Los Angeles Unified School District v. Natalia Acosta et al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. BC487197

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Richard Timothy Stephens, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Abelardo Bermejo Jr, Defendant
No Logo Abraham Gallegos, Defendant
No Logo Alexander Schwab, Defendant
No Logo Alexis Piazza, Defendant
No Logo Alice Gualpa, Defendant
No Logo Alicia Martin, Defendant
No Logo Allan Yu, Defendant
No Logo Allie Landers, Defendant
No Logo Amber Haley, Defendant
No Logo Amelia Harris, Defendant
No Logo Amy Berns, Defendant
No Logo Amy Evans, Defendant
No Logo And Does 1 Through 1000 Inclusive, Defendant
No Logo Andrea Cammarota, Defendant
No Logo Andrea Wasden, Defendant
No Logo Andrea Willcox, Defendant
No Logo Andrew Ravits, Defendant
No Logo Andrew Villanueva, Defendant
No Logo Anita Churchville, Defendant
No Logo Anna Lee, Defendant
No Logo Apolonia Cruz Martinez, Defendant
No Logo Appolonia Olumba, Defendant
No Logo April Smith, Defendant
No Logo Ariana Fraga, Defendant
No Logo Arlene Rivas, Defendant
No Logo Arthur Yahiku, Defendant
No Logo Audrey Mclaughlin, Defendant
No Logo Aundrea Scott, Defendant
No Logo Aurora Tourtellotte, Defendant
No Logo Avery Kallas, Defendant
No Logo Barbara Cofer, Defendant
No Logo Barbara Freedman, Defendant
No Logo Barbara Izarraraz, Defendant
No Logo Bonnie Duguid Siegel, Defendant
No Logo Brenda Mc Kindra, Defendant
No Logo Brian Eamer, Defendant
No Logo Bridgette Booth, Defendant
No Logo Buren Simmons, Defendant
No Logo Caitlin Mac Dowell, Defendant
No Logo Candace Lawrence, Defendant
No Logo Carey Smith, Defendant
No Logo Carina Vazquez, Defendant
No Logo Carlos Penate, Defendant
No Logo Carlos Salazar, Defendant
No Logo Carmen Rivera, Defendant
No Logo Carolina Castillo, Defendant
No Logo Carrie Broquard, Defendant
No Logo Carrie Diedolf, Defendant
No Logo Cassie Santos, Defendant
No Logo Cathy Sales, Defendant
No Logo Cathy Zeidel, Defendant
No Logo Cecelia Haugen, Defendant
No Logo Charlise Duparl, Defendant
No Logo Cheri Noel, Defendant
No Logo Cherry Young, Defendant
No Logo Cheryl Chistopher, Defendant
No Logo Chris Rico, Defendant
No Logo Christin Park, Defendant
No Logo Christine Smith, Defendant
No Logo Christopher Boscarino, Defendant
No Logo Christopher Lock, Defendant
No Logo Christopher Miranda, Defendant
No Logo Clarissa Ingram, Defendant
No Logo Claudia Diaz De Leon, Defendant
No Logo Clinton Robinson, Defendant
No Logo Colleen Faris, Defendant
No Logo Corazon Rigor, Defendant
No Logo Courtney Miller, Defendant
No Logo Craig Seganti, Defendant
No Logo Crisanto Gallegos, Defendant
No Logo Crystal Davis, Defendant
No Logo Cynthia Fitzgerald, Defendant
No Logo Cynthia White, Defendant
No Logo Dana Bagdassarian, Defendant
No Logo Darren Borg, Defendant
No Logo David, Samuel, Defendant
No Logo DAVID THOMPSON, Defendant
No Logo David Trbovich, Defendant
No Logo Deborah Michels, Defendant
No Logo Deniza Moran, Defendant
No Logo Desiree Newton, Defendant
No Logo Diana Baker, Defendant
No Logo Dianne Fernandez, Defendant
No Logo Dietrich Bradford, Defendant
No Logo Donald Garcia, Defendant
No Logo Donald Hart, Defendant
No Logo Douglas, Martin, Defendant
No Logo Duong Ho, Defendant
No Logo E. Pisarz, Defendant
No Logo Eboni Kemp, Defendant
No Logo Eddie Moscoso, Defendant
No Logo Edwin Messal, Defendant
No Logo Elaine Linas, Defendant
No Logo Elena Golt, Defendant
No Logo Elizabeth Larson, Defendant
No Logo Emely Leigh, Defendant
No Logo Erika Baum, Defendant
No Logo Erin Guesno, Defendant
No Logo Erwin Faralan, Defendant
No Logo Ester Tyler Aikens, Defendant
No Logo Eugene Robidoux, Defendant
No Logo Evelyn Carr, Defendant
No Logo Francisco Ambriz, Defendant
No Logo Frank Bengier, Defendant
No Logo Frank Vitale, Defendant
No Logo Franklin Hsu, Defendant
No Logo Genaro Favela, Defendant
No Logo Georgia Reese, Defendant
No Logo Gina Gatto, Defendant
No Logo Gina Radogna, Defendant
No Logo Giselle Spriewald, Defendant
No Logo Gloria Bonilla, Defendant
No Logo Gloria Davis, Defendant
No Logo Gloria Rommel, Defendant
No Logo Gregorio Verbera, Defendant
No Logo Gregory Sotir, Defendant
No Logo Guillermo Aviles Rodriguez, Defendant
No Logo Ha, Nguyen, Defendant
No Logo Harry Tom, Defendant
No Logo Heather Mcmanus, Defendant
No Logo Helmut Zimmer, Defendant
No Logo Hilah Swidler, Defendant
No Logo Holly Hoffer, Defendant
No Logo Jaamal Jones, Defendant
No Logo Jacob, Edward S., Defendant
No Logo Jacqueline Hall, Defendant
No Logo Jaime Tychsen, Defendant
No Logo James Coyle, Defendant
No Logo James Moore, Defendant
No Logo James, Peter, Defendant
No Logo Jana Risher, Defendant
No Logo Janet Hunter, Defendant
No Logo Jason Simon, Defendant
No Logo Jeffrey Hartwig, Defendant
No Logo Jeffrey Walker, Defendant
No Logo Jenaro Torres, Defendant
No Logo Jennifer Beatty, Defendant
No Logo Jennifer Cangemi, Defendant
No Logo Jennifer Hoft, Defendant
No Logo Jennifer Lee, Defendant
No Logo Jennifer Radis, Defendant
No Logo Jenny Lindemann, Defendant
No Logo Jeri Obrien, Defendant
No Logo Jessica Hauser, Defendant
No Logo Jessie Chen, Defendant
No Logo Jill Weinberg, Defendant
No Logo Jjiibwa Nagenda, Defendant
No Logo Joan Hairston, Defendant
No Logo Joan Walker, Defendant
No Logo John Pattschull, Defendant
No Logo John Pentecost, Defendant
No Logo John Shreve, Defendant
No Logo John Stoneburner, Defendant
No Logo Johnny Parker, Defendant
No Logo Jon Reimbold, Defendant
No Logo Jones Okeke, Defendant
No Logo Joseph Lauria, Defendant
No Logo Joseph Ziminsky, Defendant
No Logo Joshua Beardall, Defendant
No Logo Juliet Rodriguez, Defendant
No Logo Julio Nunez, Defendant
No Logo Karen Case, Defendant
No Logo Karen Miller, Defendant
No Logo Karessa Silvers, Defendant
No Logo Katharine Mitchell, Defendant
No Logo Katherine Tranfa, Defendant
No Logo Katheryne Soller, Defendant
No Logo Kathleen Elliott, Defendant
No Logo Kathy Kim, Defendant
No Logo Katiuska Castaneda, Defendant
No Logo Keely Dietrick, Defendant
No Logo Kelli Kozak, Defendant
No Logo Kelly Mindes, Defendant
No Logo Kendra Moore, Defendant
No Logo Kenneth Hoffman, Defendant
No Logo Kenneth Kirk, Defendant
No Logo Kennette Nunag Mejia, Defendant
No Logo Kerry Nachenberg, Defendant
No Logo Kerry Salmons, Defendant
No Logo Kesi Armstrong, Defendant
No Logo Kevan Combs, Defendant
No Logo Keven Barker, Defendant
No Logo Kristen Cardillo, Defendant
No Logo Kristen Kessler, Defendant
No Logo Laura Mackiewicz, Defendant
No Logo Laura Reeves, Defendant
No Logo Lauren Leitner, Defendant
No Logo Lee, Chou, Defendant
No Logo Leonor Martinez, Defendant
No Logo Lesley Garcia, Defendant
No Logo Leslie Malling, Defendant
No Logo Leticia Carranza, Defendant
No Logo Liane Hesse, Defendant
No Logo Lien Huynh, Defendant
No Logo Linda Grayson, Defendant
No Logo Linda Larson, Defendant
No Logo Linda Long, Defendant
No Logo Linda Wolvek, Defendant
No Logo Linda Zahorik, Defendant
No Logo Lisa Pharr, Defendant
No Logo Liza Wardell, Defendant
No Logo Lori Meyer, Defendant
No Logo Louise Elliott, Defendant
No Logo Luis Castaneda, Defendant
No Logo Luis South, Defendant
No Logo Luis Zambrano, Defendant
No Logo Luz Calbitaza, Defendant
No Logo Lynet Morrow, Defendant
No Logo Lynne Casal, Defendant
No Logo Ma Teresa Borquez, Defendant
No Logo Marcos Cavadas, Defendant
No Logo Maria Madrigal, Defendant
No Logo Maria Morato, Defendant
No Logo Maria Tsagrinos, Defendant
No Logo Maria Villanueva, Defendant
No Logo Marie Dowsing, Defendant
No Logo Marissa Staller, Defendant
No Logo Marjorie Barr, Defendant
No Logo Martha Borquez, Defendant
No Logo Martin Flores, Defendant
No Logo Mary Ann Baer Forman, Defendant
No Logo Matthew Sablove, Defendant
No Logo Melanie Shannon Bean, Defendant
No Logo Melissa Dotson, Defendant
No Logo Melissa Helali, Defendant
No Logo Michael Geffeney, Defendant
No Logo Michael Stigall, Defendant
No Logo Michelle Ota, Defendant
No Logo Michelle Song, Defendant
No Logo Michelle Zinser, Defendant
No Logo Mireya Ramos Meza, Defendant
No Logo Monica Boggs, Defendant
No Logo Nelly Assadourian, Defendant
No Logo Nelson Blanco, Defendant
No Logo Nicole Dunn, Defendant
No Logo Nicole Matievic, Defendant
No Logo Nisha Dugal, Defendant
No Logo Norgeena Gatchalian, Defendant
No Logo Nychelle Parks Toussaint, Defendant
No Logo Ofelia Lopez, Defendant
No Logo Ora Sparks, Defendant
No Logo Patricia Malaszczuk, Defendant
No Logo Patricia Sandoval, Defendant
No Logo Patricia Senior, Defendant
No Logo Patricia Socha, Defendant
No Logo Pattie Durry, Defendant
No Logo Paul Metoyer, Defendant
No Logo Peter Paredes, Defendant
No Logo Peter Sloan, Defendant
No Logo Phillip Gedeon, Defendant
No Logo Quiana Washington, Defendant
No Logo Rachel Brill, Defendant
No Logo Rachel Pash, Defendant
No Logo Rachel Shalts, Defendant
No Logo Randal Gibbs, Defendant
No Logo Raymond Deer, Defendant
No Logo Rena Oage, Defendant
No Logo Rene Urbina, Defendant
No Logo Rex Cooper, Defendant
No Logo Richard Ziegler, Defendant
No Logo Rita Shaw, Defendant
No Logo Robert Sihler, Defendant
No Logo Robert White, Defendant
No Logo Rochelle Chatman, Defendant
No Logo Rochelle Morrison, Defendant
No Logo Romulo Berina, Defendant
No Logo Ronny Ison, Defendant
No Logo Rosa Canizales, Defendant
No Logo Rosemarie De Ocampo, Defendant
No Logo Ross King, Defendant
No Logo Ruben Trinidad, Defendant
No Logo Rudy Meza, Defendant
No Logo Ruthie Cohen Spiegel, Defendant
No Logo Ryan Maquinana, Defendant
No Logo Samara Simmerman, Defendant
No Logo Sanan Pourfathi, Defendant
No Logo Sandra Depinto, Defendant
No Logo Sandra Michaels, Defendant
No Logo Sandra Tootalian, Defendant
No Logo Sara Blumenthal, Defendant
No Logo Sarah Bruno, Defendant
No Logo Sarah Kira, Defendant
No Logo Sarah Kowalczyk, Defendant
No Logo Sarah Salvacion Vasquez, Defendant
No Logo Seema Gaur, Defendant
No Logo Sergio Sanchez, Defendant
No Logo Shannon, James, Defendant
Officer/Director, Ict Group, Inc.
