Ultra Pro International Llc v. Hanover Accessories Corp

State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. BC485044
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Ultra Pro International LLC, Plaintiff/Petitioner

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Hornak Michael T..
v.
No Logo Does 1 To 50, Defendant/Respondent
Other Parties
No Logo Hanover Accessories Corp., Defendant and Cross-Complainant
No Logo Ultra Pro Corporation, Defendant/Respondent's AKA
Attributes
Type Declaratory Relief Only (General Jurisdiction)
Status Dismissed - Other 01/15/2013
Timeline
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 18 Filed: 1/15/2013, Entered: 1/15/2013 Request and Entry of Dismissal
ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE INCLUSIVE OF CROSS-COMPLAINT
Request RequestSpace
Blank 17 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: 1/7/2013 Stipulation and Order
to continue CMC to 2/11/13
Request RequestSpace
Blank 16 Filed: 12/31/2012, Entered: 12/31/2012 Statement-Case Management
Request RequestSpace
Blank 15 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: 12/21/2012 Notice
OF POSTING JURY FEES
Request RequestSpace
Blank 14 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: 12/21/2012 Statement-Case Management
Request RequestSpace
Blank 13 Filed: 12/14/2012, Entered: 12/14/2012 Answer
Request RequestSpace
Blank 12 Filed: 12/14/2012, Entered: 12/14/2012 Cross Complaint
Request RequestSpace
Blank 11 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: 12/7/2012 Stipulation and Order
to move deadline to file and serve answer
Request RequestSpace
Blank 10 Filed: 11/20/2012, Entered: 11/20/2012 Order
re submitted ruling on demurrer
Request RequestSpace
Blank 9 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: 9/21/2012 reply to motion
TO OPPOSITON TO DEMURRER
Request RequestSpace
Blank 8 Filed: 9/17/2012, Entered: 9/17/2012 Opposition Document
Request RequestSpace
Blank 7 Filed: 8/7/2012, Entered: 8/7/2012 Statement-Case Management
Request RequestSpace
Blank 6 Filed: 8/3/2012, Entered: 8/3/2012 Statement-Case Management
Request RequestSpace
Blank 5 Filed: 7/17/2012, Entered: 7/17/2012 Demurrer
TO COMPLAINT TO BE HELD 9/28/12
Request RequestSpace
Blank 4 Filed: 7/9/2012, Entered: 7/9/2012 Notice of Status Conference filed
Request RequestSpace
Blank 3 Filed: 6/22/2012, Entered: 6/22/2012 Notice of Status Conference filed
Request RequestSpace
Blank 2 Filed: 6/21/2012, Entered: 6/21/2012 Proof-Service/Summons
Request RequestSpace
Blank 1 Filed: 6/14/2012, Entered: 6/14/2012 Complaint
Request RequestSpace

Statistics

This case has been viewed 178 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?