Jiangsu Hongbao Hardware Co Ltd v. Ultra Pro Corporation Et

State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. BC478323
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Jiangsu Hongbao Hardware Co. Ltd., Plaintiff/Petitioner
v.
No Logo Does 1 Through 20, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Furi Brands, Inc., Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Ultra Pro Corporation, Defendant/Respondent
Attributes
Type Breach Contrct/Warnty (Sellr Pltf) (General Jurisdiction)
Status Dismissed - Other 05/14/2012
Timeline
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 6 Filed: 5/14/2012, Entered: 5/14/2012 Request For Dismissal
WITH PREJUDICE-ENTIRE ACTION.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 5 Filed: 4/4/2012, Entered: 4/4/2012 Statement-Case Management
Request RequestSpace
Blank 4 Filed: 3/8/2012, Entered: 3/8/2012 Proof-Service/Summons
Request RequestSpace
Blank 3 Filed: 2/7/2012, Entered: 2/7/2012 Notice-Case Management Conference
Request RequestSpace
Blank 2 Filed: 2/7/2012, Entered: 2/7/2012 OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
Request RequestSpace
Blank 1 Filed: 2/3/2012, Entered: 2/3/2012 Complaint
Request RequestSpace

Statistics

This case has been viewed 2 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?