E.piphany, Inc. IPO, et al v. E.Piphany, Inc., et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:01-cv-06158
District Judge Shira A. Scheindlin, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 8, 2017 at 2:03 AM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Daniel Kucera, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/29/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Stephen G Schulman , +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 sschulman@milbergweiss.com
TERMINATED: 05/29/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Seeger Weiss LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/29/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY David R. Buchanan +1 212 584 0700 +1 212 584 0799 DBuchanan@SeegerWeiss.com
TERMINATED: 05/29/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Stephen A. Weiss +1 212 584 0700 +1 212 584 0799 sweiss@seegerweiss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 200

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/29/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY David Avi Rosenfeld +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 drosenfeld@rgrdlaw.com
TERMINATED: 05/29/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Samuel Howard Rudman +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 srudman@rgrdlaw.com
No Logo Deb Belcore, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Stanley D Bernstein , +1 212 779 1414 +7793 779 779 3218 bernstein@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com
No Logo Richard Eichfeld, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Stanley D Bernstein , +1 212 779 1414 +7793 779 779 3218 bernstein@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com
v.
No Logo Bancboston Robertson Stephens Inc., Defendant
Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Epiphany, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Eliot L. Wegbreit, Defendant
No Logo Kevin J. Yeaman, Defendant
Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc. Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Incorporated"
Unknown Role, Cumulus Media Inc.
Unknown Role, Lodgian, Inc.
Unknown Role, Mlgpe Ltd
Merrill Lynch GP Inc. Unknown Role, Merrill Lynch GP Inc.
Unknown Role, Infospace.com, Inc.
Unknown Role, New BlackRock, Inc.
Unknown Role, NATIONSBANK CORP
Bank of America, NA Unknown Role, Bank of America, NA
Unknown Role, Gabelli Utility Fund
Unknown Role, Muniholdings Fund Inc
Unknown Role, Munienhanced Fund Inc
Unknown Role, Munivest Fund II Inc

Toggle Switch Represented by Nueces Republican Womens PAC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Mark Holland +1 212 813 8800 +1 212 355 3333 mholland@goodwinlaw.com
No Logo Robertson Stephens, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Brendan Joseph Dowd +1 212 326 2000 +1 212 326 2061 bdowd@omm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Andrew Jay Frackman +1 212 326 2000 +1 212 326 2061 afrackman@omm.com
No Logo Roger S. Siboni, Defendant
No Logo Buenos Aires Seruwenos, L.L.C., Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/29/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Menachem E. Lifshitz +1 212 779 1414 lifshitz@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gainey McKenna & Egleston

