Creditors Adjustment Bureau Inc v. Hanover Accessories Corp

State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. BC497247
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Creditors Adjustment Bureau Inc., Plaintiff/Petitioner
v.
No Logo Does 1 Through 10, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Hanover Accessories Corp., Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Ultra Pro International LLC, Defendant/Respondent
Other Parties
No Logo Cab-lcf, Plaintiff/Petitioner's DBA
No Logo Ultra Pro Corporation, Defendant/Respondent's DBA
Attributes
Type Othr Breach Contr/Warr-not Fraud (General Jurisdiction)
Status Dismissed - Other 03/19/2013
Timeline
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 6 Filed: 3/19/2013, Entered: 3/19/2013 Request and Entry of Dismissal
WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION
Request RequestSpace
Blank 5 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: 2/28/2013 Proof of Service
of notice of case management conference
Request RequestSpace
Blank 4 Filed: 2/21/2013, Entered: 2/21/2013 Notice-Case Management Conference
Request RequestSpace
Blank 3 Filed: 1/29/2013, Entered: 1/29/2013 Proof of Service
Request RequestSpace
Blank 2 Filed: 1/23/2013, Entered: 1/23/2013 Proof of Service
Request RequestSpace
Blank 1 Filed: 12/17/2012, Entered: 12/17/2012 Complaint
Request RequestSpace

Statistics

This case has been viewed 5 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?