Luis Eduardo Morales v. James M Barbachano et al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. BC484591

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Barbachano James M., Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Does 1 To 50, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Laserdynamics, LLC, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Nicolas Abner Z., Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Morales Luis Eduardo, Plaintiff/Petitioner
Type Contractual Fraud (General Jurisdiction)
Status Dismissed - Other 03/28/2013
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 18 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: 3/28/2013 Request and Entry of Dismissal
ENTIRE ACTION W/O PREJ
    Blank 17 Filed: 11/30/2012, Entered: 11/30/2012 Partial Dismissal
    w/o Prejudice) (As to Defendant JAMES M. BARBACHANO only
      Blank 16 Filed: 11/28/2012, Entered: 11/28/2012 Statement-Case Management
        Blank 15 Filed: 11/28/2012, Entered: 11/28/2012 Default Entered
        LASER DYNAMICS, LLC, A CALIF LIMITED PARTNERSHIP
          Blank 14 Filed: 11/28/2012, Entered: 11/28/2012 Default Entered
          ABNER Z. NICOLAS
            Blank 13 Filed: 10/15/2012, Entered: 10/15/2012 Statement-Case Management
              Blank 12 Filed: 10/3/2012, Entered: 10/3/2012 Declaration Of Diligence
                Blank 11 Filed: 10/3/2012, Entered: 10/3/2012 Proof of Service
                  Blank 10 Filed: 9/7/2012, Entered: 9/7/2012 Proof of Service
                    Blank 9 Filed: 9/7/2012, Entered: 9/7/2012 Statement-Case Management
                      Blank 8 Filed: 7/18/2012, Entered: 7/18/2012 Default Entered
                      AS JAMES M. BARBACHANO
                        Blank 7 Filed: 7/18/2012, Entered: 7/18/2012 Proof of Service
                        BY MAIL
                          Blank 6 Filed: 6/5/2012, Entered: 6/5/2012 Proof of Service
                            Blank 5 Filed: 6/5/2012, Entered: 6/5/2012 Proof of Service
                            SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT
                              Blank 4 Filed: 6/5/2012, Entered: 6/5/2012 Declaration Of Diligence
                              SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT
                                Blank 3 Filed: 6/5/2012, Entered: 6/5/2012 Proof of Serv of Ntc by Mail
                                SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT
                                  Blank 2 Filed: 5/16/2012, Entered: 5/16/2012 Notice-Case Management Conference
                                    Blank 1 Filed: 5/11/2012, Entered: 5/11/2012 Complaint

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 0 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?