FISHER v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:15-cv-01575-TCW
District Judge Thomas C. Wheeler, presiding

Tags
Last Updated July 31, 2021 at 1:42 PM DT (2.5 days ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo BRYNDON FISHER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Schubert Jonckheer & Kolbe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Noah Michael Schubert +1 415 788 4220 +1 415 788 0161 nschubert@sjk.law
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter Anthony Gwynne +1 202 616 8239 +1 202 514 8640 peter.a.gwynne@usdoj.gov
Space Meen Geu Oh +1 202 307 0184 +1 202 307 0972 Meen-Geu.Oh@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491
Nature of Suit 134 - Contract - Other
Office COFC
Filed 12/28/2015
Jury Demand None
Demand $50000000
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County None
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flag ECF
None
None
  Entries (106) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 7/31/2021, Entered: None Response to Motion
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 3/9/2021, Entered: None Scheduling Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 2/11/2021, Entered: None Status Conference Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 2/1/2021, Entered: None Status Report (JOINT)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 1/5/2021, Entered: None Notice of Reassignment
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 1/5/2021, Entered: None Reassigning Case - Rule 40.1(c)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 1/2/2021, Entered: None Status Report Order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 12/30/2020, Entered: None Status Report (JOINT)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 12/16/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 12/16/2020, Entered: None extension of time
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 12/4/2020, Entered: None Certify Class
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 8/17/2020, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 8/12/2020, Entered: None Status Conference Order
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 8/3/2020, Entered: None Status Report (JOINT)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 5/20/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 5/19/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 3/23/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 3/20/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 2/10/2020, Entered: None Notice of Reassignment
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 2/10/2020, Entered: None Reassigning Case - Rule 40.1(c)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 2/3/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 1/31/2020, Entered: None extension of time
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 11/25/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 11/24/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 8/29/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document 74 Filed: 4/4/2019, Entered: 4/4/2019 Order on motion for summary judgmentCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER denying [68] Motion for Summary Judgment. Joint Status Report due by 4/18/19. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (dh) Service on parties made.
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 8/28/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Blank  Oral Argument
                                                        Minute Entry - Was the proceeding sealed to the public? n. Proceeding held in Washington, DC on 4/4/2019 before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler: Oral Argument. [Total number of days of proceeding: 1]. Official record of proceeding taken by court reporter. To order a certified transcript or an audio recording of the proceeding, click HERE. (dh)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 3/8/2019, Entered: 3/8/2019 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER: Oral Argument set for 4/4/2019 at 2:00 PM in National Courts Building before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (dh) Service on parties made.
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 3/1/2019, Entered: 3/1/2019 Reply to Response to motion
                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re [68] MOTION for Summary Judgment , [67] MOTION for Summary Judgment , filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Oh, Meen Geu)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Sealed Legal Document 71 Filed: 2/8/2019, Entered: 2/8/2019 Response to Motion [Dispositive]
                                                              **SEALED**RESPONSE to [68] MOTION for Summary Judgment , filed by BRYNDON FISHER. Reply due by 3/1/2019. (Attachments: # (1) Plaintiff's Response to the Government's Statement of Undisputed Facts, # (2) Declaration of Bryndon Fisher in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to the Government's Motion for Summary Judgment)(Schubert, Noah) Modified on 2/11/2019 to correct deadline (ar).
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 1/15/2019, Entered: 1/15/2019 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File ResponseCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER granting [69] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Plaintiff's Response now due by 2/8/2019. Government's Reply now due by 3/1/2019. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (dh) Service on parties made.
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 1/14/2019, Entered: 1/14/2019, Terminated: 1/15/2019 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response
                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until February 8, 2019 to File Response as to [68] MOTION for Summary Judgment , filed by BRYNDON FISHER.Response due by 1/28/2019.(Schubert, Noah)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 68 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: 12/7/2018, Terminated: 4/4/2019 Motion for summary judgment
                                                                    **SEALED** MOTION for Summary Judgment , filed by USA. Response due by 1/18/2019. (Attachments: # (1) Supplement Defendant's Statement of Undisputed Facts and Supporting Exhibits)(Oh, Meen Geu) Modified on 1/15/2019 to correct deadline (ar).