No Logo Shannon Robinson, Defendant
No Logo Shanta Mayes, Defendant
No Logo Sharon Hong, Defendant
No Logo Shayla Perl, Defendant
No Logo Sheree Hunter, Defendant
No Logo Sheronda Helton, Defendant
No Logo Somer Nugent, Defendant
No Logo Sonia Rodarte, Defendant
No Logo Stefani Tovar, Defendant
No Logo Stephen, James, Defendant
No Logo Stephen Patterson, Defendant
No Logo Steven Ilias, Defendant
No Logo Stuart Sam, Defendant
No Logo Sumeet Vaikunth, Defendant
No Logo Susan Beaman, Defendant
No Logo Susan Cahill, Defendant
No Logo Susan Deaton, Defendant
No Logo Susanna Lindqvist, Defendant
No Logo Suzanne Blea, Defendant
No Logo Sydney Marie Schaef, Defendant
No Logo Sylvia Martin Mancilla, Defendant
No Logo Sylvie Chagnon, Defendant
No Logo Tabia Lee, Defendant
No Logo Tara Thomas, Defendant
No Logo Tarsis Najam, Defendant
No Logo Theodore Huling, Defendant
No Logo Therese Schmidt, Defendant
No Logo Thomas Shelden, Defendant
No Logo Timothy Balut, Defendant
No Logo Tommy Wilson, Defendant
No Logo Ulla Hanson, Defendant
No Logo Valeska Lopez, Defendant
No Logo Violeta Reinaga, Defendant
No Logo Virginia Pearson, Defendant
No Logo Wanda Miller, Defendant
No Logo White Stephanie, Defendant
No Logo William Mac Donald, Defendant
No Logo William Munkacsy, Defendant
No Logo Zanaida Bynum Roberson, Defendant
No Logo Zuleima Sullivan, Defendant
No Logo Acosta Natalia, Defendant/Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Wells, Small, Fleharty & Weil

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space White Shawn
No Logo Aguas Maritza, Defendant/Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Wells, Small, Fleharty & Weil

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space White Shawn
No Logo Aguillon Issac, Defendant/Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Wells, Small, Fleharty & Weil

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space White Shawn
No Logo Alexander Annette, Defendant/Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Wells, Small, Fleharty & Weil

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space White Shawn
No Logo Alfaro Ericka, Defendant/Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Wells, Small, Fleharty & Weil

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space White Shawn
No Logo Alipour Zari, Defendant/Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Wells, Small, Fleharty & Weil

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space White Shawn
No Logo Hector Vega, Defendant/Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Wells, Small, Fleharty & Weil

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space White Shawn
No Logo Rodriguez Rebecca, Defendant/Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Wells, Small, Fleharty & Weil

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space White Shawn
No Logo Alejandro Vega, Defendant & Defendant in Pro Per
No Logo Alferez Mercedes, Defendant & Defendant in Pro Per
No Logo Arleen Medina, Defendant & Defendant in Pro Per
No Logo Brand N. Kay, Defendant & Defendant in Pro Per
No Logo Clark, Dorothy, Defendant & Defendant in Pro Per
No Logo Cooper Kristin, Defendant & Defendant in Pro Per
No Logo Fortson Sylvia, Defendant & Defendant in Pro Per
No Logo Henry Turner, Defendant & Defendant in Pro Per
No Logo Howard, Kent, Defendant & Defendant in Pro Per
No Logo Jose Herrera, Defendant & Defendant in Pro Per
No Logo Lawrence Carnow, Defendant & Defendant in Pro Per
No Logo Lee, Jennifer, Defendant & Defendant in Pro Per
No Logo Leif Andersen, Defendant & Defendant in Pro Per
No Logo Logan John T., Defendant & Defendant in Pro Per
No Logo Mark, Morris, Defendant & Defendant in Pro Per
No Logo Mclaine Carol, Defendant & Defendant in Pro Per
No Logo Michael Oshiro, Defendant & Defendant in Pro Per
No Logo Rebecca Rodriguez, Defendant & Defendant in Pro Per
No Logo Shellane Dizon, Defendant & Defendant in Pro Per
No Logo Singara Victoria, Defendant & Defendant in Pro Per
No Logo Victoria Sinagra, Defendant & Defendant in Pro Per
No Logo Los Angeles Superior Court-limited Juris., Court-Other County/State
No Logo Los Angeles Unified School District, Plaintiff/Petitioner

Represented by Koeller, Nebeker, Carlson & Haluck, LLP

Type Collections Case-Seller Plaintiff (General Jurisdiction)
Status Reclassified-Limited-Los Angeles 07/29/2013
  Entries (522) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 522 Filed: 12/9/2014, Entered: 12/9/2014 Request for Certified Copy
Sylvia Fortson
    Blank 521 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: 5/8/2014 Substitution of Attorney
    REBECCA RODRIGUEZ
      Blank 520 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: 5/1/2014 Notice-Stay
      BANKRUPTCY OF JAMES INGRAM, CLARISSA INGRAM
        Blank 519 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: 4/30/2014 Request for Certified Copy
        AS TO ROSS S.HECKMANN
          Blank 518 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: 9/30/2013 miscellaneous other
          *RETURNED NOTICE OF OUTGOING TRANSFER ON ATTORNEY LAW OFFICES OF PAUL MANKIN
            Blank 517 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: 9/4/2013 Notice-Stay
              Blank 516 Filed: 8/28/2013, Entered: 8/28/2013 miscellaneous other
              RETURNED NOTICE OF OUTGOING RECLASSIFICATION/UNDELIVERABLE
                Blank 515 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: 8/15/2013 Notice Of Ruling
                  Blank 514 Filed: 8/1/2013, Entered: 8/1/2013 Notice Of Ruling
                    Blank 513 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: 7/31/2013 Partial Dismissal
                    w/o Prejudice) (COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT, KERRY SALMONS ONLY
                      Blank 512 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: 7/31/2013 Notice Of Ruling
                        Blank 511 Filed: 7/26/2013, Entered: 7/26/2013 Motion
                          Blank 510 Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: 7/24/2013 Answer
                            Blank 509 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: 7/18/2013 Stipulation
                            STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT
                              Blank 508 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: 7/18/2013 Order
                              s
                                Blank 507 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: 7/17/2013 Notice Of Ruling
                                  Blank 506 Filed: 7/16/2013, Entered: 7/16/2013 Motion To Be Relieved As Counsel
                                    Blank 505 Filed: 7/16/2013, Entered: 7/16/2013 Declaration
                                    OF MICHAEL A. LAWSON
                                      Blank 504 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: 7/12/2013 Partial Dismissal
                                      w/o Prejudice) (AS TO DEFENDANT ELAINE LINAS, ONLY
                                        Blank 503 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: 7/12/2013 Partial Dismissal
                                        w/o Prejudice) (AS TO DEFENDANT BRIDGETTE BOOTH, ONLY
                                          Blank 502 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: 7/12/2013 Partial Dismissal
                                          w/o Prejudice) (AS TO DEFENDANT, CARRIE BROQUARD, ONLY
                                            Blank 501 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: 7/12/2013 Partial Dismissal
                                            w/o Prejudice) (AS TO DEFENDANT, JAAMAL JONES, ONLY
                                              Blank 500 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: 7/12/2013 Partial Dismissal
                                              w/o Prejudice) (AS TO DEFENDNAT JOSHUA BEARDALL, ONLY
                                                Blank 499 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: 7/10/2013 Proof-Service/Summons
                                                P/S CARLOS SALAZAR
                                                  Blank 498 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: 7/8/2013 Report - Status
                                                    Blank 497 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: 7/8/2013 Statement-Case Management
                                                      Blank 496 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: 7/8/2013 Notice-Related Cases
                                                        Blank 495 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: 7/8/2013 Default Entered
                                                        as to Sanam Pourfathi
                                                          Blank 494 Filed: 7/5/2013, Entered: 7/5/2013 Notice
                                                          OF TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE FOR CASE STTUS CONF.
