Lanisha Cole v. Michael Richards et al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. BC469096

Tags
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Cole Lanisha, Plaintiff/Petitioner
No Logo Does 1 Through 25, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Fremantlemedia North America Inc., Defendant/Respondent
Officially listed as "Fremantle Media North America"
No Logo Richards, Michael, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Sandler Adam, Defendant/Respondent
Type Wrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction)
Status Dismissed - Other 05/07/2013
  Entries (65) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 65 Filed: 5/7/2013, Entered: 5/7/2013 Request and Entry of Dismissal
Entire Action W/Prejudice
    Blank 64 Filed: 5/6/2013, Entered: 5/6/2013 Notice Of Ruling
      Blank 63 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: 4/26/2013 Notice-Settlement
      Unconditional
        Blank 62 Filed: 4/11/2013, Entered: 4/11/2013 Notice Of Ruling
        ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR SUMMARY ADJ UDICATION
          Blank 61 Filed: 4/3/2013, Entered: 4/3/2013 Notice
          OF WESTENDORF V. WEST COAST CONTRA CTORS OF NEVADA, INC., __F.3D ,2O1 3DJDAR 4258 (9TH CIR. APR. 1, 2013 ) IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION
            Blank 60 Filed: 3/21/2013, Entered: 3/21/2013 Response
            TO PLAINTIFF'S OBJECIIONS TO SUPPL EMENTAL DECLARATION OF KATE S. COL D IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICAT ION
              Blank 59 Filed: 3/19/2013, Entered: 3/19/2013 Notice
              OF ERRATA RE: [PROPOSED] ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTION TO, AND REQU EST FOR RULING RE: SUPPLEMENTAL DE CLARATION OF KATE S. GOLD
                Blank 58 Filed: 3/14/2013, Entered: 3/14/2013 Objection Document
                TO, AND REQUEST FOR RULING RE: SUP PLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF KATE S. G OLD, FILED WITH DEFENDANT'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFEN DANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT /ADJUDICATION; MEMORANDUM OF POINT
                  Blank 57 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: 3/5/2013 Supplemental Declaration
                  OF KATE S. GOLD IN SUPPORT OF DEFE NDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMEN T, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR SUM MARY ADJUDICATION
                    Blank 56 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: 3/5/2013 Reply/Response
                    SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED M ATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICAT ION
                      Blank 55 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: 3/5/2013 Brief - Reply
                      IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY J UDGMENT, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, F OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION
                        Blank 54 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: 3/5/2013 Response
                        TO PLAINTIFF'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTI ONS TO DEFENDANTS' EVIDENCE IN SUP PORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUM MARY JUDGMENT, OR, IN THE ALTERNAT IVE, FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION
                          Blank 53 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: 3/5/2013 Objection Document
                          TO PLAINTIFF'S EVIDENCE SUMMITED I N OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICAT ION
                            Blank 52 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: 2/27/2013 Notice
                            OF ERRATA TO DECLARATION OF ROBERT C. HAYDEN IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                              Blank 51 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: 2/27/2013 Notice
                              OF ERRATA RE PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDU M OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPP OSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERN ATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION
                                Blank 50 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: 2/27/2013 Notice
                                RE PLAINTIFF'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS AND SUP PORTING EVIDENCE TN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUD GMENT, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE SUMM ARY ADJUDICATION
                                  Blank 49 Filed: 2/19/2013, Entered: 2/19/2013 Declaration
                                  OF ROBERT C. HAYDEN IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY J UDGMENT AGAINST LANISHA COLE
                                    Blank 48 Filed: 2/19/2013, Entered: 2/19/2013 Opposition Points & Authorities
                                    TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, S UMMARY ADJUDICATION
                                      Blank 47 Filed: 2/19/2013, Entered: 2/19/2013 Objection Document
                                      EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDAN T'S EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDA NT?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJ UDICATION
                                        Blank 46 Filed: 2/19/2013, Entered: 2/19/2013 Statement of Facts
                                        SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DISPUTED MAT ERIAL FACTS AND SUPPORTING EVIDENC E IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOT ION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR, IN T HE ALTERNATIVE SUMMARY ADJUDICATIO N
                                          Blank 45 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: 2/1/2013 Notice
                                          PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES
                                            Blank 44 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: 2/1/2013 Receipt
                                            CIVIL DEPOSIT
                                              Blank 43 Filed: 1/16/2013, Entered: 1/16/2013 Notice Of Ruling