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: 12/7/2018, Terminated: 12/7/2018 Motion for summary judgment
                                                                      REDACTED DOCUMENT, redacting [68] MOTION for Summary Judgment , filed by USA.Response due by 1/4/2019. (Attachments: # (1) Supplement Defendant's Statement of Undisputed Facts and Supporting Exhibits)(Oh, Meen Geu) Modified on 12/10/2018 to correct docket text and add link to sealed document (ar).
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: 10/29/2018 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER: Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment due by 12/7/2018. Plaintiff's Response due by 1/18/2019. Defendant's Reply due by 2/8/2019. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (dh) Service on parties made.
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Blank  Telephone Conference
                                                                          Minute Entry - Was the proceeding sealed to the public? n. Proceeding held in Washington, DC on 10/29/2018 before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler: Telephonic Status Conference. [Total number of days of proceeding: 1]. Official Record of proceeding taken via electronic digital recording (EDR). To order a certified transcript or an audio recording of the proceeding, click HERE.(dh)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: 10/23/2018 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 10/29/2018 at 2:00 PM EDT in Chambers (Telephonic) before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (dh) Service on parties made. Modified on 10/23/2018 - corrected typographical error (jt1).
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: 10/12/2018 Answer to amended complaint
                                                                              ANSWER to Amended Complaint , filed by USA. (Oh, Meen Geu) Modified on 10/15/2018 to remove deadline (ar).
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: 9/21/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER GRANTING [62] Defendant's Motion for an enlargement of time. Answer Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint due by 10/12/2018. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (dh) Service on parties made. Modified on 9/21/2018 to add document link and correct deadline (ar).
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: 9/20/2018, Terminated: 9/21/2018 motion for extension of time to file answer
                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 10/12/2018 to File Answer re [61] Amended Complaint , filed by USA.Response due by 10/4/2018.(Oh, Meen Geu)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: 9/14/2018 Amended Complaint
                                                                                    AMENDED COMPLAINT against USA, filed by BRYNDON FISHER. Second Amended Class Action Complaint, filed by BRYNDON FISHER.Answer due by 9/28/2018. (Schubert, Noah)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: 9/14/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                      ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Revised Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint, re [59] Unopposed MOTION to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15 (Revised) filed by BRYNDON FISHER, [51] MOTION to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15 filed by BRYNDON FISHER The Court directs Plaintiff to file its second amended complaint. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (dh) Service on parties made. Modified on 9/14/2018 to add additional text (ar).
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: 9/13/2018, Terminated: 9/14/2018 Motion to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15
                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15 (Revised), filed by BRYNDON FISHER.Response due by 9/27/2018. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Proposed Second Amended Class Action Complaint)(Schubert, Noah)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: 9/13/2018 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re [51] MOTION to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15 , filed by BRYNDON FISHER. (Schubert, Noah)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: 9/7/2018 Response to motion
                                                                                            RESPONSE to [51] MOTION to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15 , Partially Opposing Plaintiff's Motion For Leave, Refiled Unsealed Pursuant to Court's Order (ECF No. 56), filed by USA.Reply due by 9/14/2018. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Oh, Meen Geu)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: 9/7/2018 Order on Motion to unseal documentCourt Filing
                                                                                              ORDER granting [55] Motion to Unseal Document. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (dh) Service on parties made.
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: 9/7/2018, Terminated: 9/7/2018 Motion to Unseal Document
                                                                                                MOTION to Unseal Document [54] Response to Motion, filed by USA , filed by USA.Response due by 9/21/2018.(Oh, Meen Geu)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 54 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: 9/6/2018 Response to motion
                                                                                                  **SEALED**RESPONSE to [51] MOTION to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15 Partially Opposing Motion For Leave (Provisionally Filed Under Seal), filed by USA.Reply due by 9/13/2018. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Oh, Meen Geu)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: 9/6/2018 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File ResponseCourt Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER granting [52] Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint due by 9/6/2018. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (dh) Service on parties made.
