Charles Wright v. Apollo Global Management Llc et al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. BC492800

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Wright, Charles, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Alfonso Realty Llc, Defendant
No Logo Coldwell Banker Alfonso Realty Llc(doe5), Defendant
No Logo Apollo Global Management, LLC, Defendant/Respondent
Coldwell Banker Corporation Coldwell Banker Corporation, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Does 1 To 100, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Realogy Corporation, Defendant/Respondent
Type Fraud (no contract) (General Jurisdiction)
Status Dismissed - Other 08/11/2014
  Entries (28) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 28 Filed: 8/12/2014, Entered: 8/12/2014 Notice Of Ruling
    Blank 27 Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: 7/10/2014 Notice Of Ruling
      Blank 26 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: 5/8/2014 Notice
      OF ENTRY OF ORDERS
        Blank 25 Filed: 4/29/2014, Entered: 4/29/2014 Order
        Specially appearing defendant's MOTION TO QUASH SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT (ORDER
          Blank 24 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: 3/26/2014 Proof of Service
          SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT;
            Blank 23 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: 3/26/2014 Proof of Service
            LODGEMENT OF PROOF OF SERVICE
              Blank 22 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: 3/24/2014 Objection Document
              re:defendant's evidentiary objedctions in support of reply re motion to quash
                Blank 21 Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: 3/17/2014 Declaration
                OF FRANK C. OLAH;
                  Blank 20 Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: 3/17/2014 Reply/Response
                  REPLY RE MOTION TO QUASH;
                    Blank 19 Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: 3/17/2014 Objection Document
                    EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS
                      Blank 18 Filed: 3/12/2014, Entered: 3/12/2014 Declaration
                      OF SAIED KASHANI IN OPP TO MOTION TO QUASH;
                        Blank 17 Filed: 3/12/2014, Entered: 3/12/2014 Declaration
                          Blank 16 Filed: 3/12/2014, Entered: 3/12/2014 Points and Authorities
                            Blank 15 Filed: 1/16/2014, Entered: 1/16/2014 Declaration
                            OF CARLENE ALFONSO
                              Blank 14 Filed: 1/16/2014, Entered: 1/16/2014 Motion
                              TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS
                                Blank 13 Filed: 1/16/2014, Entered: 1/16/2014 Declaration
                                OF FRANK C. OLAH;
                                  Blank 12 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: 11/21/2013 Amendment to Complaint
                                  DOE 5: COLDWELL BANKER ALFONSO REALTY, LLC
                                    Blank 11 Filed: 5/30/2013, Entered: 5/30/2013 Notice of Entry of Judgment
                                      Blank 10 Filed: 2/20/2013, Entered: 2/20/2013 Notice of Continuance
                                      OF INITIAL CMC
                                        Blank 9 Filed: 2/6/2013, Entered: 2/6/2013 Notice of Continuance
                                          Blank 8 Filed: 1/24/2013, Entered: 1/24/2013 Joinder
                                          JOINDER TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT;
                                            Blank 7 Filed: 1/24/2013, Entered: 1/24/2013 Statement-Case Management
                                              Blank 6 Filed: 12/14/2012, Entered: 12/14/2012 Demurrer
                                              TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT;
                                                Blank 5 Filed: 12/13/2012, Entered: 12/13/2012 Affidavit - misc
                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
                                                  Blank 4 Filed: 10/15/2012, Entered: 10/15/2012 Summons Filed
                                                  AMENDED
                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 10/15/2012, Entered: 10/15/2012 First Amended Complaint
                                                      Blank 2 Filed: 9/28/2012, Entered: 9/28/2012 Notice-Case Management Conference
                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: 9/27/2012 Complaint

                                                          Statistics

                                                          This case has been viewed 33 times.

                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                          Space
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                           
                                                          PlainSite
                                                          Sign Up
                                                          Need Password Help?