Frank Park v. Coldwell Banker Residential Brokerage Co et al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. BC479530

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Coldwell Banker Corporation Coldwell Banker Corporation, Defendant/Respondent
Officially listed as "Coldwell Banker"
No Logo Does 1 To 30, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Mieszala Yves, Defendant/Respondent
Coldwell Banker Residential Brokerage, Inc. Coldwell Banker Residential Brokerage, Inc., - Defendant/Respondent
Officially listed as "Coldwell Banker Residential Brokerage"
No Logo Park Frank, Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per
Type Intentional PI/PD/WD (eg. assault) (General Jurisdiction)
Status Dismissed - Other 07/16/2013
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 17 Filed: 7/16/2013, Entered: 7/16/2013 Request For Dismissal
WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION
    Blank 16 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: 4/9/2013 Notice
    OF OSC RE SETTLEMENT
      Blank 15 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: 4/9/2013 Notice-Settlement
        Blank 14 Filed: 3/25/2013, Entered: 3/25/2013 Notice of Lien
          Blank 13 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: 2/28/2013 Notice of Reassignment and Order
            Blank 12 Filed: 2/26/2013, Entered: 2/26/2013 List of Witnesses
              Blank 11 Filed: 2/26/2013, Entered: 2/26/2013 List of Exhibits
                Blank 10 Filed: 2/26/2013, Entered: 2/26/2013 Substitution of Attorney
                  Blank 9 Filed: 2/26/2013, Entered: 2/26/2013 Statement of Case
                    Blank 8 Filed: 5/18/2012, Entered: 5/18/2012 Statement-Case Management
                      Blank 7 Filed: 5/15/2012, Entered: 5/15/2012 Statement-Case Management
                        Blank 6 Filed: 5/15/2012, Entered: 5/15/2012 Proof of Service
                          Blank 5 Filed: 4/26/2012, Entered: 4/26/2012 Proof of Service
                            Blank 4 Filed: 4/3/2012, Entered: 4/3/2012 Answer
                              Blank 3 Filed: 4/3/2012, Entered: 4/3/2012 Answer
                              COLDWELL BANKER RESIDENTIAL BROKERAGE COMPANY, YVES MIESZALA
                                Blank 2 Filed: 3/1/2012, Entered: 3/1/2012 Notice-Case Management Conference
                                  Blank 1 Filed: 2/23/2012, Entered: 2/23/2012 Complaint

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 13 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?