                                              ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER PURSUANT TO STIPULATION
                                                Blank 42 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: 1/7/2013 Stipulation
                                                STIPULATION RE: 1) ADDITIONAL DISCOVERY BEYOND DISCOVERY CUT-OFF DATE; 2) SUMMARY JUDGMENT BRIEFING SCHEDULE; & 3) SUMMARY JUDGMENT HEARING, MEDIATION CUT-OFF & TRIAL DATES
                                                  Blank 41 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: 1/7/2013 Exparte Application
                                                  PLFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER PURSUATN TO STIPULATION, 1) CONTINUING HEARING ON DEFT'S MSJ & ESTABLISH BRIEFING SCHEDULE, 2) CONTINUING MEDIATION CUT-OFF AND TRIAL DATES, & 3) PERMITTING CERTA
                                                    Blank 40 Filed: 12/18/2012, Entered: 12/18/2012 Stipulation and Order
                                                    STIPULATION TO CONTINUE MEDIATION COMPLETION AND RELATED DEADLINE; ORDER
                                                      Blank 39 Filed: 11/9/2012, Entered: 11/9/2012 Amended Proof Of Service
                                                      OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND SUPPORTING DOCUMENTS
                                                        Blank 38 Filed: 11/8/2012, Entered: 11/8/2012 Supporting Docs/ P's & A's
                                                        DEFT'S SEPARATE STMT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MSJ/MSA SET FOR 1/22/13
                                                          Blank 37 Filed: 11/8/2012, Entered: 11/8/2012 Points and Authorities
                                                          DEFT'S MEMO OF PTS & AUTH IN SUPPORT OF MSJ/MSA SET FOR 1/22/13
                                                            Blank 36 Filed: 11/8/2012, Entered: 11/8/2012 Supporting Docs/ P's & A's
                                                            DEFT'S APPENDIX OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MSJ/MSA SET FOR 1/22/13
                                                              Blank 35 Filed: 11/3/2012, Entered: 11/3/2012 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                              DEFT'S MSJ/MSA SET FOR 1/22/13
                                                                Blank 34 Filed: 7/30/2012, Entered: 7/30/2012 Stipulation and Order
                                                                STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE DATES AND RELATED DEADLINES; ORDER
                                                                  Blank 33 Filed: 5/9/2012, Entered: 5/9/2012 Stipulation and Order
                                                                  STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE DATES AND RELATED DEADLINES; ORDER
                                                                    Blank 32 Filed: 4/30/2012, Entered: 4/30/2012 Stipulation and Order
                                                                    AND ORDER CONTINUING MEDIATION COMPLETION DATE TO 7/27/12
                                                                      Blank 31 Filed: 4/19/2012, Entered: 4/19/2012 Notice Of Ruling
                                                                      ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DISQUALIF Y DEFENSE COUNSEL
                                                                        Blank 30 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: 4/12/2012 Notice Of Ruling
                                                                        ON EXPARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE HEARING DATE ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION OF LANISH A COLE TO BE HEARD WITH PLAINTIFF' S MOTION TO DISQUALIFY DEFENSE COU NSEL
                                                                          Blank 29 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: 4/12/2012 Reply/Response
                                                                          TO DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO MOTIO N TO DISQUALIFY DEFENSE COUNSEL
                                                                            Blank 28 Filed: 4/11/2012, Entered: 4/11/2012 Exparte Application
                                                                              Blank 27 Filed: 4/6/2012, Entered: 4/6/2012 Opposition Document
                                                                              TO PLAINTIFF'S N1OTIO TO DISQUALIF Y DEFENSE COUNSEL; DECLARATIONS OF KATE S. GOLD, ELLEN GOLDSMITH AND MARK CORDOBA
                                                                                Blank 26 Filed: 3/27/2012, Entered: 3/27/2012 Motion
                                                                                TO DISQUALIFY DEFENSE COUNSEL; DEC LARATIONS OF LANISHA COLE AND STEV EN M. CISCHKE
                                                                                  Blank 25 Filed: 3/19/2012, Entered: 3/19/2012 Notice
                                                                                  OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL
                                                                                    Blank 24 Filed: 2/27/2012, Entered: 2/27/2012 Notice
                                                                                    OF ORDER RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE HEARING DATE ON DEFENDA NTS' MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITI ON OF LANISHA COLE
                                                                                      Blank 23 Filed: 2/23/2012, Entered: 2/23/2012 Exparte Application
                                                                                      EX PARTE APPL TO ADVANCE HRING DATE ON DEFT'S MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPO OF LANISHA COLE
                                                                                        Blank 22 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: 2/21/2012 Motion to Compel
                                                                                        THE DEPOSITION OF LANISHA COLE; ME MORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES ; DECLARATION OF KATE S. GOLD; DEC LARATION OF ELLEN GOLDSMITH; DECLA RATION OF MARK CORDOBA; REQUEST FO R SANCTIONS