                                                            Blank 493 Filed: 6/25/2013, Entered: 6/25/2013 Reply/Response
                                                              Blank 492 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: 6/19/2013 Opposition Document
                                                              OF PLAINTIFF, LAUSD, TO MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND VACAT E ORDER OF PUBLICATION BY DEFENDAN T, CARLOS SALAZAR; MOTION TO RECOV ER SERVICE RELATED COSTS IC.C.P. ? 415.30(D)J; DECLARTION OF HIROYOSH
                                                                Blank 491 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: 6/19/2013 Amended Proof Of Service
                                                                OF OPPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF, LAUSD, TO MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUM MONS AND VACATE ORDER OF PUBLICATI ON BY DEFENDANT, CARLOS SALAZAR; M OTION TO RECOVER SERVICE RELATED C OSTS (C.C.P. ?415.30(D)); DECLARAT
                                                                  Blank 490 Filed: 6/12/2013, Entered: 6/12/2013 Notice-Related Cases
                                                                  BC420518
                                                                    Blank 489 Filed: 6/11/2013, Entered: 6/11/2013 Partial Dismissal
                                                                    with Prejudice) (Shellane Dizon, ONLY
                                                                      Blank 488 Filed: 6/10/2013, Entered: 6/10/2013 Partial Dismissal
                                                                      w/o Prejudice) (as to Defendant, Mercedes Alferez, ONLY
                                                                        Blank 487 Filed: 6/10/2013, Entered: 6/10/2013 Partial Dismissal
                                                                        w/o Prejudice) (as to Defendant, Gloria Bonilla, O NLY
                                                                          Blank 486 Filed: 6/10/2013, Entered: 6/10/2013 Proof of Serv of Ntc by Mail
                                                                            Blank 485 Filed: 6/6/2013, Entered: 6/6/2013 Notice Of Ruling
                                                                            AT STATUS CONFERENCE
                                                                              Blank 484 Filed: 6/6/2013, Entered: 6/6/2013 Cross Complaint
                                                                              Carol McLaine
                                                                                Blank 483 Filed: 6/3/2013, Entered: 6/3/2013 Statement-Case Management
                                                                                  Blank 482 Filed: 5/28/2013, Entered: 5/28/2013 Statement-Case Management
                                                                                    Blank 481 Filed: 5/21/2013, Entered: 5/21/2013 Statement-Case Management
                                                                                      Blank 480 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: 5/17/2013 Answer
                                                                                      Kristin Cooper
                                                                                        Blank 479 Filed: 5/16/2013, Entered: 5/16/2013 Default Entered
                                                                                        JOSHUA BEARDALL
                                                                                          Blank 478 Filed: 5/16/2013, Entered: 5/16/2013 Default Entered
                                                                                          RONNY ISON
                                                                                            Blank 477 Filed: 5/16/2013, Entered: 5/16/2013 Default Entered
                                                                                            LISA PHARR
                                                                                              Blank 476 Filed: 5/16/2013, Entered: 5/16/2013 Default Entered
                                                                                              CATHY SALES
                                                                                                Blank 475 Filed: 5/16/2013, Entered: 5/16/2013 Default Entered
                                                                                                GLORIA DAVIS
                                                                                                  Blank 474 Filed: 5/14/2013, Entered: 5/14/2013 Default Entered
                                                                                                  AS ROBERT WHITE
                                                                                                    Blank 473 Filed: 5/14/2013, Entered: 5/14/2013 Default Entered
                                                                                                    AS THOMAS SHELDEN
                                                                                                      Blank 472 Filed: 5/14/2013, Entered: 5/14/2013 Default Entered
                                                                                                      AS SERGIO SANCHEZ
                                                                                                        Blank 471 Filed: 5/14/2013, Entered: 5/14/2013 Partial Dismissal
                                                                                                        w/o Prejudice) (as to Defendant, Audrey McLaughlin ONLY
                                                                                                          Blank 470 Filed: 5/14/2013, Entered: 5/14/2013 Default Entered
                                                                                                          AS KATHERINE TRANFA
                                                                                                            Blank 469 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: 5/13/2013 Default Entered
                                                                                                            AS CARMEN RIVERA
                                                                                                              Blank 468 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: 5/13/2013 Default Entered
                                                                                                              AS KAREN MILLER
                                                                                                                Blank 467 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: 5/13/2013 Default Entered
                                                                                                                AS TARSIS HAJAM
                                                                                                                  Blank 466 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: 5/13/2013 Default Entered
                                                                                                                  AS MICHELE OTA
                                                                                                                    Blank 465 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: 5/13/2013 Default Entered
                                                                                                                    AS SUSANNA LINDQVIST
                                                                                                                      Blank 464 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: 5/13/2013 Default Entered
                                                                                                                      AS TABIA LEE
                                                                                                                        Blank 463 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: 5/13/2013 Default Entered
                                                                                                                        AS STPHEN JAMES
                                                                                                                          Blank 462 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: 5/13/2013 Default Entered
                                                                                                                          AS ULLA HANSSON
                                                                                                                            Blank 461 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: 5/13/2013 Default Entered
                                                                                                                            AS ROMULO BERINA
                                                                                                                              Blank 460 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: 5/13/2013 Default Entered
                                                                                                                              AS ABELARDO BERMEJO JR.
                                                                                                                                Blank 459 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: 5/13/2013 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                AS SUSAN CAHILL
                                                                                                                                  Blank 458 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: 5/13/2013 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                  AS MARCOS CAVADAS
                                                                                                                                    Blank 457 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: 5/13/2013 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                    AS SYLVIE CHAGNON
                                                                                                                                      Blank 456 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: 5/13/2013 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                      AS CHERYL CHRISTOPHER
                                                                                                                                        Blank 455 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: 5/13/2013 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                        AS CRISANTO GALLEGOS
                                                                                                                                          Blank 454 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: 5/13/2013 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                          AS AMBER HALEY
                                                                                                                                            Blank 453 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: 5/10/2013 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                            Summons & Complaint, etc.
                                                                                                                                              Blank 452 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: 5/10/2013 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                              Summons & Comlaint, etc.
                                                                                                                                                Blank 451 Filed: 5/7/2013, Entered: 5/7/2013 Motion to Quash
                                                                                                                                                BY DEFENDANT CARLOS SALAZAR TO QUA SH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND TO VACAT E ORDER FOR PUBLICATION; MEMORANDU M OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLA RATION OF DEFENDANT CARLOS SALAZAR
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 450 Filed: 5/6/2013, Entered: 5/6/2013 Exparte Application
                                                                                                                                                  FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE AND ANSWER OR OTHER RESPONSIVE PLEADING BY DEFT CARLOS SALAZAR
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 449 Filed: 5/3/2013, Entered: 5/3/2013 Proof-Personal Service
                                                                                                                                                    Summons & Complaint, etc.
