Elite Aviation Llc et al v. Shane C Warner et al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. BC483935

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Aero-sphere, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Aerowarner Inc., Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Does 1 Through 100, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Warner Shane C., Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Elite Aviation, LLC, Plaintiff/Petitioner
No Logo Holifield Christine E., Plaintiff/Petitioner
No Logo Wilkins, John, Plaintiff/Petitioner
Type Defamation (Slander/Libel) (General Jurisdiction)
Status Dismissed - Other 08/15/2012
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 5 Filed: 8/15/2012, Entered: 8/15/2012 Request and Entry of Dismissal
WITH PREJUDICE, ENTIRE ACTION
    Request RequestSpace
    Blank 4 Filed: 7/6/2012, Entered: 7/6/2012 Notice-Related Cases
    12SESC00017 (FRESNO SUPERIOR COURT
      Request RequestSpace
      Blank 3 Filed: 6/25/2012, Entered: 6/25/2012 Proof of Service
      SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT SUB-SERVED ON 5-23-12 AND BY MAIL ON 5-24-12
        Request RequestSpace
        Blank 2 Filed: 5/10/2012, Entered: 5/10/2012 Notice-Case Management Conference
          Request RequestSpace
          Blank 1 Filed: 5/3/2012, Entered: 5/3/2012 Complaint
            Request RequestSpace

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 1 time.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?