosfeld Llc, Defendant
No Logo Bandera Richard Fisher Llc, Defendant
No Logo Bicknell Ryan, Defendant
No Logo Collinridge Tracy, Defendant
No Logo Crane Joshua, Defendant
No Logo Davis, Richard Dean, Defendant
No Logo Does 1 Through 500, Defendant
No Logo Dolker Jason, Defendant
No Logo Dupuis Peter, Defendant
No Logo Elrod Kevin, Defendant
No Logo Federman Casey, Defendant
No Logo Fg Wilshire Llc, Defendant
No Logo Fisher, Adam, Defendant
No Logo Fisher, Richard, Defendant
No Logo Frere Marie Laure, Defendant
No Logo Grosfeld Jason, Defendant
No Logo Hourston Renee, Defendant
No Logo Irongate Azrep Bw Llc, Defendant
No Logo Irongate Capital Partners Llc, Defendant
No Logo Irongate Development, Defendant
No Logo Irongate Punta Bandera Investors Usa Llc, Defendant
No Logo Irongate Wilshire Llc, Defendant
No Logo Jgrosfeld Llc, Defendant
No Logo Jk Grosfeld Llc, Defendant
No Logo Leduc Jay, Defendant
No Logo Mann Robert Brendan, Defendant
No Logo Pb Impulsores S. De C.v., Defendant
No Logo Punta Bandera Investors Usa Ii Llc, Defendant
No Logo Punta Investors Usa Llc, Defendant
No Logo Resort Dynamics Inc., Defendant
No Logo Rockey David, Defendant
No Logo S&p Destination Properties Inc., Defendant
No Logo S&p Destination Properties L.p., Defendant
No Logo S&p Destination Properties S.a. De C.v, Defendant
No Logo S&p Destination Properties U.s. Inc., Defendant
No Logo S&p Real Estate Partners, Defendant
No Logo Sanchez Mark, Defendant
No Logo Setter Jacquelyn, Defendant
No Logo Sid Landholt, Defendant
No Logo Susel Matias Rudolfo, Defendant
Trump Organization, Inc. Trump Organization, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "The Trump Organization Inc."
Trump Organization, LLC Trump Organization, LLC, Defendant
Officially listed as "The Trump Organization Llc"
No Logo Trump Corporation The, Defendant
Trump, Donald J. Trump, Donald J., Defendant
Officer/Director, Riviera Holdings Corp
No Logo Trump, Donald J. Jr., Defendant
Officially listed as "Trump Donald Jr."
No Logo Trump, Ivanka, Defendant
Trump Marks Baja LLC Trump Marks Baja LLC, Defendant
Trump Marks LLC Trump Marks LLC, Defendant
No Logo A&m Destination Properties Inc. F/k/a, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo A&m Destination Properties U.s. Inc, Defendant/Respondent
Type Fraud (no contract) (General Jurisdiction)
Status Dismissed - Other 12/11/2013
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 5 Filed: 4/12/2011, Entered: 4/12/2011 Request
FOR COURTCALL
    Blank 4 Filed: 3/28/2011, Entered: 3/28/2011 Statement-Case Management
      Blank 3 Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: 1/25/2011 Notice-Case Management Conference
        Blank 2 Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: 1/25/2011 Notice-Related Cases
          Blank 1 Filed: 1/6/2011, Entered: 1/6/2011 Complaint

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 101 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?