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: 9/5/2018, Terminated: 9/6/2018 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response
                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 9/6/18 to File Response as to [51] MOTION to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15 , filed by USA.Response due by 9/19/2018.(Oh, Meen Geu)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/22/2018, Entered: 8/22/2018, Terminated: 9/14/2018 Motion to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15
                                                                                                        MOTION to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15 , filed by BRYNDON FISHER.Response due by 9/5/2018. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Proposed Second Amended Class Action Complaint)(Schubert, Noah)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/23/2018, Entered: 7/23/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint due by 8/22/2018. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ab) Service on parties made.
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                                            Minute Entry - Was the proceeding sealed to the public? No. Proceeding held in Washington, D.C. on 7/23/2018 before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler: Status Conference. [Total number of days of proceeding: 1]. Official Record of proceeding taken via electronic digital recording (EDR). To order a certified transcript or an audio recording of the proceeding, click HERE.(ab)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/9/2018, Entered: 5/9/2018 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery.Court Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER granting [48] Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Expert Discovery due by 7/18/2018. Status Conference rescheduled for 7/23/2018 at 02:00 PM EDT in Chambers (Telephonic) before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ab) Service on parties made.
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/7/2018, Entered: 5/7/2018, Terminated: 5/9/2018 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time,until July 18, 2018, to Complete Discovery , filed by BRYNDON FISHER.Response due by 5/21/2018.(Schubert, Noah)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/8/2018, Entered: 2/8/2018 Status Conference OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 6/7/2018 02:00 PM EDT in Chambers (Telephonic) before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ab) Service on parties made.
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/31/2018, Entered: 1/31/2018 order on motion for extension of time to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [45] Motion for Extension of Time Defendant's Expert Report due by 2/16/2018. Plaintiff's Rebuttal Report due by 3/30/2018. Expert Discovery completed by 5/11/2018. Status Conference rescheduled for 5/29/2018 02:00 PM (EDT) in Chambers (Telephonic) before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler.. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ab) Service on parties made.
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: 1/30/2018, Terminated: 1/31/2018 MOTION for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Expert Discovery Schedule , filed by USA.Response due by 2/13/2018.(Oh, Meen Geu)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: 1/23/2018 Order on Motion to stayCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER denying as moot [43] Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (mg) Service on parties made.
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: 1/22/2018, Terminated: 1/23/2018 Motion To Stay
                                                                                                                          MOTION to Stay Expert Discovery Deadlines Due To Lapse In Appropriations, filed by USA.Response due by 2/5/2018.(Oh, Meen Geu)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/18/2017, Entered: 10/18/2017 Discovery Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            DISCOVERY SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiff Expert Report due by 12/15/2017. Defendant Expert Report due by 2/2/2018. Plaintiff Rebuttal Report due by 3/2/2018. Expert Discovery completed by 3/30/2018. Status Conference set for 4/3/2018 02:00 PM (EST) in Chambers (Telephonic) before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ab) Copy to parties.
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                                                              Minute Entry - Was the proceeding sealed to the public? No. Proceeding held in Washington, D.C. on 10/18/2017 before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler: Status Conference. [Total number of days of proceeding: 1]. Official Record of proceeding taken via electronic digital recording (EDR). To order a certified transcript or an audio copy of the proceeding, click HERE.(ab)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/18/2017, Entered: 9/18/2017 Status Conference OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference rescheduled for 10/18/2017 02:00 PM EDT in Chambers (Telephonic) before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ab) Copy to parties.
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/14/2017, Entered: 9/14/2017 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [39] Motion for Extension of Time to Complete DiscoveryFact Discovery due by 10/13/2017. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ab) Copy to parties.
