Elite Aviation Llc v. Chris Papero
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. BC483402

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Does 1 Through 100, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Elite Aviation, LLC, Plaintiff/Petitioner
No Logo Papero Chris, Defendant & Defendant in Pro Per
No Logo Thomas Geoffrey L., Mediator
Type Othr Breach Contr/Warr-not Fraud (General Jurisdiction)
Status Dismissed - Other 08/01/2013
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 20 Filed: 8/1/2013, Entered: 8/1/2013 Request and Entry of Dismissal
W/PREJUDICE AS TO COMPLAINT AND ENTIRE ACTION
    Request RequestSpace
    Blank 19 Filed: 5/6/2013, Entered: 5/6/2013 Notice-Recusal-ADR Neutral
    #10 Scheduling conflicts
      Request RequestSpace
      Blank 18 Filed: 2/20/2013, Entered: 2/20/2013 Notice-Assignment-Mediator
        Request RequestSpace
        Blank 17 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: 2/1/2013 Statement-Case Management
          Request RequestSpace
          Blank 16 Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: 12/20/2012 Notice-Case Management Conference
            Request RequestSpace
            Blank 15 Filed: 10/24/2012, Entered: 10/24/2012 Notice Of Ruling
            AMENDED
              Request RequestSpace
              Blank 14 Filed: 10/18/2012, Entered: 10/18/2012 Notice Of Ruling
              FOLLOWING HRG ON DEMURRER AND MTN TO STRIKE
                Request RequestSpace
                Blank 13 Filed: 10/15/2012, Entered: 10/15/2012 miscellaneous other
                form interrogatories
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Blank 12 Filed: 10/4/2012, Entered: 10/4/2012 Reply/Response
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Blank 11 Filed: 10/3/2012, Entered: 10/3/2012 Reply/Response
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Blank 10 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: 9/21/2012 Motion to Strike
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Blank 9 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: 9/21/2012 Declaration
                        OF CHRISTINA PISIKIAN
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Blank 8 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: 9/21/2012 Supporting Docs/ P's & A's
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Blank 7 Filed: 9/13/2012, Entered: 9/13/2012 Order-Court Fee Waiver After Hrg
                              Request RequestSpace
                              Blank 6 Filed: 8/23/2012, Entered: 8/23/2012 Order-Court Fee Waiver
                                Request RequestSpace
                                Blank 5 Filed: 8/21/2012, Entered: 8/21/2012 Demurrer
                                  Request RequestSpace
                                  Blank 4 Filed: 8/21/2012, Entered: 8/21/2012 Request-Waive Court Fees
                                    Request RequestSpace
                                    Blank 3 Filed: 7/17/2012, Entered: 7/17/2012 Substitution of Attorney
                                      Request RequestSpace
                                      Blank 2 Filed: 7/9/2012, Entered: 7/9/2012 Proof-Service/Summons
                                      complaint
                                        Request RequestSpace
                                        Blank 1 Filed: 5/1/2012, Entered: 5/1/2012 Complaint
                                          Request RequestSpace

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 641 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?