Joseph L Agostini et al v. Dukes Inc
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. BC495532

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Agostini Joseph L., Plaintiff/Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Baum Hedlund Aristei & Goldman PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space THE WINCHESTER LAW FIRM +1 831 427 0546
No Logo Agostini Suellen, Plaintiff/Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Baum Hedlund Aristei & Goldman PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space THE WINCHESTER LAW FIRM +1 831 427 0546
No Logo Henegar Douglas J., Plaintiff/Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Baum Hedlund Aristei & Goldman PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space THE WINCHESTER LAW FIRM +1 831 427 0546
No Logo Henegar Sharon K., Plaintiff/Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Baum Hedlund Aristei & Goldman PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space THE WINCHESTER LAW FIRM +1 831 427 0546
No Logo Does 1-10, Defendant/Respondent

Represented by Martinez & Ritorto PC

No Logo Dukes, Inc., Defendant/Respondent

Represented by Martinez & Ritorto PC

No Logo Infinity Aerospace, Defendant/Respondent's DBA
Type Prdct Liablty (not asbes,tox,envir (General Jurisdiction)
Status Dismissed - Other 06/17/2014
  Entries (37) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 37 Filed: 6/19/2014, Entered: 6/19/2014 Notice
    Blank 36 Filed: 6/17/2014, Entered: 6/17/2014 Request and Entry of Dismissal
    W/P ENTIRE ACRTION
      Blank 35 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: 5/5/2014 Order
      APPROVING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT DETERMINATION;
        Blank 34 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: 4/24/2014 Proof of Service
          Blank 33 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: 4/24/2014 Reply/Response
            Blank 32 Filed: 4/15/2014, Entered: 4/15/2014 Notice
              Blank 31 Filed: 4/9/2014, Entered: 4/9/2014 Notice-Settlement
                Blank 30 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: 4/8/2014 Notice-Settlement
                and application for judicial determination of good faith settlement; declaration of Stephen L. Nelson
                  Blank 29 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: 3/10/2014 Request
                    Blank 28 Filed: 12/6/2013, Entered: 12/6/2013 Notice-Settlement
                      Blank 27 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: 12/2/2013 Order
                      RE MOTION FOR ADMISSION OF CYNTHIA M. DEVERS TO THE BAR OF THIS COURT PRO HAC VICE;
                        Blank 26 Filed: 10/3/2013, Entered: 10/3/2013 Order
                        RE MOTI0N FOR ADMISSION OF ARTHUR ALAN WOLK TO THE BAR OF THIS COURT PRO HAC VICE;
                          Blank 25 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: 10/1/2013 Application-Pro Hac Vice
                            Blank 24 Filed: 9/11/2013, Entered: 9/11/2013 Order
                            GRANTING APPLICATION OF LOUIS R. MARTINEZ TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE;
                              Blank 23 Filed: 9/11/2013, Entered: 9/11/2013 Order
                              GRANTING APPLICATION OF RICHARD RITORTO TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE;
                                Blank 22 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: 9/9/2013 Application-Miscellaneous
                                  Blank 21 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: 8/2/2013 Notice Of Ruling
                                    Blank 20 Filed: 8/1/2013, Entered: 8/1/2013 Notice
                                      Blank 19 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: 7/31/2013 Order
                                      RE MOTION FOR ADMISSION OF MICHAEL S. MISKA TO THE BAR OF THIS COURT PRO HAC VICE;
                                        Blank 18 Filed: 7/30/2013, Entered: 7/30/2013 Statement-Case Management
                                          Blank 17 Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: 7/24/2013 Notice-Case Management Conference
                                            Blank 16 Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: 7/24/2013 Application-Miscellaneous
                                            pro hac vice
                                              Blank 15 Filed: 7/16/2013, Entered: 7/16/2013 Statement-Case Management
                                                Blank 14 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: 5/29/2013 Proof of Service
                                                  Blank 13 Filed: 5/28/2013, Entered: 5/28/2013 Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem
                                                    Blank 12 Filed: 5/28/2013, Entered: 5/28/2013 Answer
                                                      Blank 11 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: 5/23/2013 Statement-Case Management
                                                        Blank 10 Filed: 5/20/2013, Entered: 5/20/2013 Statement of Damages
                                                          Blank 9 Filed: 5/20/2013, Entered: 5/20/2013 Request to Enter Default
                                                          as to Dukes, Inc.d/b/a Infinity Aerospace reject-#3,9,18,28 (by mail is not acceptable inside the state of california
                                                            Blank 8 Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: 5/1/2013 Notice of Continuance
                                                              Blank 7 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: 3/1/2013 Notice of Reassignment and Order
                                                                Blank 6 Filed: 1/15/2013, Entered: 1/15/2013 Proof of Service
                                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 1/10/2013, Entered: 1/10/2013 Proof-Service/Summons
                                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 12/3/2012, Entered: 12/3/2012 Notice-Case Management Conference
                                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: 11/13/2012 Summons Filed
                                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 11/9/2012, Entered: 11/9/2012 Complaint
                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 5/17/2012, Entered: 5/17/2012 Complaint

                                                                            Statistics

                                                                            This case has been viewed 6 times.

                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                            Space
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                             
                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                            Need Password Help?