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/13/2017, Entered: 9/13/2017, Terminated: 9/14/2017 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time,until 10/13/17, to Complete Discovery , filed by BRYNDON FISHER.Response due by 9/27/2017.(Schubert, Noah)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/17/2017, Entered: 8/17/2017 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference rescheduled to 9/21/2017 at 2:00 PM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (gb) Copy to parties.
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/14/2017, Entered: 8/14/2017 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [36] Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Fact Discovery due by 9/18/2017. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (gb) Copy to parties.
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/8/2017, Entered: 8/8/2017, Terminated: 8/14/2017 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time,until September 18, 2017, to Complete Discovery , filed by BRYNDON FISHER.Response due by 8/22/2017.(Schubert, Noah)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/8/2017, Entered: 8/8/2017 Order on Motion for protective orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [34] Motion for Protective Order Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ad) Copy to parties.
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/7/2017, Entered: 8/7/2017, Terminated: 8/8/2017 Motion for protective order
                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION for Protective Order , filed by USA.Response due by 8/21/2017.(Oh, Meen Geu)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/10/2017, Entered: 5/10/2017 Discovery Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                DISCOVERY SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Disclosures due by 5/19/2017. Fact Discovery due by 8/18/2017. Status Conference set for 8/22/2017 at 02:00 PM (EDT) in Chambers (Telephonic) before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (gb) Copy to parties. Modified on 5/11/2017 to correct conference deadline (ar).
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: 5/5/2017 Joint Status Report
                                                                                                                                                  JOINT STATUS REPORT Regarding Proposed Schedule For Limited Merits Discovery, filed by USA. (Oh, Meen Geu)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/25/2017, Entered: 4/25/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER: Proposed Discovery and Briefing Schedule due by 5/5/2017. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (gb) Copy to parties.
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/21/2017, Entered: 4/21/2017 Joint Status Report
                                                                                                                                                      JOINT STATUS REPORT , filed by BRYNDON FISHER. (Schubert, Noah)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 29 Filed: 3/13/2017, Entered: 3/13/2017 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: Joint Status Report due by 4/21/2017. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (gb) Copy to parties.
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 28 Filed: 3/10/2017, Entered: 3/10/2017 Joint Status Report
                                                                                                                                                          JOINT STATUS REPORT Regarding Preliminary Settlement Discussions, filed by USA. (Oh, Meen Geu)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/2/2017, Entered: 3/2/2017 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Meen Geu Oh for USA . (Oh, Meen Geu)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 26 Filed: 1/23/2017, Entered: 1/23/2017 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 3/10/2017. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (gb) Copy to parties.
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank  scheduling conference
                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry - Was the proceeding sealed to the public? n. Proceeding held in Washington, D.C. on 1/23/2017 before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler: Scheduling Conference. [Total number of days of proceeding: 1]. Official Record of proceeding taken via electronic digital recording (EDR). To order a certified transcript or an audio copy of the proceeding, click HERE (gb)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 25 Filed: 1/10/2017, Entered: 1/10/2017 Preliminary Scheduling Conference OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Order Scheduling Conference set for 1/23/2017 at 2:00 PM (EST) in Chambers (Telephonic) before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (gb) Copy to parties.
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: 1/3/2017 Joint Preliminary Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                    JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT . (Schubert, Noah)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 23 Filed: 11/10/2016, Entered: 11/10/2016 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to [8] Amended Complaint , filed by USA.JPSR due by 1/3/2017.(Gwynne, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 22 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: 10/11/2016 Order on Motion for extension of time to answerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [21] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Answer due by 11/10/2016. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (gb) Copy to parties.
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/7/2016, Entered: 10/7/2016, Terminated: 10/11/2016 motion for extension of time to file answer
                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 11/10/2016 to File Answer re [1] Complaint, , filed by USA.Response due by 10/24/2016.(Gwynne, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 20 Filed: 9/26/2016, Entered: 9/26/2016 Order on Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(1) and (6)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            REPORTED OPINION denying [11] Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(1) and (6). Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (gb) Answer due 10/11/2016. Copy to parties. Modified on 9/27/2016 to add deadline (ar).
