Brand Sense Partners Llc v. Britney Spears et al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. BC458461

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Brand Sense Partners, LLC, Plaintiff and Cross-Defendant
No Logo Britney Brands, Inc., Defendant and Cross-Complainant
No Logo Does 1 Through 50, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Spears Britney, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Spears Jamie, Defendant/Respondent
Type Contractual Fraud (General Jurisdiction)
Status Dismissed - Other 02/14/2012
  Entries (30) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 30 Filed: 2/14/2012, Entered: 2/14/2012 Request and Entry of Dismissal
WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION
    Request RequestSpace
    Blank 29 Filed: 2/14/2012, Entered: 2/14/2012 Partial Dismissal(not entire case)
    WITH PREJUDICE - CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY BRITNEY BRANDS,INC. ON 6-6-11
      Request RequestSpace
      Blank 28 Filed: 1/6/2012, Entered: 1/6/2012 Declaration
      OF GEOFFREY A. NERI IN SUPPORT OF PLTS' MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS
        Request RequestSpace
        Blank 27 Filed: 1/6/2012, Entered: 1/6/2012 Notice of Motion
        1-31-12 MOT FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS
          Request RequestSpace
          Blank 26 Filed: 12/27/2011, Entered: 12/27/2011 Notice
          OF NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT
            Request RequestSpace
            Blank 25 Filed: 12/13/2011, Entered: 12/13/2011 Stipulation and Order
            CONTINUING MEDIATION COMPLETION DATE TO 1/11/12
              Request RequestSpace
              Blank 24 Filed: 12/8/2011, Entered: 12/8/2011 Notice of Motion
              1-11-12 MOT FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT
                Request RequestSpace
                Blank 23 Filed: 7/28/2011, Entered: 7/28/2011 Notice
                OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL FROM JULY 27,2011 THRU AUG 15,2011
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Blank 22 Filed: 7/13/2011, Entered: 7/13/2011 Statement-Case Management
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Blank 21 Filed: 7/13/2011, Entered: 7/13/2011 Statement-Case Management
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Blank 20 Filed: 7/12/2011, Entered: 7/12/2011 Answer To Cross-complaint
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Blank 19 Filed: 7/1/2011, Entered: 7/1/2011 Reply/Response
                        REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF DEFT' BRITNEY SPEARS
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Blank 18 Filed: 6/27/2011, Entered: 6/27/2011 Declaration
                          OF SAMUEL D. INGHAM III IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION OF CO-CONSERVATORS JAMES P. SPEARS AND ANDREW M. WALLET ACTING ON BEHALF OF DEFT' BRITNEY JEAN SPEARS TO MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Blank 17 Filed: 6/27/2011, Entered: 6/27/2011 Request For Judicial Notice
                              Request RequestSpace
                              Blank 16 Filed: 6/27/2011, Entered: 6/27/2011 Opposition Document
                              TO CO-CONSERVATORS JAMES P. SPEARS AND ANDREW M. WALLET ACTING ON BEHALF OF DEFT'BRITNEY JEAN SPEARS TO MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION
                                Request RequestSpace
                                Blank 15 Filed: 6/27/2011, Entered: 6/27/2011 Declaration
                                OF SUANN C. MACISAAC IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION OF CO=CONSERVATORS JAMES P. SPEARS AND ANDREW M. WALLET ACTING ON BEHALF OF DEFT' BRITNEY JEAN SPEARS TO MOTION TO COMPEL
                                  Request RequestSpace
                                  Blank 14 Filed: 6/13/2011, Entered: 6/13/2011 Stipulation and Order
                                  RE CONFIDENIALITY OF DOCUMENTS
                                    Request RequestSpace
                                    Blank 13 Filed: 6/6/2011, Entered: 6/6/2011 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                    OF DEFT CO-CONSERVATORS FOR THE ESTATE OF BRITNEY JEAN SPEARS FOR AND ON BEHALF OF BRITNEY JEAN SPEARS, BRITNEY BRAND INC, AND JAMIE SPEARS, TRI STAR SPORTS AND LOU M. TAYLOR TO AMEND COMPLAINT
                                      Request RequestSpace
                                      Blank 12 Filed: 6/6/2011, Entered: 6/6/2011 Cross Complaint
                                      OF BRITNEY BRAND INC.
                                        Request RequestSpace
                                        Blank 11 Filed: 6/1/2011, Entered: 6/1/2011 Notice of Motion
                                        7-11-11 MOT TO COMPEL DEPOSITION
                                          Request RequestSpace
                                          Blank 10 Filed: 6/1/2011, Entered: 6/1/2011 Declaration
                                          OF GEOFFREY A. NERI IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF DEFT'BRITNEY SPEARS
                                            Request RequestSpace
                                            Blank 9 Filed: 5/18/2011, Entered: 5/18/2011 Proof of Service
                                            OF SUMMONS ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAIN T AND 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT
                                              Request RequestSpace
                                              Blank 8 Filed: 5/17/2011, Entered: 5/17/2011 Notice-Case Management Conference
                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                Blank 7 Filed: 5/13/2011, Entered: 5/13/2011 Notice-Case Management Conference
                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                  Blank 6 Filed: 5/11/2011, Entered: 5/11/2011 Proof of Service
                                                  OF SUMMONS ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT AS TO DEFT TRI-STAR SPORTS AND ENTERAINMENT GROUP,INC. A TENNESSEE CORPROATION
                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                    Blank 5 Filed: 4/22/2011, Entered: 4/22/2011 First Amended Complaint
                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                      Blank 4 Filed: 4/22/2011, Entered: 4/22/2011 Summons Filed
                                                      ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                        Blank 3 Filed: 4/5/2011, Entered: 4/5/2011 Proof of Service
                                                        OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT BRITNEY SPEARS, AN INDIVIDUAL
                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 4/5/2011, Entered: 4/5/2011 Proof of Service
                                                          OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT JAMIE SPEARS, AN INDIVIDUAL
                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: 3/30/2011 Complaint
                                                              Request RequestSpace

                                                              Statistics

                                                              This case has been viewed 39 times.

                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                              Space
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                               
                                                              PlainSite
                                                              Sign Up
                                                              Need Password Help?