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 448 Filed: 4/30/2013, Entered: 4/30/2013 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 447 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: 4/24/2013 Partial Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                        w/o Prejudice) (as to Defendant, Nisha Dugal, ONLY
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 446 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: 4/24/2013 Partial Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                          w/o Prejudice) (as to Defendant, Sandra Depinto, O NLY
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 445 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: 4/24/2013 Partial Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                            w/o Prejudice) (as to Defendant, Leonor Martinez, ONLY
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 444 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: 4/24/2013 Partial Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                              w/o Prejudice) (as to Defendant, Elizabeth Larson, ONLY
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 443 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: 4/24/2013 Partial Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                w/o Prejudice) (as to Defendant, Louise Elliot, ON LY
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 442 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: 4/24/2013 Partial Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                  w/o Prejudice) (as to Defendant, Courtney Miller, ONLY
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 441 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: 4/24/2013 Partial Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                    w/o Prejudice) (as to Defendant, Ora Sparks, ONLY
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 440 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: 4/24/2013 Partial Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                      w/o Prejudice) (as to Defendant, Jill Weinberg, ON LY
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 439 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: 4/24/2013 Partial Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                        w/o Prejudice) (as to Defendant, Jenaro Torres, ON LY
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 438 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: 4/24/2013 Partial Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                          w/o Prejudice) (as to Defendant, Luis Zambrano, ON LY
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 437 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: 4/24/2013 Partial Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                            w/o Prejudice) (as to Defendant, Katherine Mitchel l, ONLY
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 436 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: 4/24/2013 Partial Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                              w/o Prejudice) (as to Defendant, Somer Nugent, ONL Y
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 435 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: 4/24/2013 Partial Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                w/o Prejudice) (as to Defendant, Jon Reimbold, ONL Y
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 434 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: 4/24/2013 Partial Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                  w/o Prejudice) (as to Defendant, Corazon Rigor, ON LY
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 433 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: 4/24/2013 Partial Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                    w/o Prejudice) (as to Defendant, Karessa Silvers, ONLY
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 432 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: 4/24/2013 Partial Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                      w/o Prejudice) (as to Defendant, Buren Simmons, ON LY
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 431 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: 4/24/2013 Notice of Status Conference filed
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 430 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: 4/24/2013 Partial Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                          w/o Prejudice) (as to Defendant, Pattie Durry, ONL Y
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 429 Filed: 4/12/2013, Entered: 4/12/2013 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT, ETC.(2
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 428 Filed: 4/12/2013, Entered: 4/12/2013 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                              Summons & Complaint, etc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 427 Filed: 4/12/2013, Entered: 4/12/2013 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                Summons & Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 426 Filed: 4/12/2013, Entered: 4/12/2013 Proof-Personal Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Summons & Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 425 Filed: 4/12/2013, Entered: 4/12/2013 Proof-Personal Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Summons & Complaint, etc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 424 Filed: 4/12/2013, Entered: 4/12/2013 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT- KRISTIN COOPER (NO ORDER OF THE COURT
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 423 Filed: 4/10/2013, Entered: 4/10/2013 Notice of Status Conference filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 422 Filed: 4/8/2013, Entered: 4/8/2013 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                          AS STUART SAM
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 421 Filed: 3/21/2013, Entered: 3/21/2013 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Deniza Mora
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 420 Filed: 3/20/2013, Entered: 3/20/2013 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                              AS DESIREE NEWTON
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 419 Filed: 3/20/2013, Entered: 3/20/2013 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                AS RUBEN TRINIDAD
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 418 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: 3/18/2013 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OF CASE REASSIGNMENT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 417 Filed: 3/15/2013, Entered: 3/15/2013 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    OF RESETTING OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR RECLASSIFICATION OF CASE FROM UNLIMITED TO LIMITED; ETC.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 416 Filed: 3/15/2013, Entered: 3/15/2013 Notice Of Ruling
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AT CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 415 Filed: 3/14/2013, Entered: 3/14/2013 Notice of Reassignment and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 414 Filed: 3/13/2013, Entered: 3/13/2013 Partial Dismissal(not entire case)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          WITHOUT PREJUDICE, COMPLAINT, AS TO DEFENDANT BARBARA COFER, ONLY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 413 Filed: 3/13/2013, Entered: 3/13/2013 Partial Dismissal(not entire case)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            WITHOUT PREJUDICE, COMPLAINT, AS TO ANNETTE ALEXANDER, ONLY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 412 Filed: 3/13/2013, Entered: 3/13/2013 Partial Dismissal(not entire case)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              WITHOUT PREJUDICE, COMPLAINT, AS TO DEFENDANT ZANAIDA BYNUM ROBERSON, ONLY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 411 Filed: 3/13/2013, Entered: 3/13/2013 Partial Dismissal(not entire case)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                WITHOUT PREJUDICE, COMPLAINT, AS TO DEFENDANT SARA BLUMENTHAL, ONLY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 410 Filed: 3/13/2013, Entered: 3/13/2013 Partial Dismissal(not entire case)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  WITHOUT PREJUDICE, COMPLAINT, AS TO DEFENDANT, NICOLE MATIEVIC, ONLY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 409 Filed: 3/13/2013, Entered: 3/13/2013 Partial Dismissal(not entire case)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    WITHOUT PREJUDICE, COMPLAINT, AS TO DEFENDANT ROCHELLE CHATMAN, ONLY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 408 Filed: 3/12/2013, Entered: 3/12/2013 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUSAN BEAMAN
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 407 Filed: 3/12/2013, Entered: 3/12/2013 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PHILLIP GEDEON
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 406 Filed: 3/12/2013, Entered: 3/12/2013 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF CHAPTER 7 BANKRUPTCY CASE CLOSURE (WITHOUT DISCHARGE) AS TO DEFT, MERCEDES ALFEREZ
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 405 Filed: 3/12/2013, Entered: 3/12/2013 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MERCEDES ALFEREZ
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 404 Filed: 3/12/2013, Entered: 3/12/2013 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              GLORIA BONILLA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 403 Filed: 3/12/2013, Entered: 3/12/2013 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TOMMY WILSON
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 402 Filed: 3/12/2013, Entered: 3/12/2013 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANDREW RAVITS
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 401 Filed: 3/12/2013, Entered: 3/12/2013 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CARRIE BROQUARD
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 400 Filed: 3/12/2013, Entered: 3/12/2013 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AVERY KALLAS
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 399 Filed: 3/12/2013, Entered: 3/12/2013 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        JJIIBWA NAGENDA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 398 Filed: 3/12/2013, Entered: 3/12/2013 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ROSA CANIZALES
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 397 Filed: 3/11/2013, Entered: 3/11/2013 Amended Proof Of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 396 Filed: 3/8/2013, Entered: 3/8/2013 Opposition Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TO DEFT KRISTIN COOPER'S MOTION TO QUASH
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 395 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: 3/6/2013 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                of withdrawal of plffs motion for reclassification
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 394 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: 3/5/2013 Opposition Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  to demurrer stephanie white
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 393 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: 2/28/2013 Order for Publication
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FOR SERGIO SANCHEZ NEWSPAPER THE LOS ANGELES TIMES
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 392 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: 2/28/2013 Order for Publication
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FOR SERGIO SANCHEZ NEWSPAPER THE LOS ANGELES TIMES
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 391 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: 2/28/2013 Order for Publication
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        FOR CARLOS SANCHEZ NEWSPAPER THE LOS ANGELES TIMES
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 390 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: 2/28/2013 Appl & Ord to Publish Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          FOR RICHARD TIMOTHY STEPHENS NEWSPAPER THE LOS ANGELES TIMES (NO FEE GOVT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 389 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: 2/28/2013 Order for Publication
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            FOR MICHELE OTA NEWSPAPER THE LOS ANGELES TIMES
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 388 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: 2/28/2013 Order for Publication
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              FOR RICHARD TIMOTHY STEPHENS NEWSPAPER THE LOS ANGELES TIMES
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 387 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: 2/28/2013 Order for Publication
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                FOR ROBERT WHITE NEWSAPER THE LOS ANGELES TIMES
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 386 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: 2/28/2013 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SARAH KOWALCZYK
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 385 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: 2/28/2013 Order for Publication
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FOR THOMAS SHELDEN NEWSPAPER THE LOS ANGELES TIMES
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 384 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: 2/28/2013 Order for Publication
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FOR GLORIA DAVIS NEWSPAPER THE RIVERSIDE PRESS ENTERPRISE
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 383 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: 2/28/2013 Order for Publication
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        FOR JOSHUA BEARDALL NEWSPAPER NEWS-GAZETTE
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 382 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: 2/28/2013 Order for Publication
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          FOR MARCOS CAVADAS NEWSPAPER THE LOS ANGELES TIMES
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 381 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: 2/28/2013 Order for Publication
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            FOR CARMEN RIVERA NEWSPAPER THE LOS ANGELES TIMES
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 380 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: 2/28/2013 Order for Publication
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              FOR LISA PHARR NEWSPAPER DURANGO HERALD
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 379 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: 2/28/2013 Order for Publication
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                FOR AMBER HALEY NEWSPAPER THE LOS ANGELES TIMES
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 378 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: 2/28/2013 Order for Publication
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FOR KATHERINE TRANFA NEWSPAPER THE LOS ANGELES TIMES
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 377 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: 2/28/2013 Order for Publication
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FOR CATHY SALES NEWSPAPER ORANGE COUNTY REGISTER
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 376 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: 2/28/2013 Order for Publication
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FOR CARLOS SALAZAR NEWSPAPER THE LOS ANGELES TIMES
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 375 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: 2/27/2013 Amended Proof Of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 374 Filed: 2/26/2013, Entered: 2/26/2013 Proof-Service/Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          X3