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Oral Argument
                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry - Was the proceeding sealed to the public? n. Proceeding held in Washington, D.C. on 9/15/2016 before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler: Telephonic Oral Argument. [Total number of days of proceeding: 1]. Official Record of proceeding taken via electronic digital recording (EDR). To order a certified transcript or an audio copy of the proceeding, click HERE (gb)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/6/2016, Entered: 9/6/2016 Sur-Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                SUR-REPLY re [11] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1) and (6) , filed by BRYNDON FISHER. (Schubert, Noah)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/6/2016, Entered: 9/6/2016 order on motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [17] Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (gb) Copy to parties.
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/3/2016, Entered: 9/3/2016, Terminated: 9/6/2016 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss , filed by BRYNDON FISHER.Response due by 9/22/2016. (Attachments: # (1) Sur-Reply Memorandum)(Schubert, Noah)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/31/2016, Entered: 8/31/2016 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER: Oral Argument set for 9/15/2016 at 02:00 PM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (gb) Copy to parties.
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/22/2016, Entered: 8/22/2016 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re [11] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1) and (6) , filed by USA. (Gwynne, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/29/2016, Entered: 7/29/2016 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File ReplyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [13] Motion for Extension of Time to file responsive pleading. Response now due by 8/22/2016. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ejg) Copy to parties.
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/28/2016, Entered: 7/28/2016, Terminated: 7/29/2016 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to [12] Response to Motion [Dispositive] , filed by USA.Response due by 8/15/2016.(Gwynne, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/13/2016, Entered: 7/13/2016 Response to Motion [Dispositive]
                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to [11] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1) and (6) (Oral Argument Requested), filed by BRYNDON FISHER.Reply due by 8/1/2016. (Schubert, Noah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 11 Filed: 6/15/2016, Entered: 6/15/2016, Terminated: 9/26/2016 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1) and (6) , filed by USA.Response due by 7/18/2016.(Gwynne, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/23/2016, Entered: 5/23/2016 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File ResponseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [9] Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading to Amended Complaint. Defendant's Responsive Pleading due by 6/15/2016. Amended Complaint accepted as filed. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (hm) Copy to parties.
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/18/2016, Entered: 5/18/2016, Terminated: 5/23/2016 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Enlargement of Time File Respone to Amended Complaint and NOTICE of Filing Amended Complaint. (Attachments: # (1) Amended Complaint)(Schubert, Noah) Modified on 5/19/2016 to correct event type; wrong event selection (ar).
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/12/2016, Entered: 5/12/2016 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED COMPLAINT against USA, filed by BRYNDON FISHER. .Answer due by 5/31/2016. (Schubert, Noah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 7 Filed: 4/11/2016, Entered: 4/11/2016, Terminated: 2/14/2017 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1) and (6) plaintiff's complaint, filed by USA.Response due by 5/12/2016.(Gwynne, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/24/2016, Entered: 2/24/2016 Order on Motion for extension of time to answerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [5] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Answer due by 4/11/2016. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (hm) Copy to parties.
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: 2/22/2016, Terminated: 2/24/2016 motion for extension of time to file answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 4/11/2016 to File Answer re [1] Complaint, , filed by USA.Response due by 3/10/2016.(Gwynne, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/11/2016, Entered: 1/11/2016 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Anthony Gwynne for USA . (Gwynne, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/28/2015, Entered: 12/28/2015 Notice of Designation of Electronic Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (vdw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/28/2015, Entered: 12/28/2015 Notice of AssignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (vdw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 12/28/2015, Entered: 12/28/2015 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT against USA (O) (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 9998-3126098) (Copy Served Electronically on Department of Justice), filed by BRYNDON FISHER. Answer due by 2/26/2016. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet) (vdw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 307 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?