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/29/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Gregory Michael Egleston +1 212 683 3400 +1 212 683 3402 greg.egleston@gmail.com
No Logo Tectonic Fund, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Zia Uddin, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Stanley D Bernstein , +1 212 779 1414 +7793 779 779 3218 bernstein@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 78m(a)
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/1/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT settling ation. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 11/24/09) (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Right to Appeal)(dt) (Entered: 12/03/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/13/2003, Entered: None
ANSWER to Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. Document filed by Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation. Related document: 17 Amended Complaint filed by Zia Uddin, Richard Eichfeld, Deb Belcore.(sac, ) (Entered: 03/30/2004)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/22/2003, Entered: None
    ANSWER by Merrill Lynch to [17-1] amended complaint. (Attorney Mark Holland from the Firm: Clifford Chance US, LLP). (sac) (Entered: 09/16/2003)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: None
      ANSWER by Robertson Stephens to [17-1] amended complaint. (Attorney Brendan Joseph Dowd from the O'Melveny & Myers, LLP)... rec'd in the night deposit box on 7/21/03 at 7:26 p.m. (sac) (Entered: 08/20/2003)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/29/2002, Entered: None
        AMENDED COMPLAINT by Zia Uddin, Richard Eichfeld, Deb Belcore amending [1-1] complaint ; Summons issued. (ac) (Entered: 07/29/2002)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/13/2002, Entered: None
          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to Credit Suisse First by Tracy Del Duca, managing agent, on 5/28/02. (sac) (Entered: 07/25/2002)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/13/2002, Entered: None
            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to BancBoston by Stephen Austin, managing agent, on 5/29/02. (sac) (Entered: 07/25/2002)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/22/2002, Entered: None
              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to Merrill Lynch by Sue Ann Codeman, managing agent, on 5/28/02. (sac) (Entered: 07/23/2002)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: None
                RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Robertson Stephens. (sac) (Entered: 02/06/2002)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/26/2001, Entered: None
                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Tectonic Fund, Zia Uddin in FURTHER support of [8-1] motion for order consolidating this action 01 Civ. 6158 (Lead Case) with the following mem Cases: 01 Civ 6370, [8-2] motion for an order, appointing as Lead Plffs. purs. to Sec. 27(a)(3)(B) of the Securities Act of 1933 and Sec. 21D(a)(3)(B) of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934 as amended by the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act of 1995, [8-3] motion fro an order approval of Movants' selection of Lead Counsel. (Rec'd in night box on 9/26/01 7:18 p.m.) (ICMSUSER) (Entered: 10/04/2001)
                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/20/2001, Entered: None
                    RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Credit Suisse First. (ICMSUSER) (Entered: 10/04/2001)
                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/7/2001, Entered: None
                      DECLARATION of SAMUEL H. RUDMAN by Tectonic Fund, Zia Uddin in support Re: [8-1] motion for order consolidating this action 01 Civ. 6158 (Lead Case) with the following mem Cases: 01 Civ 6370, [8-2] motion for an order, appointing as Lead Plffs. purs. to Sec. 27(a)(3)(B) of the Securities Act of 1933 and Sec. 21D(a)(3)(B) of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934 as amended by the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act of 1995, [8-3] motion fro an order approval of Movants' selection of Lead Counsel. (Rec'd in night box on 9/7/01 9:13 p.m.) (ICMSUSER) (Entered: 10/04/2001)
                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/7/2001, Entered: None
                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Tectonic Fund, Zia Uddin in support of [8-1] motion for order consolidating this action 01 Civ. 6158 (Lead Case) with the following mem Cases: 01 Civ 6370, [8-2] motion for an order, appointing as Lead Plffs. purs. to Sec. 27(a)(3)(B) of the Securities Act of 1933 and Sec. 21D(a)(3)(B) of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934 as amended by the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act of 1995, [8-3] motion fro an order approval of Movants' selection of Lead Counsel. (Rec'd in night box on 9/7/01 9:13 p.m.) (ICMSUSER) Modified on 10/04/2001 (Entered: 10/04/2001)
                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/7/2001, Entered: None
                          NOTICE OF MOTION by Tectonic Fund, Zia Uddin for order consolidating this action 01 Civ. 6158 (Lead Case) with the following mem Cases: 01 Civ 6370 , for an order, appointing as Lead Plffs. purs. to Sec. 27(a)(3)(B) of the Securities Act of 1933 and Sec. 21D(a)(3)(B) of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934 as amended by the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act of 1995 , fro an order approval of Movants' selection of Lead Counsel . (ICMSUSER) (Entered: 10/04/2001)
                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/7/2001, Entered: None
                            RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Merrill Lynch. (ICMSUSER) (Entered: 10/04/2001)
                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/7/2001, Entered: None
                              RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Merrill Lynch. (ICMSUSER) (Entered: 10/04/2001)
                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/5/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ORDER,... that all cases involving E.Pipheny in this IPO Securities Litigation, as set forth in the attached Rider (1:01-cv-06370), shall be consolidated into case number 01 Civ. 6158. The Clerk of Court is hereby ordered to consolidate any future cases that are designated as related to 01 Civ. 6158 ,... the Clerk of Court is further ordered to close all cases that have been consolidated, subject to re-opening at a later date on proper application by a party ... ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); Copies mailed. [Original filed in 1:01-cv-06158 Document No. 5. Document Docketed in 1:01-cv-06370] (dcap) (Entered: 10/02/2001)
                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/29/2001, Entered: None
                                  RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by E.Piphany, Inc. (sac) (Entered: 08/30/2001)
                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/9/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    Notice of Case Reassignment to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. Copy of notice mailed to Attorney(s) of record. Pursuant to the Order of Chief Judge Mukasey dated August 8, 2001, the above entitled action is reassigned to the calendar of Judge Shira A. Scheindlin for inclusion in the coordinated pretrial proceedings being conducted by that judge. Two originals of all future documents submitted in this action are to be presented in the Clerk's Office for filing. One original is to be filed in this docket number and one original is to be filed in the miscellaneous case number 21mc92 (SAS). Each shall bear the original assigned judge's ( ) initials after the original docket number. Attached is a copy of Judge Mukasey's ORDER re: coordinating the proceedings before Judge Scheindlin. Also attached is a copy of Judge Scheindlin's ORDER re: set initial PTC 09/07/01 and directing all counsel to comply with Judge Scheindlin's requirements. [Original Orders docketed in 21mc92 (SAS) as documents numbers 1 and 2] (dcap) (Entered: 08/10/2001)
                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/1/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      STIPULATION and ORDER; defts' time to answer, move or respond to the complaint is extended through the later of 60 days after (i) assignment of lead pltffs' counsel; or (ii) the filing of an amended complaint in this action . ( signed by Judge Lawrence M. McKenna ) (sn) (Entered: 08/01/2001)
                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/9/2001, Entered: None
                                        CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed. Summons issued and Notice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 411086. (jco) (Entered: 07/10/2001)
                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 60 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?