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 373 Filed: 2/26/2013, Entered: 2/26/2013 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RICHARD TIMOTHY SEPHENS
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 372 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: 2/22/2013 Appl & Ord to Publish Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              FOR JOSHUA BEARDALL NEWSPAPER NEWS-GAZETT (NO FEE GOVT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 371 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: 2/22/2013 Appl & Ord to Publish Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                FOR GLORIA DAVIS NEWSPAPER RIVERSIDE PRESS ENTERPRI SE (NO FEE GOVT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 370 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: 2/22/2013 Appl & Ord to Publish Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FOR AMBER HALEY NEWSPAPER THE LOS ANGELES TIMES (NO FEE GOVT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 369 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: 2/22/2013 Appl & Ord to Publish Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FOR LISA PHARR NEWSPAPER DURANGO HERALD (NO FEE GOVT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 368 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: 2/22/2013 Appl & Ord to Publish Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FOR CARMEN RIVERA NEWSPAPER LOS ANGELES (NO FEE GOVT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 367 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: 2/22/2013 Appl & Ord to Publish Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        FOR CATHY SALES NEWSPAER ORANGE COUNTY REGISTER (NO FEE GOVT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 366 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: 2/22/2013 Appl & Ord to Publish Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          FOR KATHERINE TRANFA NEWSPAPER THE LOS ANGELES TIMES (NO FEE GOVT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 365 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: 2/22/2013 Appl & Ord to Publish Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            FOR SERGIO SANCHEZ NEWSPAPER LOS ANGELES TIMES (NO FEE GOVT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 364 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: 2/22/2013 Order for Publication
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              FOR SUSANNA LINDGVIST NEWSPAPER THE LOS ANGELES TIMES
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 363 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: 2/22/2013 Order for Publication
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                FOR SYLVIA CHAGNON NEWSPAPER THE PORTSMOUTH HERALD
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 362 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: 2/22/2013 Order for Publication
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FOR KAREN MILLER NEWSPAPER THE LOS ANGELES TIMES
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 361 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: 2/22/2013 Order for Publication
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FOR TARSIS NAJAM NEWSPAPER THE LOS ANGELES TIMES
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 360 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: 2/22/2013 Order for Publication
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FOR TABIA LEE NEWSPAPER THE LOS ANGELES TIMES
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 359 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: 2/22/2013 Order for Publication
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        FOR CHERYL CHRISTOPHER NEWSPAPER THE LOS ANGELES TIMES
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 358 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: 2/22/2013 Order for Publication
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          FOR SUSAN CAHILL NEWSPAPER THE LOS ANGELES TIMES
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 357 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: 2/22/2013 Order for Publication
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            FOR ABELARDO BERMEJO,JR NEWSPAPER THE LOS ANGELES TIMES
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 356 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: 2/22/2013 Order for Publication
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              FOR STEPHEN JAMES NEWSPAPER THE LOS ANGELES TIMES
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 355 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: 2/22/2013 Order for Publication
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                FOR RONNY ISON NEWSPAPER THE OAKLAND PRESS
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 354 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: 2/22/2013 Order for Publication
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FOR ULLA HANSSON NEWSPAPER THE LOS ANGELES TIMES
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 353 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: 2/22/2013 Order for Publication
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FOR CRISANTO GALLEGOS NEWSPAPER THE LOS ANGELES TIMES
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 352 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: 2/22/2013 Order for Publication
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FOR ROMULO BERINA NEWSPAPER THE LOS ANGELES TIMES
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 351 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: 2/22/2013 Opposition Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TO DEMURRER OF DENIZA MORAN
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 350 Filed: 2/21/2013, Entered: 2/21/2013 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OF REJECTION/APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR PUBLICATION(X2
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 349 Filed: 2/20/2013, Entered: 2/20/2013 Substitution of Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            By Hector Vega
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 348 Filed: 2/20/2013, Entered: 2/20/2013 Substitution of Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              For Omar Vega
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 347 Filed: 2/19/2013, Entered: 2/19/2013 Appl & Ord to Publish Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                FOR KAREN MILLER NEWSPAPER THE LOS ANGELES TIMES (NO FEE GOVT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 346 Filed: 2/19/2013, Entered: 2/19/2013 Appl & Ord to Publish Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FOR SYLVIE CHAGNON NEWSPAPER PORTSMOUTH HERALD (NO FEE GOVT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 345 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: 2/15/2013 Partial Dismissal(not entire case)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    with prejudice, rebecca stallworth ONLY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 344 Filed: 2/14/2013, Entered: 2/14/2013 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      response to complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 343 Filed: 2/14/2013, Entered: 2/14/2013 Reply/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        to plaintiffs complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 342 Filed: 2/14/2013, Entered: 2/14/2013 Proof-Service/Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 341 Filed: 2/14/2013, Entered: 2/14/2013 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 340 Filed: 2/13/2013, Entered: 2/13/2013 Appl & Ord to Publish Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              FOR RUBEN TRINIDAD NEWSPAPER LOS ANGELES TIMES NO FEE GOVT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 339 Filed: 2/13/2013, Entered: 2/13/2013 Appl & Ord to Publish Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                FOR ROMULO BERINA NEWSPAPER LOS ANGELES TIMES NO FEE GOV'T
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 338 Filed: 2/13/2013, Entered: 2/13/2013 Appl & Ord to Publish Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FOR CRISANTO GALLEGOS NEWSPAPER LOS ANGELES TIMES NO FEE GOV'T
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 337 Filed: 2/13/2013, Entered: 2/13/2013 Appl & Ord to Publish Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FOR ULLA HANSSON NEWSPAPER LOS ANGELES TIMES NO FEE GOV'T
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 336 Filed: 2/13/2013, Entered: 2/13/2013 Appl & Ord to Publish Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FOR AMELIA HARRIS NEWSPAPER LOS ANGELES NO FEE GOV'T
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 335 Filed: 2/13/2013, Entered: 2/13/2013 Appl & Ord to Publish Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        FOR TARSIS NAJAM NEWSAPEPR LOS ANGELES TIMES NO FEE GOVT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 334 Filed: 2/13/2013, Entered: 2/13/2013 Appl & Ord to Publish Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          FOR STEPHEN JAMES NEWSPAPER LOS ANGELES TIMES NO FEE GOVT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 333 Filed: 2/13/2013, Entered: 2/13/2013 Appl & Ord to Publish Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            FOR ABELARDO BERMEJO,JR. NEWSPAPER LOS ANGELES TIMESS NO FEE GOVT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 332 Filed: 2/13/2013, Entered: 2/13/2013 Appl & Ord to Publish Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              FOR SUSAN CAHILL NEWSPAPER LOS ANGELES TIMES NO FEE GOVT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 331 Filed: 2/13/2013, Entered: 2/13/2013 Appl & Ord to Publish Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                FOR CHERYL CHRISTOPHER NEWSPAPER LOS ANGELES TIMES NO FEE GOVT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 330 Filed: 2/13/2013, Entered: 2/13/2013 Appl & Ord to Publish Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FOR TABIA LEE NEWSPAPER LOS ANGELES TIMES NO FEE GOVT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 329 Filed: 2/13/2013, Entered: 2/13/2013 Appl & Ord to Publish Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FOR RONNY ISON NEWSPAPER OAKLAND PRESS NO FEE GOVT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 328 Filed: 2/11/2013, Entered: 2/11/2013 Partial Dismissal(not entire case)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      X5 WITHOUT PREJUDICE,
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 327 Filed: 2/11/2013, Entered: 2/11/2013 Partial Dismissal(not entire case)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        X5
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 326 Filed: 2/8/2013, Entered: 2/8/2013 Appl & Ord to Publish Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          FOR MICHELE OTA NEWSPAPER LOS ANGELES TIMES NO FEE GOV'T
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 325 Filed: 2/8/2013, Entered: 2/8/2013 Appl & Ord to Publish Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            FOR MARCOS CAVADAS NEWSPAPER LOS ANGELES TIMES NO FEE GOV'T
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 324 Filed: 2/8/2013, Entered: 2/8/2013 Appl & Ord to Publish Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              FOR ROBERT WHITE NEWSPAPER LOS ANGELES TIMES NO FEE GOV'T
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 323 Filed: 2/8/2013, Entered: 2/8/2013 Appl & Ord to Publish Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                FOR THOMAS SHELDEN NEWSPAPER LOS ANGELES TIMES NO FEE GOV'T
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 322 Filed: 2/8/2013, Entered: 2/8/2013 Proof-Service/Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  x2
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 321 Filed: 2/8/2013, Entered: 2/8/2013 Appl & Ord to Publish Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FOR CARLOS SALAZAR NEWSPAPER LOS ANGELES TIMES NO FEE GOV'T
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 320 Filed: 2/6/2013, Entered: 2/6/2013 Partial Dismissal(not entire case)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      WITHOUT PREJUDICE, AS TO DEFENDANT JOHN STONEBURNER ONLY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 319 Filed: 2/6/2013, Entered: 2/6/2013 Partial Dismissal(not entire case)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        WITH PREJUDICE, AS TO DEFENDANT SUSAN DEATON, ONLY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 318 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: 2/4/2013 Request to Enter Default
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          as to Sanam Pourfathi rejec-#15,30
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 317 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: 2/4/2013 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            as to E. Pisarz
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 316 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: 2/4/2013 Request to Enter Default
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              as to Mercedes Alferez reject-#13, notice of relief from bankruptcy must be filed in civil court
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 315 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: 2/4/2013 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                as t Rita Shaw
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 314 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: 2/4/2013 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  as to Jacqueline Hall
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 313 Filed: 1/31/2013, Entered: 1/31/2013 Notice-Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 312 Filed: 1/31/2013, Entered: 1/31/2013 Proof-Service/Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 311 Filed: 1/31/2013, Entered: 1/31/2013 Proof-Service/Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        X3
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 310 Filed: 1/29/2013, Entered: 1/29/2013 Proof-Service/Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 309 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: 1/28/2013 Proof-Service/Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 308 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: 1/25/2013 Proof-Service/Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 307 Filed: 1/24/2013, Entered: 1/24/2013 Notice Of Ruling
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 306 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: 1/18/2013 Opposition Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TO DEMURRER OF DEFT ALEJANDRO VEGA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 305 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: 1/17/2013 Proof-Service/Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    x2
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 304 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: 1/17/2013 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MELANIE SHANNON BEAN
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 303 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: 1/17/2013 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        KERRY SALMONS
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 302 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: 1/17/2013 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CAREY SMITH
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 301 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: 1/17/2013 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            FRANKLIN HSU
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 300 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: 1/17/2013 Proof-Service/Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 299 Filed: 1/15/2013, Entered: 1/15/2013 Proof-Service/Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 298 Filed: 1/11/2013, Entered: 1/11/2013 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MICHAEL STIGALL