                                                                                          Blank 21 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: 2/21/2012 miscellaneous other
                                                                                          APPENDIX OF NON-CALIFORNIA AUTHORI TY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTIO N TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION OF LANI SHA COLE, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, E XCLUDE HER TESTIMONY AT TRIAL
                                                                                            Blank 20 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: 1/30/2012 Notice
                                                                                            OF TAKING OFF CALENDAR PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENAS FOR PLAI NTIFF'S EMPLOYMENT RECORDS AND ATT ORNEY-CLIENT COMMUNICATIONS
                                                                                              Blank 19 Filed: 1/26/2012, Entered: 1/26/2012 Opposition Document
                                                                                              TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO QUASH SUB POENAS; DECLARATION OF ELENA S. MI N
                                                                                                Blank 18 Filed: 1/23/2012, Entered: 1/23/2012 Notice Of Ruling
                                                                                                OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
                                                                                                  Blank 17 Filed: 1/18/2012, Entered: 1/18/2012 miscellaneous other
                                                                                                  Trial Prep. Order
                                                                                                    Blank 16 Filed: 1/6/2012, Entered: 1/6/2012 Statement-Case Management
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 15 Filed: 1/3/2012, Entered: 1/3/2012 Statement-Case Management
                                                                                                        Blank 14 Filed: 12/9/2011, Entered: 12/9/2011 Answer
                                                                                                          Blank 13 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: 12/5/2011 Motion to Quash
                                                                                                          SUBPOENAS FOR PLAINTIFF'S EMPLOYME NT RECORDS AND ATTORNEY-CLIENT COM MUNICATIONS; IEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF SO LOMON E. GRESEN
                                                                                                            Blank 12 Filed: 11/2/2011, Entered: 11/2/2011 Response
                                                                                                            IN OPPOSITION TO NOTICE OF RELATED CASE
                                                                                                              Blank 11 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: 10/31/2011 Notice-Related Cases
                                                                                                              BC432836
                                                                                                                Blank 10 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: 10/24/2011 Notice
                                                                                                                OF CASE RE-ASSIGNMENT PER PEREMPTO RY CHALLENGE
                                                                                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: 10/24/2011 Notice Of Ruling
                                                                                                                  ON PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE
                                                                                                                    Blank 8 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: 10/24/2011 Notice-Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                      Blank 7 Filed: 10/14/2011, Entered: 10/14/2011 Answer
                                                                                                                      Fremantle North America, Inc.
                                                                                                                        Blank 6 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: 9/28/2011 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                        Summons & Complaint, etc.
                                                                                                                          Blank 5 Filed: 9/21/2011, Entered: 9/21/2011 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                          Summons & Complaint, etc.
                                                                                                                            Blank 4 Filed: 9/16/2011, Entered: 9/16/2011 Notice-Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                              Blank 3 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: 9/13/2011 Affidavit of Prejudice--PeremptoryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              Judge Joanne O'Donnell
                                                                                                                                Blank 2 Filed: 9/8/2011, Entered: 9/8/2011 Affidavit of Prejudice--PeremptoryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                Judge Joanne O'Donnell
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 9/7/2011, Entered: 9/7/2011 Complaint

                                                                                                                                    Space Space

                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 172 times.

                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?