Roslyn Dauber et al v. Monsanto Co et al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. BC483342

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Carlos Gregory, Plaintiff/Petitioner
No Logo Costanzo John Di, Plaintiff/Petitioner
No Logo Dauber Roslyn, Plaintiff/Petitioner
No Logo Michael Williams Molly Kerwin, Plaintiff/Petitioner
No Logo Does 1-350, Defendant/Respondent

Represented by Steptoe & Johnson, LLP

Monsanto Company Monsanto Company, Defendant/Respondent
Officially listed as "Monsanto Co."

Represented by Steptoe & Johnson, LLP

Pfizer, Inc. Pfizer, Inc., Defendant/Respondent
Unknown Role, Arqule, Inc.
Unknown Role, Icagen, Inc.
Unknown Role, Zoetis Inc.
Unknown Role, Celladon Corp
Unknown Role, Pfizer Production LLC
Unknown Role, Icu Medical Inc/de
Unknown Role, Upjohn Inc
Unknown Role, Insite Vision, Inc.
Unknown Role, pSivida LTD
Unknown Role, Cortexyme, Inc.
Unknown Role, Imara Inc.
Unknown Role, Bioatla, Inc.

Represented by Steptoe & Johnson, LLP

Pharmacia Corporation Pharmacia Corporation, Defendant/Respondent
Officially listed as "Pharmacia Corp."

Represented by Steptoe & Johnson, LLP

No Logo Solutia Inc., Defendant/Respondent

Represented by Steptoe & Johnson, LLP

No Logo Southern California Gas Co., Defendant/Respondent

Represented by Steptoe & Johnson, LLP

Type Toxic Tort/Environmental (General Jurisdiction)
Status Cons with Lead Case (see X-Ref) 03/21/2013
  Entries (38) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 38 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: 8/14/2015 Notice
OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE OF LAWRENCE P. RIFF AS COUNSEL OF RECORD
    Blank 37 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: 7/22/2015 Notice
    OF STATUS CONFERENCE
      Blank 36 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: 7/22/2015 Notice of Continuance
      OF TRIAL
        Blank 35 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: 7/13/2015 Response
        TO MOTION FOR "MINI 402" RELATING TO GENERAL CAUSATION OPINIONS OF SHEILA ZAHM, PHD
          Blank 34 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: 7/13/2015 Response
          TO MOTION TO EXCLUDE PRESERVATION TESTIMONY OF SHEILA ZAHM, PHD.
            Blank 33 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: 7/13/2015 Response
            TO MOTION TO EXCLUDE SPECIFIC CAUSATION EVIDENCE AS TO PLAINTIFF JOHN DI COSTANZO
              Blank 32 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: 7/6/2015 Notice
              non-reply mini 402
                Blank 31 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: 7/1/2015 Motion
                PHARMACIA'S RENEWED MOTION TO EXCLUDE PRESERVATION TESTIMONY OF SHELIA ZAHM, PH.D.
                  Blank 30 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: 7/1/2015 miscellaneous other
                  SUMMARY OF AGREEMENTS AND RULINGS ON PRE-TRIAL MOTIONS
                    Blank 29 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: 7/1/2015 Motion
                    PHARMACIA'S MTN FOR "MINI 402" RELATING TO GENERAL CAUSATION OPINIONS OF SHELIA ZAHM, PH.D.
                      Blank 28 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: 7/1/2015 Motion
                      PHARMACIA'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE SPECIFIC CAUSATION EVIDENCE AS TO PLTF DI COSTANZO
                        Blank 27 Filed: 6/25/2015, Entered: 6/25/2015 Notice
                        TO APPEAR AT TRIAL WITH PRODUCTION PURSUANT TO CCP 1987 (SOLUTIA, INC.
                          Blank 26 Filed: 6/25/2015, Entered: 6/25/2015 Notice
                          TO APPEAR AT TRIAL WITH PRODUCTION PURSUANT TO CCP 1987 (MONSANTO COMPANY
                            Blank 25 Filed: 6/25/2015, Entered: 6/25/2015 Notice
                            TO APPEAR AT TRIAL WITH PRODUCTION PURSUANT TO CCP 1987 (PFIZER, INC.
                              Blank 24 Filed: 6/25/2015, Entered: 6/25/2015 Notice
                              TO APPEAR AT TRIAL WITH PRODUCTION PURSUANT TO CCP 1987 (PHARMACIA CORPORATION
                                Blank 23 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: 6/22/2015 Order
                                ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR GOOD FAITH DETERMINATION
                                  Blank 22 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: 5/29/2015 Order
                                  severance of plainitff gregory carlos case from bc483342 and cons olidation with bc509170
                                    Blank 21 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: 5/11/2015 Notice
                                    SETTLEMENT_________________ SO CAL GAS FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT F/B MARLIN & HOWES
                                      Blank 20 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: 5/11/2015 Application-Miscellaneous
                                      MARLIN & HOWES SO CAL GAS________________ FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT F/B MARLIN & HOWES_________
                                        Blank 19 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: 5/4/2015 Notice
                                        SETTLEMENT
                                          Blank 18 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: 5/4/2015 Application-Miscellaneous
                                          FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT
                                            Blank 17 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: 4/29/2015 Notice
                                            continuance
                                              Blank 16 Filed: 3/29/2013, Entered: 3/29/2013 Receipt
                                              CIVIL DEPOSIT- COMPLEX LITIGATION
                                                Blank 15 Filed: 3/15/2013, Entered: 3/15/2013 Notice
                                                CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE
                                                  Blank 14 Filed: 3/15/2013, Entered: 3/15/2013 Notice
                                                  OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE
                                                    Blank 13 Filed: 3/15/2013, Entered: 3/15/2013 Notice of Reassignment and Order
                                                      Blank 12 Filed: 8/9/2012, Entered: 8/9/2012 Statement-Case Management
                                                        Blank 11 Filed: 8/9/2012, Entered: 8/9/2012 Statement-Case Management
                                                          Blank 10 Filed: 7/19/2012, Entered: 7/19/2012 Notice
                                                          of CMC
                                                            Blank 9 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: 7/16/2012 Notice-Case Management Conference
                                                              Blank 8 Filed: 6/14/2012, Entered: 6/14/2012 Objection Document
                                                              PLFT'S OBJECTION TO DEFT'S NOTICE OF RELATED CASE
                                                                Blank 7 Filed: 6/11/2012, Entered: 6/11/2012 Objection Document
                                                                TO DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF RELATED CASE
                                                                  Blank 6 Filed: 5/31/2012, Entered: 5/31/2012 Answer
                                                                    Blank 5 Filed: 5/30/2012, Entered: 5/30/2012 Notice-Related Cases
                                                                      Blank 4 Filed: 5/16/2012, Entered: 5/16/2012 Proof of Service
                                                                      summons & complt, etc
                                                                        Blank 3 Filed: 5/10/2012, Entered: 5/10/2012 Notice-Case Management Conference
                                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: 4/25/2012 Notice-Case Management Conference
                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 4/23/2012, Entered: 4/23/2012 Complaint

                                                                              Statistics

                                                                              This case has been viewed 631 times.

                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                              Space
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                               
                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                              Need Password Help?