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 297 Filed: 1/11/2013, Entered: 1/11/2013 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 296 Filed: 1/11/2013, Entered: 1/11/2013 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CHERI NOEL
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 295 Filed: 1/11/2013, Entered: 1/11/2013 Reply/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        IN RESPONSE TO PLFF'S OPP TO DEFT'S DEMURRER
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 294 Filed: 1/11/2013, Entered: 1/11/2013 Notice of Continuance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 293 Filed: 1/9/2013, Entered: 1/9/2013 Proof-Service/Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            X4
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 292 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: 1/7/2013 Order-Court Fee Waiver
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              VICTORIA ANN SINAGRA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 291 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: 1/7/2013 Proof-Service/Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 290 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: 1/7/2013 Motion-Relief-Default
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NTC MOTION AND MOTION TO SET ASIDE AND VACATE DEFAULT AND FOR AFFIRMATIVE RELIEF FROM DEFAULT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 289 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: 1/4/2013 Proof-Service/Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    x2
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 288 Filed: 12/18/2012, Entered: 12/18/2012 General Denial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 287 Filed: 12/17/2012, Entered: 12/17/2012 Notice of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT, IN ANY, AND TO QUASH SERVICE AND PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 286 Filed: 12/14/2012, Entered: 12/14/2012 Partial Dismissal(not entire case)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          WITH PREJUDICE, AS TO DEFENDANT MATTHEW SABLOVE, ONLY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 285 Filed: 12/12/2012, Entered: 12/12/2012 Notice Of Ruling
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            FROM CONTINUED CMC AND OSC RE SANCTIONS FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 284 Filed: 12/10/2012, Entered: 12/10/2012 Partial Dismissal(not entire case)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              with prejudice, as to defendant james moore only
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 283 Filed: 12/6/2012, Entered: 12/6/2012 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                KEVEN BARKER
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 282 Filed: 12/6/2012, Entered: 12/6/2012 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ERIKA BAUM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 281 Filed: 12/6/2012, Entered: 12/6/2012 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    KRISTIN COOPER
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 280 Filed: 12/6/2012, Entered: 12/6/2012 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      GINA GATTO
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 279 Filed: 12/6/2012, Entered: 12/6/2012 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RANDALL GIBBS
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 278 Filed: 12/6/2012, Entered: 12/6/2012 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DUONG HO
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 277 Filed: 12/6/2012, Entered: 12/6/2012 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ERICKA ALFARO
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 276 Filed: 12/6/2012, Entered: 12/6/2012 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PAUL METOYER
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 275 Filed: 12/6/2012, Entered: 12/6/2012 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                JOHN STONEBURNER
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 274 Filed: 12/6/2012, Entered: 12/6/2012 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JEFFREY WALKER
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 273 Filed: 12/6/2012, Entered: 12/6/2012 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RICHARD ZIEGLER
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 272 Filed: 12/6/2012, Entered: 12/6/2012 Proof-Service/Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      x18
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 271 Filed: 12/6/2012, Entered: 12/6/2012 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CASSIE SANTOS
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 270 Filed: 12/5/2012, Entered: 12/5/2012 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CHERRY YOUNG
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 269 Filed: 12/5/2012, Entered: 12/5/2012 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            HARRY TOM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 268 Filed: 12/5/2012, Entered: 12/5/2012 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LUIS SOUTH
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 267 Filed: 12/5/2012, Entered: 12/5/2012 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                GREGORY SOTIR
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 266 Filed: 12/5/2012, Entered: 12/5/2012 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  VICTORIA SINAGRA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 265 Filed: 12/5/2012, Entered: 12/5/2012 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AUNDREA SCOTT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 264 Filed: 12/5/2012, Entered: 12/5/2012 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      of james a hunt in support of osc re why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to prosecute
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 263 Filed: 12/5/2012, Entered: 12/5/2012 Notice of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        for reclassification of case from civil unlimited to civil limited; memo of p's and a's in support thereof decl of james a hunt
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 262 Filed: 12/5/2012, Entered: 12/5/2012 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          JONES OKEKE
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 261 Filed: 12/5/2012, Entered: 12/5/2012 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NYCHELLE PARKS TOUSSAINT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 260 Filed: 12/5/2012, Entered: 12/5/2012 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CHRISTOPHER LOCK
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 259 Filed: 12/5/2012, Entered: 12/5/2012 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                KELLI KOZAK
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 258 Filed: 12/5/2012, Entered: 12/5/2012 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  KESI ARMSTRONG
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 257 Filed: 12/5/2012, Entered: 12/5/2012 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FRANK BENGIER
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 256 Filed: 12/5/2012, Entered: 12/5/2012 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUZANNE BLEA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 255 Filed: 12/5/2012, Entered: 12/5/2012 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MONICA BOGGS
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 254 Filed: 12/5/2012, Entered: 12/5/2012 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          KATIUSKA CASTANEDA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 253 Filed: 12/5/2012, Entered: 12/5/2012 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ERWIN FARALAN
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 252 Filed: 12/5/2012, Entered: 12/5/2012 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MICHAEL GEFFENEY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 251 Filed: 12/5/2012, Entered: 12/5/2012 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LINDA GRAYSON
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 250 Filed: 12/5/2012, Entered: 12/5/2012 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SHERONDA HELTON
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 249 Filed: 12/5/2012, Entered: 12/5/2012 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SHANNON JAMES
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 248 Filed: 12/5/2012, Entered: 12/5/2012 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 247 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: 12/4/2012 Partial Dismissal(not entire case)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        WITH PREJUDICE, COMPLAINT, AS TO DEFENDANT JENNIFER RADIS, ONLY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 246 Filed: 11/30/2012, Entered: 11/30/2012 Partial Dismissal(not entire case)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          X2
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 245 Filed: 11/30/2012, Entered: 11/30/2012 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 244 Filed: 11/28/2012, Entered: 11/28/2012 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 243 Filed: 11/28/2012, Entered: 11/28/2012 Statement-Case Management
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 242 Filed: 11/27/2012, Entered: 11/27/2012 Partial Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  w/o Prejudice) (COMPLAINT AS TO DEFT SANDRA TOOTALIAN ONLY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 241 Filed: 11/27/2012, Entered: 11/27/2012 Partial Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    w/o Prejudice) (COMPLAINT AS TO DEFT ALLAN YU ONLY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 240 Filed: 11/27/2012, Entered: 11/27/2012 Partial Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      w/o Prejudice) (complaint as to deft SHAYLA PERL ONLY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 239 Filed: 11/27/2012, Entered: 11/27/2012 Partial Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        w/o Prejudice) (COMPLAINT AS TO DEFT JAMES PETER ONLY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 238 Filed: 11/27/2012, Entered: 11/27/2012 Partial Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          w/o Prejudice) ((3
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 237 Filed: 11/27/2012, Entered: 11/27/2012 Partial Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            w/o Prejudice) (COMPLAINT AS TO DEFT VIRGINIA PEARSON ONLY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 236 Filed: 11/27/2012, Entered: 11/27/2012 Partial Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              w/o Prejudice) (complaint as to deft MARIA MORATO ONLY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 235 Filed: 11/27/2012, Entered: 11/27/2012 Partial Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                w/o Prejudice) (COMPLAINT AS TO DEFT CHRISTOPHER MIRANDA ONLY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 234 Filed: 11/27/2012, Entered: 11/27/2012 Partial Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  w/o Prejudice) (COMPLAINT AS TO DEFT CLINTON ROBINSON ONLY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 233 Filed: 11/27/2012, Entered: 11/27/2012 Partial Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    w/o Prejudice) (COMPLAINT AS TO DEFT VIOLETA REINEGA ONLY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 232 Filed: 11/27/2012, Entered: 11/27/2012 Partial Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      w/o Prejudice) (COMPLAINT AS TO DEFT GEORGIA REESE ONLY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 231 Filed: 11/27/2012, Entered: 11/27/2012 Partial Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        w/o Prejudice) (COMPLAINT AS TO DEFT CHRISTOPHER BOSCARINO ONLY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 230 Filed: 11/27/2012, Entered: 11/27/2012 Partial Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          w/o Prejudice) (COMPLAINT AS TO DEFT KAREN CASE ONLY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 229 Filed: 11/27/2012, Entered: 11/27/2012 Partial Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            w/o Prejudice) (COMPLAINT AS TO DEFT BONNIE DUGUID SIEGEL ONLY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 228 Filed: 11/27/2012, Entered: 11/27/2012 Partial Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              w/o Prejudice) (complaint as to deft AMY EVANS ONLY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 227 Filed: 11/27/2012, Entered: 11/27/2012 Partial Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                w/o Prejudice) (COMPLAINT AS TO DEFT MARTIN FLORES ONLY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 226 Filed: 11/27/2012, Entered: 11/27/2012 Partial Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  w/o Prejudice) (COMPLAINT AS TO DEFT CYNTHIA FITZGERALD ONLY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 225 Filed: 11/27/2012, Entered: 11/27/2012 Partial Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    w/o Prejudice) (COMPLAINT AS TO DEFT BARBARA FREEDMAN ONLY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 224 Filed: 11/27/2012, Entered: 11/27/2012 Partial Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      w/o Prejudice) (COMPLAINT AS TO DEFT DONALD GARCIA ONLY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 223 Filed: 11/27/2012, Entered: 11/27/2012 Partial Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        w/o Prejudice) (COMPLAINT AS TO DEFT MELISSA HELALI ONLY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 222 Filed: 11/27/2012, Entered: 11/27/2012 Partial Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          w/o Prejudice) (complaint AS TO DEFT JOSEPH LAURIA ONLY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 221 Filed: 11/27/2012, Entered: 11/27/2012 Partial Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            w/o Prejudice) (COMPLAINT AS TO DEFT OFELIA LOPEZ ONLY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 220 Filed: 11/27/2012, Entered: 11/27/2012 Partial Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              with Prejudice) (COMPLAINT AS TO DEFT WILLIAM J. MACDONALD ONLY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 219 Filed: 11/27/2012, Entered: 11/27/2012 Partial Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                w/o Prejudice) (COMPLAINT AS TO DEFT LESLIE MALLING ONLY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 218 Filed: 11/20/2012, Entered: 11/20/2012 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 217 Filed: 11/19/2012, Entered: 11/19/2012 Proof of Serv of Ntc by Mail
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    GENERAL DENIAL
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 216 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: 11/16/2012 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 215 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: 11/16/2012 Notice Of Ruling
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 214 Filed: 11/15/2012, Entered: 11/15/2012 Demurrer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 213 Filed: 11/15/2012, Entered: 11/15/2012 General Denial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 212 Filed: 11/15/2012, Entered: 11/15/2012 Proof-Service/Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              x10
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 211 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: 11/13/2012 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DEBORAH MICHELS
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 210 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: 11/13/2012 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JASON SIMON
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 209 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: 11/13/2012 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ELIZABETH LARSON
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 208 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: 11/13/2012 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      JON REIMBOLD
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 207 Filed: 11/7/2012, Entered: 11/7/2012 Proof of Serv of Ntc by Mail
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 206 Filed: 11/6/2012, Entered: 11/6/2012 Request for Certified Copy
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 205 Filed: 11/5/2012, Entered: 11/5/2012 miscellaneous other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDMENT TO GENERAL DENIAL
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 204 Filed: 11/5/2012, Entered: 11/5/2012 Proof of Serv of Ntc by Mail
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              GD CMC STATEMENT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 203 Filed: 11/2/2012, Entered: 11/2/2012 Request for Certified Copy
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 202 Filed: 11/2/2012, Entered: 11/2/2012 Proof-Service/Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  X2
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 201 Filed: 11/1/2012, Entered: 11/1/2012 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 200 Filed: 10/30/2012, Entered: 10/30/2012 Statement-Case Management
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 199 Filed: 10/30/2012, Entered: 10/30/2012 Proof-Service/Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        X 14
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 198 Filed: 10/30/2012, Entered: 10/30/2012 General Denial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 197 Filed: 10/30/2012, Entered: 10/30/2012 Statement-Case Management
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 196 Filed: 10/30/2012, Entered: 10/30/2012 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 195 Filed: 10/29/2012, Entered: 10/29/2012 Statement-Case Management
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 194 Filed: 10/26/2012, Entered: 10/26/2012 Request for Certified Copy
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 193 Filed: 10/26/2012, Entered: 10/26/2012 Proof of Serv of Ntc by Mail
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 192 Filed: 10/25/2012, Entered: 10/25/2012 Demurrer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMO OF P'S AND A'S IN SUPPORT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 191 Filed: 10/25/2012, Entered: 10/25/2012 Proof-Service/Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 190 Filed: 10/25/2012, Entered: 10/25/2012 Statement-Case Management
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 189 Filed: 10/24/2012, Entered: 10/24/2012 Reply/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 188 Filed: 10/24/2012, Entered: 10/24/2012 Statement-Case Management
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 187 Filed: 10/24/2012, Entered: 10/24/2012 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 186 Filed: 10/23/2012, Entered: 10/23/2012 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 185 Filed: 10/23/2012, Entered: 10/23/2012 Statement-Case Management
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 184 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: 10/19/2012 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      as to Abraham Gallegos
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 183 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: 10/19/2012 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        as to Annette Alexander
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 182 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: 10/19/2012 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          as to Issac Aguillon
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 181 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: 10/19/2012 Request to Enter Default
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            as to Leif Andersen reject-#1, answer 9.13.12
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 180 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: 10/19/2012 Statement-Case Management
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 179 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: 10/19/2012 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                as to Carina Vazquez
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 178 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: 10/19/2012 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  as to Stefani Tovar
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 177 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: 10/19/2012 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    as to Chris Rico
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 176 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: 10/19/2012 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      as to Mireya Ramos Meza
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 175 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: 10/19/2012 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        as to John Pattschull
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 174 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: 10/19/2012 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          as to Rena Page
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 173 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: 10/19/2012 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            as to William Munkacsy
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 172 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: 10/19/2012 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              as to Sylvia Martin Mancilla
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 171 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: 10/19/2012 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                as to Ofelia Lopez
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 170 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: 10/19/2012 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  as to Theodore Huling
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 169 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: 10/19/2012 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    as to Cecelia Haugen
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 168 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: 10/19/2012 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      as to Donald Hart
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 167 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: 10/19/2012 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        as to Ariana Fraga
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 166 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: 10/19/2012 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          as to Rachel Brill
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 165 Filed: 10/17/2012, Entered: 10/17/2012 Order-Court Fee Waiver
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 164 Filed: 10/16/2012, Entered: 10/16/2012 Proof-Service/Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 163 Filed: 10/15/2012, Entered: 10/15/2012 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 162 Filed: 10/15/2012, Entered: 10/15/2012 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 161 Filed: 10/15/2012, Entered: 10/15/2012 Request-Waive Court Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 160 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: 10/12/2012 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 159 Filed: 10/9/2012, Entered: 10/9/2012 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        of cmc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 158 Filed: 10/9/2012, Entered: 10/9/2012 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 157 Filed: 10/4/2012, Entered: 10/4/2012 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 156 Filed: 10/4/2012, Entered: 10/4/2012 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 155 Filed: 10/2/2012, Entered: 10/2/2012 Notice of Continuance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 154 Filed: 10/2/2012, Entered: 10/2/2012 Partial Dismissal(not entire case)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  W/OUT PREJUDICE X 11
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 153 Filed: 10/2/2012, Entered: 10/2/2012 General Denial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 152 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: 10/1/2012 Proof-Service/Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 151 Filed: 9/24/2012, Entered: 9/24/2012 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LINDA ZAHORIK
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 150 Filed: 9/24/2012, Entered: 9/24/2012 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 149 Filed: 9/24/2012, Entered: 9/24/2012 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            HOWARD KENT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 148 Filed: 9/24/2012, Entered: 9/24/2012 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CLARISSA INGRAM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 147 Filed: 9/24/2012, Entered: 9/24/2012 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STEVEN ILIAS
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 146 Filed: 9/24/2012, Entered: 9/24/2012 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MARIA VILLANUEVA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 145 Filed: 9/24/2012, Entered: 9/24/2012 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANDREW VILLANUEVA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 144 Filed: 9/24/2012, Entered: 9/24/2012 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      HENRY TURNER
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 143 Filed: 9/24/2012, Entered: 9/24/2012 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RACHEL SHALTS
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 142 Filed: 9/24/2012, Entered: 9/24/2012 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CRAIG SEGANTI
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 141 Filed: 9/24/2012, Entered: 9/24/2012 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PATRICIA SANDOVAL
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 140 Filed: 9/24/2012, Entered: 9/24/2012 Request to Enter Default
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REJECT FOR PISARZ-#5.17.30.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 139 Filed: 9/24/2012, Entered: 9/24/2012 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                KENNETH KIRK
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 138 Filed: 9/24/2012, Entered: 9/24/2012 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LYNET MORROW
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 137 Filed: 9/24/2012, Entered: 9/24/2012 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MERCEDES ALFEREZ
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 136 Filed: 9/24/2012, Entered: 9/24/2012 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      GUILLERMO AVILES RODRGUEZ
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 135 Filed: 9/24/2012, Entered: 9/24/2012 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DIANA BAKER
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 134 Filed: 9/24/2012, Entered: 9/24/2012 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PATTIE DURRY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 133 Filed: 9/24/2012, Entered: 9/24/2012 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            JACOB EDWARDS
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 132 Filed: 9/24/2012, Entered: 9/24/2012 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              KATHLEEN ELLIOTT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 131 Filed: 9/24/2012, Entered: 9/24/2012 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LESLEY GARCIA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 130 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: 9/21/2012 Demurrer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 129 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: 9/21/2012 Pltf's Ntc of Hrng on Demurrer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 128 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: 9/21/2012 Proof of Serv of Ntc by Mail
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 127 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: 9/21/2012 Proof of Serv of Ntc by Mail
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OF NOTICE OF HEARING FOR DEMURRER
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 126 Filed: 9/20/2012, Entered: 9/20/2012 General Denial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 125 Filed: 9/18/2012, Entered: 9/18/2012 Amended Proof Of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 124 Filed: 9/14/2012, Entered: 9/14/2012 Proof-Service/Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              X30
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 123 Filed: 9/13/2012, Entered: 9/13/2012 Order-App/Waiver Court Fees & Cost
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 122 Filed: 9/13/2012, Entered: 9/13/2012 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 121 Filed: 9/12/2012, Entered: 9/12/2012 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 120 Filed: 9/12/2012, Entered: 9/12/2012 Cross Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 119 Filed: 9/12/2012, Entered: 9/12/2012 Summons Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        on cross complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 118 Filed: 9/11/2012, Entered: 9/11/2012 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          JERI OBRIEN
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 117 Filed: 9/11/2012, Entered: 9/11/2012 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            KAREN CASE
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 116 Filed: 9/11/2012, Entered: 9/11/2012 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CLAUDIA DIAZ DE LEON
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 115 Filed: 9/11/2012, Entered: 9/11/2012 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MARIA MADRIGAL
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 114 Filed: 9/11/2012, Entered: 9/11/2012 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JENARO TORRES
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 113 Filed: 9/11/2012, Entered: 9/11/2012 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS, COMPLAINT LYNNE CASAL
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 112 Filed: 9/11/2012, Entered: 9/11/2012 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RACHEL PASH
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 111 Filed: 9/11/2012, Entered: 9/11/2012 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        GENARO FAVELA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 110 Filed: 9/11/2012, Entered: 9/11/2012 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EUGENE ROBIDOUX
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 109 Filed: 9/11/2012, Entered: 9/11/2012 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CARLOS PENATE
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 108 Filed: 9/11/2012, Entered: 9/11/2012 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LYNNE CASAL
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 107 Filed: 9/11/2012, Entered: 9/11/2012 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                VALESKA LOPEZ
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 106 Filed: 9/11/2012, Entered: 9/11/2012 Default Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUSAN DEATON
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 105 Filed: 9/11/2012, Entered: 9/11/2012 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS, COMPLAINT CLAUDIA DIAZ DE LEON
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 104 Filed: 9/7/2012, Entered: 9/7/2012 Proof of Serv of Ntc by Mail
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 103 Filed: 9/7/2012, Entered: 9/7/2012 Notice-Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 102 Filed: 9/5/2012, Entered: 9/5/2012 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 101 Filed: 8/31/2012, Entered: 8/31/2012 Order-App/Waiver Court Fees & Cost
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 100 Filed: 8/30/2012, Entered: 8/30/2012 Partial Dismissal(not entire case)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              W/OUT PREJUDICE, COMPLAINT AS TO 21 DEFENDANTS ALLEN, CORINA AMBIRZ, FRANCISCO SENIOR, PATRICIA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 99 Filed: 8/30/2012, Entered: 8/30/2012 Demurrer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                to complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 98 Filed: 8/27/2012, Entered: 8/27/2012 Proof-Service/Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  X4 THERESE SCHMIDT REBECA RODRIGUEZ RACHEL PASH MARIA VILLANUEVA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 97 Filed: 8/27/2012, Entered: 8/27/2012 Proof-Service/Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    X5 GENARO FAVELA PATTIE DURRY KEVAN COMBS LUIS CASTANEDA KAREN CASE
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 96 Filed: 8/27/2012, Entered: 8/27/2012 Proof-Service/Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      X5 LAWRENCE CARNOW ISSAC AGUILLON GREGORIO VERBERA JENARO TORRES MARISSA STALER
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 95 Filed: 8/27/2012, Entered: 8/27/2012 Proof-Service/Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        X5 RUDY MEZA HOWARD KENT SHANNON JAMES CLARISSA INGRAM DONALD HART
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 94 Filed: 8/27/2012, Entered: 8/27/2012 Proof-Service/Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          X3 MARIA MORATO SANDRA MICHAELS JOHNNY PARKER
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 93 Filed: 8/24/2012, Entered: 8/24/2012 General Denial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 92 Filed: 8/24/2012, Entered: 8/24/2012 Order-Court Fee Waiver
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 91 Filed: 8/23/2012, Entered: 8/23/2012 Proof of Serv of Ntc by Mail
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 90 Filed: 8/23/2012, Entered: 8/23/2012 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 89 Filed: 8/22/2012, Entered: 8/22/2012 Partial Dismissal(not entire case)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    WITHOUT PREJUDICE HA NGUYEN, ONLY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 88 Filed: 8/22/2012, Entered: 8/22/2012 Partial Dismissal(not entire case)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      WITHOUT PREJUDICE, NELLY ASSADOURIAN, ONLY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 87 Filed: 8/22/2012, Entered: 8/22/2012 Partial Dismissal(not entire case)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        W/OUT PREJUD KATHERYNE SOLLER, ONLY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 86 Filed: 8/22/2012, Entered: 8/22/2012 Partial Dismissal(not entire case)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          W/OUT PREJUDICE LORI MEYER, ONLY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 85 Filed: 8/22/2012, Entered: 8/22/2012 Partial Dismissal(not entire case)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            WITHOUT PREJUDICE MARY ANN BAER FORMAN, ONLY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 84 Filed: 8/22/2012, Entered: 8/22/2012 Partial Dismissal(not entire case)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              W/OUT PREJUDIC,E CLAUDIA DIAZ DE LEON, ONLY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 83 Filed: 8/22/2012, Entered: 8/22/2012 Partial Dismissal(not entire case)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                W/OUT PREJUDICE, LEE CHOU, ONLY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 82 Filed: 8/22/2012, Entered: 8/22/2012 Partial Dismissal(not entire case)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  W/OUT PREJUDICE, KEELY DIETRICK, ONLY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 81 Filed: 8/22/2012, Entered: 8/22/2012 Partial Dismissal(not entire case)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    W/OUT PREJUD JULIET RODRIGUEZ, ONLY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 80 Filed: 8/22/2012, Entered: 8/22/2012 Partial Dismissal(not entire case)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      W/OUT PREJUDICE, JENNIFER CANGEMI, ONLY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 79 Filed: 8/22/2012, Entered: 8/22/2012 Partial Dismissal(not entire case)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        W/OUT PREJUD MARIA TSAGRINOS ONLY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 78 Filed: 8/22/2012, Entered: 8/22/2012 Partial Dismissal(not entire case)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          W/OUT PREJUDICE, KRISTEN KESSLER, ONLY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 77 Filed: 8/22/2012, Entered: 8/22/2012 Proof-Service/Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 76 Filed: 8/22/2012, Entered: 8/22/2012 Partial Dismissal(not entire case)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              WITHOUT PREJUDICE. LUZ CALBITAZA, ONLY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 75 Filed: 8/22/2012, Entered: 8/22/2012 Partial Dismissal(not entire case)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                WITHOUT PREJUDICE JESSIE CHEN, ONLY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 74 Filed: 8/22/2012, Entered: 8/22/2012 Partial Dismissal(not entire case)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  W/OUT PREJUDICE BARBARA IZARRARAZ, ONLY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 73 Filed: 8/22/2012, Entered: 8/22/2012 Partial Dismissal(not entire case)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    W/OUT PREJUDICE, LIEN HUYNH, ONLY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 72 Filed: 8/22/2012, Entered: 8/22/2012 Partial Dismissal(not entire case)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      W/OUT PREJUIDICE LINDA LONG, ONLY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 71 Filed: 8/22/2012, Entered: 8/22/2012 Partial Dismissal(not entire case)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        W/OUT PREJUD ALEXIS PIAZZA, ONLY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 70 Filed: 8/21/2012, Entered: 8/21/2012 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 69 Filed: 8/21/2012, Entered: 8/21/2012 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 68 Filed: 8/17/2012, Entered: 8/17/2012 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 67 Filed: 8/17/2012, Entered: 8/17/2012 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 66 Filed: 8/16/2012, Entered: 8/16/2012 Order-Court Fee Waiver
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 65 Filed: 8/16/2012, Entered: 8/16/2012 General Denial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 64 Filed: 8/15/2012, Entered: 8/15/2012 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 63 Filed: 8/14/2012, Entered: 8/14/2012 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 62 Filed: 8/14/2012, Entered: 8/14/2012 Request-Waive Court Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 61 Filed: 8/14/2012, Entered: 8/14/2012 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 60 Filed: 8/6/2012, Entered: 8/6/2012 General Denial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 59 Filed: 8/6/2012, Entered: 8/6/2012 Order, Forma Pauperis
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 58 Filed: 8/3/2012, Entered: 8/3/2012 Partial Dismissal(not entire case)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  w/out prejudice, complaint as to arlene rivas
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 57 Filed: 8/3/2012, Entered: 8/3/2012 Partial Dismissal(not entire case)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    w/out prejudice, patgricia socha only
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 56 Filed: 8/3/2012, Entered: 8/3/2012 Partial Dismissal(not entire case)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      without prejudice, complaint, as to defendant ma teresa borquez, only
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 55 Filed: 8/3/2012, Entered: 8/3/2012 Partial Dismissal(not entire case)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        without prejudice, complaint as to defendant maritza aguas
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 54 Filed: 8/3/2012, Entered: 8/3/2012 Partial Dismissal(not entire case)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          without prejudice, complaint as to stephen patterson only
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 53 Filed: 8/3/2012, Entered: 8/3/2012 Partial Dismissal(not entire case)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            without prejudice, as to deft jenny linderman only
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 52 Filed: 8/3/2012, Entered: 8/3/2012 Partial Dismissal(not entire case)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              without prejudice, complaint, as to defendant janet hunter only
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 51 Filed: 8/3/2012, Entered: 8/3/2012 Partial Dismissal(not entire case)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                without prejudice, complaint, christine smith only
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 50 Filed: 8/3/2012, Entered: 8/3/2012 Partial Dismissal(not entire case)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  complaint, without prejudice, as to defendant rosemarie de campo only
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 49 Filed: 8/3/2012, Entered: 8/3/2012 Partial Dismissal(not entire case)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    w/out prejudice, complaint as t defendant soniya perl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 48 Filed: 8/3/2012, Entered: 8/3/2012 Partial Dismissal(not entire case)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      without prejudice, complaint, as to defendant martha borquez, only
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 47 Filed: 8/3/2012, Entered: 8/3/2012 Partial Dismissal(not entire case)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        without prejudice, complaint as to kerry nachenberg only
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 46 Filed: 8/3/2012, Entered: 8/3/2012 Partial Dismissal(not entire case)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          w/out prejudice, giselle spriewald only
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 45 Filed: 8/3/2012, Entered: 8/3/2012 Partial Dismissal(not entire case)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            without prejudice, complaint as to anna lee only
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 44 Filed: 8/3/2012, Entered: 8/3/2012 Partial Dismissal(not entire case)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              without prejudice, as to deft norgeena gatchalian, only
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 43 Filed: 8/3/2012, Entered: 8/3/2012 Partial Dismissal(not entire case)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                without prejudice, complaint, as to defendant erin guesno, only
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 42 Filed: 8/3/2012, Entered: 8/3/2012 Partial Dismissal(not entire case)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  complaint, without prejudice, samara simmerman only
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 41 Filed: 8/3/2012, Entered: 8/3/2012 Partial Dismissal(not entire case)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    w/out prejudice, complaint, arthur yahiku, only
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 40 Filed: 8/3/2012, Entered: 8/3/2012 Partial Dismissal(not entire case)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      complaint, without prejudice, april smith only
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 39 Filed: 8/3/2012, Entered: 8/3/2012 Partial Dismissal(not entire case)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        without prejudice, complaint, as to robert sihler only
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 38 Filed: 8/3/2012, Entered: 8/3/2012 Partial Dismissal(not entire case)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          without prejudice, complaint as to defendant liane hesse only
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 37 Filed: 8/3/2012, Entered: 8/3/2012 Partial Dismissal(not entire case)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            complaint, without prejudice, as to defendant melissa dotson, only
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 36 Filed: 8/3/2012, Entered: 8/3/2012 Partial Dismissal(not entire case)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              without prejudice, complaint as to aurora tourellotte only
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 35 Filed: 8/3/2012, Entered: 8/3/2012 Partial Dismissal(not entire case)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                without prejudice, complaint, as to defendant jennifer beatty, only
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 34 Filed: 8/3/2012, Entered: 8/3/2012 Partial Dismissal(not entire case)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  complaint, without prejudice, as to kendra moore only
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 33 Filed: 8/3/2012, Entered: 8/3/2012 Partial Dismissal(not entire case)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    without prejudice, complaint, as to defendant michelle zinser
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 32 Filed: 8/3/2012, Entered: 8/3/2012 Partial Dismissal(not entire case)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      without prejudice, complaint, as to defendant lynne casal, only
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 31 Filed: 8/3/2012, Entered: 8/3/2012 Partial Dismissal(not entire case)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        complaint, without prejudice, as to sarah kira only
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 30 Filed: 7/30/2012, Entered: 7/30/2012 Partial Dismissal(not entire case)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 29 Filed: 7/30/2012, Entered: 7/30/2012 Partial Dismissal(not entire case)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            w/out prejudice, complaint as to defendant linda wolvek, only
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 28 Filed: 7/30/2012, Entered: 7/30/2012 Partial Dismissal(not entire case)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              w/out prejudice, quiana washington only
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 27 Filed: 7/30/2012, Entered: 7/30/2012 Partial Dismissal(not entire case)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                without prejudice, complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 26 Filed: 7/30/2012, Entered: 7/30/2012 Partial Dismissal(not entire case)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  without prejudice, complaint as to kristen cardillo
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 25 Filed: 7/30/2012, Entered: 7/30/2012 Partial Dismissal(not entire case)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    without prejudice, complaint as to carolina castillo
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 24 Filed: 7/30/2012, Entered: 7/30/2012 Partial Dismissal(not entire case)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      w/out prejudice, as to charlise duparl only
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 23 Filed: 7/30/2012, Entered: 7/30/2012 Partial Dismissal(not entire case)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        w/out prejudice, complaint as to colleen faris only

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 993 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?